UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Bright House Networks, LLC.
Plaintiff: EMI Mills Music, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Corp., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Arista Music, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Universal Music Publishing AB, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Cotillion Music, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., WB Music Corp., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, Arista Records LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner Bros. Records Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, LaFace Records LLC, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Stone Agate Music, EMI April Music Inc., WEA International Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Rightson Music Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Nonesuch Records Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., W.C.M. Music Corp., W Chappell Music Corp. doing business as WC Music Corp. formerly known as WB Music Corp., Warner, Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., The Century Family, Inc. and Famous Music LLC
Defendant: Bright House Networks, LLC.
Respondent: Advance Publications, Inc., Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP and Jerry Birenz
3Rd Party Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc., Ronald Hughes, Robert Kuszmar, Michael Tomasullo and Audible Magic
Interested Party: MarkMonitor, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Judge S. James Otero and Raymond Zink
Counter Defendant: W Chappell Music Corp.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00710
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN LIMITED PART #640 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting In Part Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Harold Furchtgott-Roth. Plaintiffs are correct that the disputed calculation of [value per subscriber, based on Charter purchase, redacted] v. [value redacted] may be a matter of weight rather than admissibility if the proper foundation for the opinion for the greater amount can be laid. Thus, Dr. Furchtgott-Roth will be permitted to attempt to lay a foundation for a valuation of [value, based on Charter purchase, redacted] per customer as well as the alternative valuation of [value redacted] per customer. Defendant's right to challenge the assertion is preserved. The Court's order limiting the application of the resulting calculation at most to the alleged "repeat infringers"--those who allegedly received three RIAA notices about which Bright House was allegedly informed--remains unchanged. Defendant's embedded motion for fees and costs is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/1/2022. (MTP)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER DENYING #576 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/1/2022. (MTP)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER DENYING #589 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/1/2022. (MTP)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #645 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/1/2022. (MTP)
July 1, 2022 Filing 646 RESPONSE in Opposition re #640 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order granting in part Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Harold Furchtgott-Roth filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 29, 2022 Filing 645 Joint MOTION to Amend the Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gould, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2022 Filing 644 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: David Collier. (DJC)
June 28, 2022 Filing 643 TRANSCRIPT of evidentiary motion hearing - DAY 3 - held on June 1, 2022 before District Judge Mary S. Scriven. Court Reporter David J. Collier, Telephone number (813) 301-5575. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/19/2022 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2022 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2022. (DJC)
June 28, 2022 Filing 642 TRANSCRIPT of evidentiary motion hearing - DAY 2 - held on May 26, 2022 before District Judge Mary S. Scriven. Court Reporter David J. Collier, Telephone number (813) 301-5575. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/19/2022 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2022 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2022. (DJC) (LD).
June 28, 2022 Filing 641 TRANSCRIPT of evidentiary motion hearing held on May 25, 2022 before District Judge Mary S. Scriven. Court Reporter David J. Collier, Telephone number (813) 301-5575. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/19/2022 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2022 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2022. (DJC)
June 17, 2022 Filing 640 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order granting in part Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Harold Furchtgott-Roth by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER GRANTING #637 Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. All other directives from the Third Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order remain the same. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/10/2022. (MTP)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER DENYING #483 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Duncan Hall, Timothy Frendberg, and Andrew Schapiro; DENYING #519 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of the Opposition Declarations of Duncan Hall, Timothy Frendberg, and Andrew Schapiro; DENYING IN LARGE PART, GRANTING IN LIMITED PART #590 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Aram Sinnreich; GRANTING #578 Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Professor On Amir; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #579 Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross; DENYING #585 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Sandeep Chatterjee; DENYING #580 Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Kristofer Buchan; DENYING #588 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude or Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Karl N. Snow; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #586 Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Geluso and the "Listeners"; DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART #582 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kevin Almeroth; GRANTING IN PART #583 Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Harold Furchtgott-Roth. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/8/2022. (MTP)
June 6, 2022 Filing 637 Joint MOTION to Amend the Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sahni, Neema)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER granting #633 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rebecca Eve Weissman terminated; granting #634 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stacey K. Grigsby terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/2/2022. (ABC)
June 1, 2022 Filing 635 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Mary S. Scriven: EVIDENTIARY MOTION HEARING held on 6/1/2022 re: #581 MOTION to Strike Certain Expert Testimony of George Strong - Public Version; #577 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation (Public Version); #595 MOTION for Sanctions and Curative Measures for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence (Public Version); #591 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) (Public Version). Court Reporter: David Collier (KAC)
June 1, 2022 Filing 634 Unopposed MOTION for Stacey K. Grigsby to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Grigsby, Stacey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
June 1, 2022 Filing 633 Unopposed MOTION for Rebecca Weissman to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Weissman, Rebecca) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 27, 2022 Remark: Audio recordings received (Dkt. 631); filed in Court file. (LD)
May 27, 2022 Filing 632 NOTICE of HEARING re: #581 MOTION to Strike Certain Expert Testimony of George Strong - Public Version, #577 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation (Public Version), #591 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) (Public Version), #595 MOTION for Sanctions and Curative Measures for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence (Public Version). Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2022 at 1:00 PM via Zoom videoconference before Judge Mary S. Scriven. Zoom details will be provided by separate notice. Four (4) hours have been reserved for this hearing. (KAC)
May 27, 2022 Filing 631 NOTICE by UMG Recordings, Inc. of Filing Audio Recordings (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Banker, David)
May 26, 2022 Filing 630 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Mary S. Scriven: EVIDENTIARY MOTION HEARING held on 5/26/2022 re: #582 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kevin Almeroth (Public Version) ; #586 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Geluso and the "Listeners" (Public Version) ; #588 MOTION to Strike or Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Karl N. Snow (Public Version) ; #585 MOTION to Strike Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Sandeep Chatterjee (Public Version) ; #580 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Kristofer Buchan (Public Version) ; #583 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Harold Furchtgott-Roth (Public Version). Court Reporter: David Collier (KAC) Modified on 5/27/2022 to specify the hearing was evidentiary (KAC).
May 25, 2022 Filing 629 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Mary S. Scriven: EVIDENTIARY MOTION HEARING held on 5/25/2022 re: #483 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Duncan Hall, Timothy Frendberg, and Andrew Schapiro in support of BHN's Motion for Summary Judgment; #519 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Opposition Declarations of Duncan Hall, Timothy Frendberg, and Andrew Shapiro; #590 & 452 MOTION to Strike or Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Aram Sinnreich (Public Version); #578 & 462 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of On Amir (Public Version); #579 & 464 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross (Public Version); #585 & 455 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Sandeep Chatterjee. Court Reporter: David Collier (KAC) Modified docket text on 5/26/2022 to include only motions that were heard on 5/25/2022 (KAC).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER granting 627 Plaintiffs' Oral Motion to Allow Expert On Amir to Bring Electronic Equipment into Courthouse on May 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/25/2022. (KAC)
May 25, 2022 Filing 627 ORAL MOTION to Allow Expert On Amir to Bring Electronic Equipment into Courthouse on May 25, 2022 by All Plaintiffs. (KAC)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #624 Plaintiffs' construed motion requesting the Court's permission to allow Mr. Lai-Tremewan to testify via videoconference at the 575 Hearing. Zoom details have already been provided by separate notice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/24/2022. (MTP)
May 23, 2022 Filing 625 NOTICE of Appearance by Chantel Christine Wonder on behalf of MarkMonitor, Inc. (Wonder, Chantel)
May 23, 2022 Filing 624 NOTICE by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC re Availability of Plaintiffs' Expert Yi-Wen Lai-Tremewan for the May 25-26 In-Person Daubert Hearing (Sahni, Neema)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ENDORESED ORDER GRANTING #619 Non-Party, Mark Monitor's Motion for Leave to Appear Virtually/Telephonically at the Hearing Scheduled for May 25, 2022, and May 26, 2022. Counsel, Andrew Castricone, for MarkMonitor may appear telephonically. He is directed to call the reserved conference toll-free number that may be obtained by calling chambers at 813-301-5710. MarkMonitor is DIRECTED to have local counsel, Racquel A. White, present in-person at the Hearing or to secure local counsel in Tampa to attend the Hearing on behalf of MarkMonitor. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/23/2022. (MTP)
May 23, 2022 Filing 622 NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC. Regarding Witness Unavailability (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 20, 2022 Filing 621 NOTICE by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC Notice Regarding One Expert Witness at the May 25-26 Daubert Hearing (Gould, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER GRANTING #615 Defendant Bright House Network LLC's Unopposed Motion for Order Allowing Electronic Equipment into Courthouse; GRANTING #616 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Audio Recordings That Cannot Be Filed Electronically Via the CM/ECF System on a Hard Drive to the Clerk's Office; GRANTING #618 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Allowing Electronic Equipment into Courthouse. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/20/2022. (MTP)
May 20, 2022 Filing 619 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically LEAVE TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY/TELEPHONICALLY by MarkMonitor, Inc.. (White, Racquel)
May 19, 2022 Filing 618 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically Laptops, iPhone, monitor, iWatch, video splitter device, HDMI cable, PowerPoint remote, power cords, connecting cords, extension cord, power strip, and table for the May 25-26, 2022 Hearing by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2022 Filing 617 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #472 Response in Opposition to Motion, #515 Notice (Other) re BHN Rule 37(e) Motion and BHN Rule 37(c) Motion by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2022 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19588648 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Keith Howell. (Hull, Bryan)
May 19, 2022 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19588528 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Kellyn Goler. (Hull, Bryan)
May 19, 2022 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19588677 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Rebecca Weissman. (Hull, Bryan)
May 18, 2022 Filing 616 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File Audio Recordings on a Hard Drive by All Plaintiffs. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
May 18, 2022 Filing 615 MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically Laptops, iPhones, Apple Watch, monitor, Video Splitter, Powerpoint remote, HDMI cable, power cords, extension cords, and connecting cords for the May 25-26, 2022 Hearing by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting #572 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/17/2022. (ABC)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting #570 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #573 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #574 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/17/2022. (ABC)
May 17, 2022 Filing 612 REPLY to Response to Motion re #589 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 611 RESPONSE in Opposition re #595 MOTION for Sanctions and Curative Measures for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Declaration of S. Marks, #14 Declaration of A. McMullan, #15 Declaration of W. Leak, #16 Declaration of B. Cohen, #17 Declaration of S. Bahun)(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 610 RESPONSE in Opposition re #591 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 609 REPLY to Response to Motion re #576 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Frendberg Decl, #2 Affidavit Schapiro Decl., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Affidavit Snow Decl., #5 Affidavit Chatterjee Decl., #6 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 608 RESPONSE in Opposition re #587 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Terrence P. McGarty (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 607 RESPONSE in Opposition re #579 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 606 RESPONSE in Opposition re #580 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Kristofer Buchan (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corey Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 605 RESPONSE in Opposition re #578 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of On Amir (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Kaplan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 604 RESPONSE in Opposition re #577 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation (Public Version) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Moore Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Affidavit Harrison Decl.)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 603 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #576 Motion for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Gould Declaration Exhibit 1, #3 Gould Declaration Exhibit 2, #4 Gould Declaration Exhibit 3, #5 Gould Declaration Exhibit 4, #6 Gould Declaration Exhibit 5, #7 Gould Declaration Exhibit 6, #8 Gould Declaration Exhibit 7, #9 Gould Declaration Exhibit 8, #10 Gould Declaration Exhibit 9, #11 Gould Declaration Exhibit 10, #12 Gould Declaration Exhibit 11, #13 Gould Declaration Exhibit 12, #14 Gould Declaration Exhibit 13, #15 Gould Declaration Exhibit 14, #16 Gould Declaration Exhibit 15, #17 Gould Declaration Exhibit 16, #18 Gould Declaration Exhibit 17, #19 Gould Declaration Exhibit 18, #20 Gould Declaration Exhibit 19, #21 Gould Declaration Exhibit 20, #22 Gould Declaration Exhibit 21, #23 Gould Declaration Exhibit 22, #24 Gould Declaration Exhibit 23, #25 Gould Declaration Exhibit 24, #26 Gould Declaration Exhibit 25, #27 Gould Declaration Exhibit 26, #28 Gould Declaration Exhibit 27, #29 Declaration of Harold Furchtgott-Roth, #30 Furchtgott-Roth Declaration Exhibit 1, #31 Declaration of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross, #32 Frederiksen-Cross Declaration Exhibit A, #33 Frederiksen-Cross Declaration Exhibit B)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 602 RESPONSE in Opposition re #589 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Frendberg Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Affidavit Harrison Decl., #7 Affidavit Schapiro Decl., #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F, #14 Exhibit G, #15 Exhibit H, #16 Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit J, #18 Exhibit K, #19 Exhibit L, #20 Exhibit M, #21 Exhibit N, #22 Exhibit O, #23 Exhibit P, #24 Exhibit Q-1, #25 Exhibit Q-2, #26 Exhibit Q-3, #27 Exhibit Q-4, #28 Exhibit Q-5, #29 Exhibit R, #30 Exhibit S, #31 Affidavit Snow Decl., #32 Exhibit A, #33 Exhibit B, #34 Affidavit Hall Aff., #35 Affidavit Hall Aff.)