COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA et al v. FERRIERO
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF NEVADA and STATE OF ILLINOIS
Defendant: DAVID S. FERRIERO
Petitioner: BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., VICE MEDIA LLC, POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER, ARAB WOMEN ORGANIZATION, VOTEERA.ORG, DAYFORWARD INC., ILLINOIS NOW, NATIONAL IMMIGRANT WOMEN'S ADVOCACY PROJECT, INC., MORGAN STANLEY, NATIONAL WOMENS POLITICAL CAUCUS OF VIRGINIA, FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION, NATIONAL FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT, EQUAL RIGHTS AMENDMENT NORTH CAROLINA ALLIANCE, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, SISTERHOOD IS GLOBAL INSTITUTE, CALIFORNIA CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS FOUNDATION, U.S. CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, SISTERS OF LORETTO - LORETTO COMMUNITY, NEUBERGER BERMAN, SPOTIFY USA, INC., NOAH FELDMAN, SURVEYMONKEY INC., ROBERT G. MARSHALL, ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., WOMEN MATTER, WOMEN'S HEALTH AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, WORLD POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER, BIOGEN INC., PUPPET, INC., THINX, UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS, CONCERNED WOMEN FOR AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN LAWYERS, BOWERY FARMING INC., LAROCK DAVID, REVA SIEGEL, WEWORK, JUSTICE REVIVAL, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., STRAVA, SEED&SPARK, INC., CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., DOLORES HUERTA FOUNDATION, GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., PRIDE IN RUNNING, LEGAL MOMENTUM, CLARE BOOTHE LUCE CENTER FOR CONSERVATIVE WOMEN, PEPSICO, INC., RETHINKING EVE LLC, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF VIRGINIA, SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST, VF CORPORATION, COTA, INC., LEANNE LITTRELL DILORENZO, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., ERA TASK FORCE AZ, NARDELLO & CO., GENDER JUSTICE, NEVADA NOW, 1010DATA, INC., EQUITABLE, OKLAHOMA WOMEN'S COALITION, BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, EQUALITY UTAH, CAPESPACE, LLC, NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS FOUNDATION, MORMONS FOR ERA, SERVICE WOMEN'S ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, BLACK WOMENS ROUNDTABLE, BRAZE, INC., 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, LARATIFYERA, YWCA USA, ETSY, INC., ILLINOIS FEDERATION OF WOMENS BUSINESS CLUBS, INC., EAGLE FORUM, SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, VIRGINIA NOW, NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE, DOWNTOWN WOMEN FOR CHANGE, KIND LLC, ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., DOMESTIC VIOLENCE LEGAL EMPOWERMENT AND APPEALS PROJECT, HOMEGIRL PROJECT, RESTORING LIBERTY ACTION COMMITTEE, ALICE PAUL INSTITUTE, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., MCINTOSH FOUNDATION, YWCA METROPOLITAN CHICAGO, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, HERSHEY COMPANY, TURO INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, CITIGROUP INC., PROJECT 28 MO, ERA MINNESOTA, INDUSTRIOUS, AAUW OF RICHMOND, BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., INTERNATIONAL WOMEN'S RIGHTS ACTION WATCH ASIA PACIFIC, PFIZER INC., LATIN AMERICAN AND CARIBBEAN COMMITTEE FOR THE DEFENSE OF WOMEN'S RIGHTS, NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS, REBELLE MEDIA, EQUAL RIGHTS TRUST, WOMEN'S MEDIA CENTER, CHICAGO FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN, UNION THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK, SENDING HER ESSENTIALS, WOMEN'S EQUALITY COALITION, MICHIGAN ERAMERICA, 98POINT6 INC., UNITED 4 EQUALITY, LLC, CHOBANI, LLC, NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, ERA COALITION, WOMENS BAR ASSOCIATION OF ILLINOIS, WOMEN LAWYERS ON GUARD INC., RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, AAUW OF VIRGINIA, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., CENTER FOR COMMON GROUND, ARIZONA NOW, DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ASANA, INC., EQUALITY NOW, SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PLANET LABS INC., ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES, GENERATION UPWARDS, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MICROSOFT, ATAKAMA INC., PLATFORM, TWITTER, INC., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, FUND FOR WOMEN'S EQUALITY, BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., EUROPEAN WOMEN'S LOBBY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COMMISSIONS FOR WOMEN, VARATIFYERA, TURNITIN, LLC, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN, PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, TIFFANY & CO., SISTERS OF ST. JOSEPH OF CARONDELET AREA, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., VOTO LATINO, VIRGINIA POOR PEOPLES CAMPAIGN, LYFT, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., MOTUS LLC, TORY BURCH LLC, AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, MICHIGAN FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, INC., APPLE, APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., WORKDAY, INC., HADASSAH, THE WOMEN'S ZIONIST ORGANIZATION OF AMERICA, INC., NEVADANS FOR THE ERA, EAGLE FORUM FOUNDATION, TIME'S UP FOUNDATION, GENERAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS, UTAH ERA COALITION, PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., RACHELS NETWORK, AAUW OF NEVADA, ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION, PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, AAUW OF ILLINOIS, FEMNET, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, TRANSUNION, AIRBNB, INC., LIVARI CLOTHING, MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, EQUAL MEANS ERA, NATIONAL CONGRESS OF BLACK WOMEN, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, UBER, OSCAR HEALTH and AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN
Intervenor Defendant: NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, ALABAMA, SOUTH DAKOTA and TENNESSEE
