MING v. STATE OF GEORGIA et al
Plaintiff: BEVERLYN MING
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH and STATE OF GEORGIA
Case Number: 5:2020cv00067
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: MARC THOMAS TREADWELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, STATE OF GEORGIA. Amended to add the seal. (Attachments: #1 Summons GA Department of Public Health)(tam)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons WERE RE-ISSUED AT #4 as to GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: #1 Summons GA Department of Public Health)(tam) Modified DOCKET TEXT on 2/21/2020 (tam).
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BEVERLYN MING (tam)
February 20, 2020 Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by BEVERLYN MING ); Summons must be completed by attorney. Please complete summonses and email to macon.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov. (tam)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3394582, $400 filed by BEVERLYN MING (Attachments: #1 Summons Ga Dept Public Health, #2 Summons State of Georgia, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graham, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MING v. STATE OF GEORGIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLYN MING
Represented By: Neal B. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?