EDWARDS v. HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN S. EDWARDS
Defendant: HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, RYAN ANDREW MAURER, STRYKER CORPORATION and DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2021cv03345
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 USCA Case Number 22-5046 for #16 Notice of Appeal filed by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (ztth)
February 16, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (ztth)
February 16, 2022 Filing 17 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court or motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis has been decided re #16 Notice of Appeal. (ztth)
February 16, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order on Motion to Reassign Case by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (ztth)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/10/2022. (lctjk1)
February 1, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration #7 MOTION for Reassignment of Judge Timothy J Kelly by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(ztth); Modified on 2/8/2022 to add docket entry relationship (ztth).
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Reassign Case and dismissing the case for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/31/2022. (lctjk1)
January 28, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (ztth)
January 28, 2022 Filing 11 (AMENDED) MOTION for Order to Show Cause by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (ztth)
January 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(ztth)
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and for other Relief by HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, RYAN ANDREW MAURER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Forster, Todd)
January 20, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT Regarding Service by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (ztth)
January 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Reassignment of Judge Timothy J Kelly by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (ztth)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/5/2022 (ztth)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022; STRYKER CORPORATION served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (ztth)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/30/2021. (lctjk1)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In his complaint, Plaintiff purports to invoke the diversity jurisdiction of this Court under 28 U.S.C. 1332. See ECF No. 1 at 9 (mistakenly citing 28 U.S.C. 1331, which details the Court's federal-question jurisdiction, but discussing the requirements for diversity jurisdiction). To establish complete diversity, a plaintiff must "distinctly" allege the citizenship "of every party to the action." Meng v. Schwartz, 305 F. Supp. 2d 49, 55 (D.D.C. 2004). An "allegation of residence alone is insufficient to establish the citizenship necessary for diversity jurisdiction." Novak v. Capital Mgmt. & Dev. Corp., 452 F.3d 902, 906 (D.C. Cir. 2006) (cleaned up). And when there are corporate defendants, the plaintiff "must provide a statement of... the corporations' states of incorporation and their principal places of business." Id. at 906-07 (cleaned up and emphasis added). Here, Plaintiff only alleges where he and the individual defendant, Ryan Maurer, reside. ECF No. 1 at 7-8. Additionally, Plaintiff has not alleged the principal place of business for either Defendant Citizens Insurance Company or Defendant Stryker Corporation. Id. at 8. Nor has he alleged where Defendant Stryker Corporation is incorporated. Id. From the face of Plaintiff's complaint, then, it appears that Plaintiff has not established complete diversity. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, by January 27, 2022, Plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. See Caldwell v. Kagan, 777 F. Supp. 2d 177, 179 (D.D.C. 2011) (noting that dismissal for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction "may occur sua sponte prior to service on the defendants... when... it is evident that the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction") (internal quotation marks omitted). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/30/2021. (lctjk1)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 NEW Request Regarding Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (ztth)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, RYAN ANDREW MAURER, STRYKER CORPORATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(ztth) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/29/2021) (ztth).
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, RYAN ANDREW MAURER, STRYKER CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 201248) with Jury Demand filed by STEPHEN S. EDWARDS. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztth); Modified text on 12/27/2021 (ztth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDWARDS v. HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN S. EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP
Represented By: Todd Perry Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN ANDREW MAURER
Represented By: Todd Perry Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRYKER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?