Energy Innovation Company, LLC v. NCR Corporation
Plaintiff: Energy Innovation Company, LLC
Defendant: NCR Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv03919
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #29 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court directs the parties' attention to Section 19 of the Court's #24 Instructions to Parties re requests for hearings in civil cases. Otherwise, the parties' schedule is approved. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 10/2/18. (jlm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 29 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Energy Innovation Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Schedule)(Kent, Daniel)
October 1, 2018 Filing 28 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Matias Ferrario replacing attorney Amanda Nicole Brouillette and Megan M. Chung. (Ferrario, Matias)
October 1, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy U. Littlefield on behalf of NCR Corporation (Littlefield, Jeremy)
October 1, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Frazier Gage on behalf of NCR Corporation (Gage, Rachel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to #20 Counterclaim of Defendant NCR Corporation, by Energy Innovation Company, LLC.(Kent, Daniel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 7, 2018 MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matias Ferrario; granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caroline Wray. Entered by CRD at the direction of Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 9/7/18. (se)
September 5, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Matias Ferrario Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8117186). Attorney Matias Ferrario added appearing on behalf of NCR Corporation, NCR Corporation (pmb)
September 5, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Caroline Wray Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8117187). Attorney Caroline Wray added appearing on behalf of NCR Corporation, NCR Corporation (pmb)
August 31, 2018 Filing 24 INSTRUCTIONS to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 8/31/18. (jlm)
August 31, 2018 Clerks Notation re #21 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
August 30, 2018 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Caroline Wray Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8117187)by NCR Corporation. (Brouillette, Amanda)
August 30, 2018 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Matias Ferrario Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8117186)by NCR Corporation. (Brouillette, Amanda)
August 30, 2018 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Persons by NCR Corporation. (Brouillette, Amanda)
August 30, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 5/28/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against Energy Innovation Company, LLC with Jury Demand by NCR Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - 2018 assignment, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 2003 assignment)(Brouillette, Amanda) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 30, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Nicole Brouillette on behalf of NCR Corporation (Brouillette, Amanda)
August 17, 2018 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00466. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint or Transfer Venue. Court transfers the action to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Case transferred to the Northern District of Georgia. Files transferred electronically to: *Northern District of Georgia*.*75 Ted Turner Drive, Room 2211**Atlanta, GA 30303*. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order) (jah) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Change Venue filed by NCR Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Pfingst, Taylor). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst on behalf of NCR Corporation (Pfingst, Taylor). Attorney Taylor Jacqueline Pfingst added to party NCR Corporation (pty:dft). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Change Venue filed by Energy Innovation Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Earl Wong, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Lobbin, Stephen). (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 13 Supplemental NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by NCR Corporation. Identifying Other Affiliate The Blackstone Group L.P. for NCR Corporation. (Pfingst, Taylor). (jah). (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
July 4, 2018 Filing 12 PRO HAC APPROVED: Caroline K. Wray appearing for Defendant NCR Corporation (no document attached) (jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
July 4, 2018 Filing 11 PRO HAC APPROVED: Matias Ferrario appearing for Defendant NCR Corporation (no document attached) (jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11404754.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Wray, Caroline)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11404753.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Ferrario, Matias)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NCR Corporation identifying Other Affiliate The Blackstone Group L.P. for NCR Corporation.. (Chung, Megan). (jah). (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Change Venue by NCR Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Taylor J. Pfingst, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Declaration of Mariana Hall, #7 Declaration of Teresa Johnson)(Chung, Megan). Attorney Megan M. Chung added to party NCR Corporation( pty:dft). Added MOTION to Change Venue on 7/5/2018. Modified on 7/5/2018 - Multi part motion, one part not filed. QC Email sent. Added missing motion and corrected text (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Energy Innovation Company, LLC, as to NCR Corporation. (Lobbin, Stephen) (mpl). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
March 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Energy Innovation Company, LLC re #1 Complaint. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Lobbin, Stephen). Modified on 3/26/2018 - Pdf has wrong district judge initials. QC Email sent re correct judge (jah).[Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER. Judge Larry Alan Burns has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv466 H (JLB).(no document attached) (jcj) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
March 5, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *6,119,933* (cc: USPTO)(jrm)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]
March 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against NCR Corporation (filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10976469), filed by Energy Innovation Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:18-cv-00466-LAB-JLB. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Lobbin, Stephen)(jrm)(jrd) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Innovation Company, LLC v. NCR Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCR Corporation
Represented By: Caroline Wray
Represented By: Megan M. Chung
Represented By: Matias Ferrario
Represented By: Rachel Frazier Gage
Represented By: Jeremy U. Littlefield
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Brouillette
Represented By: Taylor J. Pfingst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Innovation Company, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Michael Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?