AGBONIFO v. U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO
Defendant: MATTHEW S. BOYDEN, USPS, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, MICHAEL SMITH, NICOLE DEBORDE, MARY E. CONN and E. TYNER
Case Number: 1:2019cv01897
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Western District of Missouri. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 9/2/2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/12/2019. (zeg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO (zrdj)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, the plaintiff must provide the Court with a certified copy of his trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent), including the supporting ledger sheets, for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this complaint, obtained from the appropriate from the appropriate official of each prison at which plaintiff is or was confined. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of case. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/08/2019. (zmc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO (zsb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO (zsb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb)
June 24, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/24/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGBONIFO v. U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW S. BOYDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE DEBORDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY E. CONN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. TYNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?