ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY et al

Plaintiff: LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, AIDS UNITED, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, THE NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES and NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, ALEX M. AZAR, II, R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, STEVEN MNUCHIN and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Amicus Curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, NATIONAL COALITION FOR CANCER SURVIVORSHIP, EPILEPSY FOUNDATION, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AARP FOUNDATION, HEMOPHILIA FEDERATION OF AMERICA, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, GLOBAL HEALTHY LIVING, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN OSTEOPATHIC ASSOCIATION, AARP, LEUKEMIA & LYMPHOMA SOCIETY, MARCH OF DIMES FOUNDATION and HIV MEDICINE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02133
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of plaintiffs' #28 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule, and defendants' response thereto, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern the above-captioned case: (1) pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(n)(1), defendants shall file a certified list of the contents of the administrative record with the Court and shall serve plaintiffs with a copy of the administrative record on or before December 19, 2018; (2) the parties shall file cross-motions for summary judgment, including references to the administrative record pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(h)(2), on or before January 11, 2019; (3) the parties shall file any responses thereto on or before January 25, 2019; (4) the parties shall file any replies in support of their cross-motions for summary judgment on or before February 1, 2019; and (5) plaintiffs shall file the joint administrative records appendix as required by Local Civil Rule 7(n)(2) on or before February 8, 2019. It is further ORDERED that a motions hearing on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment shall be held on February 19, 2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/12/18. (lcrjl1)
November 9, 2018 32 REPLY to opposition to motion re #28 MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule) filed by AIDS UNITED, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES. (Pincus, Andrew)
November 9, 2018 30 RESPONSE re #28 MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule) and Proposed Alternative Schedule filed by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
November 9, 2018 29 TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on October 26, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-79. Date of Issuance: November 9, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public t erminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2019.(wz)
November 7, 2018 31 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by AIDS UNITED, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (See Docket Entry #28 to view document) (jf)
November 7, 2018 28 MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule) by AIDS UNITED, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
October 26, 2018 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2018 re: Plaintiffs' #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction was Heard and Taken Under Advisement.(Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
October 25, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/26/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (jth)
October 22, 2018 27 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations by AIDS UNITED, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES (Attachments: #1 Palanker Declaration, #2 Murray Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rothfeld, Charles)
October 22, 2018 26 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by AIDS UNITED, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Sealed Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
October 22, 2018 25 REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AIDS UNITED, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES. (Pincus, Andrew)
October 22, 2018 24 ERRATA attaching corrected memorandum of law by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit corrected memorandum - redline, #2 Exhibit corrected memorandum - clean)(Orloff, Serena)
October 15, 2018 20 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Bradley)
October 15, 2018 19 RESPONSE re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
October 12, 2018 18 MOTION to Modify Filing Deadlines by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry #17 to view document) (jf)
October 12, 2018 17 NOTICE , or in the Alternative, Motion to Modify Filing Deadlines by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Bradley)
October 11, 2018 23 AMICUS BRIEF by AARP, AARP FOUNDATION. (znmw)
October 11, 2018 22 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION, EPILEPSY FOUNDATION, GLOBAL HEALTHY LIVING, HEMOPHILIA FEDERATION OF AMERICA, LEUKEMIA & LYMPHOMA SOCIETY, MARCH OF DIMES FOUNDATION, NATIONAL COALITION FOR CANCER SURVIVORSHIP, NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY. (znmw)
October 11, 2018 21 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN OSTEOPATHIC ASSOCIATION, MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, HIV MEDICINE ASSOCIATION. (znmw)
October 11, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion of American Medical Association, et al., for Leave to File a Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; #14 Motion for Leave to File Brief of American Cancer Society, et al., as Amici Curiae Supporting Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and #15 Consent Motion of AARP and AARP Foundation for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. It is hereby ORDERED that the foregoing motions are GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/11/18. (lcrjl1)
October 11, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of James R. Sigel. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that James R. Sigel be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/11/18. (lcrjl1)
October 9, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Humphreys on behalf of All Defendants (Humphreys, Bradley)
October 8, 2018 15 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by AARP, AARP FOUNDATION (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bagby, Kelly)
October 8, 2018 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, Cystic Fibrosis Foundation, EPILEPSY FOUNDATION, Global Healthy Living Foundation, Hemophilia Federation of America, Leukemia & Lymphoma Society, March of Dimes, NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY, National Coalition for Cancer Survivorship (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief of Amici Curiae American Cancer Society et al., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmore, Joseph)
