IN THE MATTER OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS' EXECUTION PROTOCOL CASES
Plaintiff: ALFRED BOURGEOIS, JULIUS ROBINSON, JAMES H. ROANE, JR.,, CORY JOHNSON, RICHARD TIPTON and DANIEL LEWIS LEE
Defendant: CHADRICK EVAN FULKS, PAUL LAIRD, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR., MICHELE LEONHART, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, JOHN F. CARAWAY, KAREN TANDY, JOHN DOES, CHARLES L. LOCKETT, THOMAS WEBSTER, MARK BEZY, ALAN R. DOERHOFF and KERRY J. FORESTAL
Intervenor Plaintiff: BRUCE WEBSTER, ANTHONY BATTLE and ORLANDO HALL
Intervenor Defendant: RICHARD VEACH
Intervenor: JEFFREY PAUL
In Re: IN THE MATTER OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS' EXECUTION PROTOCOL CASES
Case Number: 1:2019mc00145
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (This filing relates to Lee v. Barr et al., Case No. 19-cv-02559-TSC) (This document relates to Lee v. Barr,19-cv-2559) filed by MARK BEZY, JOHN F. CARAWAY, ALAN R. DOERHOFF, JOHN DOES(I-IV, Individually and in their official capacities; 07-cv-02145-TSC), JOHN DOES(I-V, Individually and in their official capacities 05cv2337; 12cv00782 I-X), KERRY J. FORESTAL, CHADRICK EVAN FULKS, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, PAUL LAIRD, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHELE LEONHART, CHARLES L. LOCKETT, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, KAREN TANDY(Administrator, Drug Enforcement Administration (05cv2337)), UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Lin, Jean)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy J. Lentz on behalf of ORLANDO HALL (Lentz, Amy) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/2/2019) (ztd).
October 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response due by 10/18/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/1/2019. (zjd)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties' joint motion #14 for an extension of time to file a response and reply to Plaintiff Daniel Lee's (19-cv-02559) motion #13 for a preliminary injunction barring implementation of the new federal lethal injunction protocol is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response on or before October 18, 2019. Plaintiff's reply is due on or before November 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/1/2019. (lctsc1)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule as to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (This filing relates to Lee v. Barr et al., Case No. 19-cv-02559-TSC) (This document relates to Lee v. Barr,19-cv-2559) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) Modified event title on 10/3/2019 (znmw).
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (This filing relates to Lee v. Barr et al., Case No. 19-cv-02559-TSC) by DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Pieter Van Tol, #3 Exhibit 1 - True and correct copy of a document entitled Addendum to BOP Execution Protocol Federal Death Sentence Implementation Procedures Effective July 25, 2019., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Tol, Pieter)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS HEARING before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan held on August 15, 2019, re Consolidated Cases, CV Nos. 05-2337, 07-2145, 12-0782, 13-0938. Page Numbers: 1-22. Date of Issuance: 9/13/19. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2019.(Wayne, Bryan)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court's 8/15/19 Order requiring that the Defendants file the administrative "record" by 8/30/19, is hereby AMENDED to reflect that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(n), Defendants were obligated to file "a certified list of the contents of the administrative record" by 8/30/19. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/13/19. (DJS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re (2 in 1:19-mc-00145-TSC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (The filing relates to Bourgeois v. United States Department of Justice, et al., No. 12-cv-0782-TSC) filed by ALFRED BOURGEOIS. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00145-TSC et al.(Kursman, Alexander)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/11/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2019. (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Solomon Victorson on behalf of DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Victorson, David)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: THIS ORDER RELATES TO ALL CASES. The parties are hereby reminded that, pursuant to the cour's Consolidation Order (ECF No. #1 ), when a filing is made that applies solely to ONE CASE, both the document and THE ECF ENTRY must contain a notation indicating that the filing Relates to [insert case NAME and NUMBER]. Documents that do not meet the requirements in the court's order may be STRICKEN sua sponte. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/6/19. (DJS)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: THIS ORDER RELATES TO LEE (19cv2559). Granting #7 #8 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pieter Van Tol and John D. Beck are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Lee. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/6/19. (DJS)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John D. Beck, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 390 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 918-3000. Fax No. - (212) 918-3100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6360222. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Beck, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pieter Van Tol, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 390 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 918-3000. Fax No. - (212) 918-3100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6360193. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pieter Van Tol, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (This Document Relates to Bourgeois v. Department of Justice, No. 12-0782 filed by KERRY J. FORESTAL, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, PAUL LAIRD, MICHELE LEONHART, CHARLES L. LOCKETT, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, THOMAS WEBSTER. (Lin, Jean)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of All Defendants (Lin, Jean)