Amicus Curiae: STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF MARYLAND, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC., GENERATION RATIFY, JULIE C. SUK, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, AMALGAMATED BANK, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT, GOVERNOR OF KANSAS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ERWIN CHEMERINSKY, GOOGLE LLC and STEVE BULLOCK
Case Number: 1:2020cv00242
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Denise M. Harle, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7344567. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CONCERNED WOMEN FOR AMERICA, Susan B. Anthony List (Attachments: #1 Declaration Denise M. Harle, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lorence, Jordan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by CONCERNED WOMEN FOR AMERICA, Susan B. Anthony List (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lorence, Jordan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Milanovich, Anita)
July 14, 2020 MINUTE ORDER granting #89 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Raphael Graybill is admitted to represent the Governor of Montana as amicus curiae in this case pro hac vice. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Ju dge Rudolph Contreras on 7/14/2020. (lcrc1)
July 14, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Raphael Graybill, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7337401. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STEVE BULLOCK (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raphael Graybill, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sommers-Flanagan, Rylee)
July 14, 2020 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Hearings re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norris, Cameron)
July 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 8/20/2020. (tj)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #87 Defendant David S. Ferriero's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant David S. Ferriero shall have until and including August 20, 2020 to file a reply in support of #29 his motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/13/2020. (lcrc1)
July 13, 2020 Filing 87 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by DAVID S. FERRIERO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
July 13, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline E Hughes on behalf of UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Hughes, Madeline)
July 10, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa Tussey on behalf of AAUW OF ILLINOIS, AAUW OF NEVADA, AAUW OF RICHMOND, AAUW OF VIRGINIA, CENTER FOR COMMON GROUND, CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION, CHICAGO FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN, ILLINOIS FEDERATION OF WOMENS BUSINESS CLUBS, INC., ILLINOIS NOW, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF VIRGINIA, MCINTOSH FOUNDATION, NATIONAL WOMENS POLITICAL CAUCUS OF VIRGINIA, NEVADA NOW, NEVADANS FOR THE ERA, RACHELS NETWORK, VARATIFYERA, VIRGINIA NOW, VIRGINIA POOR PEOPLES CAMPAIGN, WOMEN MATTER, WOMENS BAR ASSOCIATION OF ILLINOIS, YWCA METROPOLITAN CHICAGO (Tussey, Vanessa)
July 10, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Carolina Varela on behalf of AAUW OF ILLINOIS, AAUW OF NEVADA, AAUW OF RICHMOND, AAUW OF VIRGINIA, CENTER FOR COMMON GROUND, CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION, CHICAGO FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN, ILLINOIS FEDERATION OF WOMENS BUSINESS CLUBS, INC., ILLINOIS NOW, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF VIRGINIA, MCINTOSH FOUNDATION, NATIONAL WOMENS POLITICAL CAUCUS OF VIRGINIA, NEVADA NOW, NEVADANS FOR THE ERA, RACHELS NETWORK, VARATIFYERA, VIRGINIA NOW, VIRGINIA POOR PEOPLES CAMPAIGN, WOMEN MATTER, WOMENS BAR ASSOCIATION OF ILLINOIS, YWCA METROPOLITAN CHICAGO (Varela, Ana)
July 10, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Lester Mills on behalf of AAUW OF ILLINOIS, AAUW OF NEVADA, AAUW OF RICHMOND, AAUW OF VIRGINIA, CENTER FOR COMMON GROUND, CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION, CHICAGO FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN, ILLINOIS FEDERATION OF WOMENS BUSINESS CLUBS, INC., ILLINOIS NOW, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF VIRGINIA, MCINTOSH FOUNDATION, NATIONAL WOMENS POLITICAL CAUCUS OF VIRGINIA, NEVADA NOW, NEVADANS FOR THE ERA, RACHELS NETWORK, VARATIFYERA, VIRGINIA NOW, VIRGINIA POOR PEOPLES CAMPAIGN, WOMEN MATTER, WOMENS BAR ASSOCIATION OF ILLINOIS, YWCA METROPOLITAN CHICAGO (Mills, Jon)
July 10, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Harold Singer on behalf of AAUW OF ILLINOIS, AAUW OF NEVADA, AAUW OF RICHMOND, AAUW OF VIRGINIA, CENTER FOR COMMON GROUND, CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION, CHICAGO FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN, ILLINOIS FEDERATION OF WOMENS BUSINESS CLUBS, INC., ILLINOIS NOW, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF VIRGINIA, MCINTOSH FOUNDATION, NATIONAL WOMENS POLITICAL CAUCUS OF VIRGINIA, NEVADA NOW, NEVADANS FOR THE ERA, RACHELS NETWORK, VARATIFYERA, VIRGINIA NOW, VIRGINIA POOR PEOPLES CAMPAIGN, WOMEN MATTER, WOMENS BAR ASSOCIATION OF ILLINOIS, YWCA METROPOLITAN CHICAGO (Singer, Stuart)
July 10, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi Parry Stern on behalf of STATE OF NEVADA (Stern, Heidi)
July 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/19/2020 (tj)
July 10, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #80 Answer to Interrogatories on Writ of Attachment was entered in the incorrect case. (ztth)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #78 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until and including August 19, 2020 to respond to #74 Intervenor-Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/9/2020. (lcrc1)
July 9, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Xeris Gregory on behalf of 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Gregory, Xeris) (Main Document 79 replaced on 7/10/2020) (ztth).
