GRIFFIN et al v. UNITED STATES et al
Plaintiff: JOEL ADEYEMI OMOTOSHO, MICHAEL T. CHOCK, JULIO RUIZ, BETTY ANANYO, THOMAS PHILLIPS, III, LEONCIO BAUTISTA, PAUL K. MEYER, BRIGIDA E. CHOCK, HANNAH K. HEART, JOHN W. BARRY, EURICH Z. GRIFFIN, MOSES NELSON, DANIEL B. MIRANDA, JOSE VALEZ, PATRESE BLACKWOOD, ELVAH BLISS MIRANDA, RAFAEL RAMOS, RODRIGO B. LIBANAG, SCOTT F. HAWVER, RADAMES RODRIQUEZ, AARON AQUERON, HECTOR MENDEZ, ADA RAMOS, ROSALIE O. LIBANAG, MIRIAM MENDEZ, MARCIAMINAJUANEQUITA R.T. DUMLAO, JUANITO ESTRADA, CARL MCBEAN, MAGDELENA NIEVES, ELBA M. VIERA LOPEZ, BENEDICTA SISON, PATRICIA HINDS, BARBARA W. GRIFFIN, JEANETTE DELGADO, MCKINLEY LEWIS, BEVERLY BRAUMULLER-HAWVER, ROSEMARIE M. LASTIMADO-DRADI, ROSE ANN FLOR, SHERYL TINOCO, ANNETTE TORRUELLAS, KARRINE N. MONTAQUE and ADA DE LA CRUZ
Defendant: JOHN KOSKINEN, K. COLT, JAMES P. CALIGURE, CYNTHIA D. SPRY, SUMMER A. SUTHERLAND, CHERYL CORDERO, R. A. MITCHELL, COLIN P. KELLY, JOSEPH ZEIGLER, LISA MORRISON, STEVEN MNUCHIN, DEBORAH JAMES, KATHERINE R. POWERS, BART BRELLENTHIN, WILLIAM BARR, JAMES BECK, ELIZABETH A. KANE, KENNETH O. JUSTICE, BENJAMIN F. RAY, MONICA E. KOCH, JOHN DOES, JAMES GREENWAY, DAVID FERS, ROBERTA NAPOLITANO, NEIL CASEY, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, TONYA WILLIAMS-WALLACE, SARAH T. MAYHEW, KELLY MAEDA, MICHAEL W. COX, ELBA Y. PORRATA-DORIA, JOHN SHATRAW, RYAN SPENCER, DAVID J. KAUTTER, CHRISTOPHER J. GUST, JOHN B. MURPHY, LAQUITA TAYLOR-PHILLIPS, DAVID SMITH, PAUL G. ALVARADO, SHERRI HOLOCOMB, L. DUNN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, SARAH DAVIDSON, DAVID A. HUBBERT, MARK MACPHERSON, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, BRADLEY A. SARNEL, LASONIA KIMES, CHRISTINE L. DAVIS, WILLIAM P. BARR and STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00762
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Benedicta Sison. Type of Document Returned: Minte Order entered 4/11/19. New Address: not provided; unable to forward. (lsj)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion to dismiss by July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/25/2019. (lccrc1)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BETTY ANANYO, AARON AQUERON, LEONCIO BAUTISTA, PATRESE BLACKWOOD, BEVERLY BRAUMULLER-HAWVER, BRIGIDA E. CHOCK, MICHAEL T. CHOCK, ADA DE LA CRUZ, JEANETTE DELGADO, JUANITO ESTRADA, ROSE ANN FLOR, BARBARA W. GRIFFIN, SCOTT F. HAWVER, HANNAH K. HEART, PATRICIA HINDS, MCKINLEY LEWIS, RODRIGO B. LIBANAG, ROSALIE O. LIBANAG, ELBA M. VIERA LOPEZ, HECTOR MENDEZ, MIRIAM MENDEZ, PAUL K. MEYER, MOSES NELSON, MAGDELENA NIEVES, JOEL ADEYEMI OMOTOSHO, THOMAS PHILLIPS, III, RAFAEL RAMOS, RADAMES RODRIQUEZ, BENEDICTA SISON, SHERYL TINOCO, ANNETTE TORRUELLAS, JOSE VALEZ (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER advising Plaintiffs to respond to #20 Motion to Dismiss or Court may deem matter as conceded. Plaintiffs shall file one consolidated response by June 24, 2019.. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/3/2019. (lccrc1)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman-Logsdon, Megan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT by EURICH Z. GRIFFIN. (ztd)
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT by ADA DE LA CRUZ, RAFAEL RAMOS. (ztd)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT by KARRINE N. MONTAQUE. (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, by ROBERTA NAPOLITANO.(ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT by PAUL K. MEYER. (Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT by RODRIGO B. LIBANAG, ROSALIE O. LIBANAG. (Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT by ELBA M. VIERA LOPEZ. (Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT by MARCIAMINAJUANEQUITA R.T. DUMLAO. (Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT by LEONCIO BAUTISTA. (Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT by JOHN W. BARRY. (Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT by JOEL ADEYEMI OMOTOSHO.(Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT by ROSEMARIE M. LASTIMADO-DRADI.(Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT by DANIEL B. MIRANDA, ELVAH BLISS MIRANDA.(Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT by HANNAH K. HEART.(Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd) .
