STATE OF CALIFORNIA et al v. CHAO et al
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF OREGON, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF DELAWARE, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF CALIFORNIA and CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Defendant: ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, United States, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION and JAMES C. OWENS
Petitioner: NATIONAL COALITION FOR ADVANCED TRANSPORTATION, ASSOCIATION OF GLOBAL AUTOMAKERS, INC. and COALITION FOR SUSTAINABLE AUTOMOTIVE REGULATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02826
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin M. O'Connor on behalf of NATIONAL COALITION FOR ADVANCED TRANSPORTATION (O'Connor, Devin)
November 15, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Intervene In Support of Plaintiffs by NATIONAL COALITION FOR ADVANCED TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Devin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Service by CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CITY OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN re #27 Notice (Other) (Meckenstock, Margaret)
November 7, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Boyer on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Boyer, Jacob)
November 1, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Asher Paris Spiller on behalf of STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (Spiller, Asher) (Main Document 35 replaced on 11/4/2019) (zjf).
October 31, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Levick Corley on behalf of The Association of Global Automakers, Inc., The Coalition for Sustainable Automotive Regulation (Corley, Rachel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond B. Ludwiszewski on behalf of The Association of Global Automakers, Inc., The Coalition for Sustainable Automotive Regulation (Ludwiszewski, Raymond)
October 31, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Intervene by The Coalition for Sustainable Automotive Regulation, The Association of Global Automakers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit [Proposed] Notice of Intent to Join in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #3 Exhibit Notice of Service)(Ludwiszewski, Raymond)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting briefing schedule regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiffs' opposition shall be served on or before 11/14/2019; Defendants' reply shall be served on or before 11/27/2019; and briefs shall be filed as a batch within three (3) business days of the service of the last reply brief authorized by this Minute Order, but in any event no later than the Final Filing Deadline of 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/21/2019. (jag)
October 18, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certified Index of Record by ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, JAMES C. OWENS, UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Carlisle, Benjamin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Bostrom on behalf of CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Bostrom, Michael) (Main Document 30 replaced on 10/18/2019) (zjf).
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Elliott James on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (James, Jason)
October 16, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Jensen on behalf of STATE OF MAINE (Jensen, Laura)
October 15, 2019 Filing 37 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, JAMES C. OWENS, UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF MAINE, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF HAWAII, CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO.(jf)
October 15, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service by ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, JAMES C. OWENS, UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Carlisle, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss and Joint Proposed Schedule by ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, JAMES C. OWENS, UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Carlisle, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/15/2019. (jag)
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Olson on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Olson, Eric)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Vandermeuse on behalf of STATE OF WISCONSIN (Vandermeuse, Jennifer) (Main Document 24 replaced on 10/10/2019) (znmw).
October 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Hoffmann on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Hoffmann, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,,, For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CITY OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint, #3 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended and Supplemented Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Redline Version of Amended and Supplemented Complaint)(Hankins, Meredith)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Robert Carlisle on behalf of All Defendants (Carlisle, Benjamin)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil David Gordon on behalf of PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN (Gordon, Neil) (Main Document 20 replaced on 10/9/2019) (zjf).
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberta Rose James on behalf of STATE OF MARYLAND (James, Roberta)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas F. Persampieri on behalf of STATE OF VERMONT (Persampieri, Nicholas) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/4/2019) (zjf).
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Andrew Garrahan on behalf of STATE OF OREGON (Garrahan, Paul) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/3/2019) (zjf).
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Fischer on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Fischer, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kavita Paul Lesser on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Lesser, Kavita) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/3/2019) (znmw).
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Jane Hankins on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Hankins, Meredith) (Main Document 14 replaced on 10/3/2019) (znmw).
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin G. McCabe on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK (McCabe, Gavin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Nathaniel Surdo on behalf of STATE OF MINNESOTA (Surdo, Peter)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Elaine Meckenstock on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Meckenstock, Margaret)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/24/2019. (lckbj1)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, JAMES C. OWENS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur Love on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY (Love, Aaron)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Edward Tavetian on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Tavetian, Gary) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/24/2019) (zjf).
September 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Crystal Nelson on behalf of STATE OF WASHINGTON (Nelson, Emily)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Barclay-Strobel on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Barclay-Strobel, Jessica)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Marie Herzog on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Herzog, Megan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Alexander Zonana on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Zonana, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF MAINE, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF HAWAII re #1 Complaint,,, filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF MAINE, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF HAWAII. Related document: #1 Complaint,,, filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF MAINE, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF OREGON, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MINNESOTA, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons- Elaine L. Chao, #2 Summons Summons- DDC USAO, #3 Summons Summons- NHTSA, #4 Summons Summons- James C. Owens, #5 Summons Summons- US AG, #6 Summons Summons- USDOT)(Wiener, Jonathan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6389538) filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF MAINE, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF HAWAII. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wiener, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF CALIFORNIA et al v. CHAO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Asher Paris Spiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Peter Nathaniel Surdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Roberta Rose James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Nicholas F. Persampieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Emily Crystal Nelson
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEVADA
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Jason Elliott James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Michael John Fischer
Represented By: Jacob Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Megan Marie Herzog
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Vandermeuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Michael James Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: David S. Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Neil David Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Gavin G. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Aaron Arthur Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: David Alexander Zonana
Represented By: Jessica Barclay-Strobel
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: Gary Edward Tavetian
Represented By: Meredith Jane Hankins
Represented By: Kavita Paul Lesser
Represented By: Margaret Elaine Meckenstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE L. CHAO
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C. OWENS
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL COALITION FOR ADVANCED TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Devin M. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASSOCIATION OF GLOBAL AUTOMAKERS, INC.
Represented By: Rachel Levick Corley
Represented By: Raymond B. Ludwiszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COALITION FOR SUSTAINABLE AUTOMOTIVE REGULATION
Represented By: Rachel Levick Corley
Represented By: Raymond B. Ludwiszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?