BARKER v. Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD BARKER and STATE OF GEORGIA
Defendant: REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC, COLUMBUS REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC, JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER and THOMAS J TIDWELL
Intervenor Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 4:2012cv00108
Filed: May 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Columbus Office
County: Muscogee
Presiding Judge: CLAY D LAND
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying (123) Motion for Reconsideration in case 4:12-cv-00108-CDL; denying (32) Motion for Reconsideration in case 4:14-cv-00304-CDL. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 05/12/2016. (CCL)
April 21, 2016 Filing 125 RESPONSE filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #123 MOTION for Reconsideration re #122 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (BYRD, CHARLES)
April 13, 2016 Notice of Deficiency; It appears the document attached as #124 is a notice of attorney appearance. Therefore, the event selected should have been NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. Please know the document filed is being construed as a notice of attorney appearance, and the previous attorney will remain in the case. No NEED TO REFILE this document. (tlp)
April 11, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE Substitution of Counsel by STATE OF GEORGIA (VANN, SARA)
April 8, 2016 Filing 123 MOTION for Reconsideration re #122 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by RICHARD BARKER filed by JAMIE M BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(BENNETT, JAMIE)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting Motion for Determination of Relator's Share (116 in 4:12-cv-00108-CDL; 25 in 4:14-cv-00304-CDL). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 03/28/2016. (CCL)
October 28, 2015 Filing 121 REPLY to Response filed by RICHARD BARKER re #116 MOTION Determination of Relator's Share (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(BENNETT, JAMIE)
October 19, 2015 Filing 120 RESPONSE filed by STATE OF GEORGIA re #116 MOTION Determination of Relator's Share (BRADBERRY, KEVIN)
October 19, 2015 Filing 119 RESPONSE filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #116 MOTION Determination of Relator's Share (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sheetul Wall, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Laurie A. Oberembt, #3 Exhibit 2A - Barker Transcript Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 2B - Ltr from Jamie Bennett to Dept. of Justice, #5 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Enedelia Bostrup)(BYRD, CHARLES)
October 5, 2015 Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension re: #117 Letter, #118 Letter, #116 MOTION Determination of Relator's Share filed by RICHARD BARKER (tlp)
October 1, 2015 Filing 118 Letter regarding Motion for Extension of Time re #116 MOTION Determination of Relator's Share (BRADBERRY, KEVIN)
October 1, 2015 Filing 117 Letter regarding Motion for Extension of Time re #116 MOTION Determination of Relator's Share (BYRD, CHARLES)
September 14, 2015 Filing 116 MOTION Determination of Relator's Share by RICHARD BARKER filed by JAMIE M BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Bennett Affidavit, #3 Barker Affidavit)(BENNETT, JAMIE)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #113 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/4/2015 (tlp)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #112 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/4/2015 (tlp)
September 4, 2015 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint : by STATE OF GEORGIA filed by KEVIN DANIEL BRADBERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BRADBERRY, KEVIN)
September 4, 2015 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #3 Complaint, #10 Amended Complaint : by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by CHARLES W. BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BYRD, CHARLES)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Intervene. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 9/4/2015 (tlp)
September 4, 2015 Filing 110 MOTION to Intervene by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by CHARLES W. BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BYRD, CHARLES)
September 4, 2015 Filing 109 NOTICE Consent to Dismissal of Claims by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #106 Stipulation of Dismissal (BYRD, CHARLES)
July 7, 2015 Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRITTANY F REESE on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Attorney BRITTANY F REESE added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:mov) (REESE, BRITTANY)
July 7, 2015 Filing 107 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by KEVIN DANIEL BRADBERRY on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA Attorney KEVIN DANIEL BRADBERRY added to party STATE OF GEORGIA(pty:pla) (BRADBERRY, KEVIN)