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 601 RESPONSE in Opposition re #581 MOTION to Strike Certain Expert Testimony of George Strong - Public Version filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Scher Decl, #2 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 600 RESPONSE in Opposition re #588 MOTION to Strike or Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Karl N. Snow (Public Version) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Young Decl, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 599 RESPONSE in Opposition re #590 MOTION to Strike or Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Aram Sinnreich (Public Version) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 598 RESPONSE in Opposition re #584 MOTION to Strike Opinions and Testimony of Wayne C. Coleman - Public Version filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Doak Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 597 RESPONSE in Opposition re #585 MOTION to Strike Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Sandeep Chatterjee (Public Version) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Trombetta Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 596 RESPONSE in Opposition re #582 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kevin Almeroth (Public Version) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 595 MOTION for Sanctions and Curative Measures for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence (Public Version) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Schapiro Decl., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 594 RESPONSE in Opposition re #583 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Harold Furchtgott-Roth (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Grigsby, Stacey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 593 RESPONSE in Opposition re #586 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Geluso and the "Listeners" (Public Version) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Geluso, #2 Declaration of Phil Hill, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Sperling, Jonathan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 592 STIPULATION of Agreed Material Facts for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 591 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) (Public Version) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 590 MOTION to Strike or Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Aram Sinnreich (Public Version) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Oppenheim, #2 Oppenheim Declaration Exhibit 1, #3 Oppenheim Declaration Exhibit 2, #4 Oppenheim Declaration Exhibit 3, #5 Oppenheim Declaration Exhibit 4, #6 Oppenheim Declaration Exhibit 5, #7 Oppenheim Declaration Exhibit 6, #8 Oppenheim Declaration Exhibit 7)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 589 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Kaplan, #2 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 1, #3 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 2, #4 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 3, #5 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 4, #6 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 5, #7 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 6, #8 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 7, #9 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 8, #10 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 9, #11 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 10, #12 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 11, #13 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 12, #14 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 13, #15 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 14, #16 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 15, #17 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 16, #18 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 17, #19 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 18, #20 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 19, #21 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 20, #22 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 21, #23 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 22, #24 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 23, #25 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 24, #26 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 25, #27 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 26, #28 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 27, #29 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 28, #30 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 29, #31 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 30, #32 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 31, #33 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 32, #34 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 33, #35 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 34, #36 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 35, #37 Kaplan Declaration Exhibit 36, #38 Declaration of Alasdair McMullan, #39 Select Appendices and Exhibits to McMullan Declaration, #40 McMullan Declaration Exhibit UMG-54, #41 Declaration of Andrew Cass, #42 Cass Declaration Exhibit A, #43 Cass Declaration Exhibit B, #44 Declaration of Anish Patel, #45 Select Appendices and Exhibits to Patel Declaration, #46 Patel Declaration Exhibit SMP-128, #47 Declaration of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross, #48 Frederiksen-Cross Declaration Exhibit 1, #49 Declaration of Charles Burse, #50 Burst Declaration Exhibit A, #51 Burst Declaration Exhibit B, #52 Declaration of David Kokakis, #53 Select Appendices and Exhibits to Kokakis Declaration, #54 Kokakis Declaration Exhibit UMPG-117, #55 Declaration of Eleni Maltas, #56 Maltas Declaration Exhibit A, #57 Maltas Declaration Exhibit B, #58 Declaration of Epiq eDiscovery Solutions, Inc., #59 Epiq Declaration Exhibit 1, #60 Epiq Declaration Exhibit 2, #61 Declaration of Jacob Cheriff, #62 Cheriff Declaration Exhibit A, #63 Cheriff Declaration Exhibit B, #64 Declaration of Jeremy Blietz, #65 Select Appendices and Exhibits to Blietz Declaration, #66 Blietz Declaration Exhibit WCP-111, #67 Declaration of Katie Gilchrest, #68 Gilchrest Declaration Exhibit A, #69 Gilchrest Declaration Exhibit B, #70 Declaration of Kris Buchan, #71 Buchan Declaration Exhibit 1, #72 Buchan Declaration Exhibit 2A, #73 Buchan Declaration Exhibit 2B, #74 Buchan Declaration Exhibit 3, #75 Declaration of Paul Geluso, #76 Geluso Declaration A, #77 Geluso Declaration B, #78 Declaration of Rebekah Wineman, #79 Wineman Declaration Exhibit A, #80 Wineman Declaration Exhibit B, #81 Declaration of Sam Bahun, #82 Declaration of Tracie Parry, #83 Select Appendices and Exhibits to Parry Declaration, #84 Parry Declaration Exhibit WMG-45, #85 Declaration of Wade Leak, #86 Select Appendices and Exhibits to Leak Declaration, #87 Leak Declaration Exhibit SME-50, #88 Declaration of Yi-Wen Lai-Tremewan, #89 Lai-Tremewan Declaration Exhibit A, #90 Lai-Tremewan Declaration Exhibit B)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 588 MOTION to Strike or Limit Expert Testimony of Dr. Karl N. Snow (Public Version) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 587 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Terrence P. McGarty (Public Version) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grace Chang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 586 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Geluso and the "Listeners" (Public Version) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Scher, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 585 MOTION to Strike Testimony and Opinions of Dr. Sandeep Chatterjee (Public Version) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 584 MOTION to Strike Opinions and Testimony of Wayne C. Coleman - Public Version by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan M. Sperling, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sperling, Jonathan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 583 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Harold Furchtgott-Roth (Public Version) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Anten, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 582 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kevin Almeroth (Public Version) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 581 MOTION to Strike Certain Expert Testimony of George Strong - Public Version by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Grigsby, Stacey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 580 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Kristofer Buchan (Public Version) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Rose, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 579 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross (Public Version) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Hamstra, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 578 MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Testimony of On Amir (Public Version) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katy Akopjan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 577 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation (Public Version) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corey Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Gould, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2022 Filing 576 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Frendberg, #2 Frendberg Ex. A, #3 Frendberg Ex. B, #4 Frendberg Ex. C, #5 Frendberg Ex. D, #6 Declaration of Cody Harrison, #7 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #8 Schapiro Ex. A, #9 Schapiro Ex. B, #10 Schapiro Ex. C, #11 Schapiro Ex. D, #12 Schapiro Ex. E, #13 Schapiro Ex. F, #14 Schapiro Ex. G, #15 Schapiro Ex. H, #16 Schapiro Ex. I, #17 Schapiro Ex. J, #18 Schapiro Ex. K, #19 Schapiro Ex. L, #20 Schapiro Ex. M, #21 Schapiro Ex. N, #22 Schapiro Ex. O, #23 Schapiro Ex. P, #24 Schapiro Ex. Q, #25 Schapiro Ex. R, #26 Schapiro Ex. S, #27 Schapiro Ex. T, #28 Schapiro Ex. U, #29 Declaration of Karl N. Snow, #30 Snow Ex. A, #31 Declaration of George G. Strong, Jr., #32 Strong Ex. A, #33 Affidavit of Duncan Hall, #34 Affidavit of Duncan Hall)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2022 Filing 575 Motion Hearing to take place on May 25-26, 2022 beginning at 9:00 AM on both days in Tampa Courtroom 7A before Judge Mary S. Scriven. Eight (8) hours have been reserved on each day. The Court GRANTS leave for Dr. Aram Sinnreich and Dr. Terrence McGarty to appear via Zoom videoconference. Zoom details will be provided by separate notice. All other parties are to appear in person. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/17/2022. (MTP)
May 17, 2022 Filing 574 Unopposed MOTION for Sara Dennis to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19578321 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 17, 2022 Filing 573 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew Guerra to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19578283 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 16, 2022 Filing 572 Unopposed MOTION for Sean R. Anderson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19572113 for $150 by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 13, 2022 Filing 571 NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC. Joint Notice Regarding May 25-26, 2022 Hearing (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 13, 2022 Filing 570 Unopposed MOTION for Anders Linderot to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19569157 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER granting #568 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/13/2022. (ABC)
May 12, 2022 Filing 568 Unopposed MOTION for Kellyn Goler, Keith Howell, and Rebecca Weissman to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 11, 2022 Filing 567 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Mary S. Scriven: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 5/11/2022. Court Reporter: Tracey Aurelio (MEJ)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER with rulings of the Court from the March 15, 2022, hearing on confidentiality issues. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/10/2022. (MTP)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #564 Joint Time-Sensitive Motion for 20-minute telephonic or video status conference regarding the May 25-26, 2022, Hearing and Pre-trial Deadlines. A telephonic status conference will take place on May 11th, 2022, at 3:00PM Eastern Standard Time. Dial-in details for the telephonic conference will be provided to Counsel via separate notice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/6/2022. (MTP)
May 4, 2022 Filing 564 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, Specifically Time Sensitive Motion for Telephonic or Video Status Conference re: May 25-26 Hearing and Pre-Trial Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 5/5/2022 (LD).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER granting #559 Motion to Redact Transcript 551 Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/22/2022. (ABC)
April 18, 2022 Filing 562 STIPULATION and Joint Proposed Order re March 15, 2022 Hearing by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
April 18, 2022 Filing 561 STIPULATION Regarding Registration and Ownership of Certain Works in Suit by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sahni, Neema)
April 18, 2022 Filing 560 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #472 Response in Opposition to Motion, #515 Notice (Other) re BHN Rule 37(e) Motion and BHN Rule 37(c) Motion by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oppenheim, Matthew)
April 12, 2022 Filing 559 Unopposed MOTION to Redact Transcript 551 Transcript by All Plaintiffs. (Oppenheim, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
April 5, 2022 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Grace E. Chang, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA066193.) Related document: #547 Unopposed MOTION for Grace E. Chang to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
March 31, 2022 Filing 558 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #472 Response in Opposition to Motion, #515 Notice (Other) re BHN Rule 37(e) Motion, BHN Rule 37(c) Motion, and Plaintiffs' Partial Summary Judgment and certain Daubert Motions by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Oppenheim, Matthew)
March 29, 2022 Filing 557 NOTICE of intent to request redaction by Matthew J. Oppenheim re 551 Transcript (Oppenheim, Matthew)
March 29, 2022 Filing 556 NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC. Joint Notice Regarding Special Master's Orders and Transcripts (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER DIRECTING the Parties to file the Proposed Order on or before APRIL 18, 2022, as discussed at the March 15, 2022 Hearing on Confidentiality. The CLERK is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case UNTIL THE COURT DIRECTS ITS REOPENING. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/24/2022. (MTP)
March 22, 2022 Filing 552 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: David Collier. (DJC)
March 16, 2022 Filing 549 NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC. Joint Notice Regarding Availability of Expert Witnesses (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 15, 2022 Filing 550 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Mary S. Scriven: HEARING on Confidentiality Issues held on 3/15/2022. Court Reporter: David Collier (CRB)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER granting #547 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/15/2022. (ABC)
March 15, 2022 Filing 547 Unopposed MOTION for Grace E. Chang to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 14, 2022 Filing 546 JOINDER in motion by MarkMonitor, Inc. re #526 Joint MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing (Pursuant to Dkt. 437) filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rightson Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Stone Agate Music, EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Chappell & Co. Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Rhino Entertainment Company, EMI U Catalog Inc., Warner Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, WB Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, WEA International Inc., Famous Music LLC, Arista Records LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Arista Music, Universal Music Corp., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Music Corporation of America, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI April Music Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Mills Music, Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, The Century Family, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music . (White, Racquel)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART as MOOT #541 the Parties' Joint Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/14/2022. (MTP)
March 14, 2022 Filing 544 RESPONSE in Opposition re #519 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Summary Judgment Opposition Declarations of Duncan Hall, Timothy Frendberg, and Andrew Schapiro filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER granting #536 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gabriel M, Ramsey; granting #537 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anna Z. Saber. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/14/2022. (Wilson, Thomas)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #540 Non-party, Audible Magic Corporation's Unopposed Time Sensitive Motion for Leave to Appear Virtually/Telephonically at the Hearing Scheduled for March 15, 2022, at 2:00PM. Counsel, Gabriel M. Ramsey and Anna Z. Saber, for Audible Magic Corporation may appear telephonically. As Audible Magic Corporation does not have any pending motions, this appearance is for the purpose of observing only unless an unexpected issue arises as to Audible Magic Corporation. Counsel are directed to call the reserved conference toll-free number that may be obtained by calling chambers at 813-301-5710. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/14/2022. (MTP)
March 11, 2022 Filing 541 Joint MOTION to Allow Electronic Equipment, specifically laptops and iPhones by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 11, 2022 Filing 540 Third Party MOTION for Gabriel M. Ramsey to appear telephonically by Audible Magic. (Layman, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 11, 2022 Filing 539 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Audible Magic. (Layman, Shawn)
March 11, 2022 Filing 538 MEMORANDUM in support re #526 Motion to Seal filed by Audible Magic. (Layman, Shawn)
March 11, 2022 Filing 537 MOTION for Anna Z. Saber to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19334640 for $150 by Audible Magic. (Layman, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 11, 2022 Filing 536 MOTION for Gabriel M. Ramsey to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19334631 for $150 by Audible Magic. (Layman, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 11, 2022 Filing 535 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Shawn Layman on behalf of Audible Magic. Lead Counsel: Gabriel M. Ramsey. (Layman, Shawn)
March 11, 2022 Filing 534 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Layman on behalf of Audible Magic (Layman, Shawn)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #532 Non-party, MarkMonitor's Unopposed Time Sensitive Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Hearing Scheduled for March 15, 2022. Counsel, Andrew Castricone, for MarkMonitor may appear telephonically. He is directed to call the reserved conference toll-free number that may be obtained by calling chambers at 813-301-5710. MarkMonitor is DIRECTED to have local counsel, Racquel A. White, present in-person at the Hearing or to secure local counsel in Tampa to attend the Hearing on behalf of MarkMonitor. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/11/2022. (MTP)
March 10, 2022 Filing 532 Emergency MOTION for Andrew Castricone to appear telephonically at March 15, 2022 Conference by MarkMonitor, Inc.. (White, Racquel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 8, 2022 Filing 529 NOTICE to counsel to John J. Rosenthal, J. Hardy Ehlers, Katy Okopjan, Joseph E. Reed of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER regarding scheduling of Preliminary Pre-trial Conference #477. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/8/2022. (MTP)
March 7, 2022 Filing 527 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #485 Motion for Sanctions filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Declaration of Jason D. Moore, #2 REDACTED Moore Exhibit 1, #3 REDACTED Moore Exhibit 2, #4 REDACTED Moore Exhibit 3, #5 REDACTED Moore Exhibit 4, #6 REDACTED Moore Exhibit 5, #7 REDACTED Moore Exhibit 6, #8 Moore Exhibit 7, #9 Moore Exhibit 8, #10 REDACTED Moore Exhibit 9, #11 REDACTED Moore Exhibit 10, #12 REDACTED Declaration of Dan Vasey, #13 REDACTED Vasey Exhibit 1, #14 REDACTED Vasey Exhibit 2, #15 REDACTED Vasey Exhibit 3, #16 REDACTED Vasey Exhibit 4, #17 REDACTED Vasey Exhibit 5, #18 REDACTED Declaration of Cody Harrison)(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
March 7, 2022 Filing 526 Joint MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing (Pursuant to Dkt. 437) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48)(Sahni, Neema)
March 4, 2022 Filing 525 Email received by Chambers on February 18, 2022, from Counsel regarding the Parties' availability for the Motion Hearing on Confidentiality Issues and the Parties' request for clarification of directives given at the February 10, 2022 Hearing #481. (MTP)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING #523 Bright House's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Discovery Sanctions Against Plaintiffs' Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c). The Court has been fully brief on this matter. Should it require additional briefing, it will notify the Parties. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/3/2022. (MTP)
March 2, 2022 Filing 523 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document: Reply Brief in support of its Motion for Discovery Sanctions against Plaintiffs by Bright House Networks, LLC.(Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 3/3/2022 (LD).
