Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC v. Box et al
Plaintiff: Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC
Defendant: Andrew Wilson, Peter Bonner, James Smith, Philip Box, Gordon Gibson and Brendan Gallagher
Case Number: 1:2018cv04346
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re: #46 Amended Complaint, by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konn, Jamie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC.(Bosin, Joshua)
November 15, 2018 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Philip Box.(Konn, Jamie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Philip Box.(Konn, Jamie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Philip Box.(Konn, Jamie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 51 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC filed by Philip Box (Konn, Jamie)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 11/13/18. (ddm)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Consent Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order. The Temporary Restraining Order entered and extended by this Court on October 23 and 30, 2018 [ECF Nos. 26 & 39] is hereby further EXTENDED to the period through and including the Hearing but not to continue beyond November 28, 2018 without further order of this Court. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 11/13/18. (ddm)
November 12, 2018 Filing 48 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Defendant Philip Box filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC (Bosin, Joshua)
November 12, 2018 Filing 47 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Extending Temporary Restraining Order. (Bosin, Joshua)
November 9, 2018 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief)(Bosin, Joshua) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 9, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 11/27/2018 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M Ray II. (jkl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M Ray, II: Telephone Conference held on 11/8/2018. Counsel discussed scheduling a hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Defendants to confirm if they will allow a voluntary provisional extension of the TRO; if so, Plaintiff will file a proposed order. Counsel are to contact Ms. Lee to schedule the hearing. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers)(btql)
November 8, 2018 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Bosin, Joshua)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE (by docket entry only): A teleconference is set for 11/8/2018 at 2:00 PM before Judge William M Ray II. (jkl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC of Ongoing Negotiation of Consent Order for Forensic Examination (Bosin, Joshua)
October 31, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE by Brendan Gallagher, Andrew Wilson Notice of Withdrawal of Written Discovery Requests (Konn, Jamie)
October 31, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE Of Filing Temporary Restraining Order Bond by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Temporary Restraining Order Bond)(Bosin, Joshua)
October 31, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge William M Ray, II. Judge Mark H. Cohen no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-04346-WMR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (sap)
October 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC of Withdrawal of Certain Written Discovery Requests and Notices of Deposition (Bosin, Joshua)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part #35 Motion for Reconsideration. See Order for more details. The parties are DIRECTED to present a proposed Consent Order to the Court no later than November 5, 2018, or inform the Court if there are any portions of the imaging procedure for which agreement cannot be reached. Finally, with the consent of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the temporary restraining order entered by the Court on October 23, 2018, is extended for an additional fourteen (14) days, to and through November 20, 2018. The hearing on CLUS's Motion for Preliminary Injunction previously set for November 6, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., is CANCELLED. As it appears that this case will be transferred to the Honorable William M. Ray II, further scheduling requests should be directed to Judge Ray after the transfer of this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/30/18. (bnw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark H. Cohen: Discovery Hearing(Non-final Pretrial Conference) held on 10/29/2018.Court conducted a telephone conference regarding discovery issues. Court to issue an order. See transcript for details. Hearing Concluded. (Court Reporter Judith Wolff)(bnw)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for Plaintiff Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or file an Amended Complaint is hereby extended to the period through andincluding November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/29/18. (bnw)
October 29, 2018 NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE HEARING: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 03:30 PM before Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lwb)
October 29, 2018 Clerks Notation re #33 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
October 26, 2018 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or File an Amended Complaint re: #24 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bosin, Joshua)
October 26, 2018 Filing 35 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #26 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Andrew Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Konn, Jamie)
October 25, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC.(Bosin, Joshua)
October 25, 2018 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Sedgwick, Inc., Other Affiliate Sedgwick Holdings, Inc. for Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC. (Bosin, Joshua)
October 25, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Andrew Wilson (Attachments: #1 Box's Expedited Request For Interrogatories, #2 Wilson's Expedited Request For Interrogatories, #3 Wilson's Expedited Request for Interrogatories, #4 Gallagher's Expedited Request For Interrogatories)(Hu, Sydney)
October 25, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Brendan Gallagher (Konn, Jamie)
