MICHIGAN WELFARE RIGHTS ORGANIZATION et al v. TRUMP et al
Plaintiff: MAUREEN TAYLOR, TEASHA JONES, MICHIGAN WELFARE RIGHTS ORGANIZATION, NICOLE HILL and NAACP
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., DONALD J. TRUMP and REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Case Number: 1:2020cv03388
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1973
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Norris, Cameron)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Thomas Norris on behalf of REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE (Norris, Cameron)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021 (Spital, Samuel)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (zjf)
January 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 1/25/2021. (mac)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 consent motion for extension of time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by no later than January 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/31/2020. (lcegs3)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., DONALD J. TRUMP, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE filed by TEASHA JONES, MAUREEN TAYLOR, MICHIGAN WELFARE RIGHTS ORGANIZATION, NICOLE HILL, NAACP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline Comparison to original complaint, #2 Summons to Republican National Committee)(Spital, Samuel) Modified on 1/4/2021 to add additional filer (zjf).
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R. Binnall on behalf of All Defendants (Binnall, Jesse) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/21/2020) (zjf).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/14/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delivery Date Confirmation)(Spital, Samuel)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020 (Spital, Samuel)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA Notice by NICOLE HILL, TEASHA JONES, MICHIGAN WELFARE RIGHTS ORGANIZATION, MAUREEN TAYLOR #1 Complaint, filed by TEASHA JONES, NICOLE HILL, MAUREEN TAYLOR, MICHIGAN WELFARE RIGHTS ORGANIZATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Complaint)(Spital, Samuel)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7863628) filed by TEASHA JONES, MAUREEN TAYLOR, MICHIGAN WELFARE RIGHTS ORGANIZATION, NICOLE HILL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Spital, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MICHIGAN WELFARE RIGHTS ORGANIZATION et al v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAUREEN TAYLOR
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEASHA JONES
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHIGAN WELFARE RIGHTS ORGANIZATION
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE HILL
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAACP
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.
Represented By: Jesse R. Binnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Jesse R. Binnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?