CITY OF CHICAGO v. AZAR et al
Plaintiff: CITY OF CHICAGO
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES and SEEMA VERMA
Amicus Curiae: STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA and STATE OF MINNESOTA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01566
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #24 Joint Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record. It is hereby ORDERED that the [24-2], [24-3], [24-4] Administrative Record shall be deemed filed. It is further ORDERED that the parties are excused from filing the appendix described in LCvR 7(n)(1). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/7/2020. (lctjk1)
August 6, 2020 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Record by CITY OF CHICAGO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Administrative Record part 1, #3 Administrative Record part 2, #4 Administrative Record part 3)(Lewis, John)
August 3, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to opposition to motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA. (Powell, Amy)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #22 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' reply in support of their #18 Motion to Dismiss shall not exceed thirty pages. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/3/2020. (lctjk1)
August 3, 2020 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply Memorandum by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy)
July 27, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment in the Alternative filed by CITY OF CHICAGO. (Lewis, John)
July 27, 2020 Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CITY OF CHICAGO. (Lewis, John)
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment in the Alternative filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Pate, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of R. Pate, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy)
July 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra on behalf of U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Wydra, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianne Jenna Gorod on behalf of U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Gorod, Brianne)
June 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Administrative Record due by 7/20/2020. Any amicus brief in support of Defendants due by 7/24/2020. (zkh)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/22/2020. (lctjk1)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by CITY OF CHICAGO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Seel on behalf of CITY OF CHICAGO (Seel, Benjamin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Frances Thurston on behalf of CITY OF CHICAGO (Thurston, Robin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A. Lev on behalf of CITY OF CHICAGO (Lev, Sean)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 AMICUS BRIEF by State of California, et al. filed by STATE OF CALIFORNIA. (Palma, Neli); Modified text and event on 6/23/2020 (ztth).
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 AMICUS BRIEF by U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (ztth)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the #7 Consent Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the amicus curiae brief, ECF No. 7-1, shall be filed on the docket. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/19/2020. (lctjk1)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CITY OF CHICAGO re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment in the Alternative . (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lewis, John)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 6/18/2020; CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 6/18/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/19/2020; SEEMA VERMA served on 6/18/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/19/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/18/2020.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lewis, John)
June 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/18/2020. Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2020. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (zkh)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear telephonically for a status conference on June 18, 2020, at 9:30 a.m., to discuss how they wish to proceed regarding Plaintiff's #4 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, Expedited Summary Judgment. The parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3495 at least one business day in advance to make arrangements to appear. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/16/2020. (lctjk1)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Expedite in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment in the Alternative by CITY OF CHICAGO (Attachments: #1 Arwady Declaration, #2 Young Declaration, #3 Gee Declaration, #4 Orbea Declaration and Supporting Exhibits, #5 Request for Judicial Notice and Supporting Exhibits, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SEEMA VERMA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
June 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITY OF CHICAGO (adh, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7229753) filed by CITY OF CHICAGO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Lewis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF CHICAGO v. AZAR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Robin Frances Thurston
Represented By: Benjamin M. Seel
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Neli Nima Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF HAWAII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF DELAWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF VIRGINIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OREGON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?