Martin et al v. Kemp et al
Plaintiff: Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Dana Bowers, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Corliss Armstead, James Arthur Moore and Dinesh Chandra
Defendant: Beauty Baldwin, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Seth Harp, John Mangano, Ben Satterfield, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Brian Kemp, Alice O'Lenick, Stephen Day, Robyn A. Crittenden and Brad Raffensperger
Intervenor Plaintiff: Fazal Khan and Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress
Amicus Curiae: Campaign Legal Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv04776
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 102 CLERK'S ATTORNEY FEE JUDGMENT for plaintiffs against defendants in the amount of $51,013.28. (tmf)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part #88 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding Plaintiffs $51,013.28 in fees and expenses as prevailing parties under 1988. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/24/2019. (tmf)
July 5, 2019 Filing 100 REPLY BRIEF re #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Corliss Armstead, Dana Bowers, Dinesh Chandra, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, James Arthur Moore, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - chart showing LC staff's hours worked and billed)(Powers, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 99 RESPONSE re #91 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Special Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses, #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Tyson, Bryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Special Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses, #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NAACP v Kemp Apr 11 2018 Order)(Correia, Cristina)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time: Defendants Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield, and Beauty Baldwin have until June 28, 2019, to respond to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Special Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses Doc. #91 . Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/19/2019. (tmf)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/18/2019. (tmf)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR---ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/18/2019. (tmf) Modified on 6/19/2019 to add redline text (tmf).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction: ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR---ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/18/2019. (tmf) (tmf)
June 18, 2019 Filing 94 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of Special Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 93 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 27, 2019- July 9, 2019, by Cristina Correia. (Correia, Cristina)
June 17, 2019 Filing 92 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina)
June 14, 2019 Submission of #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees , to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (adg)
June 10, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #91 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Support of 88 Special Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses by Corliss Armstead, Dana Bowers, Dinesh Chandra, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, J ames Arthur Moore, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bruce Brown, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ezra D. Rosenberg, # 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of William V. Custer)(Powers, John) Modified on 6/10/2019 to edit event text. (aaq). (aaq)
June 7, 2019 Filing 91 Plaintiffs' Supplemental BRIEF in Support of #88 Special Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Expenses by Corliss Armstead, Dana Bowers, Dinesh Chandra, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, James Arthur Moore, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bruce Brown, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ezra D. Rosenberg, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of William V. Custer)(Powers, John) Modified on 6/10/2019 to edit event text. (aaq).
May 22, 2019 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Robyn A. Crittenden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GMVP Fee Settlement)(Correia, Cristina) Modified on 5/23/2019 to add filer Crittenden(tmf).
May 22, 2019 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Tyson, Bryan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees with Brief In Support by Corliss Armstead, Dana Bowers, Dinesh Chandra, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, James Arthur Moore, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Powers)(Powers, John)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING #86 Motion for Extension of Time for plaintiffs to file their special written motion for attorneys' fees and ligation expenses by no later than 5/8/2019, and their detailed specification and itemization of those fees and expenses pursuant to Local Rule 54.2A(2) by no later than 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/1/2019. (btql)
May 1, 2019 Filing 86 First MOTION for Extension of Time file Initial Special Written Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses and their Detailed Specification and Itemization of Costs by Corliss Armstead, Dana Bowers, Dinesh Chandra, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, James Arthur Moore, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, John)
April 17, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #85 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (btql)
April 17, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (btql)
April 16, 2019 Filing 85 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Corliss Armstead, Dana Bowers, Dinesh Chandra, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, James Arthur Moore, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HB 316)(Powers, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 84 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 6/3/19-6/13/19, by Bryan P. Tyson. (Tyson, Bryan) Text modified on 4/4/2019 (btql).
