SAN ANTONIO BAY ESTUARINE WATERKEEPER et al v. CONNOR et al
Plaintiff: SAN ANTONIO BAY ESTUARINE WATERKEEPER, TEXAS CAMPAIGN FOR THE ENVIRONMENT, TURTLE ISLAND RESTORATION NETWORK, EARTHWORKS and ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Defendant: MICHAEL L CONNOR, U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, MICHAEL L. CONNOR and UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Case Number: 1:2022cv01470
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimere J. Kimball on behalf of MICHAEL L. CONNOR, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Kimball, Kimere)
June 30, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by SAN ANTONIO BAY ESTUARINE WATERKEEPER, EARTHWORKS, TURTLE ISLAND RESTORATION NETWORK, TEXAS CAMPAIGN FOR THE ENVIRONMENT, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A for Matagorda Bay First Amended Complaint)(Gaines, Erin)
June 23, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS served on 6/6/2022 (Gaines, Erin)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2022. (Gaines, Erin)
June 23, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/07/2022. (Gaines, Erin)
June 23, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL L. CONNOR served on 6/6/2022 (Gaines, Erin)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Gaines on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gaines, Erin)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan Hasselman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hasselman, Jan)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 , #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Erin L. Gaines and Jan E. Hasselman are admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/1/2022. (lcapm1)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jan E. Hasselman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9273154. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EARTHWORKS, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, SAN ANTONIO BAY ESTUARINE WATERKEEPER, TEXAS CAMPAIGN FOR THE ENVIRONMENT, TURTLE ISLAND RESTORATION NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jan E. Hasselman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyles, Kristen)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Erin L. Gaines, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9273129. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EARTHWORKS, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, SAN ANTONIO BAY ESTUARINE WATERKEEPER, TEXAS CAMPAIGN FOR THE ENVIRONMENT, TURTLE ISLAND RESTORATION NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin L. Gaines, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyles, Kristen)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL L. CONNOR, U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
May 26, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EARTHWORKS, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, SAN ANTONIO BAY ESTUARINE WATERKEEPER, TEXAS CAMPAIGN FOR THE ENVIRONMENT, TURTLE ISLAND RESTORATION NETWORK (zeg)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9262594) filed by SAN ANTONIO BAY ESTUARINE WATERKEEPER, EARTHWORKS, TURTLE ISLAND RESTORATION NETWORK, TEXAS CAMPAIGN FOR THE ENVIRONMENT, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Michael L. Connor, #3 Summons to Merrick B. Garland, #4 Summons to Matthew M. Graves, #5 Summons to Army Corps of Engineers, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Boyles, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAN ANTONIO BAY ESTUARINE WATERKEEPER et al v. CONNOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN ANTONIO BAY ESTUARINE WATERKEEPER
Represented By: Kristen L. Boyles
Represented By: Erin Gaines
Represented By: Jan Erik Hasselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEXAS CAMPAIGN FOR THE ENVIRONMENT
Represented By: Kristen L. Boyles
Represented By: Erin Gaines
Represented By: Jan Erik Hasselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TURTLE ISLAND RESTORATION NETWORK
Represented By: Kristen L. Boyles
Represented By: Erin Gaines
Represented By: Jan Erik Hasselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARTHWORKS
Represented By: Kristen L. Boyles
Represented By: Erin Gaines
Represented By: Jan Erik Hasselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Represented By: Kristen L. Boyles
Represented By: Erin Gaines
Represented By: Jan Erik Hasselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL L CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL L. CONNOR
Represented By: Kimere J. Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Kimere J. Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?