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT by MOSES NELSON. (Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT by PATRESE BLACKWOOD. (Filed pursuant to order filed 4/11/19) (ztd)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER dismissing putative class action claims. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/11/2019. (lccrc2)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Clerk of Court has received individualized declarations and "offers of proof" (in the form of voluminous exhibits) from several of the Plaintiffs. In deference to the Plaintiffs pro se status, the Court will accept for filing the declarations that allege each Plaintiff's right to relief and will deem them incorporated by reference into the complaint. The exhibits, however, which function as evidence rather than allegations, are not properly considered a part of the complaint, see Fed. R. Civ. P 8 (explaining that complaints should include "a short and plain statement of the claim showing that the pleader is entitled to relief"), and are otherwise premature. The Court directs the Clerk's Office to return the offers of proof received thus far and directs Plaintiffs not to file further proofs (as opposed to the aforementioned declarations) unless this case proceeds beyond the pleadings stage and the production of evidence becomes warranted. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/11/2019. (lccrc2)
March 19, 2019 SUMMONS (46) Issued as to PAUL G. ALVARADO, WILLIAM BARR, JAMES BECK, BART BRELLENTHIN, JAMES P. CALIGURE, NEIL CASEY, K. COLT, CHERYL CORDERO, MICHAEL W. COX, SARAH DAVIDSON, CHRISTINE L. DAVIS, L. DUNN, DAVID FERS, JAMES GREENWAY, SHERRI HOLOCOMB, DAVID A. HUBBERT, DEBORAH JAMES, KENNETH O. JUSTICE, ELIZABETH A. KANE, DAVID J. KAUTTER, COLIN P. KELLY, LASONIA KIMES, MONICA E. KOCH, JOHN KOSKINEN, MARK MACPHERSON, KELLY MAEDA, SARAH T. MAYHEW, R. A. MITCHELL, STEVEN MNUCHIN, LISA MORRISON, JOHN B. MURPHY, ROBERTA NAPOLITANO, ELBA Y. PORRATA-DORIA, KATHERINE R. POWERS, BENJAMIN F. RAY, BRADLEY A. SARNEL, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, JOHN SHATRAW, DAVID SMITH, RYAN SPENCER, CYNTHIA D. SPRY, SUMMER A. SUTHERLAND, LAQUITA TAYLOR-PHILLIPS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, TONYA WILLIAMS-WALLACE, JOSEPH ZEIGLER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-1387 T(CHL) in U.S. Court of Federal Claims. (ztd)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PAUL G. ALVARADO, WILLIAM BARR, JAMES BECK, BART BRELLENTHIN, JAMES P. CALIGURE, NEIL CASEY, K. COLT, CHERYL CORDERO, MICHAEL W. COX, SARAH DAVIDSON, CHRISTINE L. DAVIS, JOHN DOES, L. DUNN, DAVID FERS, JAMES GREENWAY, CHRISTOPHER J. GUST, SHERRI HOLOCOMB, DAVID A. HUBBERT, DEBORAH JAMES, KENNETH O. JUSTICE, ELIZABETH A. KANE, DAVID J. KAUTTER, COLIN P. KELLY, LASONIA KIMES, MONICA E. KOCH, JOHN KOSKINEN, MARK MACPHERSON, KELLY MAEDA, SARAH T. MAYHEW, R. A. MITCHELL, STEVEN MNUCHIN, LISA MORRISON, JOHN B. MURPHY, ROBERTA NAPOLITANO, ELBA Y. PORRATA-DORIA, KATHERINE R. POWERS, BENJAMIN F. RAY, BRADLEY A. SARNEL, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, JOHN SHATRAW, DAVID SMITH, RYAN SPENCER, CYNTHIA D. SPRY, SUMMER A. SUTHERLAND, LAQUITA TAYLOR-PHILLIPS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, TONYA WILLIAMS-WALLACE, JOSEPH ZEIGLER ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616097265) filed by SCOTT F. HAWVER, BEVERLY BRAUMULLER-HAWVER, CARL MCBEAN, SHERYL TINOCO, ROSALIE O. LIBANAG, ELBA M. VIERA LOPEZ, JULIO RUIZ, ADA RAMOS, RODRIGO B. LIBANAG, KARRINE N. MONTAQUE, LEONCIO BAUTISTA, MOSES NELSON, MAGDELENA NIEVES, BRIGIDA E. CHOCK, JEANETTE DELGADO, BENEDICTA SISON, PATRESE BLACKWOOD, JOEL ADEYEMI OMOTOSHO, HECTOR MENDEZ, BARBARA W. GRIFFIN, PATRICIA HINDS, EURICH Z. GRIFFIN, MICHAEL T. CHOCK, MARCIAMINAJUANEQUITA R.T. DUMLAO, HANNAH K. HEART, AARON AQUERON, JUANITO ESTRADA, DANIEL B. MIRANDA, ROSEMARIE M. LASTIMADO-DRADI, BETTY ANANYO, MIRIAM MENDEZ, ELVAH BLISS MIRANDA, ROSE ANN FLOR, JOHN W. BARRY, JOSE VALEZ, THOMAS PHILLIPS, III, RADAMES RODRIQUEZ, MCKINLEY LEWIS, PAUL K. MEYER, ANNETTE TORRUELLAS, RAFAEL RAMOS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/27/2019) (ztd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN et al v. UNITED STATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KOSKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. COLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES P. CALIGURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYNTHIA D. SPRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMMER A. SUTHERLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL CORDERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. A. MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLIN P. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH ZEIGLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA MORRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE R. POWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BART BRELLENTHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH A. KANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH O. JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN F. RAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONICA E. KOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES GREENWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERTA NAPOLITANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONYA WILLIAMS-WALLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH T. MAYHEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY MAEDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL W. COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELBA Y. PORRATA-DORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SHATRAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN SPENCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID J. KAUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER J. GUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN B. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAQUITA TAYLOR-PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL G. ALVARADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERRI HOLOCOMB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Megan Eileen Hoffman-Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH DAVIDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A. HUBBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK MACPHERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY A. SARNEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASONIA KIMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE L. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN T. MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL ADEYEMI OMOTOSHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL T. CHOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIO RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY ANANYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS PHILLIPS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONCIO BAUTISTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL K. MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIGIDA E. CHOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANNAH K. HEART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN W. BARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EURICH Z. GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSES NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL B. MIRANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE VALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRESE BLACKWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELVAH BLISS MIRANDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL RAMOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODRIGO B. LIBANAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT F. HAWVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RADAMES RODRIQUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON AQUERON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADA RAMOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSALIE O. LIBANAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRIAM MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIAMINAJUANEQUITA R.T. DUMLAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITO ESTRADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL MCBEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAGDELENA NIEVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELBA M. VIERA LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENEDICTA SISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA HINDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA W. GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANETTE DELGADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCKINLEY LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY BRAUMULLER-HAWVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARIE M. LASTIMADO-DRADI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE ANN FLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERYL TINOCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNETTE TORRUELLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARRINE N. MONTAQUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADA DE LA CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?