April 3, 2019 Filing 83 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Cristina Correia replacing attorney Elizabeth Ahern Monyak. (Correia, Cristina)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING #79 Motion to Substitute Party. The Clerk is DIRECTED to substitute Georgia's current Secretary of State, Brad Raffensperger, for the prior Secretary of State, Brian Kemp. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/18/2019. (btql)
March 18, 2019 Submission of #79 MOTION to Substitute Party Brian Kemp to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING #80 Motion to Stay of Discovery and Extension of Discovery Deadlines. Discovery ends 8/9/2019. Dispositive motions due 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/28/2019. (btql)
February 28, 2019 Filing 80 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery by Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit)(Correia, Cristina)
February 27, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to Substitute Party Brian Kempby Brian Kemp. (Correia, Cristina)
February 22, 2019 Filing 78 USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal of GRANTING Appellant's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal re: #66 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 18-15148-CC. (kac)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING #76 Motion for Extension of Time to complete initial disclosures. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/14/2019. (btql)
February 14, 2019 Filing 76 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time file initial disclosures by Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Correia, Cristina)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #74 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 6/14/2019. Motions due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/16/2019. (btql)
January 15, 2019 Filing 74 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Correia, Cristina)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #72 Motion for Extension of Time to file the Joint Preliminary Planning Report. Report shall be due on 1/15/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/14/2019. (btql)
January 14, 2019 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Rule 26 Report by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
December 17, 2018 Filing 71 ANSWER to #63 COMPLAINT by Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Monyak, Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 14, 2018 Filing 70 USCA Acknowledgment of #66 Notice of Appeal, filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, Ben Satterfield, John Mangano and Alice O'Lenick. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-15148-CC. (pjm)
December 14, 2018 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, #66 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-15148-CC. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
December 13, 2018 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhonda J. Martin. Beauty Baldwin waiver mailed on 10/18/2018, answer due 12/17/2018; Stephen Day waiver mailed on 10/18/2018, answer due 12/17/2018; John Mangano waiver mailed on 10/18/2018, answer due 12/17/2018; Alice O'Lenick waiver mailed on 10/18/2018, answer due 12/17/2018; Ben Satterfield waiver mailed on 10/18/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Brown, Bruce)
December 13, 2018 Filing 68 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #66 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
December 13, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #66 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
December 13, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #55 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion to Intervene by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-8327238. Transcript Order Form due on 12/27/2018 (Tyson, Bryan)
December 13, 2018 Filing 65 ANSWER to #63 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. Discovery ends on 5/13/2019.(Tyson, Bryan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Text modified on 12/14/2018 (btql).
December 11, 2018 Filing 64 USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal of Voluntary Dismissal: Pursuant to Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), #29 Notice of Appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-14503-GG. (pjm)
December 4, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #61 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (btql)
December 3, 2018 Filing 63 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Dana Bowers, Jeanne Dufort, Jasmine Clark, Corliss Armstead, James Arthur Moore, Dinesh Chandra.(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/3/2018 (btql).
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING #53 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/3/2018. (btql)
December 3, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan (Cope, Veronica)
November 30, 2018 Submission of #53 First MOTION to Amend Complaint to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql)
November 27, 2018 RETURN of #46 APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce V. Spiva Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266091)to attorney for correction re: local counsel's address. (cdg)
November 27, 2018 RETURN of #47 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc E. Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266157) to attorney for correction re: local counsel's address. (cdg)
November 27, 2018 RETURN of #48 APPLICATION for Admission of Aria C. Branch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266161) to attorney for correction re: local counsel's address. (cdg)
November 27, 2018 RETURN of #50 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian Simmonds Marshall Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266165) to attorney for correction re: local counsel's address. (cdg)
November 27, 2018 RETURN of #49 APPLICATION for Admission of K'Shaani Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266163) to attorney for correction re: local counsel's address. (cdg)
November 26, 2018 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhonda J. Martin. Brian Kemp waiver mailed on 10/18/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Brown, Bruce)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING #57 Plaintiff-Intervenors' Motion for Reconsideration of #55 Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/15/2018. (jtj)
November 15, 2018 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #55 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion to Intervene filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Tyson, Bryan)
November 15, 2018 Filing 57 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #55 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion to Intervene with Brief In Support by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Emergency Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Affidavit of Brian Marshall, #3 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Brian Marshall, #4 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Brian Marshall, #5 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit of Brian Marshall, #6 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit of Brian Marshall, #7 Exhibit 5 to Affidavit of Brian Marshall)(Cope, Veronica)
November 13, 2018 Filing 56 Intervenor COMPLAINT against Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, Seth Harp, Brian Kemp, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, filed by Fazal Khan, Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Attachment 1)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress and Fazal Khan's Motion to Intervene #45 . Intervenors' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [45-5] is GRANTED as to the birth year issues and DENIED as to the remaining requests for relief. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket the Complaint in Intervention [45-2]. Plaintiffs Rhonda J. Martin, Dana Bowers, Jasmine Clark, Smythe Duval, Jeanne Dufort, and the Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.'s Motion and Amended Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order [42, 44] is GRANTED as to the birth year issue and DENIED as to the remaining requests for relief. Defendants Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield and Beauty Baldwin (the Gwinnett County BORE Members) are hereby ENJOINED from rejecting absentee ballots containing an error or omission relating to the absentee voter's year of birth and are ORDERED to count such ballots in the November 6, 2018 election. Defendants are ORDERED to delay certification until such ballots have been counted. Nothing in this Order affects or otherwise extinguishes this Court's prior injunction related to signature matching. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/13/2018. (rvb)
November 12, 2018 Filing 54 REPLY BRIEF re #44 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
November 12, 2018 Filing 53 First MOTION to Amend Complaint by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
November 12, 2018 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Chris Harvey)(Correia, Cristina) Text modified on 11/13/2018 (btql).
