CASEY v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Plaintiff: BRIAN M. CASEY
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION and DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02539
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Brian M. Casey; Motion to Appear Telephonically and for Preliminary Injunction This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED." Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/18/2019. (zjd)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; It is FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If the plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case, he may refile his complaint and pay the filing fee in full. This is a final appealable Order. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that an appeal from this Order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis is not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/03/2019. (zad)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by BRIAN M. CASEY. (zjd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRIAN M. CASEY. (zjd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by BRIAN M. CASEY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(zjd)
August 19, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/19/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASEY v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN M. CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?