February 28, 2022 Filing 520 RESPONSE in Opposition re #483 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Duncan Hall, Timothy Frendberg, and Andrew Schapiro in support of BHN's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica Rose, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 28, 2022 Filing 519 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Summary Judgment Opposition Declarations of Duncan Hall, Timothy Frendberg, and Andrew Schapiro by All Plaintiffs. (Sahni, Neema)
February 28, 2022 Filing 518 NOTICE by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC of Filing Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Sahni, Neema)
February 28, 2022 Filing 517 NOTICE of Filing Reply in support of Summary Judgment by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 3/3/2022 (LD).
February 28, 2022 Filing 516 NOTICE of hearing: Motion Hearing on Confidentiality Issues set for 3/15/2022 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 7 A before Judge Mary S. Scriven. Two (2) hours have been reserved for this hearing. (CRB)
February 28, 2022 Filing 515 NOTICE by Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC Notice of Filing and Related Matters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gould, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING #504 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Curative Measures and Sanctions for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence #447. Should the Court require additional briefing, it will notify the Parties. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/24/2022. (MTP)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING #509 Plaintiffs' Time-sensitive Motion for Limited Discovery and to Modify Briefing Schedules for Bright House's Sanctions Motions against Plaintiffs. As instructed in the Court's previous order granting an extension of time 479, Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendant's Rule 37(c) Sanctions Motion on or before February 25, 2022. If Plaintiffs' response suggests additional discovery is necessary, then the Court will notify the Parties. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/23/2022. (MTP)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #508 Unopposed Time-sensitive Motion for 7-Day Extension of Bright House Networks, LLC's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Spoliation Motion. Defendant is DIRECTED to file and the Clerk is directed to accept UNDER SEAL an unredacted version of Defendant's Response by March 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/23/2022. (MTP)
February 23, 2022 Filing 509 MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedules for Bright House's Sanctions Motions Against Plaintiffs and for Limited Discovery and Notice of Supplemental Facts (Time-Sensitive) by All Plaintiffs. (Gould, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2022 Filing 508 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #505 Unopposed Time-sensitive Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit for Bright House Networks, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall have twelve (12) pages, exclusive of the cover page, table of contents, and table of authorities, for its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/18/2022. (MTP)
February 17, 2022 Filing 505 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages for Bright House's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 16, 2022 Filing 504 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief in support of its Motion for Curative Measures and Sanctions by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ENDORSED ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiffs to file and the Clerk to accept UNDER SEAL an unredacted version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Spoliation Sanctions #485 and all attached exhibits. Nothing in this Order shall be construed to reflect the Court's intent to maintain this temporary seal absent sufficient justification. The matter of the continued protection of this document's contents will be resolved separately by the Court. No further motion needs to be filed unless advised by the Court. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/16/2022. (MTP)
February 16, 2022 Filing 502 REQUEST for oral argument re #485 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Spoliation Sanctions by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2022 Filing 485 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Spoliation Sanctions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit)(Gould, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2022 Filing 484 NOTICE by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC of Filing Summary Judgment and Daubert Opposition Briefs, and Parties' Stipulated Facts (Sahni, Neema)
February 14, 2022 Filing 483 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Declarations of Duncan Hall, Timothy Frendberg, and Andrew Schapiro in support of BHN's Motion for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1)(Sahni, Neema)
February 14, 2022 Filing 482 NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC. Notice of Filing Oppositions regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 14, 2022 Filing 481 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Hearing held on February 10, 2022 before Judge Mary S. Scriven. Court Reporter/Transcriber David J. Collier. (MTP)
February 11, 2022 Filing 480 MOTION to Seal Confidential Information Contained in Bright House's Motion for Sanctions (ECF 447) and Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition (ECF 472) pursuant to ECF 460 by All Plaintiffs. (Gould, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2022 Filing 513 Minute Entry. Telephonic Proceedings held before Judge Mary S. Scriven: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 2/10/2022. Court Reporter: David Collier (CRB)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #478 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A ONE-WEEK EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S RULE 37(C) SANCTIONS MOTION. The response shall be filed on or before February 25, 2022. The response shall be filed UNREDACTED and UNDER SEAL for the time being. The Court will address the Parties' continued efforts to preclude the public from viewing documents in this public business dispute by separate Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/10/2022. (Scriven, Mary)
February 9, 2022 Filing 478 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #471 MOTION for Sanctions (Time-Sensitive) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gould, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2022 Filing 477 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING #420 MOTION to Strike "Rebuttal Expert Report of Harold Furchtgott-Roth, Ph.D." and an "Expert Report of Professor On Amir" and any "sur-rebuttal" opinions contained therein. No rebuttal deadline was contained in the Court's CMSO as the Rules plainly provide for that deadline if needed. Additionally, no prejudice in providing somewhat delayed responses is demonstrated on this record. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/7/2022. (Scriven, Mary)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #470 Plaintiffs' Time-sensitive Motion for Extension of Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs shall have twenty-five (25) pages, exclusive of cover pages, table of contents, and table of authorities, for their opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/7/2022. (MTP)
February 4, 2022 Filing 474 REQUEST for oral argument re #471 MOTION for Sanctions by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 4, 2022 Filing 473 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibits Z and AA to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 4, 2022 Filing 472 RESPONSE in Opposition re #447 MOTION for Sanctions for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Declaration of S. Marks, #14 Declaration of A. McMullan, #15 Declaration of W. Leak, #16 Declaration of B. Cohen, #17 Declaration of S. Bahun)(Gould, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2022 Filing 471 MOTION for Sanctions by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 4, 2022 Filing 470 TIME-SENSITIVE MOTION to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/4/2022 (LD).
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER granting #468 defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael L. Brody terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/30/2022. (DMS)
January 28, 2022 Filing 468 Unopposed MOTION for Michael L. Brody to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Golinveaux, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified text on 2/1/2022 (JNB).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #458 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for One-Week Extension of Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to Bright House's Sanctions Motion and to Consolidate Sealing Motions. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including February 4, 2022 to respond to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including February 11, 2022 to file a consolidated motion to seal confidential information contained in the Motion for Sanctions and the Response. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/21/2022. (MWC)
January 20, 2022 Filing 458 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Sanctions Motion (Time-Sensitive) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gould, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #448 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Defendant is directed to file and the Clerk is directed to accept UNDER SEAL the exhibits identified in Defendant's Motion (Dkt. 448). Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/18/2022. (MWC)
January 14, 2022 Filing 449 REQUEST for oral argument re #447 MOTION for Sanctions for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 448 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Bright House's Motion for Sanctions and Exhibits thereto by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 447 MOTION for Sanctions for Plaintiffs' Spoliation of Evidence by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y)(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 446 REQUEST for oral argument on Bright House's Motion for Summary Judgment by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 445 REQUEST for oral argument Request for Evidentiary Hearing on Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Terrence McGarty by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 444 REQUEST for oral argument Request for Evidentiary Hearing on Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Geluso and the Listeners by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 443 REQUEST for oral argument Request for Evidentiary Hearing on Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Harold Furchtgott-Roth by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 442 REQUEST for oral argument Request for Evidentiary Hearing on Bright House's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Barbara Frederiksen-Cross by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 441 NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC. Notice of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 440 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding Public Entries from U.S. Copyright Office's Copyright Catalog by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Sahni, Neema)
January 14, 2022 Filing 439 REQUEST for oral argument on Sealed Motions filed on January 14, 2022 by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sahni, Neema)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting #434 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joshua B. Picker terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/12/2022. (DMS)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AS STATED HEREIN #435 the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Motions to Seal. On the deadlines previously set by the Court, (Dkts. 314, 425), the Parties shall file, and the CLERK is directed to accept, UNDER SEAL unredacted versions of the summary judgment and Daubert briefs, including all exhibits thereto. On or before March 7, 2022, the Parties shall file a consolidated motion for leave to file on the public record redacted versions of the summary judgment and Daubert briefs. This motion shall explain the basis for the requested redactions and for maintaining the sealed status of any materials previously filed under seal. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/7/2022. (MWC)
January 5, 2022 Filing 435 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Motions to Seal by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
January 5, 2022 Filing 434 Unopposed MOTION for Joshua B. Picker to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Picker, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #431 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Defendant is directed to file and the Clerk is directed to accept UNDER SEAL the unredacted version of the opposition to the Motion to Strike and Exhibit A thereto. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/4/2022. (MWC)
January 3, 2022 Filing 431 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike & Exhibit A (ECF 424) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
January 3, 2022 Filing 430 REDACTION re 405 Transcript. (DJC)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #426 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; GRANTING #427 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; GRANTING #428 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Defendant is directed to file and the Clerk is directed to accept UNDER SEAL the unredacted version of Defendant's Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs are directed to file and the Clerk is directed to accept UNDER SEAL the exhibits identified in Plaintiffs' Motions (Dkts. 427, 428). Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/3/2022. (MWC)
December 28, 2021 Filing 428 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Exhibit B to Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike [ECF 424] by All Plaintiffs. (Grigsby, Stacey)
December 28, 2021 Filing 427 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Exhibits 4, 5, and 6 to Motion to Strike [ECF 420] by All Plaintiffs. (Grigsby, Stacey)
December 28, 2021 Filing 426 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Motion to Strike (ECF 420) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #423 the Parties' Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule on Daubert Motions. Each side shall have up to and including February 14, 2022 to file oppositions to Daubert motions. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/28/2021. (MWC)
December 27, 2021 Filing 424 RESPONSE in Opposition re #420 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Sur-Rebuttal Expert Reports filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stacey Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Grigsby, Stacey)
December 23, 2021 Filing 423 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Daubert Motions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gould, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Ella Hallwass, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA065505.) Related document: #404 Unopposed MOTION for Ella Hallwass to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #421 Plaintiffs' Time-Sensitive Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Voluminous Exhibits on Hard Drive. Plaintiffs may file the exhibits and appendices identified in their Motion on a hard drive delivered to the Court and served on Defendant. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/15/2021. (MWC)
December 14, 2021 Filing 421 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Leave to File Voluminous Exhibits on Hard Drive - Time Sensitive by All Plaintiffs. (Sahni, Neema)
December 14, 2021 Filing 420 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Sur-Rebuttal Expert Reports by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Schapiro, Andrew)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER granting #416 Motion to Redact Transcript 405 Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/13/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
December 13, 2021 Filing 417 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #416 MOTION to Redact Transcript 405 Transcript by Andrew H. Schapiro on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
December 8, 2021 Filing 416 MOTION to Redact Transcript 405 Transcript by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
December 6, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Dylan I. Scher, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA065407.) Related document: #413 Unopposed MOTION for Dylan I. Scher to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
December 6, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Joseph E. Reed, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA65407.) Related document: #412 Unopposed MOTION for Joseph E. Reed to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #338, [S-339] plaintiffs' Time-Sensitive Motions to Compel Production of Documents and Further Deposition Testimony to the extent that the respondents are ordered to produce within 14 days a privilege log for the documents and e-mail communications in the Peer-to-Peer file that were withheld on the basis of the attorney-client privilege or the work product doctrine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/1/2021. (DMS)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER granting #412 defendant's Motion for Joseph Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #413 defendant's Motion for Dylan I. Scher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/30/2021. (DMS)
November 30, 2021 Filing 413 Unopposed MOTION for Dylan I. Scher to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 30, 2021 Filing 412 Unopposed MOTION for Joseph E. Reed to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 24, 2021 Filing 411 NOTICE of intent to request redaction by Andrew H. Schapiro re 405 Transcript (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER granting #404 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Ella Hallwass to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/19/2021. (DMS)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting #407 Motion to extend time until December 8, 2021, to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/19/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER granting #403 Motion to File unredacted supplemental memorandum under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/19/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 407 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Extend Bright House's Deadline to Respond to Interrogatory No. 17 by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 17, 2021 Filing 406 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: David Collier. (DJC)