July 7, 2015 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - Due to the NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT #105 filed by Plaintiff/Relator and the CRHS defendants, as well as the STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL #106 filed by Plaintiff/Relator and Defendant Tidwell, the Pretrial Conference scheduled for 7/9/2015, and the Jury Trial scheduled to begin 8/10/2015, are hereby CANCELLED. (esl)
July 6, 2015 Filing 106 STIPULATION of Dismissal by THOMAS J TIDWELL (Dalbey, John)
July 6, 2015 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #104 Motion to Extend stay of deadlines pending completion of settlement. The previously entered order staying deadlines is amended to extend the stay until September 4, 2015. The claims against Thomas J. Tidwell are unaffected by this Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on July 6, 2015 (CDL)
July 2, 2015 Filing 105 NOTICE of Settlement by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC (Loveland, Lewis)
July 1, 2015 Filing 104 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct #93 Order by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC filed by MICHAEL EDWARD PAULHUS.(PAULHUS, MICHAEL)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER for Response to Motion re: #100 , #102 MOTION for Reconsideration. Dr. Tidwell shall file a response to the motion for reconsideration. The response is due by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, July 7, 2015. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 07/01/2015. (CGC)
July 1, 2015 Filing 102 MOTION for Reconsideration re #98 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by RICHARD BARKER filed by JAMIE M BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(BENNETT, JAMIE)
July 1, 2015 Notice of Deficiency; Other - (related document(s): #100 Motion for Reconsideration filed by RICHARD BARKER ). Document does not have the proper signature. The name of the ECF user under whose login and password the document is submitted must be preceded by s/ in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. Ex. s/John Doe. Please revise the signature and refile. Thank you. (tlp)
June 30, 2015 Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SCOTT R GRUBMAN on behalf of THOMAS J TIDWELL Attorney SCOTT R GRUBMAN added to party THOMAS J TIDWELL(pty:dft) (GRUBMAN, SCOTT)
June 30, 2015 Filing 100 PLEASE DISREGARD; Refiled as DE#102. MOTION for Reconsideration re #98 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by RICHARD BARKER filed by JAMIE M BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(BENNETT, JAMIE) Modified on 7/2/2015 (tlp).
June 16, 2015 NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING - Due to a Court conflict, the Pretrial Conference, originally scheduled for 7/13/2015, is hereby re-set for 7/9/2015 10:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Deadlines set in the Order for Pretrial Conference #99 remain the same. (esl)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER for Pretrial Conference: Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2015 10:00 AM in Columbus before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/6/2015. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Format)(esl)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #80 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 06/03/2015. (CGC)
May 11, 2015 Filing 97 REPLY to Response filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL re #80 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Dalbey, John)
May 7, 2015 Filing 96 Certificate of Need to File Discovery Notice of Filing Original Deposition Transcript by RICHARD BARKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R. Thacker Deposition Transcript)(BENNETT, JAMIE)
April 28, 2015 Filing 95 RESPONSE filed by RICHARD BARKER re #80 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Material Facts Response to Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of K. Walker and K. McNamara, #3 Exhibit 2 - R. Thacker depo transcript excerpts, #4 Exhibit 3 - E. Tidwell depo transcript excerpts, #5 Exhibit 4 - 2010-07-13 Email from T. Layfield, #6 Exhibit 5 - 2010-05-13 Memo from R. Taylor, #7 Exhibit 6 - 2010-10-06 Email from J. Tidwell, #8 Exhibit 7 - 2011-01-31 Email from M. Sherer, #9 Exhibit 8- 2011-02-21 Email from E. Tidwell, #10 Exhibit 9 - 2012-01-11 Letter from ROC, #11 Exhibit 10 - 2010-06-24 Oncology Solutions Report, #12 Exhibit - "CONFIDENTIAL" - 11 - 2013-01-02 Dr. Chisela Report, #13 Exhibit 12 - Expert Report of D. Beyer, #14 Exhibit 13 - D. Beyer depo transcript excerpts)(BENNETT, JAMIE) [Exhibit #12 filed as a CONFIDENTIAL document pursuant to ECF#44 Order]
April 28, 2015 Notice of Deficiency; Document must be refiled to include a description of exhibit(s) - (related document(s): #94 Response to Motion, filed by RICHARD BARKER ). If you should have any questions, please call the Clerk's Office 706-649-7816. (tlp)
April 27, 2015 Filing 94 PLEASE DISREGARD, SEE DE#95. RESPONSE filed by RICHARD BARKER re #80 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(BENNETT, JAMIE) Modified on 6/1/2015 (tlp).
