Lucas(DEATH PENALTY) v. Upton
Petitioner: Daniel Anthony Lucas
Respondent: HILTON HALL and Stephen Upton
Case Number: 5:2009cv00289
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Butts
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2016 Filing 94 SEALED DOCUMENT (ans)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying #91 Motion Second Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Ex Parte and Under Seal Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 03/01/16 (ans)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #90 Third Motion for Travel Authorization Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 01/19/16 (ans)
January 11, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Ex Parte and Under Seal by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
November 13, 2015 Filing 90 MOTION Authorization for Funding for Travel by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
October 26, 2015 Filing 89 USCA Order/Opinion as to #69 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas (ans)
October 6, 2015 Filing 88 WRIT OF CERTIORARI DENIED by US Supreme Court re #69 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ggs)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #84 Sealed Motion Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 03/19/15 (ans)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Authorization for Funding for Travel Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 03/19/15 (ans)
March 9, 2015 Filing 85 MOTION for Authorization for Funding for Travel by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
February 4, 2015 Filing 84 SEALED MOTION by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(ans)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to Proceed Ex Parte and Under Seal. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 2/3/15 (lap)
January 30, 2015 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Ex Parte and Under Seal by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
January 28, 2015 Filing 81 MANDATE of USCA as to #69 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas (ans)
November 12, 2014 Filing 80 USCA Order/Opinion as to #69 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas (ans)
October 14, 2014 Filing 79 USCA Order/Opinion as to #69 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas (ans)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Travel Authorization. Ordered by U.S. District Judge C ASHLEY ROYAL on 8/29/14 (lap)
August 28, 2014 Filing 77 MOTION Authorization for Funding for Travel by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Eleventh Circuit Order on Relief Sought)(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
August 28, 2014 Filing 76 USCA Order/Opinion as to #69 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas (ans)
March 14, 2014 Filing 75 Record on Appeal hand-delivered to USCA re #69 Notice of Appeal consisting of 113 volumes contained in 12 boxes. Delivered by Nora Paul, USDC and received by Carolyn Magers, CCA-11. (nop)
July 11, 2013 Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #69 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (ans)
May 21, 2013 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Daniel Anthony Lucas. re #69 Notice of Appeal NO TRANSCRIPTS ORDERED (Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying #68 Motion to Alter Judgment. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 5/17/13 (lap)
April 30, 2013 Filing 72 USCA Case Number 13-11909-P re #69 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas. (ans)
April 25, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Stephen Upton (Schiefer, Theresa)
April 25, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SABRINA D GRAHAM on behalf of Stephen Upton (GRAHAM, SABRINA)
April 25, 2013 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #67 Judgment, #66 Order, #69 Notice of Appeal Judge Appealed: C. Ashley Royal. Fee Paid: Not Paid. (ans)
April 24, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #66 Order, #67 Judgment by Daniel Anthony Lucas. (Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
April 22, 2013 Filing 68 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
March 26, 2013 Filing 67 JUDGMENT (ans)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Denying #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 3/25/13. (lap)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued.CJA 20 : Authorization to Pay Lisa Carey-Davis. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 01/30/2013. (hrm)
December 14, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE of Filing [Doc 6] Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 171, #2 Exhibit 172A, #3 Exhibit 172B, #4 Exhibit 173, #5 Exhibit 174A, #6 Exhibit 174B, #7 Exhibit 174C, #8 Exhibit 175, #9 Exhibit 176, #10 Exhibit 177, #11 Exhibit 178, #12 Exhibit 179A, #13 Exhibit 179B, #14 Exhibit 180, #15 Exhibit 181, #16 Exhibit 182, #17 Exhibit 183, #18 Exhibit 184)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 14, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE of Filing [Doc 6] Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 157A, #2 Exhibit 157B, #3 Exhibit 157C, #4 Exhibit 158A, #5 Exhibit 158B, #6 Exhibit 158C, #7 Exhibit 159A, #8 Exhibit 159B, #9 Exhibit 159C, #10 Exhibit 160A, #11 Exhibit 160B, #12 Exhibit 161A, #13 Exhibit 161B, #14 Exhibit 161C, #15 Exhibit 162A, #16 Exhibit 162B, #17 Exhibit 162C, #18 Exhibit 163A, #19 Exhibit 163B, #20 Exhibit 163C, #21 Exhibit 164A, #22 Exhibit 164B, #23 Exhibit 164C, #24 Exhibit 164D, #25 Exhibit 165A, #26 Exhibit 165B, #27 Exhibit 165C, #28 Exhibit 166A, #29 Exhibit 166B, #30 Exhibit 167, #31 Exhibit 168, #32 Exhibit 169, #33 Exhibit 170)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 14, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE of Filing [Doc 6] Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 143A, #2 Exhibit 143B, #3 Exhibit 143C, #4 Exhibit 144A, #5 Exhibit 144B, #6 Exhibit 145A, #7 Exhibit 145B, #8 Exhibit 146A, #9 Exhibit 146B, #10 Exhibit 147A, #11 Exhibit 147B, #12 Exhibit 147C, #13 Exhibit 148A, #14 Exhibit 148B, #15 Exhibit 149A, #16 Exhibit 149B, #17 Exhibit 150A, #18 Exhibit 150B, #19 Exhibit 151A, #20 Exhibit 151B, #21 Exhibit 151C, #22 Exhibit 151D, #23 Exhibit 152A, #24 Exhibit 152B, #25 Exhibit 152C, #26 Exhibit 152D, #27 Exhibit 153A, #28 Exhibit 153B, #29 Exhibit 153C, #30 Exhibit 154A, #31 Exhibit 154B, #32 Exhibit 154C, #33 Exhibit 154D, #34 Exhibit 155A, #35 Exhibit 155B, #36 Exhibit 155C, #37 Exhibit 156A, #38 Exhibit 156B, #39 Exhibit 156C)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 13, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE of Filing [Doc 6] Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 135A, #2 Exhibit 135B, #3 Exhibit 135C, #4 Exhibit 136A, #5 Exhibit 136B, #6 Exhibit 136C, #7 Exhibit 136D, #8 Exhibit 137A, #9 Exhibit 137B, #10 Exhibit 137C, #11 Exhibit 138A, #12 Exhibit 138B, #13 Exhibit 138C, #14 Exhibit 139A, #15 Exhibit 139B, #16 Exhibit 139C, #17 Exhibit 140A, #18 Exhibit 140B, #19 Exhibit 140C, #20 Exhibit 140D, #21 Exhibit 141A, #22 Exhibit 141B, #23 Exhibit 141C, #24 Exhibit 142A, #25 Exhibit 142B, #26 Exhibit 142C)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 13, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE of Filing [doc 6] Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 125A, #2 Exhibit 125B, #3 Exhibit 125C, #4 Exhibit 126A, #5 Exhibit 126B, #6 Exhibit 126C, #7 Exhibit 127A, #8 Exhibit 127B, #9 Exhibit 127C, #10 Exhibit 127D, #11 Exhibit 128A, #12 Exhibit 128B, #13 Exhibit 128C, #14 Exhibit 129A, #15 Exhibit 129B, #16 Exhibit 129C, #17 Exhibit 130A, #18 Exhibit 130B, #19 Exhibit 130C, #20 Exhibit 131A, #21 Exhibit 131B, #22 Exhibit 131C, #23 Exhibit 132A, #24 Exhibit 132B, #25 Exhibit 132C, #26 Exhibit 133A, #27 Exhibit 133B, #28 Exhibit 133C, #29 Exhibit 133D, #30 Exhibit 133E, #31 Exhibit 134A, #32 Exhibit 134B, #33 Exhibit 134C, #34 Exhibit 134D, #35 Exhibit 134E)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 13, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE of Filing #6 Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 114A, #2 Exhibit 114B, #3 Exhibit 114C, #4 Exhibit 115A, #5 Exhibit 115B, #6 Exhibit 115C, #7 Exhibit 116A, #8 Exhibit 116B, #9 Exhibit 116C, #10 Exhibit 116D, #11 Exhibit 117A, #12 Exhibit 117B, #13 Exhibit 117C, #14 Exhibit 118A, #15 Exhibit 118B, #16 Exhibit 118C, #17 Exhibit 118D, #18 Exhibit 119A, #19 Exhibit 119B, #20 Exhibit 119C, #21 Exhibit 120A, #22 Exhibit 120B, #23 Exhibit 120C, #24 Exhibit 121A, #25 Exhibit 121B, #26 Exhibit 122A, #27 Exhibit 122B, #28 Exhibit 122C, #29 Exhibit 123A, #30 Exhibit 123B, #31 Exhibit 123C, #32 Exhibit 124A, #33 Exhibit 124B, #34 Exhibit 124C, #35 Exhibit 124D)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 13, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Filing #6 Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 104A, #2 Exhibit 104B, #3 Exhibit 104C, #4 Exhibit 105A, #5 Exhibit 105B, #6 Exhibit 105C, #7 Exhibit 106A, #8 Exhibit 106B, #9 Exhibit 106C, #10 Exhibit 106D, #11 Exhibit 107A, #12 Exhibit 107B, #13 Exhibit 107C, #14 Exhibit 107D, #15 Exhibit 108A, #16 Exhibit 108B, #17 Exhibit 108C, #18 Exhibit 108D, #19 Exhibit 109A, #20 Exhibit 109B, #21 Exhibit 109C, #22 Exhibit 109D, #23 Exhibit 109E, #24 Exhibit 110A, #25 Exhibit 110B, #26 Exhibit 110C, #27 Exhibit 111A, #28 Exhibit 111B, #29 Exhibit 111C, #30 Exhibit 112A, #31 Exhibit 112B, #32 Exhibit 112C, #33 Exhibit 112D, #34 Exhibit 113A, #35 Exhibit 113B)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 13, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE of Filing #6 Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 94A, #2 Exhibit 94B, #3 Exhibit 94C, #4 Exhibit 95A, #5 Exhibit 95B, #6 Exhibit 95C, #7 Exhibit 95D, #8 Exhibit 96A, #9 Exhibit 96B, #10 Exhibit 96C, #11 Exhibit 96D, #12 Exhibit 97A, #13 Exhibit 97B, #14 Exhibit 97C, #15 Exhibit 98A, #16 Exhibit 98B, #17 Exhibit 98C, #18 Exhibit 98D, #19 Exhibit 99A, #20 Exhibit 99B, #21 Exhibit 99C, #22 Exhibit 100A, #23 Exhibit 100B, #24 Exhibit 100C, #25 Exhibit 101A, #26 Exhibit 101B, #27 Exhibit 101C, #28 Exhibit 102A, #29 Exhibit 102B, #30 Exhibit 102C, #31 Exhibit 102D, #32 Exhibit 103A, #33 Exhibit 103B, #34 Exhibit 103C)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 13, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Filing #6 Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 70A, #2 Exhibit 70B, #3 Exhibit 70C, #4 Exhibit 71, #5 Exhibit 72, #6 Exhibit 73, #7 Exhibit 74, #8 Exhibit 75, #9 Exhibit 76, #10 Exhibit 77, #11 Exhibit 78, #12 Exhibit 79, #13 Exhibit 80, #14 Exhibit 81, #15 Exhibit 82, #16 Exhibit 83, #17 Exhibit 84, #18 Exhibit 85, #19 Exhibit 86, #20 Exhibit 87, #21 Exhibit 88, #22 Exhibit 89, #23 Exhibit 90A, #24 Exhibit 90B, #25 Exhibit 90C, #26 Exhibit 91A, #27 Exhibit 91B, #28 Exhibit 92, #29 Exhibit 93A, #30 Exhibit 93B, #31 Exhibit 93C, #32 Exhibit 94A, #33 Exhibit 94B, #34 Exhibit 94C)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 13, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE of Fling #6 Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34, #2 Exhibit 35, #3 Exhibit 36, #4 Exhibit 37, #5 Exhibit 38, #6 Exhibit 39, #7 Exhibit 40, #8 Exhibit 41, #9 Exhibit 42, #10 Exhibit 43, #11 Exhibit 44, #12 Exhibit 45, #13 Exhibit 46, #14 Exhibit 47, #15 Exhibit 48, #16 Exhibit 49, #17 Exhibit 50, #18 Exhibit 51, #19 Exhibit 52, #20 Exhibit 53, #21 Exhibit 54, #22 Exhibit 55, #23 Exhibit 56, #24 Exhibit 57, #25 Exhibit 58, #26 Exhibit 59, #27 Exhibit 60, #28 Exhibit 61, #29 Exhibit 62, #30 Exhibit 63, #31 Exhibit 64, #32 Exhibit 65, #33 Exhibit 66, #34 Exhibit 67, #35 Exhibit 68, #36 Exhibit 69)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 12, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE of FIling [Doc 6] Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22A, #2 Exhibit 22B, #3 Exhibit 22C, #4 Exhibit 23A, #5 Exhibit 23B, #6 Exhibit 24A, #7 Exhibit 24B, #8 Exhibit 24C, #9 Exhibit 24D, #10 Exhibit 24E, #11 Exhibit 24F, #12 Exhibit 24G, #13 Exhibit 24H, #14 Exhibit 24I, #15 Exhibit 24J, #16 Exhibit 24K, #17 Exhibit 24L, #18 Exhibit 24M, #19 Exhibit 24N, #20 Exhibit 25A, #21 Exhibit 25B, #22 Exhibit 25C, #23 Exhibit 26A, #24 Exhibit 26B, #25 Exhibit 26C, #26 Exhibit 27A, #27 Exhibit 27B, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29A, #30 Exhibit 29B, #31 Exhibit 30A, #32 Exhibit 30B, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 12, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE of Filing [Doc 6] Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9A, #2 Exhibit 9B, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13A, #7 Exhibit 13B, #8 Exhibit 14A, #9 Exhibit 14B, #10 Exhibit 15A, #11 Exhibit 15B, #12 Exhibit 15C, #13 Exhibit 16A, #14 Exhibit 16B, #15 Exhibit 17A, #16 Exhibit 17B, #17 Exhibit 17C, #18 Exhibit 18A, #19 Exhibit 18B, #20 Exhibit 19A, #21 Exhibit 19B, #22 Exhibit 20A, #23 Exhibit 20B, #24 Exhibit 20C, #25 Exhibit 21A, #26 Exhibit 21B, #27 Exhibit 21C)(Schiefer, Theresa)
December 12, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE of Filing [Doc 6] Exhibits by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 1D, #5 Exhibit 1E, #6 Exhibit 1F, #7 Exhibit 1G, #8 Exhibit 1H, #9 Exhibit 2A, #10 Exhibit 2B, #11 Exhibit 2C, #12 Exhibit 2D, #13 Exhibit 2E, #14 Exhibit 2F, #15 Exhibit 2G, #16 Exhibit 3A, #17 Exhibit 3B, #18 Exhibit 3C, #19 Exhibit 3D, #20 Exhibit 3E, #21 Exhibit 3F, #22 Exhibit 3G, #23 Exhibit 4, #24 Exhibit 5, #25 Exhibit 6, #26 Exhibit 7, #27 Exhibit 8)(Schiefer, Theresa)
October 10, 2012 Filing 52 BRIEF Reply In Support Of Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re #50 Brief, #51 RESPONSE in Opposition - Unrelated to a Motion (Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
September 10, 2012 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 Brief (Schiefer, Theresa)
July 12, 2012 Filing 50 BRIEF In Support Of Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re #25 Amended Complaint (Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #48 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS Petitioner an additional 30 days within which to file hismerits brief. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 5/18/12 (lap)
May 9, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Merits Brief. by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
April 5, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of Filing by Daniel Anthony Lucas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petitioner's Exhibit 1)(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ETHAN HOWARD COHEN terminated. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 3/28/12 (lap) Modified on 3/28/2012 (ans).
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #37 Motion to Supplement the Record. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 3/14/12 (lap)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying #35 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 3/14/12 (lap)
March 14, 2012 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by ERIC L BARNUM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion For Withdrawl of Appearance of Ethan H. Cohen)(BARNUM, ERIC)
February 17, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ERIC L BARNUM on behalf of Daniel Anthony Lucas (BARNUM, ERIC)
December 27, 2011 Filing 42 REPLY to Response filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re #37 MOTION To Supplement The Record And Clarify September 28, 2011 Order (Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
December 27, 2011 Filing 41 REPLY to Response filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re #35 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing (Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
December 12, 2011 Filing 40 RESPONSE filed by Stephen Upton re #37 MOTION To Supplement The Record And Clarify September 28, 2011 Order (Schiefer, Theresa)
December 12, 2011 Filing 39 RESPONSE filed by Stephen Upton re #35 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing (Schiefer, Theresa)
November 11, 2011 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re: #37 MOTION To Supplement The Record And Clarify September 28, 2011 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
November 11, 2011 Filing 37 MOTION To Supplement The Record And Clarify September 28, 2011 Order by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
November 11, 2011 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re: #35 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing (Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
November 11, 2011 Filing 35 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #29 Motion for Discovery. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 9/28/11 (lap)
July 26, 2011 Filing 33 REPLY to Response filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re #29 MOTION for Discovery (Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
July 11, 2011 Filing 32 RESPONSE filed by Stephen Upton re #29 MOTION for Discovery (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Schiefer, Theresa)
June 14, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE Supplemental Notice of Filing by Stephen Upton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 185, #2 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 186, #3 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 187, #4 Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit 188)(Schiefer, Theresa)
June 10, 2011 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re: #29 MOTION for Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
June 10, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION for Discovery by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 6/3/11 (lap)
May 27, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth Carey-Davis.(Carey-Davis, Elisabeth)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Regarding Procedural Default. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 4/12/11. (lap)
August 18, 2010 Case Reassigned to Judge C. Ashley Royal. Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell no longer assigned to the case. (dcp)
June 24, 2010 Case Reassigned to Judge Marc Thomas Treadwell. Judge C. Ashley Royal no longer assigned to the case. (ans)
May 26, 2010 Filing 26 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Daniel Anthony Lucas,amending #20 Brief (CareyDavis, Elisabeth)
May 26, 2010 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stephen Upton,filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(CareyDavis, Elisabeth)
May 26, 2010 Filing 24 BRIEF Reply on Procedural Defenses filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re #20 Brief, #21 RESPONSE in Opposition (CareyDavis, Elisabeth)
April 22, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File REPLY TO RESPONSE by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth CareyDavis.(CareyDavis, Elisabeth)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply due 5/26/10. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 4/22/10 (lap)
March 30, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Beth Attaway Burton on behalf of Stephen Upton (Burton, Beth)
March 29, 2010 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 Brief by Stephen Upton. (Schiefer, Theresa)
February 11, 2010 Filing 20 BRIEF on Procedural Defenses filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas re #19 Answer to Amended Complaint (CareyDavis, Elisabeth)
December 28, 2009 Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Stephen Upton.(Schiefer, Theresa)
November 30, 2009 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stephen Upton,filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Blickenstaff, David)
November 30, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE Appt of Counsel re #15 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. CJA 30 voucher mailed to counsel Davis. (mjw) Court Appointed Counsel ,
November 30, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE Appt of Counsel re #15 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. CJA 30 Voucher mailed to Counsel Blickenstaff. (mjw) Court Appointed Counsel
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel.Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 11/24/09 (lap)
November 6, 2009 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by David Blickenstaff.(Blickenstaff, David)
October 19, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa Marie Schiefer on behalf of Stephen Upton (Schiefer, Theresa)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Stay. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 10/15/09 (lap)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enter Agreed Scheduling Order and adopting the proposed Consent Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 10/6/09 (lap)
September 25, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth CareyDavis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(CareyDavis, Elisabeth)
September 22, 2009 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Stephen Upton re #8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings During Pendency of Petition for Writ of Certiorari (Schiefer, Theresa)
September 18, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings During Pendency of Petition for Writ of Certiorari by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Elisabeth CareyDavis.(CareyDavis, Elisabeth) Modified on 9/21/2009 changed filer from Upton to Lucas per attorney's request (cma).
September 15, 2009 Filing 7 EXHIBITS re #6 Notice of Filing Exhibits filed by Stephen Upton. Eleven Boxes of Exhibits. (cma)
September 11, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Respondent's Exhibits by Hilton Hall (Schiefer, Theresa)
September 11, 2009 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Hilton Hall.(Schiefer, Theresa)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Respondent to file an answer within 60 days after service of this Order. Ordered by Judge C. Ashley Royal on 8/24/09 (lap)
August 21, 2009 Filing 3 ERROR: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hciks issued at the direction of the Court. (cma) Modified on 8/21/2009 (cma).
August 21, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE Paid by Christina A Andronache, David C Blickenstaff, Tracy A Campbell, Lisa Carey-Davis, A Paul Heeringa $500, receipt #532532. Attorneys admitted pro hac vice as of 8/21/09. (nop)
August 21, 2009 Notice of Error in Filing (related document(s): Certificate of Service - Text Only, #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ). Case should not be referred to Magistrate Judge. (cma)
August 20, 2009 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Anthony Lucas filed by Christina A Andronache, David C Blickenstaff, Tracy A Campbell, Lisa Carey-Davis, Ethan Howard Cohen, A Paul Herringa. (Attachments: #1 Motion and Affidavit, #2 Account Certification, #3 Account Statement). Motion(s) referred to Claude W. Hicks, Jr..(cma)
August 20, 2009 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Daniel Anthony Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas(DEATH PENALTY) v. Upton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Anthony Lucas
Represented By: Aaron Paul Heeringa
Represented By: Christina A Andronache
Represented By: David Blickenstaff
Represented By: ETHAN HOWARD COHEN
Represented By: Elisabeth Carey-Davis
Represented By: Tracy A Campbell
Represented By: ERIC L BARNUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HILTON HALL
Represented By: THERESA MARIE SCHIEFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Upton
Represented By: THERESA MARIE SCHIEFER
Represented By: BETH A BURTON
Represented By: SABRINA D GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?