COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA v. WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, et al.
Plaintiff: COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA, DR MONIQUE Y TATE, MICHAEL F TATE, LAMAR PERRYMAN, COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, PRINCIPAL CHIEFTESS BLUE FEATHER, SAHANI UGIDAHLI, PRINCIPAL CHIEF RED MAN, PINE CHIEF EAGLE EYES and CATE HONVNWV
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, BUTTS COUNTY GEORGIA, STATE OF GEORGIA and PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND AND JONES LLLP
Case Number: 5:2018cv00467
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: TILMAN E SELF
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Reopen Case; denying #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 2/21/2019. (tlw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Reopen Case; MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which to File an Appeal. Filed by COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, MONIQUE Y TATE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ans) Modified docket text on 2/20/2019 (ans).
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by LAMAR PERRYMAN, MICHAEL F TATE, MONIQUE Y TATE re #5 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Supporting documents, #2 Envelope)(ans)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT in favor of BUTTS COUNTY GEORGIA, PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND AND JONES LLLP, STATE OF GEORGIA, WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION against COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, LAMAR PERRYMAN, MICHAEL F TATE, MONIQUE Y TATE (ans)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; terminating #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as moot; and granting #5 Motion to Remand. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 01/07/2019. (chc)
January 3, 2019 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #5 Motion to Remand, filed by WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ); Notice to Counsel - Alan D. Leeth- Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please login as soon as possible and update your user account via Utilities - Your Account. (vs)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed by LOUIS G FIORILLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Security Deed, #2 Exhibit B-Deed Under Power, #3 Exhibit C-Dispossessory Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D-Magistrate Court's Judgment)(FIORILLA, LOUIS)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, LAMAR PERRYMAN, MICHAEL F TATE, MONIQUE Y TATE (ans)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Injunction in Lieu of Permanent Injunction Filed by COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, LAMAR PERRYMAN, MICHAEL F TATE, MONIQUE Y TATE. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing from Butts County Clerk of Superior Court, #2 Final order and writ of possession from Butts County Clerk of Superior Court, #3 Motion to Open Default Judgment and Motion to Correct, Set Aside or Vacate Default Judgment filed in the Superior Court of Butts County)(ans)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by MONIQUE Y TATE.(ans)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHAEL F TATE, LAMAR PERRYMAN, COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, MONIQUE Y TATE, filed by MICHAEL F TATE, LAMAR PERRYMAN, COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA, MONIQUE Y TATE. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Hearing from Butts County Clerk of Superior Court, #2 Final order and writ of possession from Butts County Clerk of Superior Court, #3 Motion to Open Default Judgment and Motion to Correct, Set Aside or Vacate Default Judgment filed in the Superior Court of Butts County)(ans)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA v. WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK MINNESOTA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: LOUIS G FIORILLA
Represented By: ALAN LEETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUTTS COUNTY GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND AND JONES LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR MONIQUE Y TATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL F TATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAMAR PERRYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOSA NATION OF NORTH AMERICA USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCIPAL CHIEFTESS BLUE FEATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAHANI UGIDAHLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCIPAL CHIEF RED MAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PINE CHIEF EAGLE EYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATE HONVNWV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?