July 9, 2020 Filing 78 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEVADA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kallen, Michelle)
July 8, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Jade E. Sipes on behalf of 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA. (Sipes, Jade); Modified text at the request of counsel on 7/9/2020 (ztth).
July 8, 2020 Filing 76 AMICUS BRIEF by Governor of Montana. (Sommers-Flanagan, Rylee)
July 8, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Rylee K Sommers-Flanagan on behalf of Governor of Montana (Sommers-Flanagan, Rylee)
July 6, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Norris, Cameron)
July 6, 2020 Filing 73 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff States by VOTEERA.ORG, LEANNE LITTRELL DILORENZO (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief Amicus Curiae, #2 LCvR 26 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Proposed Order on Consent Motion)(English, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Filing 80 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ANSWER to Interrogatories on Writ of Attachment from King & Spalding LLP. (ztth); Modified on 7/10/2020 (ztth).
July 2, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda T Coberly on behalf of ALICE PAUL INSTITUTE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, ARIZONA NOW, ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA, BLACK WOMENS ROUNDTABLE, DOLORES HUERTA FOUNDATION, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE LEGAL EMPOWERMENT AND APPEALS PROJECT, DOWNTOWN WOMEN FOR CHANGE, EQUAL RIGHTS AMENDMENT NORTH CAROLINA ALLIANCE, EQUALITY UTAH, ERA COALITION, ERA MINNESOTA, ERA TASK FORCE AZ, FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION, FUND FOR WOMEN'S EQUALITY, GENDER JUSTICE, GENERAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS, HADASSAH, THE WOMEN'S ZIONIST ORGANIZATION OF AMERICA, INC., JUSTICE REVIVAL, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES, LEGAL MOMENTUM, MICHIGAN ERAMERICA, MICHIGAN FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, INC., MORMONS FOR ERA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COMMISSIONS FOR WOMEN, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN LAWYERS, NATIONAL CONGRESS OF BLACK WOMEN, INC., NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, INC., NATIONAL FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, NATIONAL IMMIGRANT WOMEN'S ADVOCACY PROJECT, INC., NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN, NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS, NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS FOUNDATION, OKLAHOMA WOMEN'S COALITION, PROJECT 28 MO, RETHINKING EVE LLC, SERVICE WOMEN'S ACTION NETWORK, SISTERS OF LORETTO - LORETTO COMMUNITY, SISTERS OF ST. JOSEPH OF CARONDELET AREA, TIME'S UP FOUNDATION, UNION THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK, UNITED 4 EQUALITY, LLC, UTAH ERA COALITION, VOTO LATINO, WOMEN LAWYERS ON GUARD INC., WOMEN'S EQUALITY COALITION, WOMEN'S HEALTH AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT, WOMEN'S MEDIA CENTER, YWCA USA (Coberly, Linda)
July 2, 2020 Filing 71 AMICUS BRIEF SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF STATES IN REQUESTING A DECLARATION by State of Michigan. (Sherman, Ann)
July 2, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Sherman on behalf of State of Michigan (Sherman, Ann)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #42 , #43 , #45 , #46 , #47 , #49 , #52 , #53 , #54 , #55 , #56 , #57 , #58 , #59 , #60 , #62 , #63 , #65 , #69 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Loretta E. Lynch, Liza M. Velazquez, Andrew G. Gordon, Tamar Holoshitz, Benjamin Z. Bergmann, Maria T. Vullo, Jodi Siegel, Xeris Gregory, Jessica B. Spade, Jade E. Sipes, Sharonda Childs Fancher, Madeline E. Hughes, Chelsea Dunn, Ana Carolina Varela, Jon L. Mills, Stuart H. Singer, Vanessa B. Tussey, Kathleen Kelly, and Linda T. Coberly are admitted to represent their respective clients as proposed amici curiae in this case pro hac vice. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/1/2020. (lcrc1)
July 1, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Linda T. Coberly, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7290084. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALICE PAUL INSTITUTE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, ARIZONA NOW, ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA, BLACK WOMENS ROUNDTABLE, DOLORES HUERTA FOUNDATION, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE LEGAL EMPOWERMENT AND APPEALS PROJECT, DOWNTOWN WOMEN FOR CHANGE, EQUAL RIGHTS AMENDMENT NORTH CAROLINA ALLIANCE, EQUALITY UTAH, ERA COALITION, ERA MINNESOTA, ERA TASK FORCE AZ, FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION, FUND FOR WOMEN'S EQUALITY, GENDER JUSTICE, GENERAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS, HADASSAH, THE WOMEN'S ZIONIST ORGANIZATION OF AMERICA, INC., JUSTICE REVIVAL, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES, LEGAL MOMENTUM, MICHIGAN