November 16, 2021 Filing 404 Unopposed MOTION for Ella Hallwass to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 15, 2021 Filing 403 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Unredacted Supplemental Briefing #400 by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #341 Plantiffs' Motion to Compel; denying #342 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. The defendant has two weeks to produce the requested documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/3/2021. (DMS)
November 3, 2021 Filing 401 Minute Entry. In-person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: MOTION HEARING held on 11/3/2021 re #341 MOTION to Compel responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission, and Production of Documents filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rightson Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Stone Agate Music, EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Chappell & Co. Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Rhino Entertainment Company, EMI U Catalog Inc., Warner Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, WB Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, WEA International Inc., Famous Music LLC, Arista Records LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Arista Music, Universal Music Corp., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Music Corporation of America, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI April Music Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Mills Music, Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, The Century Family, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, #342 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rightson Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Universal Music Publishing Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., Stone Agate Music, EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Chappell & Co. Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Rhino Entertainment Company, EMI U Catalog Inc., Warner Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, WB Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, WEA International Inc., Famous Music LLC, Arista Records LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Arista Music, Universal Music Corp., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Music Corporation of America, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI April Music Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Mills Music, Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, The Century Family, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music. (DIGITAL) (DMS)
November 3, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Donald Seth Fortenbery, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA065211.) Related document: #397 Unopposed MOTION for Donald Seth Fortenbery to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
November 1, 2021 Filing 400 SUPPLEMENT re #394 Order pdf by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 399 SUPPLEMENT Non-Party Respondents' Brief Regarding Privilege Log per Court Order #394 by Advance Publications, Inc., Jerry Birenz, Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP. (Golinveaux, Jennifer)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting #397 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Donald Seth Fortenberry to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/28/2021. (DMS)
October 27, 2021 Filing 397 Unopposed MOTION for Donald Seth Fortenbery to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting #395 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/22/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
October 21, 2021 Filing 395 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel #380 by Advance Publications, Inc., Jerry Birenz, Bright House Networks, LLC., Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP. (Golinveaux, Jennifer)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER directing parties to submit within 10 days supplemental legal memoranda in re 339 plaintiffs' Time Sensitive Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Further Deposition Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/20/2021. (DMS)
October 19, 2021 Filing 393 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Motion hearing previously scheduled for 10/22/2021 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Motion Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel (Docs. 341, 342) set for 11/3/2021 at 02:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (DMS)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting #386 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Continuance of October 22, 2021 Oral Argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/18/2021. (DMS)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER denying #340 Bright House Network, LLC's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/15/2021. (DMS)
October 14, 2021 Filing 389 Minute Entry. In-person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: MOTION HEARING held on 10/14/2021 re #340 MOTION to Compel Streaming Revenue Declarations filed by Bright House Networks, LLC., #338 Emergency MOTION to Compel Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Further Deposition Testimony filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rightson Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Stone Agate Music, EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Chappell & Co. Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Rhino Entertainment Company, EMI U Catalog Inc., Warner Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, WB Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, WEA International Inc., Famous Music LLC, Arista Records LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Arista Music, Universal Music Corp., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Music Corporation of America, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI April Music Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Mills Music, Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, The Century Family, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music. (DIGITAL) (DMS)
October 13, 2021 Filing 388 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** AMENDED document by Advance Publications, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Jerry Birenz, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Charter Communications, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Ronald Hughes, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Robert Kuszmar, LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., S. James Otero, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., Michael Tomasullo, UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Raymond Zink, Zomba Recording LLC. Amendment to #14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/14/2021 (TDC). Modified on 10/14/2021 (TDC).
October 13, 2021 Filing 386 Unopposed MOTION to Continue October 22, 2021 Oral Argument (ECF 370) by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan)
October 13, 2021 Sealed Document S-387. (LD)
October 12, 2021 Filing 385 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Elkin on behalf of Advance Publications, Inc., Jerry Birenz, Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP (Elkin, Michael)
October 11, 2021 Filing 384 NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC. OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENSE (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 8, 2021 Sealed Document S-383. (LD)
October 7, 2021 Filing 380 REPLY to Response to Motion re #338 Emergency MOTION to Compel Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Further Deposition Testimony filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting #373 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit C to the Jennifer Golinveaux declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/6/2021. (DMS)
October 5, 2021 Sealed Document S-381 - S-382. (LD)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER denying #372 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Submit a Reply in Further Support of their Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/5/2021. (DMS)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting #346 non-parties Advance Publications, Inc.; Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP; and Jerry Birenz's Motion for John J. Rosenthal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/4/2021. (DMS)
October 5, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney John J. Rosenthal (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA064969.) Related document: #346 Unopposed MOTION for John J. Rosenthal to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
October 5, 2021 Sealed Document S-378. (LD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 375 NOTICE by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC re #342 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents , #343 Declaration of filing Unredacted Motion, Redacted Exhibit H and Unredacted Exhibit I (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Motion, #2 Exhibit H (redacted), #3 Exhibit I (unredacted))(Sahni, Neema)
October 4, 2021 Filing 374 NOTICE by Advance Publications, Inc., Jerry Birenz, Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP re #347 Memorandum in opposition of Filing Exhibits D and E in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E)(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
October 4, 2021 Filing 373 Unopposed MOTION to Seal re Dkt. 347, 347-1 by All Plaintiffs. (Sahni, Neema)
October 1, 2021 Filing 372 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Leave to Submit a Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Dkt. 342, 343) by All Plaintiffs. (Sahni, Neema)
October 1, 2021 Filing 371 NOTICE of HEARING on Defendant's Motion to Compel (Streaming Revenue)(Doc. 340). It is SCHEDULED for an in-person hearing on 10/14/2021 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Note: The Plaintiffs' Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel (Doc. 338) is scheduled for the same time.Belated submissions are disfavored. Any materials submitted after 4:00 p.m. on the day before the hearing will be disregarded.(MEM)
October 1, 2021 Filing 370 NOTICE of HEARING on TWO MOTIONS: An in-person hearing on the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Doc. 341) and the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Doc. 342) is SCHEDULED for 10/22/2021 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Belated submissions are disfavored. Any materials submitted after 4:00 p.m. on the day before the hearing will be disregarded.(MEM)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER granting #361 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to seal the unredacted versions of: (1) Plaintiff's September 15, 2021, Motion to Compel (Doc. 341), the supporting declaration of Neema T. Sahni (Doc. 341-1), and (3) Exhibits C, D, E, G, H, I, J, K, N, P, R-Z, AA, CC, and EE thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/30/2021. (DMS) Modified on 10/1/2021 (DMS).
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting #360 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The defendant may file under seal the confidential portions of (1) its memorandum in opposition to the plaintiffs' September 15, 2021, Motion to Compel, (2) the supporting declaration of Dane Knudsen, and (3) Exhibits A, C and D thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/30/2021. (DMS)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #358 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. The plaintiffs may file under seal Exhibit A to the Kaplan declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/30/2021. (DMS)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting #356 Non-Party Robert Kuszmar's Unopposed Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to strike and remove from the public docket Doc. 343-8. The plaintiffs may re-file this document with the private address redacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/30/2021. (DMS)
October 1, 2021 Filing 365 NOTICE of HEARING: Oral argument on the Time Sensitive Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Further Deposition Testimony (Doc. 338) is SCHEDULED for an in-person hearing on 10/14/2021 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Belated submissions are disfavored. Any materials submitted after 4:00 p.m. on the day before the hearing will be disregarded.(MEM)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #354 Joint Motion Related to Expert Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/30/2021. (DMS)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting #352 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Submit a Reply in Further Support of Their Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel Documents and Further Deposition Testimony (Doc. 338). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/30/2021. (DMS)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting #348 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC and Non-Parties Advance Publications, Inc., Sabin, Gould and Bermant LLP, and Jerry Birenz's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. The movants may file under seal Exhibits A and B to the Golinveaux declaration (Dkt. Entries 338-2, 338-3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/30/2021. (DMS)
September 29, 2021 Filing 361 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibits C, D, E, G, H, I, J, K, N, P, R-Z, AA, CC, EE Thereto (ECF 341) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 29, 2021 Filing 360 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Response to Motion to Compel, Exhibits A, C, and D thereto, and Declaration of Dane Knudsen (ECF 359) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 29, 2021 Filing 359 RESPONSE in Opposition re #341 MOTION to Compel responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission, and Production of Documents filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration of Dane Knudsen)(Schapiro, Andrew)
September 29, 2021 Filing 358 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Gould, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2021 Filing 357 RESPONSE in Opposition re #340 MOTION to Compel Streaming Revenue Declarations filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Kaplan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Gould, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2021 Filing 356 MOTION to Seal Exhibit H to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Text Messages (ECF 343-8) by Robert Kuszmar. (Brewer, Linda)
September 29, 2021 Filing 355 RESPONSE in Opposition re #342 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Ronald Hughes, Robert Kuszmar, Michael Tomasullo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda Brewer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Brewer, Linda)
September 28, 2021 Filing 354 Joint MOTION to Amend #110 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Related to Expert Depositions by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 28, 2021 Filing 353 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #352 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply In Further Support of Plaintiffs' Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel Documents and Further Deposition Testimony by Neema T. Sahni on behalf of Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC (Sahni, Neema)
September 27, 2021 Filing 352 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply In Further Support of Plaintiffs' Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel Documents and Further Deposition Testimony by All Plaintiffs. (Sahni, Neema)
September 24, 2021 Filing 351 REQUEST for oral argument re #338 Emergency MOTION to Compel Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Further Deposition Testimony by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 350 JOINDER in motion by Charter Communications, Inc. . (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 349 REQUEST for oral argument re #338 Emergency MOTION to Compel Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Further Deposition Testimony by Advance Publications, Inc., Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP, Jerry Birenz.(Golinveaux, Jennifer) Modified on 10/5/2021 (LD).
September 24, 2021 Filing 348 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Documents in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel #347 by Bright House Networks, LLC., Advance Publications, Inc., Sabin, Gould and Bernant LLP, Jerry Birenz.(Golinveaux, Jennifer) Modified on 10/5/2021 (LD).
September 24, 2021 Filing 347 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #338 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Further Testimony filed by Advance Publications, Inc., Sabin, Bermant, & Gould LLP, Jerry Birenz(Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Golinveaux (with Exhibits A-E), #2 Declaration of Kirill Abramov, #3 Declaration of Martin Petraitis)(Golinveaux, Jennifer) Modified on 10/5/2021 (LD).
September 24, 2021 Filing 346 Unopposed MOTION for John J. Rosenthal to appear pro hac vice by Advance Publications, Inc., Jerry Birenz, Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP. (Schifino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting #344 Motion to File Excess Pages in a Consolidated Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/24/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
September 23, 2021 Filing 344 MOTION to File Excess Pages (Time-Sensitive Motion and Memorandum of Non-Parties Advance Publications, Inc., Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP, and Jerry Birenz in Support of Motion for Leave to File Consolidated 25 Page Opposition Brief), by Advance Publications, Inc., Sabin, Bermant, and Gould LLP, Jerry Birenz. (Golinveaux, Jennifer)
September 15, 2021 Filing 343 DECLARATION of Neema T. Sahni re #342 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Sahni, Neema)NOTE: Exhibit H Modified on 10/4/2021 (LD). NOTE: Exhibit H removed pursuant to Dkt. 366 Order.
