UPMC v. AZAR et al
Plaintiff: UPMC
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II and DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2020cv02781
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-01276. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/11/2020. (ajt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by UPMC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schwab, John) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/1/2020. (cmc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Susquehana Health System Innovation Center, Inc.; Somerset Hospital; Hamot Health Foundation; The Williamsport Hospital; Laurel Health System; Pinnacle Health System; Hanover Hospital as other affiliates, by UPMC. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5869612), filed by UPMC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 9/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UPMC v. AZAR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?