KNIGHT v. BIDEN et al
Plaintiff: NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR.
Defendant: JOE BIDEN, DHS, FBI, CIA and DOJ
Case Number: 1:2023cv03493
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Nickholas Knight. Brief This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "Leave to file DENIED. Case was dismissed and closed on 12/12/2023, and is on appeal to the D.C. Circuit. The Clerk is requested to send this brief, as addressed, to the appellate court.". Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/11/2024. (zrtw)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 24-5001 for #11 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR.. (zrtw)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 24-5001 for #9 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR.. (zrtw)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re #11 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zrtw)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re #9 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zrtw)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #8 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, #7 Memorandum & Opinion by NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (zrtw) Modified on 1/9/2024 (zrtw).
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #8 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, #7 Memorandum & Opinion by NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zrtw)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified via NEF. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/12/2023. (zrtw)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 12/12/2023. (zrtw)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EXHIBIT by NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR.. (zrtw)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR (zdp)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR. (zdp)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Entered in Error. . . (zdp) Modified on 11/22/2023 (zdp).
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR. (zdp)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Notice and Consent)(zdp)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/20/2023. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNIGHT v. BIDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICKHOLAS KNIGHT, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE BIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?