WHALE AND DOLPHIN CONSERVATION et al v. NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, WHALE AND DOLPHIN CONSERVATION and CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION
Defendant: WILBUR L. ROSS, JR. and NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2021cv00112
Filed: January 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Spatz on behalf of All Defendants (Spatz, Michelle)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica A. Fuller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fuller, Erica)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Monsell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Monsell, Kristen)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE served on 1/15/2021; WILBUR L. ROSS, JR served on 1/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Davenport, Jane)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Davenport, Jane)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/14/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Davenport, Jane)
January 13, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, WILBUR L. ROSS, JR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
January 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8070893) filed by WHALE AND DOLPHIN CONSERVATION, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Wilbur Ross in his official capacity as Secretary of Commerce, #3 Summons National Marine Fisheries Service, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney District of Columbia, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Davenport, Jane)
January 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHALE AND DOLPHIN CONSERVATION et al v. NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: Jane P. Davenport
Represented By: Kristen Monsell
Represented By: Erica A. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Jane P. Davenport
Represented By: Kristen Monsell
Represented By: Erica A. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHALE AND DOLPHIN CONSERVATION
Represented By: Jane P. Davenport
Represented By: Kristen Monsell
Represented By: Erica A. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSERVATION LAW FOUNDATION
Represented By: Jane P. Davenport
Represented By: Erica A. Fuller
Represented By: Kristen Monsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILBUR L. ROSS, JR.
Represented By: Michelle M. Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By: Michelle M. Spatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?