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cunningham Lindsey U.S., LLC filed by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Andrew Wilson (Konn, Jamie)
October 24, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brendan Gallagher filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC (Bosin, Joshua)
October 24, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew Wilson filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC (Bosin, Joshua)
October 24, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Philip Box filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC (Bosin, Joshua)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that CLUS's #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction against Defendants Philip Box, Peter Bonner, Andrew Wilson, and Brendan Gallagher is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. See Order for more details. It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 (c), the effectiveness of this TRO shall be conditioned upon CLUS posting a good and sufficient bond, within (14) days of the date of this Order, with sureties acceptable to the Court. The Court finds that a bond in the amount of $100,000.00 would be reasonable. It is further ORDERED that CLUS's #3 Motion for Expedited Discovery and For Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information is GRANTED. Defendants' #25 Motion to Stay Proceedings (which argued that discovery should be stayed until its Motion to Dismiss all claims is resolved) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Temporary Restraining Order will expire (14) days from today's date, unless the Court, for good cause, extends it for a like period or the Defendants consent to a longer extension. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction will be held on November 6, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 1905 at the United States Courthouse, 75 Ted Turner Drive, S.W., Atlanta, Georgia. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/23/18. (bnw)
October 16, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memo in Support)(Konn, Jamie)
October 16, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Konn, Jamie) Modified on 10/17/2018 to correct attachment name (jpa).
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer is due 10/16/2018. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/9/18. (bnw)
October 9, 2018 Clerks Notation re #16 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
October 5, 2018 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Konn, Jamie)
October 1, 2018 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw)
September 28, 2018 Filing 21 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 8-12 2018, November 1-2, 2018, by Jamie M. Konn. (Konn, Jamie)
September 28, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC. (Bosin, Joshua)
September 28, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC. (Bosin, Joshua)
September 26, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sydney Hu on behalf of Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson (Hu, Sydney)
September 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie M. Konn on behalf of Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson (Konn, Jamie)
September 26, 2018 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 9/26/2018 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
September 25, 2018 Clerks Approval re #13 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson. (Konn, Jamie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information filed by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson. (Konn, Jamie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Konn, Jamie)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 113E-8148025. (Bosin, Joshua)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information , as to Andrew Wilson. (Bosin, Joshua)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information , as to Philip Box. (Bosin, Joshua)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information , as to James Smith. (Bosin, Joshua)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information , as to Brendan Gallagher. (Bosin, Joshua)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information , as to Gordon Gibson. (Bosin, Joshua)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order,, Set Submission Deadline, filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC (Bosin, Joshua)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants respond to the TRO Motion and the Discovery Motion (7) days from the date of service. After receiving Defendants' responses, the Court will decide whether a hearing is necessary. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/17/18. (bnw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Peter Bonner, Philip Box, Brendan Gallagher, Gordon Gibson, James Smith, Andrew Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Box, #2 Summons Gallagher, #3 Summons Gibson, #4 Summons Smith, #5 Summons Wilson)(bnw)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/17/18. (bnw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and for Immediate Inspection of Electronic Information with Brief In Support by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law)(Bosin, Joshua)
September 17, 2018 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Brief In Support by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of R. Clay Humphries, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Theresa Colina-Ramirez, #5 Exhibit D - Text Proposed Order)(bnw)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8148025) filed by Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 9/17/2018 to edit file date (bnw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC v. Box et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cunningham Lindsey U.S. LLC
Represented By: Joshua Isaac Bosin
Represented By: Juliana Nwafor
Represented By: John Michael Hamrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wilson
Represented By: Jamie M. Konn
Represented By: Sydney Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Smith
Represented By: Jamie M. Konn
Represented By: Sydney Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Box
Represented By: Jamie M. Konn
Represented By: Sydney Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Gibson
Represented By: Jamie M. Konn
Represented By: Sydney Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Gallagher
Represented By: Jamie M. Konn
Represented By: Sydney Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?