November 15, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court at present is the parties' #47 Joint Status Report, in which they propose that the Court stay this matter pending the resolution of the government's appeal to the D.C. Circuit of the preliminary injunction that this Court entered. See Make the Road New York v. McAleenan, No. 19-5298 (D.C. Cir.). The Court will construe this Joint Status Report as a motion to stay, and so construed, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to stay is GRANTED, and this case is STAYED until further order of this Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, notwithstanding this stay, the parties shall file a status report within 30 days of the D.C. Circuit's issuance of the mandate in 19-5298, which shall propose a schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/15/2019. (jag)
|
November 8, 2019 |
Filing 47
Joint STATUS REPORT proposing the court stay district court proceedings pending appeal by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, MARK MORGAN. (Reuveni, Erez)
|
November 1, 2019 |
Filing 46
STIPULATION on deadline to submit status report that proposes how to further proceed in this case by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, MARK MORGAN. (Reuveni, Erez)
|
November 1, 2019 |
USCA Case Number 19-5298 for #44 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, MARK MORGAN. (zrdj)
|
October 28, 2019 |
Filing 45
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re #44 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf)
|
October 25, 2019 |
Filing 44
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #41 Order, #40 Memorandum & Opinion by MARK MORGAN, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, WILLIAM BARR, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Reuveni, Erez)
|
October 9, 2019 |
Filing 43
NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne V. Baxley on behalf of LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Baxley, Adrienne)
|
October 8, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 12/10/2019, (hs)
|
October 7, 2019 |
Filing 42
STIPULATION on scheduling by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, MARK MORGAN. (Reuveni, Erez)
|
October 7, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court at present is the parties' #42 Joint Stipulation on Scheduling, in which they represent to the Court that they have reached an agreement as to an extension for Defendants to respond to the Complaint in this matter. The Court will construe this Stipulation as a motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint (see Appendix to Gen. Order and Guidelines for APA Cases, ECF No. #11 , Para. 5(g)), and so construed, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 12/10/2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event that Defendants notice an appeal, the parties shall promptly meet and confer and, within 7 days of the filing of a notice of appeal, file a status report that proposes how to further proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/7/2019. (jag)
|
September 27, 2019 |
Filing 41
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/27/2019. (lckbj2)
|
September 27, 2019 |
Filing 40
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/27/2019. (lckbj2) (Main Document 40 replaced on 10/11/2019) (zgdf).
|
September 27, 2019 |
Filing 39
NOTICE Regarding commencement of expanded expedited removal by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Perez, Celso)
|
September 20, 2019 |
Filing 38
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/13/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/12/2019. (Perez, Celso)
|
September 20, 2019 |
Filing 37
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redline Comparison of Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Celso)
|
September 20, 2019 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #35 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as to the correct filing event (U.S. Attorney for DC) (zjf)
|
September 20, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #37 Consent Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/20/2019. (lckbj1)
|
September 19, 2019 |
Filing 36
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW T. ALBENCE served on 8/13/2019; KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II served on 8/13/2019; KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 8/13/2019; MARK MORGAN served on 8/13/2019 (Perez, Celso)
|
September 19, 2019 |
Filing 35
ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 8/13/2019. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 9/3/2019. (Perez, Celso) Modified on 9/20/2019 (jf).
