IN RE: January 2021 Short Squeeze Trading Litigation
Consolidated Plaintiff: Ethan Arellano, Michael D Scalia, Carolyn Collier, Patrick Young, Andrea Juncadella, Michael Ridpath, Christine Bukowski, Chastity Woodward, William Urrutia, Matt Scime, Michelle del Valle, Peter Fray, Omar Alsaedi, Charles Fellows, Amanda Giuliani, Jessica Hines, Bryan Joyner, Andrew B. Courtney, Travis Elliott, Asad Noorzaie, Mike Ross, Drew Hunnicutt, Mike Vallejo, Mr. Richard Joseph Gatz, Marc A. Fresa, Kevin Kelley, Mohammed A. Doleh, Sabrina Clapp, Daniel S. Kadin, Joseph Daniluk, Nick Parker, Larry Cherry, Officer David Segovia, Jayesh Shah, Anthony R Reyes, Brian Ng, Elvia Curiel-Ruth, Allen Zelewski, Bharat Thakkar, Marina Siruk, Kevin Sheehan, Angel Guzman, James Hill, Michael Watson, Julie Fox, Timothy A. Nordeen, Cody Hill, Patryk Krasowski, Josh Gossett, Sagi Cezana, Preenon Huq, Igor Kravchenko, Jacob Rosmarin, Spencer Lybrook, Uniqueka Best, Skyler Baird, Eric Eisen, Ariel Rubenstein, Steffon Dunlop, Tenzin Woiser, Dillon Rogers, Benedict Wong, Eric Quat, Julie Moody, Michael McFadden, Nicholas Bogan, Robert Days, Nermin Memic, Jordan Krumenacker, DAMON MUNCY, Jhanna White, Christian A. Dalton, Erika Mercado, Shane Cheng, Royal Williams, Chetan Patel, Matthew M Lavin, Taylor Perri, Carlos Ferreiro, Brian Belderrain, Bartosz Zybura, Hani Odeh, Anuj Kapur, Scott Schiller, Steven Minnick, Alaa Khoury, Rasheed Best, Aaron Kolysko, Chance Daniels, David Wieg, Austin Schaff, Hanna Kayali, David Moody, Aaron Fassinger, James Hiscock, Dan Dechirico, Brandon Nelson, Marcus Lagmanson, Summit Thakral, Jonathan Diamond, Ryan Heitz, Danielle Perreault, Emil Petrosyan, Terell Sterling, Steven Baird, Jean-Paul Saliba, Francis Shaeffer, Zachary Ziegler, Raymond Norvell, Mark Feeney, Maurice Scarborough, James LaPlant, Petro Siruk, Denise Redfield, Mark Milhouse, Zackary Kelley, Michael Oberlin, Jason Fossella, Alec English, Ryan Zachary Ross, Richard Conley, C. Louis Bunya and Joshua Palmer
Consolidated Defendant: Citadel LLC doing business as Citadel Securities, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, Point72 Asset Management, L.P., IBG Holdings, LLC, Square, LLC, Robinhood Crypto, LLC, Stash Financial, Inc., Merrill Edge, Apex Clearing Corporation, Square Inc., Citadel Execution Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, Smith, Does 1-50, IG Group Holdings PLC, Firstrade Securities, Inc., Trading 212 UK Ltd., John Does 1-10, The Interactive Brokers Group Inc and Subsidiaries, eToro USA Securities, Inc., Trade Republic, The Depository Trust Company, Dough LLC, Cash App Investing LLC, Melvin Capital Management, LP, The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Freetrade, Ltd., Open to the Public Investing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Candlestick Capital Management L.P., E Trade Asset Management, Inc., Interactive Brokers Corp, Interactive Brokers, LLC, E Trade Financial Corp, Alpaca Securities, LLC, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Citadel, EFT, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc., Ally Financial Inc., Barclays Bank PLC, ETrade Securities LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Financial Securities, LLC, John Does, Fumi Holdings, Inc., Maplelane Capital, LLC, IBG, LLC, D1 Capital Partner, L.P., TD Ameritrade, Inc., Trading 212 Ltd., Does 1-100, inclusive, Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Webull Financial, LLC, Free Freetrade, LTD., TD Ameritrade Holding Corp, Citadel Securities, LLC and M1 Finance, LLC
In Re: January 2021 Short Squeeze Trading Litigation
Case Number: 1:2021md02989
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1407
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 326 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference held on 04/19/21, before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, 1-64 pages, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021. (smn)
June 7, 2021 Filing 325 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason David Sternberg on behalf of Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities, LLC. Attorney Jason David Sternberg added to party Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC(pty:condft), Attorney Jason David Sternberg added to party Citadel Securities, LLC(pty:condft). (Sternberg, Jason)
June 7, 2021 Filing 324 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John F. O'Sullivan on behalf of Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities, LLC. Attorney John F. O'Sullivan added to party Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC(pty:condft), Attorney John F. O'Sullivan added to party Citadel Securities, LLC(pty:condft). (O'Sullivan, John)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER re #322 Joint Status Report. The Plaintiffs shall file a single master complaint per Tranche on or before July 12, 2021. Defendants in each Tranche shall file a joint motion to dismiss on or before August 16, 2021. Plaintiffs' responses in opposition to Defendants' joint motions to dismiss shall be filed by September 7, 2021. Defendants' replies to Plaintiffs' responses shall be filed by September 21, 2021. (Motions due by 8/16/2021, Responses due by 9/7/2021, Replies due by 9/21/2021). Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
June 2, 2021 Filing 322 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) (Per D.E. 310) by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Case List, #2 Exhibit B. Proposed Order)(Furst, Rachel)
May 28, 2021 Filing 321 NOTICE by DAMON MUNCY, Cody Todd re #307 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel,,,,, Regarding the Republication of Notice Pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 (Rosen, Laurence)
May 27, 2021 Filing 320 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Selin Demir (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER that Defendant Barclays Bank PLC is dismissed from this action without prejudice re ( #318 in case 1:21-md-02989-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/27/2021. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21478-CMA, 1:21-cv-21451-CMA, 1:21-cv-21441-CMA, 1:21-cv-21338-CMA, 1:21-cv-21318-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 26, 2021 Filing 318 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Barclays Bank PLC by Shane Cheng (Saveri, Joseph)
May 25, 2021 Filing 317 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel B. Rehns on behalf of Dan Dechirico, Angel Guzman, Joshua Palmer. Attorney Daniel B. Rehns added to party Dan Dechirico(pty:conpla), Attorney Daniel B. Rehns added to party Angel Guzman(pty:conpla), Attorney Daniel B. Rehns added to party Joshua Palmer(pty:conpla). (Rehns, Daniel)
May 24, 2021 Filing 316 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Daniel B. Rehns (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
May 24, 2021 Attorney Dennis S. Ellis representing Steering Committe Members (Movant) terminated per DE #315 Order. (mc)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Re: New Applicants Seeking Appointment to the Steering Committee. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes)
May 21, 2021 Filing 314 Statement of: Renewed Application Of Melissa R. Emert For Leadership Position To Fill Vacated Seat by Michael Oberlin (Graifman, Gary)
May 21, 2021 Filing 313 Statement of: Application for Appointment of Jason S. Rathod to the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee to Fill Vacated Seat by Mark Feeney, Jason Fossella re #312 Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resume)(Rathod, Jason)
May 20, 2021 Filing 312 Statement of: Application to Replace Dennis Ellis with Matthew L. Venezia on Plaintiff's Steering Committee by Robert Days (Venezia, Matthew)
May 20, 2021 Filing 311 TRANSCRIPT of hearing held on 05/17/2021 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, 1-113 pages, Court Reporter: Sharon Velazco, 305-523-5636 / Sharon_PellVelazco@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2021. (Pell Velazco, Sharon)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER on Leadership Structure and Appointing Counsel to Designated Leadership Roles. (Status Report due by 6/2/2021). Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/18/2021. This Document Relates to 1:21-md-2989-CMA and to All Actions. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 18, 2021 Filing 309 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Heather L. Blaise (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
