DORA et al v. SESSIONS et al
Plaintiff: ESPERANZA, ALEX, RITA, WILMA, ZANDRA, PATRICIA, XIOMARA, ULA, NORA, ALMA, KARA, TANIA, BEATRIZ, SYLVIA, ORELIA, VICTORIA, JENIFER, YADIRA, LINDA, FANY, GINA, ISIDRA, CARLOS, ALL PLAINTIFFS, CARLA, HELENA, QUELA, MINDY, DORA and BENJAMIN
Defendant: RONALD VITIELLO, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Case Number: 1:2018cv01938
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/26/2018 (tj)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' joint status report #10 , the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on Septenber 26, 2018. (MA)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shebaya, Sirine)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Lodging Agreement for Court's Approval in Case No. 18cv1832, #2 Certificate of Service)(Barmeyer, Wilson)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Shebaya, Sirine)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan James Smith on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Smith, Johnathan)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE OF ERROR re #7 Notice of Appearance; emailed to sirine@muslimadvocates.org, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Please file in the correct case. (ztd, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Shebaya, Sirine) Modified on 8/30/2018 (ztd).
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Robins on behalf of All Defendants (Robins, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2018 SUMMONS (1) Issued as to U.S. Attorney (jf)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 SEALED COMPLAINT re #3 Redacted Complaint filed by ULA, RITA, HELENA, YADIRA, ORELIA, JENIFER, KARA, ALMA, BEATRIZ, DORA, VICTORIA, SYLVIA, ZANDRA, QUELA, LINDA, CARLA, ESPERANZA, ISIDRA, ALEX, WILMA, MINDY, CARLOS, TANIA, BENJAMIN, GINA, FANY, XIOMARA, PATRICIA, NORA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Sealed Names)(zjf)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-1835. (jf)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 REDACTED COMPLAINT against L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, RONALD VITIELLO ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616094175) filed by ULA, GINA, ZANDRA, QUELA, ALMA, DORA, RITA, PATRICIA, YADIRA, ALEX, BENJAMIN, TANIA, NORA, XIOMARA, JENIFER, KARA, VICTORIA, MINDY, WILMA, CARLOS, FANY, BEATRIZ, ISIDRA, LINDA, ORELIA, HELENA, CARLA, SYLVIA, ESPERANZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER temporarily granting #1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and to File Supporting Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/17/2018. (jf)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and to File Supporting Exhibits Under Seal by ALEX, ALMA, BEATRIZ, BENJAMIN, CARLA, CARLOS, DORA, ESPERANZA, FANY, GINA, HELENA, ISIDRA, JENIFER, KARA, LINDA, MINDY, NORA, ORELIA, PATRICIA, QUELA, RITA, SYLVIA, TANIA, ULA, VICTORIA, WILMA, XIOMARA, YADIRA, ZANDRA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carol T. McClarnon, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(jf)
August 17, 2018 SUMMONS (4) Issued as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, RONALD VITIELLO, and U.S. Attorney General (jf) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DORA et al v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESPERANZA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZANDRA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIOMARA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ULA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALMA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANIA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEATRIZ
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORELIA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENIFER
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YADIRA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FANY
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISIDRA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Represented By: Johnathan James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELENA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUELA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINDY
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORA
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN
Represented By: Wilson G. Barmeyer
Represented By: Sirine Shebaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD VITIELLO
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?