SHAIKH et al v. POMPEO et al
Plaintiff: Salah-Eddine Behaz and Sumaira Shaikh
Defendant: Director of FBI CHRISTOPHER WRAY, FBI, Secretary of US DOS MICHAEL R. POMPEO, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ROBERT W. THOMAS, Acting Secretary DHS KEVIN MCALEENAN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO and FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS
Case Number: 1:2019cv02890
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT W. THOMAS served on 10/29/2019 (Bromberg, Richard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/17/2019 (Bromberg, Richard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/17/2019 (Bromberg, Richard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO served on 10/18/2019 (Bromberg, Richard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER WRAY served on 10/17/2019 (Bromberg, Richard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 10/16/2019 (Bromberg, Richard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS served on 10/17/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2019. (Bromberg, Richard)
October 1, 2019 SUMMONS (3) Not Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (zeg) Modified parties to whom summons were not issued to on 10/25/2019 (zeg).
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, ROBERT W. THOMAS, CHRISTOPHER WRAY and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) Modified parties to whom summons were issued to on 10/25/2019 (zeg).
October 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zeg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA by Salah-Eddine Behaz, Sumaira Shaikh #1 Complaint, filed by Salah-Eddine Behaz, Sumaira Shaikh. (Bromberg, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FBI, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, ROBERT W. THOMAS, CHRISTOPHER WRAY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6398456) filed by Salah-Eddine Behaz, Sumaira Shaikh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Bromberg, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAIKH et al v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of FBI CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of US DOS MICHAEL R. POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT W. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary DHS KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL RICHARD POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salah-Eddine Behaz
Represented By: Richard S. Bromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sumaira Shaikh
Represented By: Richard S. Bromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?