OWL FEATHER-GORBEY v. U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Petitioner: MICHAEL S. OWL FEATHER-GORBEY
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, WARDEN and FBOP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00858
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Receipt on 04/30/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:19-cv-01275 sent by District of Maryland. (zrdj)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Maryland, pursuant to the Court Order entered 04/08/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zsb)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 4/28/2019.. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 03/29/2019. (zef, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Emergency Hearing (See Docket Entry #1 to view document) by MICHAEL S. OWL FEATHER-GORBEY (zsb)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by MICHAEL S. OWL-FEATHER GORBEY (zsb)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL S. OWL-FEATHER GORBEY (zsb)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MICHAEL S. OWL-FEATHER GORBEY.(zsb)
March 26, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 03/26/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWL FEATHER-GORBEY v. U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL S. OWL FEATHER-GORBEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?