|
September 19, 2019 |
Filing 34
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/13/2019. (Perez, Celso)
|
September 11, 2019 |
Filing 33
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS, afternoon session, before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson, held on 9/06/2019; Page Numbers: 98 - 172. Date of Issuance: 9/11/2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Elizabeth SaintLoth; Telephone number: 202-354-3242. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 10/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2019.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
|
September 10, 2019 |
Filing 32
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on 09/06/2019; Page Numbers: 1-97. Date of Issuance: 09/10/2019. Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer, Telephone No.: (202) 354-3118, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 10/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2019.(Meyer, Nancy)
|
September 10, 2019 |
Filing 31
Joint STATUS REPORT concerning the Court's September 6, 2019 minute order by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, MARK MORGAN. (Reuveni, Erez)
|
September 6, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Michael Tan is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/6/2019. (lckbj1)
|
September 6, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. This Court held a Motion Hearing on Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 9/6/2019. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly meet and confer, and that, on or before 9/10/2019 by 12:00 PM, the parties shall submit a joint proposal regarding procedures for maintaining the status quo with respect to enforcement of the July 23rd Notice while the Plaintiffs' preliminary injunction is under review. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/6/2019. (lckbj2)
|
September 6, 2019 |
Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2019 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WECOUNT!, LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK. Court heard arguments from both parties and will take the matter under advisement and issue findings. Parties will confer in order to come up with a proposal to prevent potential harm to the members during the pendency of the Court writing an opinion (Court Reporters Nancy Meyer and Elizabeth Saint-Loth.) (zjch)
|
September 5, 2019 |
Filing 30
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Tan, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants Rights Project, :Address- 125 Broad St, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - (347) 714-0740. Fax No. - (212) 549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6360345. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Perez, Celso)
|
September 3, 2019 |
Filing 29
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryne Marie Gray on behalf of All Defendants (Gray, Kathryne)
|
September 3, 2019 |
Filing 28
REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT!. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Perez, Celso)
|
September 3, 2019 |
Filing 27
NOTICE of Appearance by Archith Ramkumar on behalf of All Defendants (Ramkumar, Archith)
|
August 28, 2019 |
Filing 26
NOTICE of filing of administrative record by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MARK MORGAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 1, #2 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 2, #3 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 3, #4 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 4, #5 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 5, #6 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 6, #7 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 7, #8 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 8, #9 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 9, #10 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 10, #11 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 11, #12 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 12, #13 Errata Administrative Record Part 13, #14 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 14, #15 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 15, #16 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 16, #17 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 17, #18 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 18, #19 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 19, #20 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 20, #21 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 21, #22 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 22, #23 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 23, #24 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 24, #25 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 25, #26 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 26, #27 Exhibit Administrative Record Part 27)(Reuveni, Erez)
|
August 28, 2019 |
Filing 25
Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MARK MORGAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez)
|
August 22, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/22/2019. (lckbj1)
|
August 22, 2019 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #24 Motion for Leave to File; emailed to laura.faer@doj.ca.gov, cc'd 25 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. DO NOT REFILE - FYI parties are to be added in all caps and no addresses (zjf, )
|
August 21, 2019 |
Filing 24
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington, District of Columbia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Faer, Laura)
|
August 21, 2019 |
Filing 23
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Brief in Support of Preliminary Injunction filed by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT!. (Perez, Celso)
|
August 21, 2019 |
Filing 22
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on 08/14/2019; Page Numbers: 1-10. Date of Issuance: 08/20/2019. Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer, Telephone Number: (202) 354-3118, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 9/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2019.(Meyer, Nancy)
|
August 15, 2019 |
Filing 21
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on 08/13/2019; Page Numbers: 1-27. Date of Issuance: 08/14/2019. Court Reporter: Nancy J. Meyer. Telephone Number (202) 354-3118, Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 9/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2019.(Meyer, Nancy)
|
August 14, 2019 |
Filing 20
Joint STATUS REPORT on proposed schedule by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MARK MORGAN. (Reuveni, Erez)
|
August 14, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' obligation to respond to the complaint shall be suspended during the Court's consideration of the merits of the motion for a preliminary injunction. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within 14 days after the Court issues its order on the motion for a preliminary injunction. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if any parallel litigation is pending, the parties shall keep the Court fully apprised of the status of such ligation, including notifying the Court within 24 hours whenever a document is filed, a hearing is held or scheduled, or an order is issued in that litigation. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/14/2019. (lckbj1)
|
