WALKER et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Plaintiff: VICTOR JOHNSON, KENNETH WATKINS, JERICUO MISSOURI, LARRY CORDELL FISHER, CORREY RAY, ISAIAH CHAPMAN, RODNEY THOMAS, MACHADO DAGOBERTO, DANIEL A. NICKELSON, JR., TERRANCE BARNES, DAVID JACKSON, BRUCE MARSHALL, RANDOLPH L. RIVERS, JR., ANTONIO D. FOX, ARTINIS WINSTON, EDWARD MAGRUDER, LINWOOD DOUGLAS THORNE, MICHAEL JOHNSON, KEVIN ARNOLD, JOEL MUKONG, PETER MORRISON, RICKY LAMONT CANTY, BROADUS JOHNSON, ADAM FOSTER, DAVON WALKER, TONY JERALD THOMAS, DANTE HAMM, DERRICK FERGUSON, REGINALD CARROLL, SEAN M. HORN, MATTHEW LUSBY, JAMES PANNELL, ANDRE DANTZLER, FRANK FLYTHE, DUSTIN MICHAEL LIVESAY, ANTHONY MOSELEY, DUANE BURTON, CHASE, ANTHONY CRAWFORD, MICHAEL BENJAMIN, WILLIAM JOHNSON, TYRELL BARKLEY, JESSE BOYD, NICHOLAS GARHAM, CRAIG BARKSDALE, EARL ALPHONZO KEARNEY and JOSE ALVARET
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 1:2019cv02769
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to RANDOLPH L. RIVERS JR.; Type of Document Returned: Docket sheet; Inmate Released 08/01/2019. (zsb)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by JESSE BOYD re #4 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement (zsb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DUANE BURTON (zsb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to Davon Walker; Type of Document Returned: Docket Sheet; Not Resent at New Address: No address provided. (zjd)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiffs to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiffs shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/7/19. (zmd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by JOSE ALVARET, KEVIN ARNOLD, TYRELL BARKLEY, CRAIG BARKSDALE, TERRANCE BARNES, MICHAEL BENJAMIN, JESSE BOYD, DUANE BURTON, RICKY LAMONT CANTY, REGINALD CARROLL, ISAIAH CHAPMAN, CHASE, ANTHONY CRAWFORD, MACHADO DAGOBERTO, ANDRE DANTZLER, DERRICK FERGUSON, LARRY CORDELL FISHER, FRANK FLYTHE, ADAM FOSTER, ANTONIO D. FOX, NICHOLAS GARHAM, DANTE HAMM, SEAN M. HORN, DAVID JACKSON, BROADUS JOHNSON, MICHAEL JOHNSON, MICHAEL JOHNSON, VICTOR JOHNSON, WILLIAM JOHNSON, EARL ALPHONZO KEARNEY, DUSTIN MICHAEL LIVESAY, MATTHEW LUSBY, EDWARD MAGRUDER, BRUCE MARSHALL, JERICUO MISSOURI, PETER MORRISON, ANTHONY MOSELEY, JOEL MUKONG, DANIEL A. NICKELSON, JR, JAMES PANNELL, CORREY RAY, RANDOLPH L. RIVERS, JR, RODNEY THOMAS, TONY JERALD THOMAS, LINWOOD DOUGLAS THORNE, DAVON WALKER, KENNETH WATKINS, ARTINIS WINSTON. (zjd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOSE ALVARET, KEVIN ARNOLD, TYRELL BARKLEY, CRAIG BARKSDALE, TERRANCE BARNES, MICHAEL BENJAMIN, JESSE BOYD, DUANE BURTON, RICKY LAMONT CANTY, REGINALD CARROLL, ISAIAH CHAPMAN, CHASE, ANTHONY CRAWFORD, MACHADO DAGOBERTO, ANDRE DANTZLER, DERRICK FERGUSON, LARRY CORDELL FISHER, FRANK FLYTHE, ADAM FOSTER, ANTONIO D. FOX, NICHOLAS GARHAM, DANTE HAMM, SEAN M. HORN, DAVID JACKSON, BROADUS JOHNSON, MICHAEL JOHNSON, MICHAEL JOHNSON, VICTOR JOHNSON, WILLIAM JOHNSON, EARL ALPHONZO KEARNEY, DUSTIN MICHAEL LIVESAY, MATTHEW LUSBY, EDWARD MAGRUDER, BRUCE MARSHALL, JERICUO MISSOURI, PETER MORRISON, ANTHONY MOSELEY, JOEL MUKONG, DANIEL A. NICKELSON, JR, JAMES PANNELL, CORREY RAY, RANDOLPH L. RIVERS, JR, RODNEY THOMAS, TONY JERALD THOMAS, LINWOOD DOUGLAS THORNE, DAVON WALKER, KENNETH WATKINS, ARTINIS WINSTON. (zjd)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS filed by BROADUS JOHNSON, DERRICK FERGUSON, ADAM FOSTER, LINWOOD DOUGLAS THORNE, DANTE HAMM, JESSE BOYD, KEVIN ARNOLD, DAVON WALKER, MACHADO DAGOBERTO, ANDRE DANTZLER, CORREY RAY, MICHAEL JOHNSON, TONY JERALD THOMAS, EDWARD MAGRUDER, DANIEL A. NICKELSON, JR, BRUCE MARSHALL, MATTHEW LUSBY, MICHAEL BENJAMIN, WILLIAM JOHNSON, EARL ALPHONZO KEARNEY, RICKY LAMONT CANTY, VICTOR JOHNSON, JERICUO MISSOURI, FRANK FLYTHE, REGINALD CARROLL, ANTONIO D. FOX, RANDOLPH L. RIVERS, JR, DUANE BURTON, ANTHONY CRAWFORD, LARRY CORDELL FISHER, SEAN M. HORN, MICHAEL JOHNSON, ARTINIS WINSTON, ISAIAH CHAPMAN, NICHOLAS GARHAM, TERRANCE BARNES, TYRELL BARKLEY, CHASE, JOSE ALVARET, ANTHONY MOSELEY, DAVID JACKSON, JAMES PANNELL, RODNEY THOMAS, JOEL MUKONG, CRAIG BARKSDALE, PETER MORRISON, DUSTIN MICHAEL LIVESAY, KENNETH WATKINS.(zjd)
September 13, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/13/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALKER et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERICUO MISSOURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY CORDELL FISHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORREY RAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISAIAH CHAPMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MACHADO DAGOBERTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL A. NICKELSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRANCE BARNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDOLPH L. RIVERS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO D. FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTINIS WINSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD MAGRUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINWOOD DOUGLAS THORNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL MUKONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER MORRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY LAMONT CANTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROADUS JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVON WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY JERALD THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANTE HAMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINALD CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN M. HORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW LUSBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES PANNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE DANTZLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK FLYTHE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN MICHAEL LIVESAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MOSELEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE BURTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BENJAMIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRELL BARKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE BOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS GARHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG BARKSDALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARL ALPHONZO KEARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE ALVARET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?