WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE et al v. PENCE et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: BRENDA SAVAGE, RICHARD W KUCKSDORF, DEBI HAAS, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, JEFF L MURSAU, JOHN WOOD, RON HEUER, LYNIE STONE, MATTHEW DADICH, LEAH HOOPES, WARREN PETERSON, SONNY BORRELLI, DEBBIE JACQUES, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, DAIRE RENDON, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, DAVID STEFFEN, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, BARON BENHAM, WILLIAM T LIGON and MATTHEW MADDOCK
Defendant: BUTCH MILLER, U.S HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, LEE CHATFIELD, BRYAN CARTER, RUSSELL BOWERS, DOUG DUCEY, U.S. SENATE, MIKE SHIRKEY, GRETCHEN WHITMER, JAKE CORMAN, TONY EVERS, DAVID RALSTON, ROBIN VOS, MICHAEL RICHARD PENCE, BRIAN KEMP, ELECTORAL COLLEGE, THE, TOM WOLF, HOWARD MARKLEIN and RICK GRAY
Case Number: 1:2020cv03791
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 2/5/2021. (znbn)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs' Counsel shall file his response to this Court's January 7, 2021, Minute Order to Show Cause by February 5, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/19/2021. (lcjeb1)
January 19, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to January 7, 2021, Minute Order to Show Cause by Erick G. Kaardal, Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Shor, Channing)
January 19, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Channing Lynn Shor on behalf of Erick G. Kaardal, Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A. (Shor, Channing)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Michael Flint on behalf of Erick G. Kaardal, Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A. (Flint, Justin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, BARON BENHAM, SONNY BORRELLI, MATTHEW DADICH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, DEBI HAAS, RON HEUER, LEAH HOOPES, DEBBIE JACQUES, RICHARD W. KUCKSDORF, WILLIAM T LIGON, MATTHEW MADDOCK, JEFF L MURSAU, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, BRENDA SAVAGE, DAVID STEFFEN, LYNIE STONE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, JOHN WOOD re 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . (Kaardal, Erick)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As Plaintiffs' 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal has now terminated the litigation, the Court ORDERS that by January 22, 2021, Plaintiffs' counsel shall show cause why the Court should not refer him to the Committee on Grievances for all of the reasons discussed in its recent 10 Memorandum Opinion. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/7/2021. (lcjeb1)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Per Plaintiffs' 16 Notice, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/7/2021. (lcjeb1)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Kaardal, Erick)
January 6, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOFS OF SERVICE by ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, BARON BENHAM, SONNY BORRELLI, MATTHEW DADICH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, DEBI HAAS, RON HEUER, LEAH HOOPES, DEBBIE JACQUES, RICHARD W. KUCKSDORF, WILLIAM T LIGON, MATTHEW MADDOCK, JEFF L MURSAU, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, BRENDA SAVAGE, DAVID STEFFEN, LYNIE STONE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, JOHN WOOD re 10 Memorandum & Opinion, 9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Kaardal, Erick)
January 6, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re 11 Notice (Other); emailed to kaardal@mklaw.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Docket Entry 11 was entered in error. Please see LCvR 5.1. (ztth, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/23/2020. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/23/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/21/2021.) (See Docket Entry 13 to view document) (ztth)
January 5, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE. LEE CHATFIELD waiver sent on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/21/2021; RICK GRAY waiver sent on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/21/2021; MIKE SHIRKEY waiver sent on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/21/2021; GRETCHEN WHITMER waiver sent on 12/23/20, answer due 2/21/2021. (Kaardal, Erick); Modified date of waiver sent and answer due date on 1/7/2021 (ztth).
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BRYAN CARTER served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/18/2021; JAKE CORMAN served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/18/2021; DOUG DUCEY served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021; TONY EVERS served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021; BRIAN KEMP served on 12/26/2020, answer due 1/16/2021; HOWARD MARKLEIN served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021; BUTCH MILLER served on 12/26/2020, answer due 1/16/2021; DAVID RALSTON served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021; TOM WOLF served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021 (Kaardal, Erick)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELECTORAL COLLEGE, THE served on 12/23/2020; MICHAEL RICHARD PENCE served on 12/23/2020; U.S HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES served on 12/23/2020; U.S. SENATE served on 12/23/2020 (Kaardal, Erick)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Letter to Judge James E. Boasberg with attachment by ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, BARON BENHAM, SONNY BORRELLI, MATTHEW DADICH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, DEBI HAAS, RON HEUER, LEAH HOOPES, DEBBIE JACQUES, RICHARD W. KUCKSDORF, WILLIAM T LIGON, MATTHEW MADDOCK, JEFF L MURSAU, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, BRENDA SAVAGE, DAVID STEFFEN, LYNIE STONE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, JOHN WOOD re 10 Memorandum & Opinion, 9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Kaardal, Erick); Modified on 1/6/2021 (ztth).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/4/2021. (lcjeb1)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/4/2021. (lcjeb1)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that, as soon as Plaintiffs file proofs of service on all Defendants, a briefing schedule and hearing shall be set. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/23/2020. (lcjeb3)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Second Declaration of Erick G. Kaardal by ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, BARON BENHAM, SONNY BORRELLI, MATTHEW DADICH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, DEBI HAAS, RON HEUER, LEAH HOOPES, DEBBIE JACQUES, RICHARD W KUCKSDORF, WILLIAM T LIGON, MATTHEW MADDOCK, JEFF L MURSAU, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, BRENDA SAVAGE, DAVID STEFFEN, LYNIE STONE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, JOHN WOOD. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Kaardal, Erick)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (19) Issued Electronically as to RUSSELL BOWERS, BRYAN CARTER, LEE CHATFIELD, JAKE CORMAN, DOUG DUCEY, ELECTORAL COLLEGE, THE, TONY EVERS, RICK GRAY, BRIAN KEMP, HOWARD MARKLEIN, BUTCH MILLER, MICHAEL RICHARD PENCE, DAVID RALSTON, MIKE SHIRKEY, U.S HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, U.S. SENATE, ROBIN VOS, GRETCHEN WHITMER, TOM WOLF. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, )