May 18, 2021 Filing 308 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for James M. Evangelista (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER denying #26 Movant Cody Todd's Motion to: (1) Appoint Lead Plaintiff; and (2) Approve Selection of Lead Counsel; denying #144 Plaintiffs Eric Quat, Aaron Fassinger, Mike Ross, Igor Kravchenko, Michael McFadden and Tenzin Woiser's Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs and Approve Their Selection of Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/17/2021. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21261-CMA, 1:21-cv-21293-CMA, 1:21-cv-21298-CMA, 1:21-cv-21307-CMA, 1:21-cv-21310-CMA, 1:21-cv-21343-CMA, 1:21-cv-21404-CMA, 1:21-cv-21534-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 17, 2021 Filing 306 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 5/17/2021. Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Natalia Maria Salas, Gabriel Amin Assaad, Rachel Wagner Furst, Joseph R. Saveri, Dennis S. Ellis, Frank R. Schirripa, Maurice David Pessah, Jeffrey A. Klafter, Roy T. Willey, IV, Peter G.A. Safirstein, Court Reporter: Sharon Velazco, 305-523-5636 / Sharon_PellVelazco@flsd.uscourts.gov. (edr)
May 14, 2021 Filing 305 Statement of: Written Disclosures of Gary S. Graifman And Melissa R. Emert Application For Plaintiffs Leadership by Michael Oberlin (Graifman, Gary)
May 14, 2021 Filing 304 Statement of: Written Disclosures of Peter Safirstein Application For Plaintiffs Leadership by Michael Oberlin (Graifman, Gary)
May 14, 2021 Filing 303 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tamara Rozina on behalf of Maplelane Capital, LLC. Attorney Tamara Rozina added to party Maplelane Capital, LLC(pty:condft). (Rozina, Tamara)
May 14, 2021 Filing 302 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Yoskowitz on behalf of Maplelane Capital, LLC. Attorney Jack Yoskowitz added to party Maplelane Capital, LLC(pty:condft). (Yoskowitz, Jack)
May 14, 2021 Filing 301 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Tamara Rozina (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
May 14, 2021 Filing 298 Statement of: WRITTEN DISCLOSURES OF MAURICE D. PESSAH, APPLICANT FOR PLAINTIFFS LEADERSHIP by Josh Gossett, Ryan Heitz, James LaPlant, Danielle Perreault, Taylor Perri, Kevin Sheehan (Pessah, Maurice)
May 14, 2021 Filing 297 Statement of: Written Disclosures of Lead Counsel Applicant Dennis S. Ellis by Robert Days re #286 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, (Venezia, Matthew)
May 14, 2021 Filing 296 Statement of: Written Disclosures for Plaintiffs' Leadership Applicant Natalia M. Salas by Omar Alsaedi, Ethan Arellano, Christine Bukowski, Carolyn Collier, Travis Elliott, Charles Fellows, Amanda Giuliani, Jessica Hines, Bryan Joyner, Andrea Juncadella, Michael Ridpath, Matt Scime, William Urrutia, Chastity Woodward, Patrick Young, Michelle del Valle re #286 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, (Salas, Natalia)
May 14, 2021 Filing 295 Statement of: Written Disclosures of Rachel W. Furst, Applicant for Plaintiffs' Leadership by Sagi Cezana re #286 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, (Furst, Rachel)
May 14, 2021 Filing 294 Statement of: Written Disclosures of Frank R. Schirripa in Support of his Application for Appointment by Dan Dechirico, Angel Guzman, Joshua Palmer re #286 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, (Schirripa, Frank)
May 13, 2021 Filing 300 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Tamara Rozina (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
May 13, 2021 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jack Yoskowitz (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
May 13, 2021 Filing 293 Statement of: Written Disclosures in Support of Motion to Appoint Joseph R. Saveri as Interim Lead Counsel by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling re #286 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, (Saveri, Joseph)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER re #286 Order on Interviews for Leadership Structure. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes)
May 11, 2021 Filing 291 Statement of: Written Disclosures of Roy T. Willey, IV in Support of his Application for Appointment by David Moody, Julie Moody re #286 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #251 Notice (Other), (Willey, Roy)
May 11, 2021 Filing 290 Statement of: JEFFREY A. KLAFTER'S WRITTEN DISCLOSURES IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF HIS APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS AN INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Patryk Krasowski, Nick Parker re #249 Notice (Other), #286 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #243 Notice (Other), (Klafter, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2021 Filing 289 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Melissa R. Emert by Michael Oberlin (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Graifman, Gary)
May 10, 2021 Filing 288 Statement of: Written Disclosures of Gabriel A. Assaad, Applicant for Plaintiffs' Leadership by C. Louis Bunya, Drew Hunnicutt, Erika Mercado, Ryan Zachary Ross (Assaad, Gabriel)
May 6, 2021 Filing 287 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Scott Geller on behalf of Maplelane Capital, LLC, Richard S Geller. Attorney Richard Scott Geller added to party Maplelane Capital, LLC(pty:condft). (Geller, Richard)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER on Interviews for Leadership Structure re #209 Case Management Order, #243 Notice of Filing Leadership Applications of Plaintiffs' Attorneys. Leadership presentations/interviews will be conducted in one session, on May 17, 2021 beginning at 11:00 a.m. The Court directs each applicant for Plaintiffs' leadership to file on the docket with the Court written responses to the questions by May 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 TENTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 4, 2021 Filing 284 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-21665-CMA Eisen v. Apex Clearing Corporation et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA (mc)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER adopting (3 in case 1:21-cv-21448-CMA) Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint (1 in case 1:21-cv-21448-CMA) is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Clerks Note: JPML notified. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/3/2021. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21448-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 4, 2021 Filing 282 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Lawrence E. Buterman re #278 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Lawrence E. Buterman has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing a Notice in all pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
May 3, 2021 Filing 281 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Cody Todd under the federal securities laws MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. under the federal securities laws filed by Cody Todd. (Rosen, Laurence)
May 3, 2021 Filing 280 REPLY to Response to Motion re #144 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Eric Quat, Aaron Fassinger, Mike Ross, Igor Kravchenko, Michael McFadden and Tenzin Woiser filed by Aaron Fassinger, Igor Kravchenko, Michael McFadden, Eric Quat, Mike Ross, Tenzin Woiser. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah N. Westcot, #2 Exhibit A)(Westcot, Sarah)
May 3, 2021 Filing 279 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Richard D. Owens (Owens, Richard)
May 3, 2021 Filing 278 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Lawrence E. Buterman (Buterman, Lawrence)
May 3, 2021 Filing 277 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Lilia B. Vazova (Vazova, Lilia)
April 30, 2021 Filing 276 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holding Corp, TD Ameritrade, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation. Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr added to party Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr added to party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr added to party TD Ameritrade Holding Corp(pty:condft), Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr added to party TD Ameritrade, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr added to party The Charles Schwab Corporation(pty:condft). (Boutrous, Theodore)
April 30, 2021 Filing 275 NOTICE of filing OBJECTIONS to (3 in case 1:21-cv-21448-CMA) Report and Recommendations by Marina Siruk, Petro Siruk (mc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 274 NOTICE by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC of Filing Robinhood's Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to the Report and Recommendation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Danon, Samuel)
April 29, 2021 Filing 273 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by H. Gregory Howard on behalf of Alpaca Securities, LLC, Fumi Holdings, Inc., Webull Financial, LLC, eToro USA Securities, Inc.. Attorney H. Gregory Howard added to party Alpaca Securities, LLC(pty:condft), Attorney H. Gregory Howard added to party Fumi Holdings, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney H. Gregory Howard added to party Webull Financial, LLC(pty:condft), Attorney H. Gregory Howard added to party eToro USA Securities, Inc.(pty:condft). (Howard, H.)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER that Consol Jonathan Diamond is dismissed from this action without prejudice re ( #271 in case 1:21-md-02989-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/28/2021. Clerks Note: JPML notified. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21263-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 28, 2021 Filing 271 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jonathan Diamond (Varnell, Janet)