August 14, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations made in the parties' #20 Joint Statement on Scheduling, it is hereby ORDERED that the following briefing schedule is set regarding Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction: Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental brief on jurisdiction of no more than 15 pages on or before noon on 8/21/2019; Defendant shall file an omnibus opposition of more than 60 pages on or before noon on 8/28/2019; Plaintiffs shall file a reply of no more than 35 pages on or before noon on 9/3/2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a Motion Hearing on Plaintiffs' #13 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/14/2019. (lckbj1)
|
August 13, 2019 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Telephone Conference held in chambers on 8/13/2019. (Court Reporter Nancy Meyer.) (zgdf)
|
August 13, 2019 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 4:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (jch )
|
August 13, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #15 , #17 , #18 , #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Omar C. Jadwat, Susannah Geltman, Joshua Polster, and Jonathan K. Youngwood are admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/13/2019. (lckbj1)
|
August 12, 2019 |
Filing 19
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan K. Youngwood, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 425 Lexington Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 455-3539. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6317404. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Perez, Celso)
|
August 12, 2019 |
Filing 18
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua Polster, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 425 Lexington Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 455-2266. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6317394. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Perez, Celso)
|
August 12, 2019 |
Filing 17
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Susannah Geltman, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 425 Lexington Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 455-2762. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6317389. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Perez, Celso)
|
August 12, 2019 |
Filing 16
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (jf)
|
August 12, 2019 |
Filing 15
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Omar C. Jadwat, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants Rights Project, :Address- 125 Broad Street, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - (212) 549-2620. Fax No. - (212) 549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6315754. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Perez, Celso)
|
August 12, 2019 |
Filing 14
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT!, LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO.(Perez, Celso)
|
August 9, 2019 |
Filing 13
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Declaration of Paige Austin, #4 Declaration of Juanita Valdez-Cox, #5 Declaration of Jonathan Fried, #6 Declaration of Eduardo Beckett, #7 Declaration of Gracie Willis, #8 Declaration of Hannah Cartwright, #9 Declaration of Shalyn Fluharty, #10 Declaration of Jessica Shulruff Schneider, #11 Declaration of Joanna Delfunt, #12 Declaration of Edna Yang, #13 Declaration of Jose Jesus Rodriguez, #14 Declaration of Kara Hartzler, #15 Declaration of Kelly White, #16 Declaration of Laura Lunn, #17 Declaration of Leah A. Jones, #18 Declaration of Timothy Warden-Hertz, #19 Declaration of Cecilia Menjivar, #20 Declaration of Taslim Tavarez, #21 Exhibit A, #22 Exhibit B, #23 Exhibit C, #24 Exhibit D, #25 Exhibit E, #26 Exhibit F, #27 Exhibit G, #28 Exhibit H, #29 Exhibit I, #30 Exhibit J, #31 Exhibit K, #32 Exhibit L, #33 Exhibit M, #34 Exhibit N, #35 Exhibit O, #36 Exhibit P, #37 Exhibit Q, #38 Exhibit R, #39 Exhibit S, #40 Exhibit T, #41 Exhibit U, #42 Exhibit V, #43 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Celso)
|
August 9, 2019 |
Filing 12
NOTICE of Appearance by Erez Reuveni on behalf of All Defendants (Reuveni, Erez)
|
August 9, 2019 |
***Attorneys Anand Balakrishnan, Lee Gelernt, Trina Ann Realmuto, Kristin Macleod-Ball, Stephen Bonggyun Kang for LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK and WECOUNT! added. (jch)
|
August 8, 2019 |
Filing 11
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/8/2019. (lckbj1)
|
August 8, 2019 |
Filing 10
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen B. Kang, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants Rights Project, :Address- 39 Drumm St, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - (415) 343-0783. Fax No. - (415) 395-0950 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6308855. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT! (Perez, Celso)
|
August 8, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #3 , #4 , #6 , #7 , #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Anand Balakrishnan, Lee Gelernt, Trina Realmuto, Kristin Macleod-Ball, and Stephen B. Kang are admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/8/2019. (lckbj1)
|
August 8, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER. The Clerk is directed to change the nature of suit code in this matter from 465 to 890, and to remove any public access restrictions to documents that have already been filed. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/8/2019. (lckbj1)
|
August 7, 2019 |
Filing 9
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michelman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Michelman, Scott)
|
August 7, 2019 |
Filing 8
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MARK MORGAN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
|
August 7, 2019 |
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing 7
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kristin Macleod-Ball, :Firm- American Immigration Council, :Address- 1318 Beacon St., Suite 18, Brookline, MA 02446. Phone No. - 857-305-3722. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6305016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT!, INC. (Walters, Karolina)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing 6
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Trina Realmuto, :Firm- American Immigration Council, :Address- 1318 Beacon St., Suite 18, Brookline, MA 02446. Phone No. - 857-305-3600. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6305012. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT!, INC. (Walters, Karolina)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing 5
NOTICE of Appearance by Karolina Joanna Walters on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Walters, Karolina)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing 4
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lee Gelernt, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants Rights Project, :Address- 125 Broad St, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - (212) 549-5585. Fax No. - (212) 549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6304748. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT!, INC. (Perez, Celso)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing 3
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anand Balakrishnan, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants Rights Project, :Address- 125 Broad St, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - (212) 549-2536. Fax No. - (212) 549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6304642. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO, MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT!, INC. (Perez, Celso)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing 2
NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur)
|
August 6, 2019 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6304121) filed by MAKE THE ROAD NEW YORK, WECOUNT!, INC., LA UNION DEL PUEBLO ENTERO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Perez, Celso)
|