ERAMERICA, MICHIGAN FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, INC., MORMONS FOR ERA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COMMISSIONS FOR WOMEN, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN LAWYERS, NATIONAL CONGRESS OF BLACK WOMEN, INC., NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, INC., NATIONAL FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, NATIONAL IMMIGRANT WOMEN'S ADVOCACY PROJECT, INC., NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN, NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS, NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS FOUNDATION, OKLAHOMA WOMEN'S COALITION, PROJECT 28 MO, RETHINKING EVE LLC, SERVICE WOMEN'S ACTION NETWORK, SISTERS OF LORETTO - LORETTO COMMUNITY, SISTERS OF ST. JOSEPH OF CARONDELET AREA, TIME'S UP FOUNDATION, UNION THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK, UNITED 4 EQUALITY, LLC, UTAH ERA COALITION, VOTO LATINO, WOMEN LAWYERS ON GUARD INC., WOMEN'S EQUALITY COALITION, WOMEN'S HEALTH AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT, WOMEN'S MEDIA CENTER, YWCA USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Linda T. Coberly, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Man, Christopher)
July 1, 2020 Filing 68 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by ALICE PAUL INSTITUTE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, ARIZONA NOW, ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA, BLACK WOMENS ROUNDTABLE, DOLORES HUERTA FOUNDATION, DOMESTIC VIOLENCE LEGAL EMPOWERMENT AND APPEALS PROJECT, DOWNTOWN WOMEN FOR CHANGE, EQUAL RIGHTS AMENDMENT NORTH CAROLINA ALLIANCE, EQUALITY UTAH, ERA COALITION, ERA MINNESOTA, ERA TASK FORCE AZ, FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION, FUND FOR WOMEN'S EQUALITY, GENDER JUSTICE, GENERAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS, HADASSAH, THE WOMEN'S ZIONIST ORGANIZATION OF AMERICA, INC., JUSTICE REVIVAL, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES, LEGAL MOMENTUM, MICHIGAN ERAMERICA, MICHIGAN FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, INC., MORMONS FOR ERA, NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COMMISSIONS FOR WOMEN, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN LAWYERS, NATIONAL CONGRESS OF BLACK WOMEN, INC., NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, INC., NATIONAL FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, NATIONAL IMMIGRANT WOMEN'S ADVOCACY PROJECT, INC., NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN, NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS, NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS FOUNDATION, OKLAHOMA WOMEN'S COALITION, PROJECT 28 MO, RETHINKING EVE LLC, SERVICE WOMEN'S ACTION NETWORK, SISTERS OF LORETTO - LORETTO COMMUNITY, SISTERS OF ST. JOSEPH OF CARONDELET AREA, TIME'S UP FOUNDATION, UNION THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK, UNITED 4 EQUALITY, LLC, UTAH ERA COALITION, VOTO LATINO, WOMEN LAWYERS ON GUARD INC., WOMEN'S EQUALITY COALITION, WOMEN'S HEALTH AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT, WOMEN'S MEDIA CENTER, and YWCA USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ztnr)
June 29, 2020 Filing 67 AMICUS BRIEF by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, GOVERNOR OF KANSAS, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN. (Spadola, Joseph); Modified event and text on 6/30/2020 (ztth).
June 29, 2020 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of State Plaintiffs by AAUW of Greater Richmond, AAUW of Illinois, AAUW of Nevada, AAUW of Virginia, CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION, Center for Common Ground, Chicago Foundation for Women, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, Illinois Federation of Womens Business Clubs, Inc., Illinois NOW, League of Women Voters of Virginia, National Womens Political Caucus of Virginia, Nevada NOW, Nevadans for the ERA, Rachels Network, The McIntosh Foundation, VAratifyERA, Virginia NOW, Virginia Poor Peoples Campaign, Women Matter, Womens Bar Association of Illinois, YWCA Metropolitan Chicago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief in Support f the State Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B Local Rule 26.1 Certificate, #3 Exhibit C Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amicus Brief)(Wallace, Dorothy)
June 29, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen Kelly, D.C. Bar No. 1014921. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281511. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Generation Ratify (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kathleen Kelly, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Moxley, Lauren)
June 29, 2020 Filing 64 ERRATA re #44 Motion and Amended Motion and Proposed Brief by Generation Ratify. (Attachments: #1 Amended Consent Motion for Leave to Participate as Amici Curiae, #2 Amended Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae)(Moxley, Lauren); Modified to add docket entry relationship on 6/30/2020 (ztth).