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction by ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, BARON BENHAM, SONNY BORRELLI, MATTHEW DADICH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, DEBI HAAS, RON HEUER, LEAH HOOPES, DEBBIE JACQUES, RICHARD W KUCKSDORF, WILLIAM T LIGON, MATTHEW MADDOCK, JEFF L MURSAU, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, BRENDA SAVAGE, DAVID STEFFEN, LYNIE STONE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, JOHN WOOD re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Kaardal, Erick)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Erick Kaardal by ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, BARON BENHAM, SONNY BORRELLI, MATTHEW DADICH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, DEBI HAAS, RON HEUER, LEAH HOOPES, DEBBIE JACQUES, RICHARD W KUCKSDORF, WILLIAM T LIGON, MATTHEW MADDOCK, JEFF L MURSAU, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, BRENDA SAVAGE, DAVID STEFFEN, LYNIE STONE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, JOHN WOOD. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix part 1, # 2 Appendix part 2, # 3 Appendix part 3, # 4 Appendix part 4, # 5 Appendix part 5, # 6 Appendix part 6, # 7 Appendix part 7, # 8 Appendix part 8, # 9 Appendix part 9, # 10 Appendix part 10, # 11 Appendix part 11, # 12 Appendix part 12)(Kaardal, Erick) (Attachment 6 replaced on 12/23/2020) (ztnr).
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, SONNY BORRELLI, RICHARD W KUCKSDORF, DEBBIE JACQUES, ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, MATTHEW DADICH, BRENDA SAVAGE, JOHN WOOD, JEFF L MURSAU, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, BARON BENHAM, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, LEAH HOOPES, MATTHEW MADDOCK, LYNIE STONE, WILLIAM T LIGON, RON HEUER, DEBI HAAS, BRANDON BEACH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, DAVID STEFFEN by ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, BARON BENHAM, SONNY BORRELLI, MATTHEW DADICH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, DEBI HAAS, RON HEUER, LEAH HOOPES, DEBBIE JACQUES, RICHARD W KUCKSDORF, WILLIAM T LIGON, MATTHEW MADDOCK, JEFF L MURSAU, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, BRENDA SAVAGE, DAVID STEFFEN, LYNIE STONE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, JOHN WOOD. (Kaardal, Erick)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF HEARING by ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, BARON BENHAM, SONNY BORRELLI, MATTHEW DADICH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, DEBI HAAS, RON HEUER, LEAH HOOPES, DEBBIE JACQUES, RICHARD W KUCKSDORF, WILLIAM T LIGON, MATTHEW MADDOCK, JEFF L MURSAU, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, BRENDA SAVAGE, DAVID STEFFEN, LYNIE STONE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, JOHN WOOD re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Kaardal, Erick)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE, BRANDON BEACH, BARON BENHAM, SONNY BORRELLI, MATTHEW DADICH, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, DEBI HAAS, RON HEUER, LEAH HOOPES, DEBBIE JACQUES, RICHARD W KUCKSDORF, WILLIAM T LIGON, MATTHEW MADDOCK, JEFF L MURSAU, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WARREN PETERSON, DAIRE RENDON, BRENDA SAVAGE, DAVID STEFFEN, LYNIE STONE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, JOHN WOOD (Kaardal, Erick)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7990281) filed by JEFF L MURSAU, BARON BENHAM, WARREN PETERSON, PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE, MATTHEW MADDOCK, SONNY BORRELLI, DAVID STEFFEN, DEBBIE JACQUES, MATTHEW DADICH, LEAH HOOPES, WILLIAM T LIGON, BRANDON BEACH, RICHARD W KUCKSDORF, LYNIE STONE, GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE, BRENDA SAVAGE, RON HEUER, JOHN WOOD, DEBI HAAS, ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND, DAIRE RENDON, ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kaardal, Erick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE et al v. PENCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA SAVAGE
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD W KUCKSDORF
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBI HAAS
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELECTION INTEGRITY FUND
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARIZONA VOTER INTEGRITY ALLIANCE
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF L MURSAU
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WOOD
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON HEUER
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNIE STONE
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW DADICH
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH HOOPES
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARREN PETERSON
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONNY BORRELLI
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBBIE JACQUES
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WISCONSIN VOTERS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAIRE RENDON
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNSYLVANIA VOTERS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON BEACH
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID STEFFEN
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGIA VOTERS ALLIANCE
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARON BENHAM
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM T LIGON
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MADDOCK
Represented By: Erick G. Kaardal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUTCH MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE CHATFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN CARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL BOWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUG DUCEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. SENATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE SHIRKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRETCHEN WHITMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAKE CORMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY EVERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID RALSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN VOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL RICHARD PENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN KEMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTORAL COLLEGE, THE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOM WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD MARKLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK GRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?