MORGAN v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MORGAN
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2022cv03192
Filed: October 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 12/28/2022. (ztg)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, by December 28, 2022, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23. This action was removed on October 19, 2022, see #1 Notice of Removal, and plaintiff's counsel failed to confer with defendant for the submission of a Joint Meet and Confer Report within 30 days of the filing of defendant's #3 Answer, as was required under Local Civil Rule 16.3 and this Court's #5 Standing Order 4(a). Failure to comply with this order may result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. In light of defendant's representations that the individual lawyer who initiated this action in Superior Court is no longer affiliated with the law firm indicated in the Superior Court filings, see #6 WMATA's Rule 16.3 Report, at 1, and the fact that no counsel for plaintiff has entered an appearance since the action's removal, the Clerk of Court is directed to send notice of this order to the law firm of record in the underlying Superior Court action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 14, 2022. (lcbah1)
November 18, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Shantie Morgan. "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 11/18/2022. (zed)
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Gaffney, Donna)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 20, 2022. (lcbah1)
October 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, )
October 19, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Gaffney, Donna)
October 19, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Gaffney, Donna)
October 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022 CA 004399 V Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9610026 filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Writ of Summons, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Information Sheet, #5 Exhibit Initial Order, #6 Exhibit Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit Request for Production)(Gaffney, Donna)
October 19, 2022 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORGAN v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MORGAN
Represented By: Matthew W. Tievsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Donna Lynn Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?