June 29, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Chelsea Dunn, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281487. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Chelsea Dunn, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cappiello, Elizabeth)
June 29, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Madeline E. Hughes, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281466. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Madeline E. Hughes, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cappiello, Elizabeth)
June 29, 2020 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Equality Now, The World Policy Analysis Center, The Latin American and Caribbean Committee for the Defense of Women's Rights, The Equal Rights Trust, The European Women's Lobby, FEMNET, The Arab Women Organization, International Women's Rights Action Watch Asia Pacific, The Sisterhood is Global Institute (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief, #2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Myrick, Stefani)
June 29, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sharonda Childs Fancher, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281432. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Sharonda Childs Fancher, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cappiello, Elizabeth)
June 29, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Vanessa B. Tussey, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281443. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AAUW of Greater Richmond, AAUW of Illinois, AAUW of Nevada, AAUW of Virginia, Center for Common Ground, Chicago Foundation for Women, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, Illinois Federation of Womens Business Clubs, Inc., Illinois NOW, League of Women Voters of Virginia, National Womens Political Caucus of Virginia, Nevada NOW, Nevadans for the ERA, Rachels Network, The McIntosh Foundation, VAratifyERA, Virginia NOW, Virginia Poor Peoples Campaign, Women Matter, Womens Bar Association of Illinois, YWCA Metropolitan Chicago (Riley, Joshua)
June 29, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- STUART H. SINGER, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281421. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AAUW of Greater Richmond, AAUW of Illinois, AAUW of Nevada, AAUW of Virginia, CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION, Center for Common Ground, Chicago Foundation for Women, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, Illinois Federation of Womens Business Clubs, Inc., Illinois NOW, League of Women Voters of Virginia, National Womens Political Caucus of Virginia, Nevada NOW, Nevadans for the ERA, Rachels Network, The McIntosh Foundation, VAratifyERA, Virginia NOW, Virginia Poor Peoples Campaign, Women Matter, Womens Bar Association of Illinois, YWCA Metropolitan Chicago (Riley, Joshua)
June 29, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jade E. Sipes, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281398. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jade E. Sipes, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cappiello, Elizabeth)
June 29, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jon L. Mills, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281382. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AAUW of Greater Richmond, AAUW of Illinois, AAUW of Nevada, AAUW of Virginia, Center for Common Ground, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, Illinois Federation of Womens Business Clubs, Inc., Illinois NOW, League of Women Voters of Virginia, National Womens Political Caucus of Virginia, Nevada NOW, Nevadans for the ERA, Rachels Network, The McIntosh Foundation, VAratifyERA, Virginia NOW, Virginia Poor Peoples Campaign, Women Matter, Womens Bar Association of Illinois, YWCA Metropolitan Chicago (Riley, Joshua)
June 29, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ana Carolina Varela, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281350. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AAUW of Greater Richmond, AAUW of Illinois, AAUW of Nevada, AAUW of Virginia, CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION, Center for Common Ground, Chicago Foundation for Women, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, Illinois Federation of Womens Business Clubs, Inc., Illinois NOW, League of Women Voters of Virginia, National Womens Political Caucus of Virginia, Nevada NOW, Nevadans for the ERA, Rachels Network, The McIntosh Foundation, VAratifyERA, Virginia NOW, Virginia Poor Peoples Campaign, Women Matter, Womens Bar Association of Illinois, YWCA Metropolitan Chicago (Riley, Joshua)
June 29, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jessica B. Spade, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281341. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jessica B. Spade, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cappiello, Elizabeth)
June 29, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Xeris Gregory, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7281278. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Xeris Gregory, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cappiello, Elizabeth)
June 29, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jodi Siegel, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-7281144. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, EQUAL MEANS ERA, LARATIFYERA, THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jodi Siegel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cappiello, Elizabeth)
June 29, 2020 Filing 51 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by THE UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS, EQUAL MEANS ERA, 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, LARATIFYERA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cappiello, Elizabeth)
June 29, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Spadola on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, GOVERNOR OF KANSAS (Spadola, Joseph)
June 29, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Maria T. Vullo, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7280582. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., Amalgamated Bank, BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GILEAD SCIENCES, INC., GOOGLE LLC, GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., THE HERSHEY COMPANY, THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maria T. Vullo, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LeGrand, Rebecca)
June 29, 2020 Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by ERWIN CHEMERINSKY, NOAH FELDMAN, REVA SIEGEL, JULIE C. SUK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae Constitutional Law Professors Erwin Chemerinsky, Noah Feldman, Reva Siegel, and Julie C. Suk, in Support of Neither Party, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
June 29, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Benjamin Z. Bergmann, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7280521. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., THE HERSHEY COMPANY, THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Z. Bergmann, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhee, Jeannie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tamar Holoshitz, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7280459. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., THE HERSHEY COMPANY, THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tamar Holoshitz, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhee, Jeannie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew G. Gordon, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7280354. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., THE HERSHEY COMPANY, THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew G. Gordon, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhee, Jeannie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 44 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs by Generation Ratify (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 LCvR 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Proposed Order)(Moxley, Lauren)
June 29, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Liza M. Velazquez, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7280294. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., THE HERSHEY COMPANY, THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Liza M. Velazquez, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhee, Jeannie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Loretta E. Lynch, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7280150. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., THE HERSHEY COMPANY, THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Loretta E. Lynch, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhee, Jeannie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Ellsworth on behalf of ERWIN CHEMERINSKY, NOAH FELDMAN, REVA SIEGEL, JULIE C. SUK (Ellsworth, Jessica) (Main Document 41 replaced on 6/30/2020) (ztth).
