AGBONIFO v. UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 1:2019cv02185
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Receipt on 09/04/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 6:19-cv-03318 sent by Western District of Missouri. (zrdj)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred to the USDC for the Western District of Missouri, pursuant to the Court Order entered 08/08/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zrdj)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. See order for full details. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/8/2019. (zjd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO (zmc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO. (Attachment: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(zmc)
July 19, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/19/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGBONIFO v. UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OJEGBA AGBONIFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?