FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER et al v. ALEX M. AZAR II
Plaintiff: REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC, JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC, RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AMISUB (SFH), INC., BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, ATHENS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER LLC, AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC, HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS HENDERSON HOSPITAL, ATHENS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER LLC doing business as STARR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL SOUTH, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS) doing business as SETON MEDICAL CENTER HARKER HEIGHTS, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE REGIONAL HOSPITAL ROSWELL, TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL, BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD. doing business as CORPUS CHRISTI MEDICAL CENTER, AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC doing business as AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL PRYOR, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - REEDLEY, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as SONORA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL doing business as ST. HELENA HOSPITAL NAPA VALLEY, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CLAREMORE, PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HACKENSACK UMC AT PASACK VALLEY, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL, QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS QUITMAN HOSPITAL, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - HANFORD doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER- SELMA, ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH ATHENS HOSPITAL, RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST HEALTH AND RIDEOUT, AMISUB (SFH), INC. doing business as SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE WESTSIDE HOSPITAL, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as GRANDVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - PORTLAND, BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC doing business as BAY MEDICAL CENTER, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL HENRYETTA, JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. FRANCIS CAMPUS, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as EAST TEXAS MEDICAL CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CUSHING, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as BAPTIST ST. ANTHONY'S HOSPITAL, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as PORTNEUF MEDICAL CENTER, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL doing business as UKIAH VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as MOUNTAINSIDE HOSPITAL, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC doing business as PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CLOVIS COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER and SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES doing business as SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of Health and Human Services and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv03536
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam Holland on behalf of All Defendants (Holland, Liam)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General December 4, 2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/3/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/3/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/2/2020.) (Roth, Robert) Modified date served on 1/2/2020 (ztd).
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
November 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC, BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-867. (Roth, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC, BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER (Roth, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6589149) filed by AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Roth, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER et al v. ALEX M. AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS)
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. HELENA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSA HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMISUB (SFH), INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHENS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENDERSON HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS HENDERSON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHENS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER LLC doing business as STARR REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL SOUTH
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS) doing business as SETON MEDICAL CENTER HARKER HEIGHTS
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE REGIONAL HOSPITAL ROSWELL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PITTSBURG HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS PITTSBURG HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD. doing business as CORPUS CHRISTI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS, LLC doing business as AIKEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERS
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL PRYOR
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - REEDLEY
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as SONORA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. HELENA HOSPITAL doing business as ST. HELENA HOSPITAL NAPA VALLEY
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CLAREMORE
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PASCACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HACKENSACK UMC AT PASACK VALLEY
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUITMAN HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS QUITMAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - HANFORD doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER- SELMA
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATHENS HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as UT HEALTH ATHENS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIDEOUT MEMORIAL HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST HEALTH AND RIDEOUT
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMISUB (SFH), INC. doing business as SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE WESTSIDE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as GRANDVIEW MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - PORTLAND
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC doing business as BAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL HENRYETTA
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL doing business as UT HEALTH EAST TEXAS JACKSONVILLE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. FRANCIS CAMPUS
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE WOMEN'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARTHAGE HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as EAST TEXAS MEDICAL CARTHAGE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CUSHING
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as BAPTIST ST. ANTHONY'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as PORTNEUF MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL doing business as UKIAH VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as MOUNTAINSIDE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC doing business as PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CLOVIS COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES doing business as SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?