June 29, 2020 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., Amalgamated Bank, BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., GILEAD SCIENCES, INC., GOOGLE LLC, GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., THE HERSHEY COMPANY, THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Brief of Business and Corporate Entities as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff States, #2 Appendix B - LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Corporate Disclosure, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhee, Jeannie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca S. LeGrand on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, GILEAD SCIENCES, INC., GOOGLE LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION (LeGrand, Rebecca)
June 29, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeannie Sclafani Rhee on behalf of 1010DATA, INC., 98POINT6 INC., ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC, ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC., ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC., AIRBNB, INC., AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC., APPLE, ASANA, INC., ATAKAMA INC., BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC., BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO., BIOGEN INC., BLOOMBERG L.P., BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC., BOWERY FARMING INC., BRAZE, INC., BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC., BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY, CAPESPACE, LLC, CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED, CHOBANI, LLC, CITIGROUP INC., COTA, INC., DAYFORWARD INC., DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC., ELLIG GROUP LLC, EQUITABLE, THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC., ETSY, INC., EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., THE GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC., GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE HERSHEY COMPANY, INDUSTRIOUS, KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION, KIND LLC, LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC, LEVI STRAUSS & CO., LIVARI CLOTHING, LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC., LYFT, INC., MASTERCARD INCORPORATED, MICROSOFT, MORGAN STANLEY, MOTUS LLC, NARDELLO & CO., NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE, NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC, NEUBERGER BERMAN, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, OSCAR HEALTH, PEPSICO, INC., PFIZER INC., PLANET LABS INC., PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC, PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC., PUPPET, INC., QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC., REBELLE MEDIA, RODAN & FIELDS, LLC, SALESFORCE.COM, INC., SEED&SPARK, INC., SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS, SPOTIFY USA, INC., STRAVA, SURVEYMONKEY INC., THINX, TIFFANY & CO., TORY BURCH LLC, TRANSUNION, TURNITIN, LLC, TURO INC., TWITTER, INC., UBER, UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC., UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VF CORPORATION, VICE MEDIA LLC, WEWORK, WORKDAY, INC. (Rhee, Jeannie)
June 29, 2020 Filing 37 Memorandum in opposition to re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEVADA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kallen, Michelle)
June 29, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy Wallace on behalf of AAUW of Greater Richmond, AAUW of Illinois, AAUW of Nevada, AAUW of Virginia, Center for Common Ground, CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION, Chicago Foundation for Women, ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, Illinois Federation of Womens Business Clubs, Inc., Illinois NOW, League of Women Voters of Virginia, The McIntosh Foundation, National Womens Political Caucus of Virginia, Nevadans for the ERA, Nevada NOW, Rachels Network, VAratifyERA, Virginia NOW, Virginia Poor Peoples Campaign, Womens Bar Association of Illinois, Women Matter, YWCA Metropolitan Chicago (Wallace, Dorothy) (Main Document 36 replaced on 6/29/2020) (ztth).
June 12, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE. (ztth)
June 12, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting #10 Movants' Motion to Intervene. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/12/2020. (lcrc1)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #10 Movants' Motion to Intervene. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/12/2020. (lcrc1)
May 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/29/2020; Replies due by 8/10/2020. (tj)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #32 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern the remaining briefing on #29 Defendant's motion to dismiss: Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before June 29, 2020; Defendant shall file his reply in further support of the motion to dismiss on or before August 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/22/2020. (lcrc1)
May 22, 2020 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEVADA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kallen, Michelle)
May 14, 2020 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by EAGLE FORUM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 LcvR 26.1 Certificate)(Olson, William)
May 14, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jeffrey Olson on behalf of EAGLE FORUM (Olson, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by DAVID S. FERRIERO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita); Modified text and to deleted selected docket information on 5/8/2020 (ztth).
April 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Norris, Cameron)
April 20, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #27 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY; emailed to cam@consovoymccarthy.com, cc'd 22 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Document #27 was entered in error. Please refile in pleading format. See LCvR 5.1 (a). (ztth, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 27 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE (Norris, Cameron); Modified on 4/20/2020 (ztth).
April 17, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 5/7/2020; Responses due by 6/8/2020; Replies due by 6/29/2020. (tj)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #26 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern briefing on the Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss: Defendant shall file his motion to dismiss on or before May 7, 2020; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before June 8, 2020; Defendant shall file his reply in further support of the motion to dismiss on or before June 29, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/16/2020. (lcrc1)
April 16, 2020 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by DAVID S. FERRIERO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
April 16, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita B. Andrapalliyal on behalf of DAVID S. FERRIERO (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
March 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Baker Murrill on behalf of LOUISIANA (Murrill, Elizabeth) (Main Document 24 replaced on 3/25/2020) (ztth).