October 5, 2018 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James R. Sigel, :Firm- Morrison & Foerster LLP, :Address- 425 Market Street, San Francisco CA 94105. Phone No. - 415-268-6948. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5725780. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, Cystic Fibrosis Foundation, EPILEPSY FOUNDATION, Global Healthy Living Foundation, Hemophilia Federation of America, Leukemia & Lymphoma Society, March of Dimes, NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY, National Coalition for Cancer Survivorship (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James R. Sigel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmore, Joseph)
October 5, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Palmore on behalf of AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, Cystic Fibrosis Foundation, EPILEPSY FOUNDATION, Global Healthy Living Foundation, Hemophilia Federation of America, Leukemia & Lymphoma Society, March of Dimes, National Coalition for Cancer Survivorship, NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY (Palmore, Joseph)
October 5, 2018 11 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN OSTEOPATHIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS, THE HIV MEDICINE ASSOCIATION, MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amici, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Golder, Chad)
October 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 10/15/2018. Reply due by 10/22/2018. (tb)
October 2, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #4 Motion for Order Approving Proposed Agreed-Upon Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall file their response to plaintiffs' preliminary injunction motion no later than 10/15/18 and that plaintiffs shall file their reply no later than 10/22/18. It is further ORDERED that a preliminary injunction hearing shall be set for 10/26/18 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/2/18. (lcrjl1)
September 28, 2018 10 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 31 NOTICE FILED ON 11/07/2018.....MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AIDS UNITED, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Harry Brandt Declaration, #3 David Fassler Declaration, #4 Paul Gionfriddo Declaration, #5 Elena Hung Declaration, #6 Kenneth Janda Declaration, #7 Angela Kimball Declaration, #8 George Kolodner Declaration, #9 Jesse Milan Jr Declaration, #10 Margaret Murray Declaration, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew) Modified on 11/9/2018 (zjf).
September 27, 2018 9 RESPONSE re #4 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Orloff, Serena)
September 25, 2018 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA served on 9/18/2018; ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/18/2018; STEVEN MNUCHIN served on 9/18/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 9/18/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 9/18/2018; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY served on 9/18/2018 (Pincus, Andrew)
September 25, 2018 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/18/2018. (Pincus, Andrew)
September 25, 2018 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/17/2018. (Pincus, Andrew)
September 25, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of All Defendants (Orloff, Serena)
September 24, 2018 4 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by AIDS UNITED, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry #3 Summons Issued Electronically was entered in error; Summonses already issued at Docket Entry #2 . (znmw)
September 17, 2018 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) Modified on 9/26/2018 (znmw).
September 17, 2018 2 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
September 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zsb)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, ALEX M. AZAR, II, STEVEN MNUCHIN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5688441) filed by THE NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES, MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC, NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS, AIDS UNITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - U.S. Department of Treasury, #3 Summons - U.S. Department of Labor, #4 Summons - U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #5 Summons - Alex M. Azar II, #6 Summons - R. Alexander Acosta, #7 Summons - Steven Mnuchin, #8 Summons - U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #9 Summons - U.S. Attorney General)(Pincus, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LITTLE LOBBYISTS, LLC
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles A. Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDS UNITED
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles A. Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ALLIANCE ON MENTAL ILLNESS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles A. Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles A. Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles A. Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION FOR COMMUNITY AFFILIATED PLANS
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles A. Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PARTNERSHIP FOR WOMEN & FAMILIES
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Charles A. Rothfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MNUCHIN
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Represented By: Bradley P. Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Chad Golder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL COALITION FOR CANCER SURVIVORSHIP
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EPILEPSY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Chad Golder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNECOLOGISTS
Represented By: Chad Golder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CYSTIC FIBROSIS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Chad Golder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEDICAL SOCIETY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Chad Golder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP FOUNDATION
Represented By: Kelly R. Bagby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEMOPHILIA FEDERATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLOBAL HEALTHY LIVING
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Chad Golder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN OSTEOPATHIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Chad Golder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP
Represented By: Kelly R. Bagby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEUKEMIA & LYMPHOMA SOCIETY
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARCH OF DIMES FOUNDATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Palmore
Represented By: James R. Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HIV MEDICINE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Chad Golder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?