September 15, 2021 Filing 342 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Sahni, Neema) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 15, 2021 Filing 341 MOTION to Compel responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission, and Production of Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE)(Sahni, Neema) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.*** NOTE: SEALED EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO DKT. 369 ORDER*** Modified on 10/4/2021 (LD).
September 15, 2021 Filing 340 MOTION to Compel Streaming Revenue Declarations by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Schapiro, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified on 9/16/2021 (TDC).
September 10, 2021 Filing 338 Emergency MOTION to Compel Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Further Deposition Testimony by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joshua B. Picker, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U)(Sahni, Neema) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER granting #336 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/10/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
September 10, 2021 Sealed Document S-339. (LD)
September 9, 2021 Filing 336 Emergency MOTION to Seal Time Sensitive Motion to Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Sahni, Neema)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER denying #332 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/9/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting #331 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/9/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
September 8, 2021 Filing 333 DECLARATION of Joshua B. Picker in support of #332 First MOTION to Compel Production of Document and further Deposition Testimony by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Sahni, Neema) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified on 9/9/2021 (LD).
September 8, 2021 Filing 332 First MOTION to Compel Time-Sensitive Motion to Compel Production of Documents and further Deposition Testimony by All Plaintiffs. (Sahni, Neema) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 7, 2021 Filing 331 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Response by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER SUSTAINING IN PART AND OVERRULING IN PART #212 #216 #298 #317 the Parties' Objections to Judge Wilson's Discovery Rulings. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/7/2021. (MWC)
September 3, 2021 Filing 329 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC re #324 MOTION to Compel Sandvine, Inc. Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rightson Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Stone Agate Music, EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Chappell & Co. Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Rhino Entertainment Company, EMI U Catalog Inc., Warner Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, WB Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, WEA International Inc., Famous Music LLC, Arista Records LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Arista Music, Universal Music Corp., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Music Corporation of America, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI April Music Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Mills Music, Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, The Century Family, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music (Gould, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #324 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Motion to Compel as to MMP Interrogatory 15 and RLP ROG 14. The plaintiffs have 30 days to answer those interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/2/2021. (DMS)
August 30, 2021 Filing 327 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on Nov. 9, 2021, 9:00 a.m. pacific before Hon. S. James Otero. (Sperling, Jonathan)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #323 Bright House's Time-Sensitive Motion for Protective Order and Temporary Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to the extent that the deposition of Timothy Frendberg, in his corporate capacity, is scheduled for Monday, September 13, 2021, and, in his personal capacity, for Tuesday, September 14, 2021, for a total of seven hours each day. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/25/2021. (DMS)
August 24, 2021 Filing 325 RESPONSE in Opposition re #323 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Sahni, Neema)
August 23, 2021 Filing 324 MOTION to Compel Sandvine, Inc. Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Gould, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Gould, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 23, 2021 Filing 323 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Schapiro, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 23, 2021 Filing 322 JOINT NOTICE Regarding Mediation by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC re #312 Order Appointing Mediator - Joint (Sperling, Jonathan) Modified on 8/24/2021 (LD).
August 20, 2021 Sealed Document S-321. (LD)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #319 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs are directed to file and the Clerk is directed to accept UNDER SEAL (i) the unredacted version of Plaintiffs' Partial Objection to the July 21, 2021 Discovery Order, and (ii) Exhibits C and D thereto. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/19/2021. (MWC)
August 18, 2021 Filing 319 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Objection re 311 by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
August 18, 2021 Filing 318 RESPONSE re #317 Objection filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schapiro, Andrew)
August 4, 2021 Filing 317 OBJECTION re #311 Order on Motion to Compel by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Sahni, Neema)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #315 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorneys Corey M.S. Miller and Alexander Kaplan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/3/2021. (DMS)
August 3, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18548573 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Alexander Kaplan. (Hull, Bryan)
August 3, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18548505 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Corey M.S. Miller. (Hull, Bryan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 315 Unopposed MOTION for Corey M.S. Miller and Alexander Kaplan to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 314 THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 6/10/2022. Jury Trial set on the August 2022 trial term, which commences on 8/1/2022, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/5/2022. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/2/2021. (MWC)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #306 the Parties' Expedited Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. A Third Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order will be issued by separate notice. No further extensions will be granted absent highly extenuating circumstances. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/2/2021. (MWC)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/2/2021. (MWC)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #287 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files. The defendant has until August 20, 2021, to produce the documents identified in Plaintiff's RFP Nos. 33 and 59. The discovery motions deadline is two weeks after the discovery cut-off date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/21/2021. (DMS)
July 20, 2021 Filing 310 Minute Entry. In-person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: MOTION HEARING held on 7/20/2021 re #287 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rightson Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Stone Agate Music, EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Chappell & Co. Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Rhino Entertainment Company, EMI U Catalog Inc., Warner Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, WB Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, WEA International Inc., Famous Music LLC, Arista Records LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Arista Music, Universal Music Corp., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Music Corporation of America, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI April Music Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Mills Music, Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, The Century Family, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music. (DIGITAL) (DMS)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Remote Review of Source Code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/15/2021. (DMS)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting #307 Joint Motion for Entry of Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Remote Review of Source Code. The Clerk is directed to file the stipulated protective order attached at Doc. 307-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/15/2021. (DMS)
July 14, 2021 Filing 307 Joint MOTION to Supplement #58 Protective Order regarding Remote Review of Source Code by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gould, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2021 Filing 306 Joint MOTION to Amend #257 Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order EXPEDITED by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting #303 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Admission of Justine Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/9/2021. (DMS)
July 8, 2021 Filing 304 RESPONSE re #298 Objection to Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Partial Objection to June 10, 2021 Discovery Order filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit A)(Sahni, Neema)
July 8, 2021 Filing 303 Unopposed MOTION for Justine Young to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18452875 for $150 by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
June 30, 2021 Filing 301 NOTICE by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC re #287 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files [Unredacted] (Attachments: #1 Main Document Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files, #2 Exhibit P)(Sperling, Jonathan)
June 29, 2021 Filing 300 NOTICE of HEARING: In-person oral argument on the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files (Doc. 287) is SCHEDULED for 7/20/2021 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Belated submissions are disfavored. Any materials submitted after 4:00 p.m. on the day before the hearing will be disregarded.(MEM)
June 28, 2021 Sealed Document S-302. (LD)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #292 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal; granting #296 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The defendant may file under seal unredacted versions of (1) Exhibit P to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, (2) the defendant's Response to the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, and (3) Exhibits 2 and 3 to its Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/24/2021. (DMS)
June 24, 2021 Filing 298 OBJECTION re #294 Order on Motion to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting #293 defendant's Motion for Ryan Lee Hedstrom to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan Lee Hedstrom terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/21/2021. (DMS)
June 16, 2021 Filing 296 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Response to Motion to Compel by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 16, 2021 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #287 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #274 Bright House Networks, LLC's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/10/2021. (DMS)
June 14, 2021 Filing 293 Unopposed MOTION for Ryan L. Hedstrom to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Hedstrom, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
June 12, 2021 Filing 292 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 10, 2021 Filing 290 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: MOTION HEARING held on 6/10/2021 re #274 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Admission filed by Bright House Networks, LLC. (DIGITAL) (AG)
June 8, 2021 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Patrick Bennett on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Bennett, Justin)
June 2, 2021 Filing 288 REQUEST for oral argument re #287 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
June 2, 2021 Filing 287 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(Grigsby, Stacey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 25, 2021 Filing 286 NOTICE of HEARING: In-person oral argument on the defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Admission (Doc. 274)is SCHEDULED for 6/10/2021 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Belated submissions are disfavored. Any materials submitted after 4:00 p.m. on the day before the hearing will be disregarded.(MEM)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER denying without prejudice #272 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files; denying as moot #283 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/24/2021. (DMS)
May 21, 2021 Filing 284 RESPONSE in Opposition re #274 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Admission filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Grigsby, Stacey)
May 19, 2021 Filing 283 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendants Response to Motion to Compel by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 19, 2021 Filing 282 RESPONSE in Opposition re #272 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 17, 2021 Sealed Document S-281. (LD)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #278 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The unredacted version of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files, and Exhibit P thereto, may be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/14/2021. (DMS)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting #277 Motion for Extension of Time of one week to File Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/14/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 278 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 10, 2021 Filing 277 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #272 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files , #274 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Admission by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kate Akopjan, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063856.) Related document: #270 Unopposed MOTION for Katy Akopjan to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
May 4, 2021 Filing 276 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #274 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Admission by Andrew H. Schapiro on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
April 30, 2021 Filing 275 REQUEST for oral argument re #274 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Admission by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
April 30, 2021 Filing 274 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Admission by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Schapiro, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
April 29, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18193434 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Stacey K. Grigsby. (Grigsby, Stacey)
April 28, 2021 Filing 273 REQUEST for oral argument re #272 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
April 28, 2021 Filing 272 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Custodial Files by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T)(Sperling, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #270 defendant's Motion for Katy Akopjan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
April 23, 2021 Filing 270 Unopposed MOTION for Katy Akopjan to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #268 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Produce Discovery Documents. The parties have up to, and including, April 30, 2021, to complete production of documents responsive to outstanding discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/19/2021. (DMS)
April 15, 2021 Filing 268 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Produce Discovery Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 16, 2021 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. 113A-18005658 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney John H. Ehlers. (Hull, Bryan)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #266 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Produce Discovery Documents. The parties have up to, and including, April 15, 2021, to complete production of documents responsive to outstanding discovery requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/11/2021. (DMS)
March 10, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael Trombetta (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063402.) Related document: #264 Unopposed MOTION for 1.Michael F. Trombetta to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
March 9, 2021 Filing 266 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Produce Discovery Documents and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
February 26, 2021 (ERROR: No payment reflected; counsel notified) Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney John H. Ehlers. (Sahni, Neema) Modified on 3/2/2021 (AG).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #264 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Michael F. Trombetta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/24/2021. (DMS)
February 23, 2021 Filing 264 Unopposed MOTION for Michael F. Trombetta to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Hedstrom, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified on 2/24/2021 (TDC).
February 23, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Joshua B. Picker (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063278.) Related document: #259 Unopposed MOTION for Stacey K. Grigsby and Joshua B. Picker to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
February 19, 2021 Filing 263 Joint NOTICE OF SELECTION of Peter J. Grilli as mediator by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan) Modified on 2/22/2021 (TDC).
February 16, 2021 Filing 262 NOTICE to counsel Joshua B. Picker Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLJ)
February 16, 2021 Filing 261 NOTICE to counsel John H, Ehlers Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLJ)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting #259 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stacey K. Grigsby and Joshua B. Picker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/3/2021. (DMS)
February 2, 2021 Filing 259 Unopposed MOTION for Stacey K. Grigsby and Joshua B. Picker to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 6/10/2022. Jury Trial set on the August 2022 trial term, which commences on 8/1/2022, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/17/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/1/2021. (MWC)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #254 the Parties' Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. A Second Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order will be issued by separate notice. The Court intends to permit discovery to be completed and then stay this action during the trial in Warner Records v. Charter Communications, Inc., No. 1:19-cv-00874 (D. Colo.). Upon completion of the trial in that action, the Court will lift the stay. At that time, the Court will set final pretrial filing deadlines. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/1/2021. (MWC)
January 29, 2021 Sealed Document S255. (TDC)
January 29, 2021 Filing 254 Joint MOTION to Amend #144 Case management and scheduling order Time Sensitive - Relief Requested before February 5, 2021 by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan)
January 28, 2021 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Phil Hill (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA063030.) Related document: #245 MOTION for Phil Hill and J. Hardy Ehlers to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #194 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. The plaintiffs may file under seal an unredacted version of page 10 of their Motion to Compel, which is CM/ECF docket number 159. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/25/2021. (DMS)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting #250 Motion to Continue Response to Interrogatory for 21 days after Ruling on Objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/25/2021. (Wilson, Thomas)
January 25, 2021 Filing 251 RESPONSE to Motion re #250 MOTION to Continue January 31, 2021 Deadline to Answer Interrogatory Expedited Relief Requested filed by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 1/26/2021 (TDC).