September 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 9/16/2019. Reply due by 9/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00145-TSC, 1:05-cv-02337-TSC, 1:07-cv-02145-TSC, 1:12-cv-00782-TSC, 1:13-cv-00938-TSC(tb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Certification of the Administrative Record and the Index of the Administrative Record by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Certified List of the Contents of the Administrative Records)Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00145-TSC, 1:05-cv-02337-TSC, 1:07-cv-02145-TSC, 1:12-cv-00782-TSC, 1:13-cv-00938-TSC(Clark, Denise)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' consent motion #3 for an extension of time to file a response to Plaintiff Alfred Bourgeois' (12-cv-00782) motion #2 for a preliminary injunction barring the execution of Plaintiff Bourgeois is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response on or before September 16, 2019. Plaintiff's reply is due within one week of Defendants' response or September 23, 2019, whichever date is earlier. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/29/2019. (lctsc1)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR, NEWTON E. KENDIG, II, HARLEY G. LAPPIN, MICHAEL B. MUKASEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd); (Document originally filed in 05cv2337.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ALFRED BOURGEOIS (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd); (Document originally filed in 12cv782 on 8/19/19)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties consent motions and the representations made by the parties at the August 15, 2019 status conference, the court hereby consolidates the four mention cases in the case caption of this order, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). It is therefore ORDERED that the following cases are to be consolidated into A Master Case File established for the lead case, 05-cv-2337 (TSC), as well as 07-cv-2145 (TSC), 12-cv-0782 (TSC), and 13-cv-0938 (TSC). All filings shall be made solely in the Master Case. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/20/19. (ztd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/29/2019) (tb). Modified on 8/29/2019 (DJS).
August 15, 2019 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 8/15/2019 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Parties will adhere to the following schedule: Defendants shall file the administrative record on or before August 30, 2019; Plaintiffs shall complete the necessary 30(b)(6) depositions on or before February 28, 2020; and Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before March 31, 2020. Order forthcoming regarding consolidation of 05-2337; 07-2145; 12-782; and 13-958. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) Modified on 8/19/2019 (lctsc1). - (Entry originally filed in 05cv2337 on 08/15/19.) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE MATTER OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS' EXECUTION PROTOCOL CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHADRICK EVAN FULKS
Represented By: Amy Gershenfeld Donnella
Represented By: Joseph William Luby
Represented By: Billy H. Nolas
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL LAIRD
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC H. HOLDER, JR.
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Paul F. Enzinna
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEWTON E. KENDIG, II
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Robert J. Erickson
Represented By: Peter S. Smith
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR.
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELE LEONHART
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL B. MUKASEY
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARLEY G. LAPPIN
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. CARAWAY
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN TANDY
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Peter S. Smith
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES L. LOCKETT
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS WEBSTER
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK BEZY
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Robert J. Erickson
Represented By: Peter S. Smith
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN R. DOERHOFF
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRY J. FORESTAL
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Represented By: Jean Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED BOURGEOIS
Represented By: Alexander Louis Kursman
Represented By: Billy H. Nolas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIUS ROBINSON
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Aminoff
Represented By: Craig Anthony Harbaugh
Represented By: Celeste Bacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES H. ROANE, JR.,
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Represented By: Paul F. Enzinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORY JOHNSON
Represented By: Charles Anthony Zdebski
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Represented By: Donald P. Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD TIPTON
Represented By: Charles Anthony Zdebski
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Represented By: Brandon David Almond
Represented By: Gerald Wesley King, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL LEWIS LEE
Represented By: David S. Victorson
Represented By: Pieter Van Tol
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: John D. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: BRUCE WEBSTER
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Represented By: Yousri H. Omar
Represented By: Jeanne Vosberg Sourgens
Represented By: Robert E. Waters
Represented By: Kathryn B. Codd
Represented By: William E. Lawler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: ANTHONY BATTLE
Represented By: William E. Hoffmann, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Represented By: Abigail Bortnick
Represented By: Margaret O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: ORLANDO HALL
Represented By: Matthew John Herrington
Represented By: Joshua Christopher Toll
Represented By: Robert A. Ayers
Represented By: Mark Joseph Hulkower
Represented By: Amy J. Lentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: RICHARD VEACH
Represented By: Denise M. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: JEFFREY PAUL
Represented By: Robert L. McGlasson
Represented By: Gary E. Proctor
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Represented By: Sean D. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IN THE MATTER OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS' EXECUTION PROTOCOL CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?