AGNEW et al v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: JENNIFER HOWARD, SANDRA BLACK, ANN COOPER, DAVID EARLS, CALVIN COMPTON, CAREASE JACKSON, TANYA HARRIS, JOANNE BILLMIRE, PRINCETON BARNETT, SEAN CLARK, KERA COLLINSON, ERIC BARNES, MARK ALFRED, NAOMY CENTENO, LALITA EVANS, CLAUDIA GUIDEN, BETTY KNOX, KIMBERLY FROCK, ASHLEY KYLES, ANDRIENNA FAISON, DEBBIE BROWN, JAMISA INGRAM, LYNN JONES, ADAM FEAR, TODD LAPCHESKE, BARBARA AGNEW, REBECCA BRYANT, CLAUDE EVANS, DANIEL CONNELLY, ANNA CROOM, KIMBERLY HANSON, ARTHUR DRAPER, LESLEY HICE, CYNTHIA INGRAHAM, BRENT FEDDERS, LOUISE GASKELL, BRAD ELLISH, CHRISTOPHER ELLINGTON, JIMMY CORNELIUS, KEVIN DUGAN, KRISTINE JACKSON, BUNTHOEUN KUN, JACLYN CALLAHAN, JOSETTE JACKSON, JAMILLE JOHNSON, VICKIE HODGINS, MICHAEL ANJA, JANET BROWN, LORIE HARRINGTON and AARON BECKER
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02489
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Case Stayed. (znbn)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's #4 Motion to Stay is GRANTED, and the case is STAYED until the JPML rules on consolidation and transfer. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/30/2019. (lcjeb2)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toro, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE by LOUISE GASKELL, KIMBERLY FROCK, ANNA CROOM, AARON BECKER, BRAD ELLISH, CALVIN COMPTON, MARK ALFRED, BARBARA AGNEW, DANIEL CONNELLY, ADAM FEAR, KERA COLLINSON, JOSETTE JACKSON, CLAUDE EVANS, CHRISTOPHER ELLINGTON, LALITA EVANS, JENNIFER HOWARD, JIMMY CORNELIUS, NAOMY CENTENO, BUNTHOEUN KUN, DAVID EARLS, DEBBIE BROWN, BRENT FEDDERS, KIMBERLY HANSON, JANET BROWN, BETTY KNOX, JAMISA INGRAM, ARTHUR DRAPER, JAMILLE JOHNSON, JACLYN CALLAHAN, KEVIN DUGAN, ANDRIENNA FAISON, PRINCETON BARNETT, ASHLEY KYLES, VICKIE HODGINS, LORIE HARRINGTON, MICHAEL ANJA, TODD LAPCHESKE, SANDRA BLACK, CYNTHIA INGRAHAM, REBECCA BRYANT, LYNN JONES, SEAN CLARK, LESLEY HICE, JOANNE BILLMIRE, CLAUDIA GUIDEN, KRISTINE JACKSON, TANYA HARRIS, CAREASE JACKSON, ANN COOPER, ERIC BARNES. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Mason, Gary)
August 23, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #2 Summons Issued Electronically; emailed to gmason@wbmllp.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. The incorrect summons form was completed and issued. Please complete the correct summons form and submit electronically (ztd, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) Modified on 8/23/2019 (ztd).
August 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6328246) filed by LOUISE GASKELL, KIMBERLY FROCK, ANNA CROOM, AARON BECKER, BRAD ELLISH, CALVIN COMPTON, MARK ALFRED, BARBARA AGNEW, DANIEL CONNELLY, ADAM FEAR, KERA COLLINSON, JOSETTE JACKSON, CLAUDE EVANS, CHRISTOPHER ELLINGTON, LALITA EVANS, JENNIFER HOWARD, JIMMY CORNELIUS, NAOMY CENTENO, BUNTHOEUN KUN, DAVID EARLS, DEBBIE BROWN, BRENT FEDDERS, KIMBERLY HANSON, JANET BROWN, BETTY KNOX, JAMISA INGRAM, ARTHUR DRAPER, JAMILLE JOHNSON, JACLYN CALLAHAN, KEVIN DUGAN, ANDRIENNA FAISON, PRINCETON BARNETT, ASHLEY KYLES, VICKIE HODGINS, LORIE HARRINGTON, MICHAEL ANJA, TODD LAPCHESKE, SANDRA BLACK, CYNTHIA INGRAHAM, REBECCA BRYANT, LYNN JONES, SEAN CLARK, LESLEY HICE, JOANNE BILLMIRE, CLAUDIA GUIDEN, KRISTINE JACKSON, TANYA HARRIS, CAREASE JACKSON, ANN COOPER, ERIC BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supplement Notice of Related Cases)(Mason, Gary) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/23/2019) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGNEW et al v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER HOWARD
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA BLACK
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN COOPER
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID EARLS
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVIN COMPTON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAREASE JACKSON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA HARRIS
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNE BILLMIRE
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCETON BARNETT
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN CLARK
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERA COLLINSON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC BARNES
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK ALFRED
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAOMY CENTENO
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LALITA EVANS
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIA GUIDEN
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY KNOX
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY FROCK
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY KYLES
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRIENNA FAISON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBBIE BROWN
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMISA INGRAM
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNN JONES
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM FEAR
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD LAPCHESKE
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA AGNEW
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA BRYANT
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDE EVANS
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL CONNELLY
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA CROOM
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY HANSON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR DRAPER
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLEY HICE
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA INGRAHAM
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT FEDDERS
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUISE GASKELL
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAD ELLISH
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER ELLINGTON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY CORNELIUS
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN DUGAN
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINE JACKSON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUNTHOEUN KUN
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACLYN CALLAHAN
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSETTE JACKSON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMILLE JOHNSON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKIE HODGINS
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ANJA
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET BROWN
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORIE HARRINGTON
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON BECKER
Represented By: Gary Edward Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?