January 22, 2021 Filing 250 MOTION to Continue January 31, 2021 Deadline to Answer Interrogatory Expedited Relief Requested by All Plaintiffs. (Gould, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/25/2021 (TDC).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #245 Plaintiffs' Motion for Phil Hill and J. Hardy Ehlers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/19/2021. (DMS)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING #235 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Objection to Magistrate Judge's Ruling on Motion to Compel. Should the Court require additional briefing regarding this matter, it will direct the Parties to file such briefing via a sua sponte Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/19/2021. (MWC)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #246 Objector Raymond Zink's Motion to Seal. Objector Raymond Zink requests that the Court remove his personally identifying information from the objection he filed with the Court on December 15, 2020. Because the Clerk has already sealed Mr. Zink's objection, his request is moot. The objection shall remain sealed until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/11/2021. (MWC)
January 7, 2021 Filing 246 CONSTRUED MOTION to Seal by Raymond Zink. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
January 4, 2021 Filing 245 MOTION for Phil Hill and J. Hardy Ehlers to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING #171 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims; DENYING #165 Defendant's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and for Leave to File Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/29/2020. (MWC)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #241 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas Patrick Lane terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/3/2020. (DMS)
December 2, 2020 Filing 241 Unopposed MOTION for Thomas Patrick Lane to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #239 Plaintiffs' Consented Motion for Clarification of Seal Order (Dkt. 232). The Clerk is directed to unseal the redacted version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Ruling on Motion to Compel. (Dkt. 230) Plaintiffs are directed to file and the Clerk is directed to accept UNDER SEAL the unredacted version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Ruling on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/23/2020. (MWC)
November 19, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael Clark (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA062496.) Related document: #215 Unopposed MOTION for Michelle Clark to appear pro hac vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act. (ARC)
November 17, 2020 Filing 239 Consent MOTION for Clarification re #232 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan)
November 16, 2020 Filing 238 NOTICE to counsel Michelle A. Clark of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLJ)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #234 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Written Discovery. The Parties' written discovery deadline shall be extended to January 15, 2021. All other deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order shall remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/13/2020. (AKJ)
November 13, 2020 Filing 236 RESPONSE in Opposition re #235 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for leave to file Reply Brief in support of Objection to Magistrate Judge's Ruling on Motion to Compel filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2020 Filing 235 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for leave to file Reply Brief in support of Objection to Magistrate Judge's Ruling on Motion to Compel by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 11, 2020 Filing 234 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Extend Deadline for Written Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan)
November 10, 2020 Filing 233 RESPONSE re #216 Objection filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER GRANTING #231 Plaintiffs' Consented Motion For Leave to File Documents Under Seal. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/10/2020. (AKJ)
November 6, 2020 Filing 231 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Opposition Under Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan)
November 6, 2020 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #212 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Ruling on Motion to Compel filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gould, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Sperling, Jonathan)
November 6, 2020 Filing 229 REPLY to Response to Motion re #171 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Gould, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Gould, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2020 Filing 228 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #203 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Amended Counterclaims. Plaintiffs shall file a seven (7) page reply brief within three (3) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/3/2020. (AKJ)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 First Stipulated Amendment to Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/2/2020. (DMS)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #221 Joint Expedited Motion for Entry of First Stipulated Amendment to Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 11/2/2020. (DMS)
November 2, 2020 Filing 224 NOTICE by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC re #203 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Defendant's Amended Counterclaims (Gould, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #214 defendant's Motion for Nathan Hamstra to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #215 defendant's Motion for Michelle Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/29/2020. (DMS)
October 29, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nathan Hamstra, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA062308.) Related document: #214 Unopposed MOTION for Nathan Hamstra to appear pro hac vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act. (JLD)
October 28, 2020 Sealed Document S-222. (LD)
October 28, 2020 Filing 221 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and for EXPEDITED Entry of First Stipulated Amendment to Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING #213 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/28/2020. (AKJ)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Produce Identifying Information Concerning Certain Bright House Subscribers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/27/2020. (DMS)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #211 Joint Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to establish Procedure for Production of Third Party Documents. The Clerk is directed to docket the Order Granting Stipulation to Procedure Identifying Information Concerning Certain Bright House Subscribers attached to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/27/2020. (DMS)
October 27, 2020 Filing 217 DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Gould re #216 Objection by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Gould, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 216 OBJECTION re #210 Order on Motion to CompelOrder on Motion to Stay Discovery (partial). (Gould, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 215 Unopposed MOTION for Michelle Clark to appear pro hac vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 27, 2020 Filing 214 Unopposed MOTION for Nathan Hamstra to appear pro hac vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 23, 2020 Filing 213 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 10/26/2020 (TDC).
October 23, 2020 Filing 212 OBJECTION re #210 Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Stay Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 10/26/2020 (TDC).
October 23, 2020 Filing 211 JOINT MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Establish Procedure for Production of Third Party Documents by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sahni, Neema) Modified on 10/26/2020 (TDC). Modified on 10/26/2020 (TDC).
October 12, 2020 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #203 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Defendant's Amended Counterclaims filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #159 Defendant Bright House Networks LLC's Motion to Compel; denying #173 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Stay of Discovery Pending Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/9/2020. (DMS)
October 9, 2020 Filing 208 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: MOTION HEARING held on 10/9/2020 re #173 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rightson Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Stone Agate Music, EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Chappell & Co. Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Rhino Entertainment Company, EMI U Catalog Inc., Warner Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, WB Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, WEA International Inc., Famous Music LLC, Arista Records LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Arista Music, Universal Music Corp., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Music Corporation of America, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI April Music Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Mills Music, Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, The Century Family, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, #159 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Bright House Networks, LLC. (DIGITAL) (DMS)
October 8, 2020 Filing 206 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #159 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Interrogatories by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gould, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2020 Filing 205 NOTICE of Supplemental Decision by Bright House Networks, LLC. re #159 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Interrogatories. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew) Modified on 10/9/2020 (TDC).
October 7, 2020 Filing 204 Defendant's NOTICE of Supplemental Decision by Bright House Networks, LLC. re #173 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision)(Ranahan, Erin) Modified on 10/8/2020 (TDC).
October 6, 2020 Filing 203 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Defendant's Amended Counterclaims by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #201 Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Counsel Matthew J. Oppenheim, Jeffrey M. Gould, Jonathan M. Sperling, and Neema T. Sahni to Appear Telephonically at October 9, 2020 motion hearing. Counsel shall join the hearing by dialing 888-684-8852, entering access code 6630225, and security code 9922. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/5/2020. (DMS)
October 2, 2020 Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Jeffrey M. Gould, Jonathan M. Sperling, and Neema T. Sahni to appear telephonically at October 9, 2020 hearing (EXPEDITED REVIEW REQUESTED) by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 30, 2020 Filing 200 REPLY to Response to Motion re #165 MOTION to Modify #144 Case management and scheduling order filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 Filing 199 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on September 24, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Transcriber David J. Collier, Telephone number (813) 301-5575. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Transcriber. Redaction Request due 10/19/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2020. (DJC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 198 NOTICE of HEARING: Oral argument on the Defendant's Motion to Compel (Doc. 159) AND Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Stay of Discovery (Doc. 173) are SCHEDULED for 10/9/2020 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (MEM)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #157 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/24/2020. (DMS)
September 24, 2020 Filing 195 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: MOTION HEARING held on 9/24/2020 re #157 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rightson Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Jobete Music Co. Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Stone Agate Music, EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Chappell & Co. Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Rhino Entertainment Company, EMI U Catalog Inc., Warner Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, WB Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, WEA International Inc., Famous Music LLC, Arista Records LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Arista Music, Universal Music Corp., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Music Corporation of America, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI April Music Inc., W Chappell Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Mills Music, Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, The Century Family, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music. (DIGITAL) (DMS)
September 24, 2020 Filing 194 MOTION to Seal by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gould, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #180 Parties' Joint Motion for Order Resolving Plaintiffs' Objection to Bright House Networks' Designation of Wayne Coleman as a Qualified Person Under the Protective Order and denying as moot #143 Plaintiffs' Motion to Deny Wayne Coleman's Designation as a Qualified Person Under the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/24/2020. (AKJ)
September 24, 2020 Filing 192 NOTICE to counsel Michael L. Brody of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #177 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and Leave to File Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims. Defendant shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file their seven-page reply brief. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/23/2020. (AKJ)
September 23, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Linda Brewer (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061962.) Related document: #184 Unopposed MOTION for Linda Brewer to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
September 23, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Todd Anten (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061962.) Related document: #181 Unopposed MOTION for Todd Anten to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
September 23, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Allison Huebert (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061962.) Related document: #182 Unopposed MOTION for Allison Huebert to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
September 23, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jessica Rose (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061962.) Related document: #183 Unopposed MOTION for Jessica Rose to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
September 22, 2020 Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition re #173 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 22, 2020 Filing 189 RESPONSE in Opposition re #171 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER DENYING #155 Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal This Court's July 8, 2020 Opinion and Order; DENYING AS MOOT #178 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Submit a Five Page Reply in Further Support of Their Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/22/2020. (MWC)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #186 Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Counsel Matthew J. Oppenheim, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Neema T. Sahni to Appear Telephonically at the September 24, 2020 Hearing. Counsel shall join the hearing by dialing 888-684-8852, entering access code 6630225, and security code 0710. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/22/2020. (DMS)
September 22, 2020 Filing 186 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Neema T. Sahni to appear telephonically at September 24, 2020 hearing (Doc. 175) on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. 157), EXPEDITED REVIEW REQUESTED by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #181 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Todd Anten to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #182 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Allison Huebert to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #183 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Jessica Rose to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #184 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Linda Brewer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/21/2020. (DMS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION for Linda Brewer to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified text on 9/18/2020 (MCB).
September 18, 2020 Filing 183 Unopposed MOTION for Jessica Rose to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified text on 9/18/2020 (MCB).
September 18, 2020 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Allison Huebert to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified text on 9/18/2020 (MCB).
September 18, 2020 Filing 181 Unopposed MOTION for Todd Anten to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Modified text on 9/18/2020 (MCB).
