NETIS v. SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MAHAL NETIS
Defendant: JUDY VALOIS, JASON J. HYDE, JYOTHI RACHA, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, PARVAN ARGAWAL, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, SHERRY MORRISON, MWS CAPITAL, LLC, DENISE WILLIAMS, NANCY RISTER, CINDY BOYD, MICHAEL BURNS, ROBERT CHODY, LAURA BARKER, GARY RICHARDSON, ERNEST CODILIS, CHRIS AZUR, DANIEL SPILSBURY, MARTY RUBLE, ANGELA ZAVALA, MATTHEW SHAW, SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C., WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS), SERVICELINK DEFAULT ABSTRACT SOLUTIONS, WILLIAM T. LYNCH, KAMMIE MARSHALL, ANGELA B. MYERS and JUDY HOBBS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00200
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Verified Alien Tort Claim. Defendant's response shall be due on or before April 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/18/2019. (lcapm2)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order advising plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF #15 by April 17, 2019. If Plaintiff does not respond or does not ask for more time on or before April 17, 2018, then the court may grant the Motion and dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/18/2019. (lcapm2)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 ERRATA EXHIBIT F - to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by LAURA BARKER, ROBERT CHODY, JUDY HOBBS, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, SHERRY MORRISON, NANCY RISTER, MARTY RUBLE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by SHERRY MORRISON, LAURA BARKER, JUDY HOBBS, NANCY RISTER, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, ROBERT CHODY, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, MARTY RUBLE. (Inomata, Margaret)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by LAURA BARKER, ROBERT CHODY, JUDY HOBBS, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, SHERRY MORRISON, NANCY RISTER, MARTY RUBLE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Inomata, Margaret)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Verified Alien Tort Claim by ERNEST CODILIS, CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C., ANGELA ZAVALA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chizewer, David)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Joel Chizewer on behalf of ERNEST CODILIS, CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C., ANGELA ZAVALA (Chizewer, David)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Carmen Jo Rejda-Ponce, :Firm- Germer PLLC, :Address- 2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2900, Houston, Texas 77019. Phone No. - 713-650-1313. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6006230. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LAURA BARKER, ROBERT CHODY, JUDY HOBBS, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, SHERRY MORRISON, NANCY RISTER, MARTY RUBLE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carmen Jo Rejda-Ponce in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Inomata, Margaret)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Larry J. Simmons, :Firm- Germer PLLC, :Address- 2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2900, Houston, Texas 77019. Phone No. - 713-650-1313. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6006192. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LAURA BARKER, ROBERT CHODY, JUDY HOBBS, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, SHERRY MORRISON, NANCY RISTER, MARTY RUBLE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Larry J. Simmons in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Inomata, Margaret)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Inomata on behalf of LAURA BARKER, ROBERT CHODY, JUDY HOBBS, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, SHERRY MORRISON, NANCY RISTER, MARTY RUBLE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE (Inomata, Margaret)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PARVAN ARGAWAL served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; CHRIS AZUR served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; LAURA BARKER served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; MICHAEL BURNS served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; ROBERT CHODY served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; ERNEST CODILIS served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; JUDY HOBBS served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; JASON J. HYDE served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; KAMMIE MARSHALL served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; SHERRY MORRISON served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS) served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; MWS CAPITAL, LLC served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; NANCY RISTER served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; MARTY RUBLE served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; SERVICELINK DEFAULT ABSTRACT SOLUTIONS served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; MATTHEW SHAW served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; ANGELA ZAVALA served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019 (jf)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 ERRATA (Civil Cover Sheet) re #1 Complaint filed by MAHAL NETIS. (jf)
February 8, 2019 Summons (22) Issued as to PARVAN ARGAWAL, CHRIS AZUR, LAURA BARKER, MICHAEL BURNS, ROBERT CHODY, ERNEST CODILIS, CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C., JUDY HOBBS, JASON J. HYDE, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, KAMMIE MARSHALL, SHERRY MORRISON, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS), MWS CAPITAL, LLC, NANCY RISTER, MARTY RUBLE, SERVICELINK DEFAULT ABSTRACT SOLUTIONS, MATTHEW SHAW, SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ANGELA ZAVALA. (jf)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 ERRATA re #1 Complaint filed by MAHAL NETIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(jf)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Permission to Use Post Office Box by MAHAL NETIS (jf)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by MAHAL NETIS (jf) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/8/2019) (zjf).
January 18, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to All Defendants (jf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Cease and Desist All Claims, Ex Parte Injunctive Relief by MAHAL NETIS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Vacate Foreclosure by MAHAL NETIS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate Judgment by MAHAL NETIS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jf)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PARVAN ARGAWAL, CHRIS AZUR, LAURA BARKER, MICHAEL BURNS, ROBERT CHODY, ERNEST CODILIS, CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C., JUDY HOBBS, JASON J. HYDE, JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS, KAMMIE MARSHALL, SHERRY MORRISON, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS), MWS CAPITAL, LLC, NANCY RISTER, MARTY RUBLE, SERVICELINK DEFAULT ABSTRACT SOLUTIONS, MATTHEW SHAW, SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ANGELA ZAVALA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616096473) with Jury Demand filed by MAHAL NETIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Errata, #3 Exhibits) (jf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NETIS v. SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY VALOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON J. HYDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JYOTHI RACHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDICIARY COURTS OF TEXAS
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARVAN ARGAWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMSON COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRY MORRISON
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MWS CAPITAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY RISTER
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINDY BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CHODY
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA BARKER
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERNEST CODILIS
Represented By: David Joel Chizewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS AZUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL SPILSBURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTY RUBLE
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA ZAVALA
Represented By: David Joel Chizewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODILIS & STAWAIRSKI, P.C.
Represented By: David Joel Chizewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMSON COUNTY TEXAS SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVICELINK DEFAULT ABSTRACT SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM T. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMMIE MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA B. MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDY HOBBS
Represented By: Margaret Inomata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAHAL NETIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?