DANA JOHNSON v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DANA JOHNSON
Defendant: CRAIG CHERVERT LONG, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and RASIER, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00821
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 Receipt on 5/21/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2020 CA 000322 V. (eg)
May 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Lance Robey on behalf of CRAIG CHERVERT LONG (Robey, Daniel)
May 5, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/5/2021. Discovery shall start today and close on 12/4/2021. Amended Complaint and Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2021. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures due by 9/5/2021. Defendant's Expert Disclosures due by 10/20/2021. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/4/2021. Each party may depose up to five fact witnesses and may present up to three experts. Document requests, interrogatories, and requests for admission shall be governed by the rules of civil procedure. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Kearney, Francis)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for May 4, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The conference will take place by telephone. Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/9/2021 (lctnm1)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis R Kearney on behalf of DANA JOHNSON (Kearney, Francis)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10:00 a.m. on May 4, 2021, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden shall now be held at 10:00 a.m. on May 5, 2021. All other instructions in the Court's #10 Order remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/9/2021 (lctnm1)
April 9, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Regarding Additional Exhibits by RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hanrahan, Catherine)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, )
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/30/2021. (lctnm1)
March 30, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC re #4 Cover Sheet filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC. Related document: #4 Cover Sheet filed by RASIER, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(Hanrahan, Catherine)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC re Notice of QC- New Case, filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,.(Hanrahan, Catherine)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RASIER, LLC (Hanrahan, Catherine)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Hanrahan, Catherine)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 000322 V Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8332405 filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanrahan, Catherine)
March 26, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to catherine.hanrahan@wilsonelser.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANA JOHNSON v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG CHERVERT LONG
Represented By: Daniel Lance Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Catherine A. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER, LLC
Represented By: Catherine A. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA JOHNSON
Represented By: Francis R Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?