March 24, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE. (Norris, Cameron)
March 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 3/24/2020. (tj)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Movants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: It is hereby ORDERED that Movants shall have until and including March 24, 2020, to file their reply in support of their motion to intervene. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/13/2020. (lcrc1)
March 13, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Intervene by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norris, Cameron)
March 10, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEVADA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kallen, Michelle)
March 4, 2020 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/18/2020. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/20/2020. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/20/2020.) (See Docket Entry #19 to view document) (ztth)
March 4, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID S. FERRIERO served on 2/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kallen, Michelle); Modified date of service on 3/5/2020 (ztth).
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Neilson Strawbridge on behalf of ALABAMA (Strawbridge, Patrick)
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Curtis on behalf of ALABAMA (Curtis, Kelsey)
February 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Barrett Bowdre on behalf of ALABAMA (Bowdre, Alexander)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andree Sophia Blumstein on behalf of TENNESSEE (Blumstein, Andree)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #10 Motion to Intervene: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until and including March 11, 2020, to respond to #10 Movants' Motion to Intervene. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/27/2020. (lcrc1)
February 27, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Intervene by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEVADA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kallen, Michelle)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Campbell on behalf of NEBRASKA (Campbell, James)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James William Davis on behalf of ALABAMA (Davis, James)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund G. LaCour, Jr on behalf of ALABAMA (LaCour, Edmund)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by ALABAMA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH DAKOTA, TENNESSEE (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Norris, Cameron)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Toby Jay Heytens on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Heytens, Toby)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Merry Samuels on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Samuels, Jessica)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DAVID S. FERRIERO. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Martine Elizabeth Cicconi on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA (Cicconi, Martine)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 ERRATA by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kallen, Michelle)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Roberson-Young on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Roberson-Young, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Graham Wells on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Wells, Christopher)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Hunt Muse on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Muse, Kathryn)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID S. FERRIERO (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kallen, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA et al v. FERRIERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID S. FERRIERO
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Martine Elizabeth Cicconi
Represented By: Michelle S. Kallen
Represented By: Jessica Merry Samuels
Represented By: Toby Jay Heytens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEVADA
Represented By: Michelle S. Kallen
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Elizabeth Roberson-Young
Represented By: Christopher Graham Wells
Represented By: Kathryn Hunt Muse
Represented By: Michelle S. Kallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NEBRASKA
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: LOUISIANA
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: ALABAMA
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Alexander Barrett Bowdre
Represented By: Kelsey Curtis
Represented By: James William Davis
Represented By: Patrick Neilson Strawbridge
Represented By: Edmund G. LaCour, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: TENNESSEE
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Andree Sophia Blumstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BARON CAPITAL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VICE MEDIA LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ARAB WOMEN ORGANIZATION
Represented By: Stefani Johnson Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VOTEERA.ORG
Represented By: Charles Morton English, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAYFORWARD INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ILLINOIS NOW
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL IMMIGRANT WOMEN'S ADVOCACY PROJECT, INC.
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MORGAN STANLEY
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL WOMENS POLITICAL CAUCUS OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EQUAL RIGHTS AMENDMENT NORTH CAROLINA ALLIANCE
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SALESFORCE.COM, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ADVANCE LOCAL MEDIA LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SISTERHOOD IS GLOBAL INSTITUTE
Represented By: Stefani Johnson Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CALIFORNIA CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS FOUNDATION
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.S. CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SISTERS OF LORETTO - LORETTO COMMUNITY
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NEUBERGER BERMAN
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SPOTIFY USA, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NOAH FELDMAN
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SURVEYMONKEY INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBERT G. MARSHALL
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WOMEN MATTER
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WOMEN'S HEALTH AND REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WORLD POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER
Represented By: Stefani Johnson Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BIOGEN INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PUPPET, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THINX
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES CONFERENCE OF MAYORS
Represented By: Madeline E Hughes
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cappiello
Represented By: Jade E. Sipes,
Represented By: Xeris Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CONCERNED WOMEN FOR AMERICA
Represented By: Jordan Woodard Lorence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WOMEN LAWYERS
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BOWERY FARMING INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LAROCK DAVID
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REVA SIEGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WEWORK
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JUSTICE REVIVAL
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEVI STRAUSS & CO.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STRAVA
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SEED&SPARK, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOLORES HUERTA FOUNDATION
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PRIDE IN RUNNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEGAL MOMENTUM
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CLARE BOOTHE LUCE CENTER FOR CONSERVATIVE WOMEN
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PEPSICO, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RETHINKING EVE LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUSAN B. ANTHONY LIST
Represented By: Jordan Woodard Lorence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VF CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COTA, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEANNE LITTRELL DILORENZO
Represented By: Charles Morton English, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHUTTERSTOCK, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERA TASK FORCE AZ
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NARDELLO & CO.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GENDER JUSTICE
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NEVADA NOW
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 1010DATA, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EQUITABLE
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OKLAHOMA WOMEN'S COALITION
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BUILD AMERICA MUTUAL ASSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EQUALITY UTAH
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CAPESPACE, LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MORMONS FOR ERA
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SERVICE WOMEN'S ACTION NETWORK
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ELLIG GROUP LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BLACK WOMENS ROUNDTABLE
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRAZE, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA
Represented By: Jade E. Sipes
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cappiello
Represented By: Xeris Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LARATIFYERA
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cappiello
Represented By: Jade E. Sipes,
Represented By: Xeris Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YWCA USA
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ETSY, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ILLINOIS FEDERATION OF WOMENS BUSINESS CLUBS, INC.