April 28, 2021 Filing 270 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-21600-CMA Oberlin v. TD Ameritrade, Inc. with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA (mc)
April 28, 2021 Filing 269 NOTICE by Omar Alsaedi, Ethan Arellano, Christine Bukowski, Carolyn Collier, Travis Elliott, Charles Fellows, Amanda Giuliani, Jessica Hines, Bryan Joyner, Andrea Juncadella, Michael Ridpath, Matt Scime, William Urrutia, Chastity Woodward, Patrick Young, Michelle del Valle re #246 Notice (Other),, #243 Notice (Other), of Filing Updated Exhibit A in Support of Leadership Application of Natalia M. Salas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Updated Exhibit A- List of Law Firms and Plaintiffs' Lawyers Supporting Natalia M. Salas as Lead Counsel) (Salas, Natalia)
April 27, 2021 Filing 268 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Kevin S. Hannon (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 27, 2021 Filing 267 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Anupama Reddy (Reddy, Anupama)
April 27, 2021 Filing 266 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Christopher Kar-Lun Young (Young, Christopher)
April 27, 2021 Filing 265 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Steven Noel Williams (Williams, Steven)
April 27, 2021 Filing 264 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Gary S. Graifman by Michael Oberlin (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Graifman, Gary)
April 27, 2021 Filing 263 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
April 27, 2021 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for David A. Domina (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
April 27, 2021 Filing 261 Clerks Notice to Filer re #244 Notice (Other),. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
April 27, 2021 Filing 260 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Rey Ogden on behalf of C. Louis Bunya, Drew Hunnicutt, Erika Mercado, Ryan Zachary Ross (Ogden, William)
April 27, 2021 Filing 259 Clerks Notice to Filer re #249 Notice (Other),. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, See DE# 257 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
April 27, 2021 Filing 258 Clerks Notice to Filer re #248 Notice (Other),,. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, See DE# 256 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
April 27, 2021 Filing 255 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Joseph R. Saveri re #242 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Joseph R. Saveri has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing a Notice in all pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. Also, each attorney must file their own Notice and complete the Pacer process as well. One Notice is not sufficient for all attorneys in the same firm. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
April 26, 2021 Filing 257 DECLARATION signed by: Jeffrey A. Klafter in Support re #243 Notice (Other), by Patryk Krasowski, Nick Parker. (For Image See DE#249 ) (cds)
April 26, 2021 Filing 256 DECLARATION signed by: Dennis S. Ellis in Support re #243 Notice (Other), by Robert Days (For Image See DE#248 ) (cds)
April 26, 2021 Filing 254 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Eric Quat, Aaron Fassinger, Mike Ross, Igor Kravchenko, Michael McFadden and Tenzin Woiser filed by Cody Todd. Replies due by 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
April 26, 2021 Filing 253 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Cody Todd under the federal securities laws MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. under the federal securities laws filed by Aaron Fassinger, Igor Kravchenko, Michael McFadden, Eric Quat, Mike Ross, Tenzin Woiser. Replies due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah N. Westcot, #2 Exhibit A)(Westcot, Sarah)
April 26, 2021 Filing 252 NOTICE by Shane Cheng, Terell Sterling Notice of Filing in Support of Plaintiffs Shane Cheng and Terell Sterling's Motion to Appoint Joseph R. Saveri as Interim Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri in Support of Cheng Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Joseph R. Saveri as Interim Lead Counsel, #2 Exhibit A - Firm Resume of Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP, #3 Exhibit B - JSLF Team Member Biographies, #4 Exhibit C - Proposed Time-Keeping and Expense Protocols, #5 Declaration of Anupama K. Reddy in Support of Cheng Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Joseph R. Saveri as Interim Lead Counsel, #6 Declaration of Christopher K.L. Young in Support of Cheng Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Joseph R. Saveri as Interim Lead Counsel, #7 Declaration of Catherine K. Smith in Support of Cheng Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Joseph R. Saveri as Interim Lead Counsel, #8 Declaration of Austin B. Cohen in Support of Cheng Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Joseph R. Saveri as Interim Lead Counsel) (Saveri, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Filing 251 NOTICE by David Moody, Julie Moody re #243 Notice (Other), Notice of Declaration of Roy T. Willey, IV and Exhibit in Support of Application for Appointment of Roy T. Willey, IV (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roy T. Willey, IV, #2 Exhibit 1 - Career Highlights of William M. Audet) (Willey, Roy)
April 26, 2021 Filing 250 NOTICE by Sagi Cezana re #243 Notice (Other), Notice of Filing Rachel Furst CV (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rachel Furst CV) (Furst, Rachel)
April 26, 2021 Filing 249 NOTICE by Patryk Krasowski, Nick Parker re #243 Notice (Other), of Declaration and Exhibits in Support of Jeffrey A. Klafter Application for Interim Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Klafter Lesser LLP Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Juncadella Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Krasowski Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Byrd McDonald's Complaint) (Klafter, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2021 Filing 248 NOTICE by Robert Days re #243 Notice (Other), Declaration of Dennis S. Ellis in Support of Application to be Appointed as Co-Lead Interim Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Browne George Ross, et al. Firm Information, #2 Exhibit B - Browne George Ross, et al. Firm Articles, #3 Exhibit C - Dennis S. Ellis Bio, #4 Exhibit D - Katherine F. Murray Bio, #5 Exhibit E - Carl A. Roth Bio, #6 Exhibit F - Matthew L. Venezia Bio, #7 Exhibit G - Law Firm Support List) (Venezia, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Filing 247 AFFIDAVIT of Frank R. Schirripa in Support of Application for Leadership signed by: F. Schirripa re #243 Notice (Other), by Dan Dechirico, Angel Guzman, Joshua Palmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HRSC Firm Bio, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chart of Counsel Support for Salas-Ellis-Schirripa Slate)(Hettler, Kathryn)
April 26, 2021 Filing 246 NOTICE by Omar Alsaedi, Ethan Arellano, Christine Bukowski, Carolyn Collier, Travis Elliott, Charles Fellows, Amanda Giuliani, Jessica Hines, Bryan Joyner, Andrea Juncadella, Michael Ridpath, Matt Scime, William Urrutia, Chastity Woodward, Patrick Young, Michelle del Valle re #243 Notice (Other), of Filing Exhibits in Support of Leadership Application of Natalia M. Salas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Law Firms and Pls' Lawyers Supporting Application of Natalia M. Salas, #2 Exhibit CV of Natalia M. Salas and The Ferraro Law Firm, P.A., #3 Exhibit CV of Bruce S. Rogow) (Salas, Natalia)
April 26, 2021 Filing 245 NOTICE by Josh Gossett, James LaPlant, Danielle Perreault, Maurice Scarborough, Scott Schiller re #243 Notice (Other), of Exhibits in Support of Application of Maurice D. Pessah for Appointment to Plaintiff's Leadership Committee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Gossett, et al. v. Robinhood Financial, et al. First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. CV of Pessah Law Group's Attorneys, #3 Exhibit C. Pessah Law Group's MDL Resources Page, #4 Exhibit D. Spreadsheet of Cases Submitted to the JPML) (Pessah, Maurice)
April 26, 2021 Filing 244 NOTICE by Michael Oberlin re #243 Of Filing Of Exhibits To Appl. For Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff And Selection Of Counsel. Attorney Gary S. Graifman added to party Michael Oberlin(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To Appl. For Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff--Firm Resume Of Safirstein Metcalf LLP, #2 Exhibit B To Appl. For Appointment Of Lead Plaintiff--Firm Resume Of KGG) (Graifman, Gary) Modified to add document link on 4/27/2021 (cds).