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Amending #78 Third Scheduling/Discovery Order. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 4/21/15. (tlp)
April 10, 2015 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #92 Motion to seal document. The clerk is hereby ordered to restrict public access to ECF No #88 . Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 4/10/2015 (esl)
April 8, 2015 Filing 92 MOTION seal supplemental interrogatory answers of Relator re #88 Discovery Materials by THOMAS J TIDWELL filed by John D. Dalbey.(Dalbey, John)
April 8, 2015 Filing 91 NOTICE Notice of Filing by THOMAS J TIDWELL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Barker Transcript, #2 Exhibit Beyer Transcript)(Dalbey, John)
April 7, 2015 FOURTH AMENDED Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received and forwarded to Chambers (tlp)
April 6, 2015 Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND: Telephone Conference held on 4/3/2015. Court Reporter: Betsy Peterson. (esl)
April 6, 2015 Filing 89 Discovery Materials - Relator's Responses to Dr. Tidwell's First Request for Admission by THOMAS J TIDWELL. Related document: #81 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Dalbey, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 88 Discovery Materials - Relator's Supplemental Answers to Thomas J. Tidwell M.D.'s First Set of Interrogatories by THOMAS J TIDWELL. Related document: #81 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Dalbey, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 87 Discovery Materials - Pages of Deposition of David Beyer, M.D. by THOMAS J TIDWELL. Related document: #81 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Dalbey, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 86 Discovery Materials - Pages of Deposition of Richard Barker by THOMAS J TIDWELL. Related document: #81 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Dalbey, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 85 DEPOSITION - Deposition of Miriam Eve Tidwell by THOMAS J TIDWELL. Related document: #81 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Dalbey, John) Modified on 4/7/2015 (tlp).
April 6, 2015 Filing 84 Discovery Materials - Supplemental Declaration of Miriam Eve Tidwell by THOMAS J TIDWELL. Related document: #81 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Dalbey, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 83 Discovery Materials - Declaration of Miriam Eve Tidwell by THOMAS J TIDWELL. Related document: #81 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Dalbey, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 82 Discovery Materials - Declaration of Shawn Ghavidel by THOMAS J TIDWELL. Related document: #81 Certificate of Need to File Discovery filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Dalbey, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 81 Certificate of Need to File Discovery by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Dalbey, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment by THOMAS J TIDWELL filed by John D. Dalbey. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts LR 56 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Dalbey, John)
March 31, 2015 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #79 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Each party's main brief in support of or opposition to summary judgment shall not exceed thirty-five pages. No reply brief shall exceed twenty pages. The parties are nonetheless encouraged to avoid discursiveness and prolixity. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 03/31/2015. (CGC)
March 27, 2015 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Briefing by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC filed by Michael Edward Paulhus. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paulhus, Michael)
January 28, 2015 Filing 78 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #77 Motion to Amend/Correct. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 1/28/2015 (tlf). Modified on 1/28/2015 (esl). Dispositive motion deadline 4/6/2015.
January 28, 2015 Filing 77 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #73 Scheduling/Discovery Order by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC filed by Michael Edward Paulhus. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paulhus, Michael)
January 28, 2015 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING - Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2015 10:00 AM in Columbus before U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND. Jury Trial set to begin 8/10/2015 09:00 AM in Columbus before U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND (3 weeks have been set aside to try this case). (esl)
January 9, 2015 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard L. Shackelford terminated. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 1/9/2015 (esl)
January 8, 2015 Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC filed by Richard L. Shackelford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shackelford, Richard)
January 5, 2015 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER finding as moot #75 Motion for Protective Order. With the deposition presumably having been taken on December 17, 2014 as indicated on the Notice of Deposition and with no renewal of request to compel discovery within 14 days of that deposition, the Court finds the motion for protective order, which was previously deferred, is now moot.Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on January 5, 2015 (CDL)
December 10, 2014 Filing 75 MOTION for Protective Order by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC filed by Michael Edward Paulhus. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Limited Protective Order Regarding Relators Amended Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Motion to Stay Deposition, #2 Exhibit A: Amended 30(b)(6) Notice, served December 9, 2014, #3 Exhibit B: Amended 30(b)(6) Notice, served October 31, 2014, #4 Exhibit C: Amended 30(b)(6) Notice, served December 5, 2014, #5 Exhibit D: Correspondence regarding 30(b)(6), #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Paulhus, Michael)
December 10, 2014 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER deferring ruling on #75 Motion for Protective Order and Denying motion to stay deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) witnesss. As to those issues for which Defendants' counsel seeks a protective order, Plaintiff's counsel shall be permitted to ask the questions and Defendants' counsel shall state the objection on the record, and as to those questions, the witness shall not be required to answer. Within 14 days of the deposition, Plaintiff shall file a motion to compel responses to those questions if he continues to insist upon obtaining the information, and Defendants shall have 14 days to file a response. The Court will then rule at that time as to whether the witness shall be compelled to answer either in a limited follow up deposition or by sworn written response. This discovery skirmish will not be allowed to delay the progression of this litigation. No reason exists to postpone the entire deposition while these issues are resolved. Therefore, the Court defers ruling on the issues raised by the protective order and denies the motion to stay the deposition. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on December 10, 2014 (CDL)
November 21, 2014 Filing 74 STIPULATION by RICHARD BARKER (BENNETT, JAMIE)
November 10, 2014 Filing 73 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Deadline to complete fact discovery is November 15, 2014; Deadline to file Motions for Summary Judgment is February 6, 2015. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 11/10/2014(tlf).
November 4, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JESSICA E SABBATH on behalf of COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC Attorney JESSICA E SABBATH added to party COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER(pty:dft), Attorney JESSICA E SABBATH added to party Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney JESSICA E SABBATH added to party JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER(pty:dft), Attorney JESSICA E SABBATH added to party Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney JESSICA E SABBATH added to party REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC(pty:dft) (SABBATH, JESSICA)
September 12, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by THOMAS J TIDWELL filed by John D. Dalbey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dalbey, John)
September 12, 2014 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #71 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd P. Swanson has been terminated as counsel for Thomas J. Tidwell, MD, and should no longer receive email notification of filings. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 9/12/2014. (esl)
September 11, 2014 Filing 70 AMENDED SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 9/11/14. (tlp)
September 11, 2014 Notice of Deficiency; Case Administrator Deficiency - (related document(s): #69 Notice (Other) filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL ). A motion to withdrawal as counsel is required pursuant to Local Rule 83.1.4. (tlp)
September 10, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE Withdrawal of Todd P. Swanson by THOMAS J TIDWELL (Dalbey, John)
September 8, 2014 Notice of Deficiency: (related document(s): #68 Discovery Status Report ). Please submit the proposed scheduling order via e-mail as directed in the DE#27 Rules 16/26 Order. (tlp)
September 8, 2014 Proposed Scheduling/Discovery Order Received and forwarded to Chambers (tlp)
September 5, 2014 Filing 68 Discovery Status Report (BENNETT, JAMIE)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Compel. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 08/29/2014. (CGC)
August 29, 2014 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARINGS - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed 8/29/2014, Doc. #67 , the Pretrial Conference is hereby set for 5/20/2015 09:30 AM in Columbus and the Jury Trial is specially set for 7/13/2015 09:30 AM in Columbus, all before U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND. (esl)
August 27, 2014 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/20/2014, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alan Causey. Motion Hearing. Volume Number: I OF I. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Peterson, Betsy)
August 20, 2014 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND: Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2014 re #61 MOTION to Compel filed by RICHARD BARKER (Court Reporter Alan Causey.) (esl)
July 24, 2014 This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #64 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Carolyn Cain Burch terminated. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 7/24/2014 (esl)
July 23, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC filed by Carolyn Cain Burch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burch, Carolyn)
July 22, 2014 NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re #61 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2014 10:00 AM in Columbus before U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND. (esl)
July 21, 2014 Filing 63 REPLY to Response filed by RICHARD BARKER re #61 MOTION to Compel (BENNETT, JAMIE)
July 14, 2014 Filing 62 RESPONSE filed by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC re #61 MOTION to Compel (Loveland, Lewis)
June 30, 2014 Filing 61 MOTION to Compel by RICHARD BARKER filed by JAMIE M BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Privilege Log, #3 Exhibit Correspondence, #4 Text of Proposed Order Motion to Compel, #5 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Deadlines)(BENNETT, JAMIE)
June 30, 2014 Filing 60 AMENDED ANSWER by THOMAS J TIDWELL. (Dalbey, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 59 AMENDED ANSWER by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC. (Shackelford, Richard)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Leave to File; granting #55 Motion for Leave to File; terminating #53 Motion to Compel. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 06/23/2014. (CGC)
June 18, 2014 Filing 57 REPLY to Response filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL re #53 MOTION to Compel , #55 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, #54 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Dalbey, John)
June 18, 2014 Filing 56 REPLY to Response filed by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC re #54 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer (Shackelford, Richard)
June 9, 2014 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by THOMAS J TIDWELL filed by John D. Dalbey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Relator's Requests for Production to Defendant Tidwell, #3 Exhibit 3 - Relator's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Tidwell's Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - Relator's 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Defendant)(Dalbey, John)
June 9, 2014 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC filed by Richard L. Shackelford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit Relator's Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit Relator's Supplemental Answers to Dr. Tidwell's Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit Relator's 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shackelford, Richard)
June 9, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION to Compel by RICHARD BARKER filed by JAMIE M BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Privilege Log, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BENNETT, JAMIE)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines.Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 6/5/14 (tlp)
June 4, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lewis Joseph Loveland on behalf of COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC Attorney Lewis Joseph Loveland added to party COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Joseph Loveland added to party Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Joseph Loveland added to party JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Joseph Loveland added to party Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Lewis Joseph Loveland added to party REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC(pty:dft) (Loveland, Lewis)
June 3, 2014 Filing 50 MOTION to Stay for Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC filed by Richard L. Shackelford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shackelford, Richard)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 5/7/14 (tlp)
May 5, 2014 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by RICHARD BARKER filed by JAMIE M BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Stipulation Regarding Trusent Report, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BENNETT, JAMIE)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 MOTION for Court Order to Obtain CMS Records. Ordered by U.S. District Judge CLAY D LAND on 4/23/14. (tls)
April 22, 2014 Filing 46 MOTION for Court Order to Obtain CMS Records by RICHARD BARKER filed by JAMIE M BENNETT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BENNETT, JAMIE)
April 4, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carolyn Cain Burch on behalf of COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC (Burch, Carolyn)
October 31, 2013 Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #43 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Clay D. Land on 10/31/13 (tls)
October 29, 2013 Filing 43 MOTION for Protective Order by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC filed by Richard L. Shackelford. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Shackelford, Richard)
October 28, 2013 Filing 42 SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER: Fact Discovery deadline 5/31/2014. Dispositive motions deadline 10/9/2014. Ordered by U.S. District Judge Clay D. Land on 10/28/2013. (esl)
October 25, 2013 Filing 41 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by THOMAS J TIDWELL.(Bever, Thomas)
October 25, 2013 Filing 40 16/26 Discovery Report filed by RICHARD BARKER. Related document: #27 Order - Rules 16/26.(BENNETT, JAMIE)
October 25, 2013 Proposed Pretrial Order Received and forwarded to chambers. (tls)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #25 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 10/09/2013. (CGC)
October 8, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JEFFREY A BROWN on behalf of COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC (BROWN, JEFFREY)
October 2, 2013 Filing 37 REPLY to Response filed by THOMAS J TIDWELL re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint : (SWANSON, TODD)
September 24, 2013 Filing 36 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Defendant (Bever, Thomas)
September 24, 2013 Filing 35 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Plaintiff (BENNETT, JAMIE)
September 23, 2013 Filing 34 ***Arbitration Opt Out Letter by Defendants (Shackelford, Richard)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying #33 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss. After a preliminary review of Defendant Tidwell's motion to dismiss, the Court has determined that discovery should not be stayed at this time. The Court anticipates that it should be able to rule on the pending motion to dismiss expeditiously after the Defendant's Reply is filed.Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on September 23, 2013 (CDL)
September 19, 2013 Filing 33 MOTION to Stay Discovery as to Plaintiff and Defendant Tidwell only (Consent Motion) re #27 Order - Rules 16/26 by THOMAS J TIDWELL filed by Thomas D. Bever. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(Bever, Thomas)
September 16, 2013 Filing 32 RESPONSE filed by RICHARD BARKER re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint : (BENNETT, JAMIE)
September 16, 2013 Filing 31 Arbitration Referral Letter sent 9/16/2013 (hrm)
September 12, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D. Dalbey on behalf of THOMAS J TIDWELL (Dalbey, John)
September 12, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TODD P SWANSON on behalf of THOMAS J TIDWELL (SWANSON, TODD)
September 12, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas D. Bever on behalf of THOMAS J TIDWELL (Bever, Thomas)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed scheduling order to be submitted via e-mail as directed no later than October 25, 2013; Corporate disclosure statement(s) to be submitted as directed. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 9/10/13. (tls)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 8/28/2013. Before filing future Motions for Extensions of Time, parties may want to review Local Rule 6.2 re: 14-day extension by the clerk. Call the Clerk's Office with any questions. (esl)
August 27, 2013 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Consent as to #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint : by RICHARD BARKER filed by NATHAN M PEAK.(PEAK, NATHAN)
August 19, 2013 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #10 Amended Complaint : by THOMAS J TIDWELL filed by Thomas D. Bever. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Bever, Thomas)
August 5, 2013 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC identifying Other Affiliate Regional Urgent Care Center, LLC, Other Affiliate My Care Urgent Care, Other Affiliate Behavioral Health Management Services, LLC for Medical Center; Other Affiliate Columbus Healthcare Resources, Inc., Other Affiliate Columbus Diagnostic Imaging Center, LLC, Other Affiliate Evergreen Medical Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Rehabilitation Hospital of Phenix City, LLC, Other Affiliate Women's Medical Services, Inc., Other Affiliate MAC Lumpkin Road, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbus Health Services, Inc., Other Affiliate All Care Pharmacy, Other Affiliate Tower (My Care) Pharmacy, Other Affiliate Stadium Pharmacy, Other Affiliate Spring Harbor Health for Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc.; Corporate Parent Columbus Ambulatory Healthcare Services, Inc. for COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER. (Shackelford, Richard)
August 2, 2013 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Refiled as DE#24) . COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional (Shackelford, Richard)
August 2, 2013 Filing 22 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC.(Shackelford, Richard)
July 29, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION by COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC (Shackelford, Richard)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Tidwell shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before August 19, 2013. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 07/24/2013. (CGC)
July 23, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by THOMAS J TIDWELL filed by Thomas D. Bever. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bever, Thomas)
July 11, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JESSICA J M HAGEN on behalf of COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC (HAGEN, JESSICA)
July 11, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edward Paulhus on behalf of COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC (Paulhus, Michael)
July 11, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard L. Shackelford on behalf of COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC (Shackelford, Richard)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Amended Complaint. There Court hereby permits defendant Thomas J. Tidwell 60 days from May 30, 2013 to file his Responsive Pleadings to the Amended Complaint. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 6/27/2013 (esl)
June 26, 2013 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by THOMAS J TIDWELL filed by TRAVIS C HARGROVE.(HARGROVE, TRAVIS)
June 20, 2013 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD BARKER. as to COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER, Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC (BENNETT, JAMIE)
June 20, 2013 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RICHARD BARKER as to THOMAS J TIDWELL. (BENNETT, JAMIE)
May 31, 2013 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to THOMAS J TIDWELL on 5/31/2013. (tls)
May 10, 2013 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc., JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER, Medical Center, REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC, THOMAS J TIDWELL, COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER filed by RICHARD BARKER(tlf).
July 24, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE Paid by JAMIE M BENNETT $100, receipt #8473 - admitted pro hac vice as of 6/18/2012. (nop)
May 24, 2012 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 7940 (ans)
May 18, 2012 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by RICHARD BARKER against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tlf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARKER v. Columbus Regional Healthcare System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONAL ONCOLOGY LLC
Represented By: JESSICA J M HAGEN
Represented By: JESSICA E SABBATH
Represented By: Lewis Joseph Loveland
Represented By: Carolyn Cain Burch
Represented By: JEFFREY A BROWN
Represented By: CLAYTON M ADAMS
Represented By: Richard L. Shackelford
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD PAULHUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBUS REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC
Represented By: JESSICA J M HAGEN
Represented By: JESSICA E SABBATH
Represented By: Lewis Joseph Loveland
Represented By: Carolyn Cain Burch
Represented By: JEFFREY A BROWN
Represented By: CLAYTON M ADAMS
Represented By: Richard L. Shackelford
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD PAULHUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN B AMOS CANCER CENTER
Represented By: JESSICA J M HAGEN
Represented By: JESSICA E SABBATH
Represented By: Lewis Joseph Loveland
Represented By: Carolyn Cain Burch
Represented By: JEFFREY A BROWN
Represented By: CLAYTON M ADAMS
Represented By: Richard L. Shackelford
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD PAULHUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: JESSICA J M HAGEN
Represented By: JESSICA E SABBATH
Represented By: Lewis Joseph Loveland
Represented By: Carolyn Cain Burch
Represented By: JEFFREY A BROWN
Represented By: CLAYTON M ADAMS
Represented By: Richard L. Shackelford
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD PAULHUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBUS RADIATION ONCOLOGY TREATMENT CENTER
Represented By: JESSICA J M HAGEN
Represented By: JESSICA E SABBATH
Represented By: Lewis Joseph Loveland
Represented By: Carolyn Cain Burch
Represented By: JEFFREY A BROWN
Represented By: CLAYTON M ADAMS
Represented By: Richard L. Shackelford
Represented By: MICHAEL EDWARD PAULHUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J TIDWELL
Represented By: TRAVIS C HARGROVE
Represented By: TODD P SWANSON
Represented By: Thomas D. Bever
Represented By: John D. Dalbey
Represented By: SCOTT R GRUBMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BARKER
Represented By: JAMIE M BENNETT
Represented By: ANDREA S HIRSCH
Represented By: NATHAN M PEAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: SARA ELIZABETH VANN
Represented By: NANCY BAILEY ALLSTROM
Represented By: KEVIN DANIEL BRADBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: SHEETUL S WALL
Represented By: CHARLES W BYRD
Represented By: BRITTANY F REESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?