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EAGLE FORUM
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SOFTBANK INVESTMENT ADVISERS
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VIRGINIA NOW
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOWNTOWN WOMEN FOR CHANGE
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KIND LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ADVANCE PUBLICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE LEGAL EMPOWERMENT AND APPEALS PROJECT
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HOMEGIRL PROJECT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RESTORING LIBERTY ACTION COMMITTEE
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALICE PAUL INSTITUTE
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MCINTOSH FOUNDATION
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YWCA METROPOLITAN CHICAGO
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ILLINOIS STATE BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HERSHEY COMPANY
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TURO INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EVERYTHING IS EVERYTHING
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITIGROUP INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PROJECT 28 MO
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERA MINNESOTA
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INDUSTRIOUS
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AAUW OF RICHMOND
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BLUE APRON HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INTERNATIONAL WOMEN'S RIGHTS ACTION WATCH ASIA PACIFIC
Represented By: Stefani Johnson Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LATIN AMERICAN AND CARIBBEAN COMMITTEE FOR THE DEFENSE OF WOMEN'S RIGHTS
Represented By: Stefani Johnson Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REBELLE MEDIA
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EQUAL RIGHTS TRUST
Represented By: Stefani Johnson Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WOMEN'S MEDIA CENTER
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHICAGO FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNION THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SENDING HER ESSENTIALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WOMEN'S EQUALITY COALITION
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHIGAN ERAMERICA
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 98POINT6 INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED 4 EQUALITY, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHOBANI, LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, INC.
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRIGHTHOUSE FINANCIAL, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BLOOMBERG L.P.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Anita Milanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERA COALITION
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WOMENS BAR ASSOCIATION OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WOMEN LAWYERS ON GUARD INC.
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RODAN & FIELDS, LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AAUW OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LVMH MOET HENNESSY LOUIS VUITTON INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CENTER FOR COMMON GROUND
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ARIZONA NOW
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASANA, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EQUALITY NOW
Represented By: Stefani Johnson Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHELTERPOINT LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PLANET LABS INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GENERATION UPWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL WOMEN'S SOCCER LEAGUE, LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: Rebecca S. LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICROSOFT
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ATAKAMA INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PLATFORM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TWITTER, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL FOOTBALL LEAGUE
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FUND FOR WOMEN'S EQUALITY
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY CO.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EUROPEAN WOMEN'S LOBBY
Represented By: Stefani Johnson Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COMMISSIONS FOR WOMEN
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VARATIFYERA
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TURNITIN, LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PROCORE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CAPRI HOLDINGS LIMITED
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TIFFANY & CO.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SISTERS OF ST. JOSEPH OF CARONDELET AREA
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VOTO LATINO
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VIRGINIA POOR PEOPLES CAMPAIGN
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LYFT, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: QUOTIENT TECHNOLOGY INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MOTUS LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TORY BURCH LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN CITY BUSINESS JOURNALS, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LEADERS GROUP HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHIGAN FEDERATION OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL WOMEN'S CLUBS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: APPLE
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WORKDAY, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HADASSAH, THE WOMEN'S ZIONIST ORGANIZATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NEVADANS FOR THE ERA
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EAGLE FORUM FOUNDATION
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TIME'S UP FOUNDATION
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GENERAL FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S CLUBS
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UTAH ERA COALITION
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: William Jeffrey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RACHELS NETWORK
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AAUW OF NEVADA
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASSOCIATION OF FLIGHT ATTENDANTS-CWA
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHICAGO BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PROSPERITY LIFE INSURANCE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AAUW OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Vanessa Tussey
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Jon Lester Mills
Represented By: Joshua P. Riley
Represented By: Dorothy Wallace
Represented By: Ana Carolina Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FEMNET
Represented By: Stefani Johnson Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHISEIDO AMERICAS CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRANSUNION
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AIRBNB, INC.
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LIVARI CLOTHING
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MASTERCARD INCORPORATED
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EQUAL MEANS ERA
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cappiello
Represented By: Jade E. Sipes,
Represented By: Xeris Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL CONGRESS OF BLACK WOMEN, INC.
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Represented By: Rebecca S. LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UBER
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OSCAR HEALTH
Represented By: Jeannie Sclafani Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN
Represented By: Christopher D. Man
Represented By: Linda T Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca S. LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GENERATION RATIFY
Represented By: Lauren Moxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JULIE C. SUK
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Ann M Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMALGAMATED BANK
Represented By: Rebecca S. LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GOVERNOR OF KANSAS
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Joseph Spadola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ERWIN CHEMERINSKY
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GOOGLE LLC
Represented By: Rebecca S. LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEVE BULLOCK
Represented By: Rylee K Sommers-Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?