RTSKHILADZE v. MUELLER et al
Plaintiff: GIORGI RTSKHILADZE
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and ROBERT S. MUELLER, III
Case Number: 1:2020cv01591
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by GIORGI RTSKHILADZE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redline of Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend the Complaint)(Madden, Jerome)
July 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2020. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2020. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 10/20/2020. (lsj)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. The following deadlines shall apply: Both Defendants shall file their Motion to Dismiss by September 15, 2020; Plaintiff shall file his Opposition by October 6, 2020; Defendants shall file their Reply by October 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/21/20. (lccrc2)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Inkeles on behalf of ROBERT S. MUELLER, III (Inkeles, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Marie Cutri-Kohart on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca)
July 14, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #15 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error. US Attorney has been served. See docket #14 .(ztd)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to, U.S. Attorney (ztd) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ztd).
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/30/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/29/2020. (Madden, Jerome)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE USA District of Columbia filed by GIORGI RTSKHILADZE.(Madden, Jerome)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT S. MUELLER, III served on 6/25/2020, answer due 7/16/2020 (Madden, Jerome)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to (Individual Capacity) ROBERT S. MUELLER, III. (ztd)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GIORGI RTSKHILADZE.(Madden, Jerome)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on ROBERT S. MUELLER,III. Date of Service 06/22/2020. (Madden, Jerome) Modified party served on 6/25/2020 (ztd).
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Department of Justice. Date of Service 06/22/2020. (Madden, Jerome) Modified party served on 6/25/2020 (ztd).
June 24, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #4 Request for Summons to Issue, #5 Request for Summons to Issue was entered in error as duplicates of docket entry no. #3 . When filing fillable forms, make sure your documents are saved as a pdf before filing.(ztd)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ztd)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GIORGI RTSKHILADZE.(Madden, Jerome)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GIORGI RTSKHILADZE.(Madden, Jerome) Modified on 6/24/2020 (ztd).
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GIORGI RTSKHILADZE.(Madden, Jerome) Modified on 6/24/2020 (ztd).
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GIORGI RTSKHILADZE.(Madden, Jerome)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
June 18, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7238085) filed by GIORGI RTSKHILADZE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Madden, Jerome)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RTSKHILADZE v. MUELLER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Rebecca Marie Cutri-Kohart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT S. MUELLER, III
Represented By: David W. Inkeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIORGI RTSKHILADZE
Represented By: Jerome A. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?