September 16, 2020 Filing 180 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Order Resolving Plaintiffs' Objections to Bright House Networks' Designation of Wayne Coleman as a Qualified Person Under the Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan)
September 15, 2020 Filing 179 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #157 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Sperling, Jonathan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 178 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Leave to Submit a Five-Page Reply in Further Support of Their Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 177 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Leave to File Second Amended Answer by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #156 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims. In light of the Defendant's amended pleadings #164, Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims #156 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/10/2020. (AKJ)
September 10, 2020 Filing 175 NOTICE of HERING: Oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents (Doc. 157) is SCHEDULED for9/24/2020 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (MEM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #159 Motion to Compel filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF JONATHAN GLASS, #2 DECLARATION OF WADE LEAK, #3 DECLARATION OF ALASDAIR MCMULLAN, #4 DECLARATION OF NEEMA T. SAHNI, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D)(Sperling, Jonathan)
September 8, 2020 Filing 173 MOTION to Stay Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF NEEMA T. SAHNI, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Sperling, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 8, 2020 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re #165 MOTION to Modify #144 Case management and scheduling order filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gould, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2020 Filing 171 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gould, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2020 Filing 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Warner 08/25/2020 Hearing Transcript Excerpt, #2 Exhibit B - Warner 12/17/2019 Hearing Transcript Excerpt, #3 Exhibit C - First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for Production)(Ranahan, Erin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 169 REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically TO DENY WAYNE COLEMAN'S DESIGNATION AS A QUALIFIED PERSON UNDER THE PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1)(Sperling, Jonathan)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying without prejudice #161 defendant's Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/28/2020. (DMS)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #163 Motion for extension of time to respond to Doc 157 until Sept. 4, 2020, and to respond to Doc 159 until Sept. 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/28/2020. (Wilson, Thomas)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING AS STATED HEREIN #153 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Submit a Three-Page Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Deny Wayne Coleman's Designation as a Qualified Person Under the Protective Order. Plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a reply not to exceed three (3) pages, which shall only address the alleged mischaracterization of law and facts contained in Defendant's Response. Should the Court require additional briefing regarding this matter, it will advise the Parties. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/27/2020. (GMD)
August 25, 2020 Filing 165 MOTION to Modify #144 Case management and scheduling order by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schapiro, Andrew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 164 AMENDED ANSWER to #94 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 163 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically TO SET DEADLINES FOR OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (ECF 157) AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (ECF 159) by All Plaintiffs. (Sperling, Jonathan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 162 RESPONSE in Opposition re #155 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) of the Court's Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claim for Vicarious Liability filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 161 MOTION to Seal Memorandum, and Exhibit 19 to the Declaration of Erin Ranahan, in support of #159 Motion to Compel, by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ranahan, Erin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 160 REQUEST for oral argument re #159 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Interrogatories by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 159 MOTION to Compel Responses to Certain Requests for Production and Interrogatories by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin R. Ranahan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20)(Ranahan, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 14, 2020 Filing 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :THREE-PAGE REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DENY WAYNE COLEMAN'S DESIGNATION AS A QUALIFIED PERSON UNDER THE PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Bright House Networks, LLC. (Ranahan, Erin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 157 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema Sahni, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R)(Sperling, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 11, 2020 Filing 156 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gould, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2020 Filing 155 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) of the Court's Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claim for Vicarious Liability by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 5, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Peter J. Grilli as mediator by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
July 31, 2020 Filing 153 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :THREE-PAGE REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DENY WAYNE COLEMAN'S DESIGNATION AS A QUALIFIED PERSON UNDER THE PROTECTIVE ORDER by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re #143 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically TO DENY WAYNE COLEMAN'S DESIGNATION AS A QUALIFIED PERSON UNDER THE PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin R. Ranahan, #2 Exhibit 1_Ranahan Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2_Ranahan Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3_Ranahan Declaration, #5 Declaration of Wayne Coleman)(Ranahan, Erin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 151 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #94 Amended Complaint ; Injunctive Relief Sought, COUNTERCLAIM and Demand for Jury Trial; Injunctive Relief Sought against Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC by Bright House Networks, LLC..(Ranahan, Erin)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #147 defendant's Motion for David Eiseman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/20/2020. (DMS)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #146 defendant's Motion for Andrew Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/20/2020. (DMS)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #145 defendant's Motion for Charles Verhoeven to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/20/2020. (DMS)
July 20, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney David Eiseman, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061429.) Related document: #147 Unopposed MOTION for David Eiseman to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
July 20, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Charles Verhoeven, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061429.) Related document: #145 Unopposed MOTION for Charles Verhoeven to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
July 20, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Andrew Schapiro, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061429.) Related document: #146 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew Schapiro to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
July 16, 2020 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION for David Eiseman to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 16, 2020 Filing 146 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew Schapiro to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 16, 2020 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION for Charles Verhoeven to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 10/18/2021. Jury Trial set on the December 2021 trial term, which commences on 11/29/2021. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/15/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/15/2020. (GMD)
July 9, 2020 Filing 143 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically TO DENY WAYNE COLEMAN'S DESIGNATION AS A QUALIFIED PERSON UNDER THE PROTECTIVE ORDER by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema Sahni, #2 Exhibit 1)(Sperling, Jonathan)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING #99 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint as to the Claim for Vicarious Liability; DENYING AS MOOT #100 Defendant's Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/8/2020. (MWC)
July 1, 2020 Filing 141 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Gould, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael L. Brody, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061225.) Related document: #138 Unopposed MOTION for Michael L. Brody to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
June 17, 2020 Filing 140 OBJECTION re #137 Notice of filing supplemental authority Defendant's Objection and Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Ranahan, Erin)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #138 defendant's Motion for Michael L. Brody to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/16/2020. (DMS)
June 12, 2020 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION for Michael L. Brody to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
June 9, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #106 Memorandum in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Authority)(Sperling, Jonathan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 136 STIPULATION re 131 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Joint Submission of Proposed Case Schedule by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Sperling, Jonathan)
May 26, 2020 Filing 135 SUPPLEMENT re #133 Order Plaintiffs' Submission of Supplemental Scheduling Report and Notice of Forthcoming Joint Proposed Case Schedule by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Hull, Bryan)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #102 Plaintiffs' Partial Objections to Two Discrete Rulings in Magistrate Judge Wilson's January 9, 2020 Discovery Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/22/2020. (GMD)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Concerning Civil Cases: Case Management and Scheduling Orders. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/19/2020. (KE)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART #118 Defendant's Motion to Re-Designate Case to Track Three. To the extent the Motion seeks to designate this action as a Track Three Case, the Motion is GRANTED. The Motion is otherwise DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Parties are DIRECTED that, notwithstanding the current stay of this matter imposed by the Court's Order Concerning Jury Trials and Other Proceedings in re: Coronavirus Public Emergency, (Dkt.123), the Parties shall confer telephonically and file a joint proposed case schedule within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. All proposed deadlines shall be later than May 29, 2020. Thereafter, the Court will enter an Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order and determine whether a pre-trial conference will be needed. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/12/2020. (GMD)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shilpa A. Coorg terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/7/2020. (DMS)
May 6, 2020 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Shilpa A. Coorg to Withdraw as Attorney by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Coorg, Shilpa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 4, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC re #118 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Re-Designate Case to Track Three of Non-opposition to Re-Designation to Track Three (Kamin, Mitchell)
April 17, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #106 Memorandum in opposition by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Authority)(Sperling, Jonathan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #118 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Re-Designate Case to Track Three filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin Ranahan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Ranahan, Erin)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #124 Motion for Leave to Submit a Three-Page Reply to be Considered with Otherwise Fully Briefed Motion to Re-Designate the Case to Track Three by Bright House Networks, LLC. Notwithstanding the COVID-19 Stay Order previously entered in this case, the Reply shall be filed within seven (7) calendar days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/30/2020. (Scriven, Mary)
March 26, 2020 Filing 124 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Clarify Order and Seek Leave to Submit a Three-Page Reply to be Considered with Otherwise Fully Briefed Motion to Re-Designate the Case to Track Three by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER concerning Jury Trials and Other Proceedings in re: Coronavirus Public Emergency. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/19/2020. (LRB)
March 6, 2020 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Re-Designate Case to Track Three (Partial Opposition) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neema T. Sahni, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Kamin, Mitchell)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Continuance of March 9, 2020 Deadline to Produce Documents. The plaintiffs' deadline to produce documents responsive to RFP 2, 3 and 5 is extended to May 1, 2020. Additionally, the plaintiffs' deadline to produce documents responsive to RFP 8 is extended until 30 days after the plaintiffs' objection is ruled upon, in the event the objection is denied. Additional extensions of time are disfavored. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/4/2020. (DMS)
March 3, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION to Continue March 9, 2020 Deadline to Produce Documents EXPEDITED RELIEF REQUESTED by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gillian Malloy Smith)(Kamin, Mitchell)
February 28, 2020 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re #99 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint as to the Claim for Vicarious Liability filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin)
February 24, 2020 Filing 118 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Re-Designate Case to Track Three by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin Ranahan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Ranahan, Erin)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #116 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Exhibits to the Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to replace Exhibits A and B to the First Amended Complaint, (Dkts. 94-1, 94-2), with the amended exhibits attached to the Motion. (Dkts. 116-1, 116-2). Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/18/2020. (GMD)
February 15, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED EXHIBITS TO THE COMPLAINT by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kamin, Mitchell)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING #113 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Submit a Two-Page Reply in Further Support of Their Partial Objection to Two Discrete Rulings in Magistrate Judge Wilson's January 9, 2020 Discovery Order. If the Court requires further briefing, it will notify the Parties. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/14/2020. (GMD)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #112 Defendant Bright House Networks LLC's Motion For Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Bright House Networks LLC shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file its reply, which shall not exceed five (5) pages. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/14/2020. (GMD)
February 11, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION for leave to file Two-Page Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Partial Objection to Two Discrete Rulings in Magistrate Judge Wilson's January 9, 2020 Discovery Order by All Plaintiffs. (Gould, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION for leave to file Defendant BHN's Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss #99 by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying #101 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/7/2020. (Wilson, Thomas)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #104 Joint Motion to Conduct Additional Depositions. The parties may take up to 20 depositions per side. The deadline for discovery-related motions is June 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/6/2020. (DMS)
February 6, 2020 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #102 Objection to Two Rulings in Magistrate Judge Wilson's January 9, 2020 Discovery Order filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #101 Motion for Reconsideration of Two Issues From This Court's January 9, 2020 Discovery Order filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin)
February 4, 2020 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #100 Notice to take judicial notice filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Kamin, Mitchell)
February 4, 2020 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #99 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint as to the Claim for Vicarious Liability filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Kamin, Mitchell)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING #103 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Kerry M. Mustico as counsel of record and recipient of filings for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/3/2020. (GMD)
January 30, 2020 Filing 104 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Conduct Additional Depositions; Memorandum in Support by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION for Kerry M. Mustico to withdraw as attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Mustico, Kerry)
January 23, 2020 Filing 102 OBJECTION re #93 Order on motion to compel (Partial). (Attachments: #1 Gould Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Gould, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Reconsideration re #93 Order on motion to compel and Memorandum in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gould, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding #99 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint as to the Claim for Vicarious Liability /Motion for Judicial Notice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1_CAS MOU, #3 Exhibit 2_Comcast Press Release, #4 Exhibit 3_Verizon Press Release, #5 Exhibit 4_Verizon Press Release, #6 Exhibit 5_ATT Press Release, #7 Exhibit 6_ATT Press Release, #8 Exhibit 7_Notice of Inquiry, #9 Exhibit 8_Economic Advisers Issue Brief, #10 Exhibit 9_Commissioner Rosenworcel Remarks, #11 Exhibit 10_FCC Promoting Telehealth)(Ranahan, Erin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint as to the Claim for Vicarious Liability by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #94 Amended Complaint by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Chappell & Co. Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Famous Music LLC, Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Music Corporation of America, Inc., Music Edition Discoton GMBH, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The All Blacks U.S.A., Inc., The Century Family, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal MCA Music Limited, Universal MCA Music Publishing PTY, Limited, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W Chappell Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner Records Sire Ventures LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Kamin, Mitchell)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #96 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Directing the Clerk to Replace Image of the First Amended Complaint with Clean Copy. The Clerk is DIRECTED to replace the redlined version of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, (Dkt. 94), with the clean copy attached as an exhibit to the Motion. (Dkt. 96-1). Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/16/2020. (GMD)
January 15, 2020 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order Directing the Clerk to Replace Image of the First Amended Complaint with Clean Copy by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hull, Bryan)
January 13, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Lee Hedstrom on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Hedstrom, Ryan)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #74 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents; granting in part and denying in part #80 Defendant Bright House Network's Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/9/2020. (DMS)
January 8, 2020 Filing 91 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson: MOTION HEARING held on 1/8/2020 re #74 MOTION to Compel FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rightson Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Stone Agate Music, EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Rhino Entertainment Company, EMI U Catalog Inc., Warner Records Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, WB Music Corp., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, WEA International Inc., Arista Records LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Arista Music, Universal Music Corp., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI April Music Inc., Universal Music Publishing AB, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, #80 MOTION to Compel Discovery (with Certificate of Service) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC. (DIGITAL) (DMS) (DMS).
January 7, 2020 Filing 94 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs.(LD) (LD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (LD).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #32 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Vicarious Liability. In light of Plaintiffs' having filed an Amended Complaint, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Defendant shall be free to reassert any of the challenges raised therein to the extent that they remain viable against the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/7/2020. (GMD)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #88 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint to Add Parties. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, (Dkt. 88-1), shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/7/2020. (GMD)
January 6, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint to Add Parties by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kamin, Mitchell)
December 20, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE by Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC of Jury Verdict (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kamin, Mitchell)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying #85 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Submit a Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents. The plaintiffs will have an opportunity to reply at the hearing scheduled on this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/16/2019. (DMS)
December 13, 2019 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by All Plaintiffs. (Kamin, Mitchell)
December 12, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of HEARING: Oral argument on the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses and Production of Documents (Doc. 74) and the Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery (Doc. 80) are SCHEDULED for 1/8/2020 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 12 A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (MEM)
December 11, 2019 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 MOTION to Compel Discovery (with Certificate of Service) filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Abitbol, #2 Declaration of Christopher Bell, #3 Declaration of of Jeremy Blietz, #4 Declaration of Matthew Flott, #5 Declaration of Wade Leak, #6 Declaration of Alasdair McMullan, #7 Declaration of Tracie Parry, #8 Declaration of Neema Sahni, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit H, #17 Exhibit I, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Exhibit K, #20 Exhibit L, #21 Exhibit M, #22 Exhibit N, #23 Exhibit O, #24 Exhibit P)(Kamin, Mitchell)
December 6, 2019 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION to Compel FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (with Certificate of Service) filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin R. Ranahan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Ranahan, Erin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 81 REQUEST for oral argument re #80 MOTION to Compel Discovery (with Certificate of Service) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Ranahan, Erin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Compel Discovery (with Certificate of Service) by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin Ranahan in Support of BHN's Motion to Compel Discovery, #2 Exhibit Index to Ranahan Decl, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18)(Ranahan, Erin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 27, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Bright House Networks, LLC. Notice of Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief and Motion to Strike the Notice of Amicus Brief (Schifino, William)
November 25, 2019 Filing 78 AMENDED document by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. Amendment to #76 Notice of selection of mediator AMENDED JOINT NOTICE OF MEDIATOR SELECTION. (Kamin, Mitchell)
November 25, 2019 Filing 77 AMENDED document by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. Amendment to #76 Notice of selection of mediator . (Kamin, Mitchell)
November 25, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Peter J. Grilli as mediator by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Kamin, Mitchell)
November 22, 2019 Filing 75 DECLARATION of NEEMA T. SAHNI re #74 MOTION to Compel FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Kamin, Mitchell)
November 22, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION to Compel FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by All Plaintiffs. (Kamin, Mitchell) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 20, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION to Strike #72 Notice (Other) by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Kamin, Mitchell)
November 13, 2019 Filing 72 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DKT. 79 NOTICE of withdrawal. NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC. of Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schifino, William) Modified on 12/2/2019 (LD).
