AlertPoint, LLC v. Olds et al

Plaintiff: AlertPoint, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Dean Olds and RoomPro Technologies, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: David Allen and EDCO-Educational Consultants, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03879
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Cobb
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE by AlertPoint, LLC Subpoena (Schnell, Grant)
October 11, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by AlertPoint, LLC.(Schnell, Grant)
October 10, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of AlertPoint, LLC's Initial Disclosures by AlertPoint, LLC.(Schnell, Grant)
October 10, 2018 Filing 23 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by AlertPoint, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schnell, Grant)
October 8, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc.. (Lilenfeld, David)
October 1, 2018 Filing 21 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by AlertPoint, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schnell, Grant) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 28, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by AlertPoint, LLC. (Schnell, Grant)
September 27, 2018 Clerks Notation re #19 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons by Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc.. (Lilenfeld, David)
September 27, 2018 Submission of #15 MOTION for Joinder of David Allen and EDCO-Educational Consultants, Inc. to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (cmd)
September 26, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re #15 MOTION for Joinder of David Allen and EDCO-Educational Consultants, Inc. filed by Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc.. (Lilenfeld, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION for Joinder of David Allen and EDCO-Educational Consultants, Inc. filed by AlertPoint, LLC. (Hendrick, Allen)
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Edward Schnell on behalf of AlertPoint, LLC (Schnell, Grant)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Joinder of David Allen and EDCO-Educational Consultants, Inc. with Brief In Support by Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc.. (Lilenfeld, David)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 2/7/2019.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against David Allen, EDCO-Educational Consultants, Inc. with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against AlertPoint, LLC with Jury Demand by Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Lilenfeld, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 9/11/2018 to add third-party defendants, edit text. (cmd)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants' Answers due 9/10/2018. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/6/18. (jpa)
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc.. (Lilenfeld, David)
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn Anne Haase on behalf of Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc. (Haase, Kaitlyn)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Lilenfeld on behalf of Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc. (Lilenfeld, David)
August 24, 2018 Clerks Notation re #9 Leave of Absence. Attorney Allen Hendrick is relieved from personally having to attend any proceedings or trials in this matter on the following dates: August 31-September 4, 2018; September 21-24, 2018; October 11-15, 2018; November 1-5, 2018; November 21-23, 2018; and December 24-January 4, 2019. This leave of absence will not affect the processing of this case including the scheduling of motions, hearings, trials or other events before this Court. (mlb)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 31, 2018 - September 4, 2018, September 21 - 24, 2018, October 11 - 15, 2018, November 1 - 5, 2018, November 21 - 23, 2018, December 24, 2018 - January 4, 2019, by Allen Andre Hendrick. (Hendrick, Allen)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 AO Form 121 mailed to Registrar. (btql)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by AlertPoint, LLC. RoomPro Technologies, Inc. served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Hendrick, Allen)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by AlertPoint, LLC. Dean Olds served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Hendrick, Allen)
August 21, 2018 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by AlertPoint, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by AlertPoint, LLC. (Hendrick, Allen)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Hendrick, Allen)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
August 15, 2018 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ddm)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dean Olds, RoomPro Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ddm)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by AlertPoint, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8080153) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AlertPoint, LLC v. Olds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Dean Olds
Represented By: Kaitlyn Anne Haase
Represented By: David M. Lilenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: RoomPro Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Kaitlyn Anne Haase
Represented By: David M. Lilenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AlertPoint, LLC
Represented By: Jeffery Byron Arnold
Represented By: Allen Andre Hendrick
Represented By: Grant Edward Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: David Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: EDCO-Educational Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?