April 26, 2021 Filing 243 NOTICE by Sagi Cezana Notice of Filing Plaintiffs' Leadership Applications (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assaad Application, #2 Exhibit Ellis Application, #3 Exhibit Furst Application, #4 Exhibit Klafter Application, #5 Exhibit Oberlin Application, #6 Exhibit Pessah Application, #7 Exhibit Salas Application, #8 Exhibit Saveri Application, #9 Exhibit Schirripa Application, #10 Exhibit Willey Application) (Furst, Rachel)
April 26, 2021 Filing 242 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Filing 241 Statement of: PLAINTIFF DANILUK'S STATEMENT ON LEADERSHIP OF THIS MDL by Joseph Daniluk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Green, Robert)
April 26, 2021 Filing 240 Statement of: Recommendation for Jeffrey Klafter for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel by Mark Feeney, Jason Fossella (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resume of Jason S. Rathod)(Rathod, Jason)
April 26, 2021 Filing 239 NOTICE of Exhibit 1 - Assaad Aplication - 3M Combat Arms Leadership Structure by Ryan Zachary Ross (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 2 - Assaad Application 3M Combat Arms CMO 4, #2 Exhibits 3 - Assaad Application - CV 2021-Short Squeeze) (Assaad, Gabriel) Modified text per attorney's requests on 4/26/2021 (mc).
April 26, 2021 Filing 238 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for William Rey Ogden (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 237 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Ryan McDevitt (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 236 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Rachel E. Morowitz (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 235 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Maxwell Goins (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 234 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Gretchen Freeman Cappio (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 233 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Stuart J. Guber (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NINTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 23, 2021 Filing 231 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristi Stahnke McGregor on behalf of Francis Shaeffer (McGregor, Kristi)
April 23, 2021 Filing 230 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jason S. Rathod (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 23, 2021 Filing 229 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-21534-CMA Best et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA (mc)
April 23, 2021 Filing 228 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Evan Selik (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 227 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Erica L. Stone (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 226 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Michael A. Cohen (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 225 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Leiv Blad (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 224 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Allison Vissichelli (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 223 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for H. Gregory Howard (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 EIGHTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 21, 2021 Filing 221 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Adrian Gucovschi (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 21, 2021 Filing 220 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua H. Grabar on behalf of Sabrina Clapp. Attorney Joshua H. Grabar added to party Denise Redfield(pty:conpla). (Grabar, Joshua) Modified party name on 4/21/2021 (mc).
April 21, 2021 Filing 219 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Joshua H. Grabar (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 21, 2021 Filing 218 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake Abbott on behalf of David Moody, Julie Moody. Attorney Blake Abbott added to party David Moody(pty:conpla), Attorney Blake Abbott added to party Julie Moody(pty:conpla). (Abbott, Blake)
April 20, 2021 Filing 217 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Eve-Lynn J. Rapp (Rapp, Eve-Lynn)
April 20, 2021 Filing 216 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Kathryn A. Hettler (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 20, 2021 Filing 215 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Frank R. Schirripa (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Dismissing Consol Plaintiff Daniel S. Kadin from this action without prejudice re (7 in case 1:21-cv-21511-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/20/2021. Clerks Note: JPML notified. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 20, 2021 Filing 213 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Blake G. Abbott (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 20, 2021 Filing 212 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Peter Safirstein (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 20, 2021 Filing 211 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 1:21-cv-02566 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21511-CMA on 4/20/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 20, 2021 Filing 210 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Richard C. Dalton (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER of Procedures for Appointment of Counsel re 202 Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/19/2021. (Responses due by 4/26/2021, Replies due by 5/3/2021 re #26 , #144 Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel). See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 19, 2021 Filing 208 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Charles D. Marshall by Joseph Daniluk (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Green, Robert)
April 19, 2021 Filing 207 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Linda J. Brewer (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 19, 2021 Filing 206 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C. Tarlowe on behalf of Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. Attorney Richard C. Tarlowe added to party Point72 Asset Management, L.P.(pty:condft). (Tarlowe, Richard)
April 19, 2021 Filing 205 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Kramer on behalf of Point72 Asset Management, L.P.. Attorney Daniel J. Kramer added to party Point72 Asset Management, L.P.(pty:condft). (Kramer, Daniel)
April 19, 2021 Filing 204 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Korinna S. Anderson (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 19, 2021 Filing 203 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Harry A. Olivar (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 19, 2021 Filing 202 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Status Conference held on 4/19/2021. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Natalia Maria Salas, Sean Alexander Burstyn, Rachel Wagner Furst, William M. Audet, Jason J. Mendro, Joseph R. Saveri, Sean A. Byrstyn, Jeffrey A. Klafter, Roy T. Willey, IV, Kevin J. Orsini, Phillip Kim. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (edr)
April 18, 2021 Filing 200 NOTICE by Sagi Cezana, Sagi Cezana Notice of Filing Case List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pending Case List) (Furst, Rachel)
April 18, 2021 Filing 199 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Castellanos Alvarado, Maria)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER that Consol Plaintiffs Taylor Perri, Ryan Heitz, and Kevin Sheehan are dismissed from this action without prejudice re ( #194 in case 1:21-md-02989-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2021. Clerks Note: JPML notified. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21266-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 198 NOTICE of Striking #142 Certificate of Understanding, filed by ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, E Trade Financial Corp, #141 Certificate of Understanding, filed by ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, E Trade Financial Corp by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Homer, Peter)
April 16, 2021 Filing 197 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc H. Edelson on behalf of Sabrina Clapp. Attorney Marc H. Edelson added to party Sabrina Clapp(pty:conpla). (Edelson, Marc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 196 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Texas. Case Number 4:21-cv-01083 with documents 1-5. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21479-CMA on 4/16/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 195 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Minnesota. Case Number 0:21-cv-00689 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21478-CMA on 4/16/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 194 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Ryan Heitz, Taylor Perri, Kevin Sheehan (Taaffe, Michael)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 SEVENTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 192 NOTICE of Striking #136 Certificate of Understanding, filed by ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, E Trade Financial Corp by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Homer, Peter)
April 16, 2021 Filing 191 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Kenneth R. O'Rourke (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 190 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Marc H. Edelson (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 189 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul T. Llewellyn on behalf of FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC (Llewellyn, Paul)
April 16, 2021 Filing 188 Clerks Notice to Filer re #141 Certificate of Understanding, #142 Certificate of Understanding. Missing Signature; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - No electronic signature accepted for the Certificate of Understanding, original signature is required. The Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the original signature (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 187 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Ann McLoone on behalf of Ally Financial Inc.. Attorney Jennifer Ann McLoone added to party Ally Financial Inc.(pty:condft). (McLoone, Jennifer)
April 16, 2021 Filing 186 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado on behalf of Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Attorney Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado added to party Robinhood Financial LLC(pty:condft), Attorney Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:condft). (Castellanos Alvarado, Maria)
April 16, 2021 Filing 185 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gustavo Javier Membiela on behalf of Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Attorney Gustavo Javier Membiela added to party Robinhood Financial LLC(pty:condft), Attorney Gustavo Javier Membiela added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Gustavo Javier Membiela added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:condft). (Membiela, Gustavo)
April 16, 2021 Filing 184 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Alberto Danon on behalf of Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Attorney Samuel Alberto Danon added to party Robinhood Financial LLC(pty:condft), Attorney Samuel Alberto Danon added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Samuel Alberto Danon added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:condft). (Danon, Samuel)
April 16, 2021 Filing 183 Corrected CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Gina Cora by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Homer, Peter)
April 16, 2021 Filing 182 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott David Hirsch on behalf of Julie Fox, Preenon Huq. Attorney Scott David Hirsch added to party Julie Fox(pty:conpla), Attorney Scott David Hirsch added to party Preenon Huq(pty:conpla). (Hirsch, Scott)
April 16, 2021 Filing 181 Corrected CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Janet Jones-Duffey by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Homer, Peter)
April 16, 2021 Filing 180 Corrected CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Brian S. Weinstein by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Homer, Peter)
April 16, 2021 Filing 179 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Oregon. Case Number 3:21-cv-00319 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21453-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 178 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of New York. Case Number 1:21-cv-00677 with documents 1-66. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21451-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 177 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Nebraska. Case Number 8:21-cv-00093 with documents 1-25. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21450-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 176 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Minnesota. Case Number 0:21-cv-00415 with documents 1-4. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21448-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 175 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:21-cv-01643 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21447-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 174 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:21-cv-01601 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21446-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 173 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Florida. Case Number 8:21-cv-00329 with documents 1-14. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21445-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 172 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of California. Case Number 3:21-cv-00238 with documents 1-4. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21444-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 171 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell B. Balikian on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holding Corp, TD Ameritrade, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation. Attorney Russell B. Balikian added to party Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Russell B. Balikian added to party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Russell B. Balikian added to party TD Ameritrade Holding Corp(pty:condft), Attorney Russell B. Balikian added to party TD Ameritrade, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Russell B. Balikian added to party The Charles Schwab Corporation(pty:condft). (Balikian, Russell)
April 15, 2021 Filing 170 NOTICE of Striking #134 Certificate of Understanding, filed by ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, E Trade Financial Corp, #135 Certificate of Understanding, filed by ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, E Trade Financial Corp by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Homer, Peter)
April 15, 2021 Filing 169 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason J. Mendro on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holding Corp, TD Ameritrade, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation. Attorney Jason J. Mendro added to party Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Jason J. Mendro added to party TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Jason J. Mendro added to party TD Ameritrade Holding Corp(pty:condft), Attorney Jason J. Mendro added to party TD Ameritrade, Inc.(pty:condft), Attorney Jason J. Mendro added to party The Charles Schwab Corporation(pty:condft). (Mendro, Jason)
April 15, 2021 Filing 168 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Emrah M. Sumer by Joseph Daniluk (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Green, Robert)
April 15, 2021 Filing 167 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Robert S. Green by Joseph Daniluk (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Green, Robert)
April 15, 2021 Filing 166 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-01596 with documents 1-23. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21442-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 165 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00896 with documents 1-38. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21441-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 164 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00871 with documents 1-28. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21432-CMA on 4/14/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 163 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 3:21-cv-00980 with documents 1-40. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21430-CMA on 4/14/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 162 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Arkansas. Case Number 4:21-cv-00093 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21428-CMA on 4/14/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 161 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of Texas Case Number 4:21-01083 Memic et al v. Markets, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #160 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 160 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2989 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Cecilia M. Altonaga. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 159 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Daniel J. Kramer (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Richard C. Tarlowe (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 157 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Lawrence E. Buterman (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Richard D. Owens (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Lilia B. Vazova (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Colleen E. Heyler (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Brendan J. Coffman (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 152 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Paul T. Llewellyn (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 151 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Evangelina A.Z. Burbidge (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 150 Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Peter Homer in the amount of $200.00 on 04/15/2021 re #123 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, (mua)
April 15, 2021 Filing 149 Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Peter Homer in the amount of $200.00 on 04/15/2021 re #123 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, (mua)
April 15, 2021 Filing 148 Clerks Notice of Filing Fee refunded to Peter Homer in the amount of $200.00 on 04/15/2021 re #115 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (mua)
April 15, 2021 Filing 147 Clerks Notice to Filer re #136 Certificate of Understanding. Missing Signature. CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - No electronic signature accepted for the Certificate of Understanding, original signature is required. The Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the original signature.(mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 146 Clerks Notice to Filer re #134 Certificate of Understanding, #135 Certificate of Understanding. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the correct document that matches the docket text. (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 145 NOTICE by Sagi Cezana, Andrea Juncadella Notice of Filing Joint Proposed Agenda. Attorney Rachel Wagner Furst added to party Andrea Juncadella(pty:conpla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Agenda) (Furst, Rachel)
April 14, 2021 Filing 144 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Eric Quat, Aaron Fassinger, Mike Ross, Igor Kravchenko, Michael McFadden and Tenzin Woiser by Aaron Fassinger, Igor Kravchenko, Michael McFadden, Eric Quat, Mike Ross, Tenzin Woiser. Responses due by 4/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Sarah Westcot in Support of Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Westcot, Sarah)
April 14, 2021 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jeffrey Evan Kwatinetz by Omar Alsaedi, Ethan Arellano, Christine Bukowski, Carolyn Collier, Travis Elliott, Charles Fellows, Amanda Giuliani, Jessica Hines, Bryan Joyner, Andrea Juncadella, Michael Ridpath, Matt Scime, William Urrutia, Chastity Woodward, Patrick Young, Michelle del Valle (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Salas, Natalia)
April 14, 2021 Filing 142 (STRICKEN per DE #198 ) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Brian S. Weinstein by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Homer, Peter) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (mc).
April 14, 2021 Filing 141 (STRICKEN per DE #198 ) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Janet Jones-Duffey by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Homer, Peter) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (mc).
April 14, 2021 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Christopher D. Kercher (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Robert J. Binstock (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Dennis C. Reich (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 137 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Justina K. Sessions (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc) (No email address provided) Modified text on 4/15/2021 (mc).
April 14, 2021 Filing 136 (STRICKEN per #192 ) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Gina Cora by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Homer, Peter) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (mc).
April 14, 2021 Filing 135 (STRICKEN per DE #170 ) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Janet Jones-Duffey by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Homer, Peter) Modified text on 4/16/2021 (mc).
April 14, 2021 Filing 134 (STRICKEN per DE #170 ) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Brian S. Weinstein by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Homer, Peter) Modified text on 4/16/2021 (mc).
April 14, 2021 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Eve-Lynn J. Rapp (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 132 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Marina Lev (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 131 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Shreedhar R. Patel (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Parker James Lavin (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Adam L. Hoeflich (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 128 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-21404-CMA with documents 1-7. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 FIFTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Kurt Kessler by Sagi Cezana, Elvia Curiel-Ruth (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Furst, Rachel)
April 14, 2021 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Ling Y. Kuang by Sagi Cezana, Elvia Curiel-Ruth (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Furst, Rachel)
April 14, 2021 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for William M. Audet by Sagi Cezana, Elvia Curiel-Ruth (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)). Attorney Rachel Wagner Furst added to party Elvia Curiel-Ruth(pty:conpla). (Furst, Rachel)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying as moot #113 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing ; denying as moot #114 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Solomon B. Cera (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Paul Olszowka (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Gregory M. Boyle (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jason J. Mendro (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Russell B. Balikian (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 117 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of New York Case Number 1:21-02566 Kadin v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #116 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 116 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2989 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Cecilia M. Altonaga. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying as moot #101 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Brian S. Weinstein. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 114 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Janet Jones-Duffey. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14600779 by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Responses due by 4/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(Homer, Peter)
April 13, 2021 Filing 113 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gina Cora. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14600720 by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Responses due by 4/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(Homer, Peter)
April 13, 2021 Filing 112 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Oregon Case Number 3:21-00319 Norvell et al v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. with enclosed copy of the #103 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 111 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of New York Case Number 1:21-00677 Dechirico et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #103 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 110 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Nebraska Case Number 8:21-00093 Shaeffer v. TD Ameritrade, Inc. with enclosed copy of the #103 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 109 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Minnesota Case Number 0:21-00415 Siruk et al v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al, 0:21-00689 Fox et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #103 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 108 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of Illinois Case Number 1:21-01601 Milhouse v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al, 1:21-01643 Odeh v. TD Ameritrade, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #103 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 107 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Middle District of Florida Case Number 8:21-00329 Zelewski et al v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #103 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 106 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of California Case Number 3:21-00238 Petrosyan v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #103 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 105 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of California Case Number 3:21-00980 Daniluk v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al, 4:21-00871 Saliba v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al, 4:21-00896 Clapp et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al, 4:21-01596 Lybrook et al v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #103 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 13, 2021 Filing 104 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Arkansas Case Number 4:21-00093 Kelley et al v. Robinhood Markets Inc et al with enclosed #103 copy of the order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 103 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2989 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Cecilia M. Altonaga. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Wagner Furst on behalf of Sagi Cezana. Attorney Rachel Wagner Furst added to party Sagi Cezana(pty:mov). (Furst, Rachel)
April 12, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian S. Weinstein. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14599297 by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Responses due by 4/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Homer, Peter)
April 12, 2021 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Zarema A. Jaramillo (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Maya Ginsburg (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Thomas E. Redburn, Jr. (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jonathan E. Greengarden (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Adam S. Paris (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Maurice D. Pessah (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Alexander G. Cabeceiras (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Thomas G. Haskins, Jr. (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jeffrey A. Koncius (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Cherisse H. Cleofe (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Shari Ross Lahlou (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Marc De Leeuw (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for R. Tamara de Silva (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Phillip Kim (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Belinda S. Lee (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Stuart Chelin (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Steven Bizar (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for J. Mark Gidley (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Bryan D. Gant (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jack E. Pace III (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Samuel W. Stelk (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lena Marguerite Mirilovic on behalf of Matthew M Lavin. Attorney Lena Marguerite Mirilovic added to party Matthew M Lavin(pty:conpla). (Mirilovic, Lena)
April 12, 2021 Filing 78 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00693 with documents 1-33. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21378-CMA on 4/9/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 FIFTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Matthew L. Venezia (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Sean A. Burstyn by Omar Alsaedi, Ethan Arellano, Christine Bukowski, Carolyn Collier, Travis Elliott, Charles Fellows, Amanda Giuliani, Jessica Hines, Bryan Joyner, Andrea Juncadella, Michael Ridpath, Matt Scime, William Urrutia, Chastity Woodward, Patrick Young, Michelle del Valle (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Salas, Natalia)
April 9, 2021 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Alexander G. Cabeceiras by Mohammed A. Doleh, Peter Fray, Hanna Kayali, Steven Minnick, Brandon Nelson, Jhanna White, Zachary Ziegler, Bartosz Zybura (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Miller, Caroline)
April 9, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter W. Homer on behalf of E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party E Trade Financial Corp (pty:condft), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC(pty:condft), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party ETrade Securities LLC(pty:condft), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC(pty:condft). (Homer, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Michael C. McKay by Austin Schaff (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Hill, Brandon)
April 9, 2021 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Steven N. Williams (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Anupama K. Reddy (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Christopher K.L. Young (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Joseph R. Saveri (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Gabriel A. Assaad (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Rachel Meese (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Elizabeth A. Brehm (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FOURTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 63 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case Number 2:21-cv-00489 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21353-CMA on 4/8/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 62 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Virginia. Case Number 1:21-cv-00115 with documents 1-15. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21351-CMA on 4/8/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 61 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Connecticut. Case Number 3:21-cv-00134 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21367-CMA on 4/9/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Angela Daker on behalf of Apex Clearing Corporation. Attorney Angela Daker added to party Apex Clearing Corporation(pty:condft). (Daker, Angela)
April 8, 2021 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Amir Alimehri (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jeffrey A. Klafter (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 THIRD ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 56 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Connecticut. Case Number 3:21-cv-00123 with documents 1-17. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21359-CMA on 4/8/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Roy T. Willey, IV by David Moody, Julie Moody re #46 Order (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)). Attorney Roy T. Willey, IV added to party David Moody(pty:conpla), Attorney Roy T. Willey, IV added to party Julie Moody(pty:conpla). (Willey, Roy)
April 8, 2021 Filing 54 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Texas. Case Number 4:21-cv-00292 with documents 1-21. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21338-CMA on 4/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 53 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 1:21-cv-00799 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21335-CMA on 4/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 52 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 1:21-cv-00777 with documents 1-17. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21333-CMA on 4/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 51 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00833 with documents 1-20. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21341-CMA on 4/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 50 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Texas. Case Number 4:21-cv-00311 with documents 1-12. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21350-CMA on 4/8/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 49 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00838 with documents 1-23. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21343-CMA on 4/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 48 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00861 with documents 1-28. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21349-CMA on 4/8/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 47 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00829 with documents 1-32. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21340-CMA on 4/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Schedule B - Certificate of Understanding) (mc)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SECOND ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 44 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00781 with documents 1-155. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21318-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 43 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 3:21-cv-01361 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21316-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 42 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00759 with documents 1-20. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21315-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 41 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00758 with documents 1-28. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21313-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 40 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00697 with documents 1-28. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21311-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 39 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00696 with documents 1-25. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21310-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 38 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 2:21-cv-01348 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21305-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 37 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 2:21-cv-01729 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21307-CMA. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-2989-CMA. (pes)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 35 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:21-cv-00624 with documents 1-15. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21300-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 34 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:21-cv-00574 with documents 1-14. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21299-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 33 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:21-cv-00541 with documents 1-14. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21298-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 32 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:21-cv-00510 with documents 1-21. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21297-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 31 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:21-cv-00490 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21296-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 30 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of California. Case Number 3:21-cv-00167 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21294-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 29 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of California. Case Number 21-cv-00837 with documents 1-37. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21293-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 28 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of California. Case Number 2:21-cv-00835 with documents 1-39. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21291-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Filing 27 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Florida. Case Number 4:21-cv-00061 with documents 1-17. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21295-CMA on 4/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 5, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Cody Todd under the federal securities laws ( Responses due by 4/19/2021), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. under the federal securities laws by Cody Todd. Attorney Laurence Matthew Rosen added to party Cody Todd(pty:mov). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen in Support of the Motion of Cody Todd to: (1) Appoint Lead Plaintiff; and (2) Approve Selection of Lead Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #4 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence)
April 2, 2021 Filing 25 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Florida. Case Number 8:21-cv-00234 with documents 1-12. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21266-CMA on 4/2/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 24 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Florida. Case Number 8:21-cv-00222 with documents 1-12. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21265-CMA on 4/2/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 23 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Colorado. Case Number 1:21-cv-00290 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21261-CMA on 4/2/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 22 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Florida. Case Number 8:21-cv-00216 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21264-CMA on 4/2/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 21 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Florida. Case Number 6:21-cv-00207 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21263-CMA on 4/2/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Initial Status Conference for 4/19/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. One hour has been reserved for the conference; if any party anticipates requiring additional time, it shall advise the Courtroom Deputy in advance. The parties shall submit a joint proposed agenda listing items for discussion on or before April 15, 2021. The hearing will be held via video conference, with instructions to follow. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 19 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Virginia Case Number 1:21-00115 Lavin v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of Texas Case Number 4:21-00292 Ross, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al, 4:21-00311 NG, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 17 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania Case Number 2:21-00489 Minnick, et al v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 16 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of New York Case Number 1:21-00777 Nelson v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al, 1:21-00799 Williams v. Webull Financial LLC with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of New Jersey Case Number 2:21-01348 Zybura v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al, 2:21-01729 Muncy v. Robinhood Securities, LLC, et al, 3:21-01361 Noorzaie v. Robinhood Markets, Inc., et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 14 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of Illinois Case Number 1:21-00490 Gatz v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, 1:21-00510 Kayali, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al, 1:21-00541 Lagmanson, et al v. Robinhood Markets, Inc., et al, 1:21-00574 Cherry v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al, 1:21-00624 Hiscock v. TD Ameritrade, Inc. with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of Florida Case Number 4:21-00061 Baird v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Middle District of Florida Case Number 6:21-00207 Diamond v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al, 8:21-00216 Schaff v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al, 8:21-00222 Schaff v. TD Ameritrade, Inc., 8:21-00234 Perri, et al v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Connecticut Case Number 3:21-00123 Ziegler v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al, 3:21-00134 Fresa v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Colorado Case Number 1:21-00290 Daniels v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of California Case Number 3:21-00167 Nordeen, et al v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of California Case Number 4:21-00693 Wieg v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al, 4:21-00696 Days v. Robinhood Markets, Inc., et al, 4:21-00697 Dalton v. Robinhood Securities, LLC, et al, 4:21-00758 Krasowski, et al v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al, 4:21-00759 Cezana v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al, 4:21-00781 Cheng, et al v. Ally Financial Inc., et al, 4:21-00829 Curiel-Ruth v. Robinhood Securities LLC, et al, 4:21-00833 Freeney, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al. 4:21-00838 Krumenacker v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al, 4:21-00861 Moody, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Central District of California Case Number 2:21-00835 Kayali, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al, 2:21-00837 Gossett, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-80238-CMA with documents 1-17. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-20414 with documents 1-28. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 0:21-cv-60226-CMA with documents 1-15. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 0:21-cv-60220-CMA with documents 1-8. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (mc)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 04/01/2021) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2989 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Cecilia M. Altonaga. (Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair). (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: January 2021 Short Squeeze Trading Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ethan Arellano
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael D Scalia
Represented By: Ronald Peter Weil
Represented By: Marguerite Clare Racher Snyder
Represented By: Luke Thomas Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Carolyn Collier
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patrick Young
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Andrea Juncadella
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Sean A. Byrstyn
Represented By: Mathew Daniel Gutierrez
Represented By: Rachel Wagner Furst
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Ridpath
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Christine Bukowski
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chastity Woodward
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: William Urrutia
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Matt Scime
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michelle del Valle
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Peter Fray
Represented By: Alexander Cabeceiras
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Omar Alsaedi
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Charles Fellows
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Amanda Giuliani
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jessica Hines
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bryan Joyner
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Andrew B. Courtney
Represented By: Michael James McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Travis Elliott
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: James Louis Ferraro, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Kwatinetz
Represented By: Sean Alexander Burstyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Asad Noorzaie
Represented By: Ibrahim Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mike Ross
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Obergfell
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Drew Hunnicutt
Represented By: William Rey Ogden
Represented By: Gabriel Amin Assaad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mike Vallejo
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mr. Richard Joseph Gatz
Represented By: Richard Joseph Gatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marc A. Fresa
Represented By: Stephen Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kevin Kelley
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mohammed A. Doleh
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Lana Bajes Nassar
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Heather Lea Blaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sabrina Clapp
Represented By: Marc H. Edelson
Represented By: Joshua H. Grabar
Represented By: Eric Lechtzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Daniel S. Kadin
Represented By: Adrian Gucovschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joseph Daniluk
Represented By: Emrah Sumer
Represented By: Charles David Marshall
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nick Parker
Represented By: Pamela Ann Markert
Represented By: Solomon B. Cera
Represented By: Amir Alimehri
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Klafter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Larry Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Officer David Segovia
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jayesh Shah
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Anthony R Reyes
Represented By: R. Tamara de Silva
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brian Ng
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Elvia Curiel-Ruth
Represented By: Ling Y. Kuang
Represented By: Rachel Wagner Furst
Represented By: Kurt Kessler
Represented By: William M. Audet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Allen Zelewski
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powell
Represented By: Dario D. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bharat Thakkar
Represented By: Anuj Kapur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marina Siruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kevin Sheehan
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Halpern
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Brandon Michael Taaffe
Represented By: Michael D. Bressan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Angel Guzman
Represented By: Eugene Zaydfudim
Represented By: Frank R. Schirripa
Represented By: Kathryn A. Hettler
Represented By: Daniel B. Rehns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James Hill
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powell
Represented By: Dario D. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Watson
Represented By: Maxwell Holt Goins
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Rachel Morowitz
Represented By: Jeffrey Greg Lewis
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Julie Fox
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott David Hirsch
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Timothy A. Nordeen
Represented By: Gary Richard Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cody Hill
Represented By: Maxwell Holt Goins
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Rachel Morowitz
Represented By: Jeffrey Greg Lewis
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patryk Krasowski
Represented By: Pamela Ann Markert
Represented By: Solomon B. Cera
Represented By: Amir Alimehri
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Klafter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Josh Gossett
Represented By: Michael Joseph Morris-Nussbaum
Represented By: Summer Elizabeth Benson
Represented By: Maurice David Pessah
Represented By: Stuart Neil Chelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sagi Cezana
Represented By: Ling Y. Kuang
Represented By: Rachel Wagner Furst
Represented By: Kurt Kessler
Represented By: William M. Audet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Preenon Huq
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott David Hirsch
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Igor Kravchenko
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Obergfell
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jacob Rosmarin
Represented By: Adrian Gucovschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Spencer Lybrook
Represented By: Maxwell Holt Goins
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Rachel Morowitz
Represented By: Jeffrey Greg Lewis
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Uniqueka Best
Represented By: Adrian Gucovschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Skyler Baird
Represented By: Anuj Kapur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eric Eisen
Represented By: Adrian Gucovschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ariel Rubenstein
Represented By: Adrian Gucovschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Steffon Dunlop
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Seamus Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tenzin Woiser
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Obergfell
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dillon Rogers
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powell
Represented By: Dario D. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Benedict Wong
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Seamus Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eric Quat
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Obergfell
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Julie Moody
Represented By: Eric M. Poulin
Represented By: Blake Abbott
Represented By: Roy T. Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael McFadden
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Obergfell
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nicholas Bogan
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Seamus Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert Days
Represented By: Keith Joseph Wesley
Represented By: Dennis S. Ellis
Represented By: Matthew L. Venezia
Represented By: Katherine Frenck Murray
Represented By: Carl Alan Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nermin Memic
Represented By: Anuj Kapur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jordan Krumenacker
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: DAMON MUNCY
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jhanna White
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Nathaniel N. Peckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Christian A. Dalton
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Koncius
Represented By: Richard Collins Dalton
Represented By: Paul R. Kiesel
Represented By: Cherisse Heidi Alcantara Cleofe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Erika Mercado
Represented By: William Rey Ogden
Represented By: Gabriel Amin Assaad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Shane Cheng