November 6, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE by Bright House Networks, LLC. of Filing Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schifino, William)
November 6, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE to counsel Erin R. Ranahan and Shilpa A. Coorg of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JNB)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #67 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Modify Case Schedule. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including January 6, 2020 to add parties. The Case Management and Scheduling Oder otherwise remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/5/2019. (GMD)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 12/14/2020, Jury Trial set on the February 2021 trial term, which commences on 2/1/2021, Conduct mediation hearing by 3/27/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/4/2019. (MR)
November 1, 2019 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION to modify Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties in the Case Management Report (ECF No. 34) by All Plaintiffs. (Kamin, Mitchell)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.04(a) #64 Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/30/2019. (DMS)
October 23, 2019 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Erin Ranahan re #64 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Memorandum In Support by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BHN 1st set of RFP, #2 Exhibit BHN 1st set of interrogatories, #3 Exhibit Pl's Objs & Resps to 1st set of RFP, #4 Exhibit Pl's Objs & Resps to 1st set of interrogatories, #5 Exhibit Ltr to N Sahni re discovery responses, #6 Exhibit BHN Correspondence, #7 Exhibit Complaint, #8 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit Pl's Initial Disclosures, #10 Exhibit Minutes, #11 Exhibit Hearing Transcript, #12 Exhibit Order re Cox' Motion to Compel, #13 Exhibit Complaint, #14 Exhibit Myxer Order Granting Work for Hire)(Schifino, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Memorandum In Support by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
October 22, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #39 Memorandum in opposition by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.C.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Warner Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Authority)(Kamin, Mitchell)
October 16, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Shilpa A. Coorg, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058590.) Related document: #60 Unopposed MOTION for to appear pro hac vice. (TDC)
October 16, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Erin R. Ranahan, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA058589.) Related document: #60 Unopposed MOTION for to appear pro hac vice. (TDC)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 defendant's motion for Erin R. Ranahan and Shilpa A. Coorg to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/9/2019. (DMS)
October 9, 2019 Filing 61 STIPULATION Joint for Producing Documents and ESI by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING the Unopposed Motions for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Attorney Giovanni P. Giarratana, of the law firm Gunster, Yoakley, & Stewart, P.A., #54, and Attorney Stacey Foltz Stark, of the law firm Winston & Strawn LLP. #55 The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Attorney Giovanni P. Giarratana and Attorney Stacey Foltz Stark as counsel of record and recipient of filings in this action. Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC continues to be represented by Winston & Strawn LLP attorneys Michael S. Elkin, Thomas Patrick Lane, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, and Seth E. Spitzer, as well as Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A. attorneys William J. Schifino Jr. and John A. Schifino. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/6/2019. (GMD)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/5/2019. (DMS)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. The Clerk is directed to file the Stipulated Protective Order in the court docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/5/2019. (DMS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for protective order (entry of Stipulated Protective Order) by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 15, 2019 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Stacey Foltz Stark to withdraw as attorney for Bright House Networks, LLC by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Giarratana, Giovanni)
August 15, 2019 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Giovanni P. Giarratana to withdraw as attorney for Bright House Networks, LLC by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Giarratana, Giovanni)
August 14, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE to counsel Marc Chen of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE to counsel Jennifer A. Golinveaux of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE to counsel William O'Neil of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE to counsel Michael S. Elkin of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE to counsel Thomas Patrick Lane of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE to counsel Seth E. Spitzer of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE to counsel Stacey Foltz Stark of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #44 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Correct Names of Three Party Plaintiffs. The CLERK is directed to change the case caption to reflect the new names of the three corporate Plaintiffs as follows: (1) Warner Records Inc. (f/k/a Warner Bros. Records Inc.), (2) Warner Chappell Music, Inc. (f/k/a Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.), and (3) W.C.M. Music Corp. (f/k/a W.B.M. Music Corp.).Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/13/2019. (GMD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Vicarious Liability filed by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Names of Three Party Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan)
August 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Megan M. O'Neill, appearing on behalf of UMG Recordings, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057605.) Related document: #40 MOTION for Mark Chen, William O'Neil and Megan M. O'Neill to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
August 1, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Mark Y. Chen, appearing on behalf of UMG Recordings, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057560.) Related document: #40 MOTION for Mark Chen, William O'Neil and Megan M. O'Neill to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #42 Defendant Bright House Networks LLC's Motion For Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Bright House Networks LLC shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file its reply, which shall not exceed five (5) pages. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/29/2019. (GMD)
July 17, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney William E. O'Neil, appearing on behalf of Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057388.). (ARC)
July 5, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to file reply brief in further support of Motion to Dismiss by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Plaintiffs' Motion for attorneys Mark Chen, William O'Neil, and Megan O'Neill to Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/3/2019. (DMS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Mark Chen, William O'Neil and Megan M. O'Neill to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 1, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #32 Motion to dismiss filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recording LLC. (Kamin, Mitchell)
June 28, 2019 Filing 38 The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Attorney Rebecca G. Van Tassell as counsel of record and recipient of filings for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/28/2019. (GMD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Rebecca Van Tassell to withdraw as attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Van Tassell, Rebecca)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Motion to extend time; denying as moot #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTING #33 the Parties' Joint Consent Motion and Stipulated Briefing Schedule Related to Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Vicarious Liability; DENYING AS MOOT #35 the Parties Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including July 1, 2019 to respond to Defendant's Motion. Thereafter, Defendant shall file an answer to the remaining allegations in the Complaint within fourteen (14) days from the date of the Court's Order on the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/12/2019. (Wilson, Thomas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Vicarious Liability by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kamin, Mitchell)
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to extend time to and set briefing schedule relating to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Vicarious Liability by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William)
May 20, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order Amended by Bright House Networks, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Charter Communications, Inc. for Bright House Networks, LLC... (Schifino, William)
May 20, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Bright House Networks, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Charter Communications, Inc. for Bright House Networks, LLC... (Schifino, William)
May 17, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael S. Elkin, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056628.) Related document: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Michael S. Elkin, Thomas Patrick Lane, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, Seth E. Spitzer, and Stacey Foltz Stark to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 17, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Stacey Foltz Stark, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056628.) Related document: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Michael S. Elkin, Thomas Patrick Lane, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, Seth E. Spitzer, and Stacey Foltz Stark to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 17, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Thomas P. Lane, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056628.) Related document: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Michael S. Elkin, Thomas Patrick Lane, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, Seth E. Spitzer, and Stacey Foltz Stark to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 17, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Seth E. Spitzer, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056628.) Related document: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Michael S. Elkin, Thomas Patrick Lane, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, Seth E. Spitzer, and Stacey Foltz Stark to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 17, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jennifer A. Golinveaux, appearing on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056628.) Related document: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Michael S. Elkin, Thomas Patrick Lane, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, Seth E. Spitzer, and Stacey Foltz Stark to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 29 Special Admission Attorney Certification of Seth E. Spitzer by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William) Modified on 5/10/2019 (LD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 28 Special Admission Attorney Certification of Jennifer A. Golinveaux by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William) Modified on 5/10/2019 (LD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 27 Special Admission Attorney Certification of Thomas Patrick Lane by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William) Modified on 5/10/2019 (LD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 26 Special Admission Attorney Certification of Michael S. Elkin by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William) Modified on 5/10/2019 (LD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 25 Special Admission Attorney Certification of Stacy Foltz Stark by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William) Modified on 5/10/2019 (LD).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #22 the Parties' Joint Motion Requesting Permission to Hold a Telephonic Case Management Meeting. The Parties may appear by telephone at the case management conference for the purpose of filing their joint Case Management Report. In the event that the Parties fail to agree upon necessary terms of the Case Management Report, the Court may direct that they conduct a second conference in person. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/9/2019. (GMD)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #18 defendant's Motion for attorneys Michael S. Elkin, Thomas Patrick Lane, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, Seth E. Spitzer, and Stacey Foltz Stark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/8/2019. (DMS)
May 8, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Permission to Hold a Telephonic Case Management Meeting and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #16 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Attorney Jacqueline C. Charlesworth as counsel of record and recipient of filings for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/7/2019. (GMD)
May 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by John A. Schifino on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, John)
May 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Giovanni P. Giarratana on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Giarratana, Giovanni)
May 6, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Michael S. Elkin, Thomas Patrick Lane, Jennifer A. Golinveaux, Seth E. Spitzer, and Stacey Foltz Stark to appear pro hac vice by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of counsel by William J. Schifino, Jr on behalf of Bright House Networks, LLC. (Schifino, William)
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Jacqueline C. Charlesworth to withdraw as attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of service by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recording LLC . (Sahni, Neema)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recording LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Provident Label Group, LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Zomba Recording LLC; Other Affiliate Vivendi S.A. for Capitol Records, LLC, Polygram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp., Other Affiliate Access Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate Len Blavatnik for Atlantic Recording Corporation, Cotillion Music, Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.; Other Affiliate BB Investments LLC, Other Affiliate Bad Boy Records for Bad Boy Records LLC.. (Hull, Bryan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on April 8, 2019 by Provident Label Group, LLC, LaFace Records LLC, Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Rightson Music Inc., Nonesuch Records Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Arista Music, Fueled By Ramen LLC, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, Unichappell Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Intersong U.S.A., Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., WEA International Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, EMI U Catalog Inc., W.B.M. Music Corp., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Arista Records LLC, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Stone Agate Music, EMI Mills Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., WB Music Corp., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony Music Entertainment, Universal Music Publishing AB, Jobete Music Co. Inc., EMI April Music Inc., Zomba Recording LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Colgems-EMI Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Stone Diamond Music Corp., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Inc. as to All Defendants. (Hull, Bryan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recording LLC. Related case(s): no (Hull, Bryan)
April 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Mitchell A. Kamin, appearing on behalf of all Plaintiffs (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055991.) Related document: #9 Amended MOTION for Mitchell A. Kamin, Jonathan M. Sperling, Jacqueline C. Charlesworth, Neema T. Sahni, and Rebecca Van Tassell to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Neema Sahni, appearing on behalf of all Plaintiffs (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055991.) Related document: #9 Amended MOTION for Mitchell A. Kamin, Jonathan M. Sperling, Jacqueline C. Charlesworth, Neema T. Sahni, and Rebecca Van Tassell to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Rebecca Van Tassell, appearing on behalf of all Plaintiffs (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055991.). (ARC)
April 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jonathan M. Sperling, appearing on behalf of all Plaintiffs (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055991.) Related document: #9 Amended MOTION for Mitchell A. Kamin, Jonathan M. Sperling, Jacqueline C. Charlesworth, Neema T. Sahni, and Rebecca Van Tassell to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Rebecca Van Tassell, appearing on behalf of all Plaintiffs (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055991.) Related document: #9 Amended MOTION for Mitchell A. Kamin, Jonathan M. Sperling, Jacqueline C. Charlesworth, Neema T. Sahni, and Rebecca Van Tassell to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 29, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Scott Zabrak, appearing on behalf of UMG Recordings, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055907.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Scott A. Zebrak, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Kerry M. Mustico to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 29, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jeffrey Gould, appearing on behalf of UMG Recordings, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055907.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Scott A. Zebrak, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Kerry M. Mustico to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 29, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Matthew Oppenheim, appearing on behalf of UMG Recordings, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055907.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Scott A. Zebrak, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Kerry M. Mustico to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 29, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kerry Mustico, appearing on behalf of UMG Recordings, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055907.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Scott A. Zebrak, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Kerry M. Mustico to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 plaintiffs' amended motion for Mitchell A. Kamin, Neema T. Sahni, Rebecca G. Van Tassell, Jonathan M. Sperling, and Jacqueline C. Charlesworth to appear pro hac vice; denying as moot #7 plaintiffs' motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/27/2019. (DMS)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 plaintiffs' motion for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Scott A. Zebrak, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Kerry M. Mustico to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/27/2019. (DMS)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION for Mitchell A. Kamin, Jonathan M. Sperling, Jacqueline C. Charlesworth, Neema T. Sahni, and Rebecca Van Tassell to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Scott A. Zebrak, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Kerry M. Mustico to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Mitchell A. Kamin, Neema T. Sahni, Rebecca G. Van Tassell, Jonathan M. Sperling, and Jacqueline C. Charlesworth to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (LD)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Bright House Networks, LLC. (LD)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/8/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/25/2019. (KTT)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/8/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/25/2019. (KTT)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-710-T-35TGW. (SJB)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-15272664) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Hull, Bryan) Modified on 3/25/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Bright House Networks, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Mills Music, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Publishing Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corp.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Miller Catalog Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Music
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colgems-EMI Music Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zomba Recording LLC
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volcano Entertainment III, LLC
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Publishing AB
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Feist Catalog Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: J. Hardy Ehlers
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: Phil Hill
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Anders Linderot
Represented By: Andrew Guerra
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roadrunner Records, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan D. Hull
Represented By: Marc Chen
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gould
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kamin
Represented By: Matthew J. Oppenheim
Represented By: William O'Neil
Represented By: Rebecca G. Van Tassell
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Charlesworth
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Megan O'Neil
Represented By: Kerry Malloy Mustico
Represented By: Scott A. Zebrak
Represented By: Jonathan M. Sperling
Represented By: Mark Y. Chen
Represented By: Megan M O'Neill
Represented By: William E. O'Neil
Represented By: Joshua B. Picker
Represented By: Rebecca Eve Weissman
Represented By: Stacey K. Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [