JOHNSON v. HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY R JOHNSON
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA, WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA, JOHNNY C SIKES, HILTON HALL, HUGH SMITH, RONALD KING, CULLEN TALTON, HAYS, DEBORAH D MILLER, JAMES MILLER, MALCOLM H DERRICK, JR, H D DENNARD, R G WEST, BRAD MULES, STEPHEN D LYNN, MICHAEL GARRETT, JOHN STINSON, JR and GRANVILLE
Case Number: 5:2015cv00419
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Office: Macon Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: C ASHLEY ROYAL
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Plaintiff's Section 1983 substantive due process claim against Defendant Margaret Hays. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 2/28/2018 (lap)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 4/5/17 (lap)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 22 Motion to Dismiss Complaint and GRANTING 17 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. The following claims are hereby DISMISSED: (1) all claims against the State Defendants; (2) all claims against Def endant Houston County; and (3) all claims against the Sheriff and the Jailers in their official capacities. Thus, all claims against the City Defendants and all claims against the Sheriff and the Jailers in their individual capacities remain pending. The stay of discovery in this case is hereby LIFTED, and the parties must file their Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL on 8/2/2016. (tlh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY R JOHNSON
Represented By: ZAHRA S KARINSHAK
Represented By: PATRICIA KING MINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSTON COUNTY GEORGIA
Represented By: TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III
Represented By: TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER ROBINS GEORGIA
Represented By: JON TRAVIS HALL
Represented By: THOMAS F RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNNY C SIKES
Represented By: JOHN DEMOULPIED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILTON HALL
Represented By: JOHN DEMOULPIED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUGH SMITH
Represented By: JOHN DEMOULPIED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD KING
Represented By: JOHN DEMOULPIED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CULLEN TALTON
Represented By: TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III
Represented By: TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAYS
Represented By: TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III
Represented By: TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH D MILLER
Represented By: JON TRAVIS HALL
Represented By: THOMAS F RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALCOLM H DERRICK, JR
Represented By: JON TRAVIS HALL
Represented By: THOMAS F RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H D DENNARD
Represented By: JON TRAVIS HALL
Represented By: THOMAS F RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R G WEST
Represented By: JON TRAVIS HALL
Represented By: THOMAS F RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD MULES
Represented By: JON TRAVIS HALL
Represented By: THOMAS F RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN D LYNN
Represented By: JON TRAVIS HALL
Represented By: THOMAS F RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL GARRETT
Represented By: TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III
Represented By: TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN STINSON, JR
Represented By: TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III
Represented By: TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRANVILLE
Represented By: TIMOTHY J BUCKLEY, III
Represented By: TAYLOR WAYNE HENSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?