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Anupama Reddy
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Royal Williams
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chetan Patel
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Matthew M Lavin
Represented By: Lena Marguerite Mirilovic
Represented By: Parker James Lavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Taylor Perri
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Halpern
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Brandon Michael Taaffe
Represented By: Michael D. Bressan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Carlos Ferreiro
Represented By: Anuj Kapur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brian Belderrain
Represented By: R. Tamara de Silva
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bartosz Zybura
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hani Odeh
Represented By: Alexander N. Loftus
Represented By: David Alan Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Anuj Kapur
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Scott Schiller
Represented By: Michael Joseph Morris-Nussbaum
Represented By: Summer Elizabeth Benson
Represented By: Maurice David Pessah
Represented By: Stuart Neil Chelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Steven Minnick
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Nathaniel N. Peckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alaa Khoury
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Seamus Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rasheed Best
Represented By: Adrian Gucovschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Aaron Kolysko
Represented By: Gary Richard Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chance Daniels
Represented By: Kevin Scott Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Wieg
Represented By: Ishan Dave
Represented By: Abraham Zev Wolf Melamed
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Austin Schaff
Represented By: Brandon J Hill
Represented By: Chad Andrew Justice
Represented By: Michael C. McKay
Represented By: Luis A. Cabassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hanna Kayali
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Lana Bajes Nassar
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Heather Lea Blaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Moody
Represented By: Eric M. Poulin
Represented By: Blake Abbott
Represented By: Roy T. Willey, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Aaron Fassinger
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Obergfell
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James Hiscock
Represented By: Alexander N. Loftus
Represented By: Joshua Bradford Kons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dan Dechirico
Represented By: Eugene Zaydfudim
Represented By: Frank R. Schirripa
Represented By: Kathryn A. Hettler
Represented By: Daniel B. Rehns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brandon Nelson
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Seamus Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marcus Lagmanson
Represented By: R. Tamara de Silva
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Summit Thakral
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jonathan Diamond
Represented By: Janet Robards Varnell
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Represented By: Erika Roxanne Willis
Represented By: Brian William Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ryan Heitz
Represented By: Jeremy Matthew Halpern
Represented By: Michael S. Taaffe
Represented By: Brandon Michael Taaffe
Represented By: Michael D. Bressan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Danielle Perreault
Represented By: Michael Joseph Morris-Nussbaum
Represented By: Summer Elizabeth Benson
Represented By: Maurice David Pessah
Represented By: Stuart Neil Chelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Emil Petrosyan
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Terell Sterling
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Anupama Reddy
Represented By: Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Steven Baird
Represented By: Jason Alec Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jean-Paul Saliba
Represented By: Christine Zaouk
Represented By: Evan Selik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Francis Shaeffer
Represented By: David J. Worley
Represented By: Stuart J. Guber
Represented By: James M. Evangelista
Represented By: Kristi Stahnke McGregor
Represented By: David A. Domina
Represented By: Leslie Toran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Zachary Ziegler
Represented By: Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Represented By: Caroline Hope Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Raymond Norvell
Represented By: Michael R. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mark Feeney
Represented By: Selin Demir
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Maurice Scarborough
Represented By: Michael Joseph Morris-Nussbaum
Represented By: Summer Elizabeth Benson
Represented By: Maurice David Pessah
Represented By: Stuart Neil Chelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James LaPlant
Represented By: Michael Joseph Morris-Nussbaum
Represented By: Summer Elizabeth Benson
Represented By: Maurice David Pessah
Represented By: Stuart Neil Chelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Petro Siruk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Denise Redfield
Represented By: Marc H. Edelson
Represented By: Joshua H. Grabar
Represented By: Eric Lechtzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mark Milhouse
Represented By: Eve-Lynn J. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Zackary Kelley
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Oberlin
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jason Fossella
Represented By: Selin Demir
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alec English
Represented By: Maxwell Holt Goins
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Rachel Morowitz
Represented By: Jeffrey Greg Lewis
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ryan Zachary Ross
Represented By: William Rey Ogden
Represented By: Gabriel Amin Assaad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Conley
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powell
Represented By: Dario D. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: C. Louis Bunya
Represented By: William Rey Ogden
Represented By: Gabriel Amin Assaad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joshua Palmer
Represented By: Eugene Zaydfudim
Represented By: Frank R. Schirripa
Represented By: Kathryn A. Hettler
Represented By: Daniel B. Rehns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Citadel LLC doing business as Citadel Securities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Doroghazi
Represented By: Elizabeth Robben Murray
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado
Represented By: Benjamin H. Diessel
Represented By: Andrew Kabnick Garden
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Represented By: Gustavo Javier Membiela
Represented By: Samuel Alberto Danon
Represented By: Grace Kang
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Represented By: Brittany L. Sukiennik
Represented By: Joel A. Mullin
Represented By: Zachary J. Watters
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Stephen H. Galloway
Represented By: Odean L. Volker
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Thomas P. Cimino, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Feltoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: John M. Doroghazi
Represented By: Elizabeth Robben Murray
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado
Represented By: Benjamin H. Diessel
Represented By: Andrew Kabnick Garden
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Represented By: Gustavo Javier Membiela
Represented By: Samuel Alberto Danon
Represented By: Grace Kang
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Represented By: Brittany L. Sukiennik
Represented By: Zachary J. Watters
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Odean L. Volker
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Thomas P. Cimino, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Feltoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: John M. Doroghazi
Represented By: Elizabeth Robben Murray
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado
Represented By: Benjamin H. Diessel
Represented By: Andrew Kabnick Garden
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Represented By: Gustavo Javier Membiela
Represented By: Samuel Alberto Danon
Represented By: Grace Kang
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Represented By: Brittany L. Sukiennik
Represented By: Zachary J. Watters
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Odean L. Volker
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Thomas P. Cimino, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Feltoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Point72 Asset Management, L.P.
Represented By: Richard C. Tarlowe
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: IBG Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Square, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Robinhood Crypto, LLC
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Brittany L. Sukiennik
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Stash Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Robin L. Nunn
Represented By: Joseph Edward Floren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Merrill Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Apex Clearing Corporation
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Represented By: Bryan Daniel Gant
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Represented By: Angela Daker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Square Inc.
Represented By: Belinda S. Lee
Represented By: Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Citadel Execution Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: IG Group Holdings PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Firstrade Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Trading 212 UK Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Interactive Brokers Group Inc and Subsidiaries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: eToro USA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: H. Gregory Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Trade Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Depository Trust Company
Represented By: Gregory M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dough LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Cash App Investing LLC
Represented By: Belinda S. Lee
Represented By: Alfred Carroll Pfeiffer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Melvin Capital Management, LP
Represented By: Thomas E. Redburn, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Oliver Grange
Represented By: Maya Ginsburg
Represented By: Zarema A. Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Russell B. Balikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Gregory M. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Freetrade, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Open to the Public Investing, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Bank
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: Brendan J. Coffman
Represented By: Kenneth Ryan O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Russell B. Balikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Russell B. Balikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Candlestick Capital Management L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: E Trade Asset Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Interactive Brokers Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Interactive Brokers, LLC
Represented By: Shari Ross Lahlou
Represented By: Steven E. Bizar
Represented By: Jonathan E. Greengarden
Represented By: Samuel W. Stelk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: E Trade Financial Corp
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Represented By: Gina M. Cora
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Peter W. Homer
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alpaca Securities, LLC
Represented By: H. Gregory Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Represented By: Gina M. Cora
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Peter W. Homer
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Represented By: Gina M. Cora
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Peter W. Homer
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sequoia Capital Operations LLC
Represented By: Linda Jane Brewer
Represented By: Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.
Represented By: Korinna Stefel Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Citadel, EFT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Tastyworks, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Dale Rising
Represented By: Allison Gerard
Represented By: Thomas G. Haskins, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Olszowka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Paris
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Represented By: Kyle Allen Niemi
Represented By: Marc De Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Colleen E. Heyler
Represented By: Lawrence E. Buterman
Represented By: Lilia B. Vazova
Represented By: Richard D. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ETrade Securities LLC
Represented By: Janet Jones-Duffey
Represented By: Gina M. Cora
Represented By: Brian S. Weinstein
Represented By: Peter W. Homer
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC
Represented By: Paul T. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Financial Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fumi Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: H. Gregory Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Maplelane Capital, LLC
Represented By: Richard Scott Geller
Represented By: Jack Yoskowitz
Represented By: Tamara Rozina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: IBG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: D1 Capital Partner, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Represented By: Christian T. Kemnitz
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Hannah Olivia Koesterer
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Russell B. Balikian
Represented By: Ryan Carlton Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Trading 212 Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC
Represented By: Steig D. Olson
Represented By: Justin Thomas Reinheimer
Represented By: William A. Burck
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Stephanie M Boomershine
Represented By: Marina Lev
Represented By: Christopher D. Kercher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Webull Financial, LLC
Represented By: H. Gregory Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Free Freetrade, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TD Ameritrade Holding Corp
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Russell B. Balikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Citadel Securities, LLC
Represented By: Steig D. Olson
Represented By: Justin Thomas Reinheimer
Represented By: William A. Burck
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Marina Lev
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Broome
Represented By: Christopher D. Kercher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: M1 Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: January 2021 Short Squeeze Trading Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?