November 12, 2018 Filing 51 RESPONSE re #45 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs, #44 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #42 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Supplemental Declaration of Lynn Ledford)(Tyson, Bryan)
November 12, 2018 Filing 50 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian Simmonds Marshall Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266165)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
November 12, 2018 Filing 49 APPLICATION for Admission of K'Shaani Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266163)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
November 12, 2018 Filing 48 APPLICATION for Admission of Aria C. Branch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266161)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
November 12, 2018 Filing 47 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc E. Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266157)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
November 12, 2018 Filing 46 APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce V. Spiva Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266091)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
November 11, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs with Brief In Support by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit 2 to Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause and for a Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit Brief in Support of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause and for a Preliminary Injunction)(Cope, Veronica)
November 11, 2018 Filing 44 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Rhonda J. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for TRO)(Brown, Bruce)
November 11, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE Of Filing by Rhonda J. Martin re #42 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Exhibits in Support of Motion (Brown, Bruce)
November 11, 2018 Filing 42 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Brief In Support by Rhonda J. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting TRO)(Brown, Bruce)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING #19 AMENDED Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This Order does not affect the injunction already in place regarding signature mismatches. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/2/2018. (btql)
October 31, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE by Dana Bowers, Campaign Legal Center, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc. re #19 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sixth Circuit opinion in Husted)(Powers, John)
October 31, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF re #19 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dana Bowers, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jennifer Nwachukwu, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Pooja Choudhuri, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jacob Conarck, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Ryan Snow, #5 Exhibit 5 - First Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Michael P. McDonald, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Isabel Hidalgo, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of James A. Edwards, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Broughton Brooks, #9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Oanh Tran, #10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Guido Aguilar, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Matilda S. Rouse, #12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Thomas P. Grant, #13 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Nicolas Bailey, #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Norma Bristow, #15 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Alec Brindell, #16 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Lana Goitia, #17 Exhibit 17 - Supplemental declaration of Amber McReynolds, #18 Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Godwin I. Ogboma Akhirome, #19 Exhibit 19 - Supplemental declaration of Marilyn Marks)(Powers, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #20 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Ryan Snow) (rvb). Modified on 10/31/2018 to add exhibit 4 (rvb).
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING #27 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal of Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/30/2018. (btql)
October 29, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gwinnett Response in GMVP Litigation, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Lynn Ledford from GMVP Response)(Tyson, Bryan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Seth Harp, Brian Kemp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Correia, Cristina)
October 29, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
October 29, 2018 Filing 34 USCA Acknowledgment of #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Brian Kemp. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-14503-GG. (pjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 33 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #29 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #29 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
October 29, 2018 Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, #29 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-14503-GG. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John Powers ; granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Danielle M. Lang; granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Mark P. Gaber. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/29/2018. (rvb)
October 26, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Dempsey on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Dempsey, Brian)
October 26, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Carothers on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Carothers, Richard)
October 26, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Temporary Restraining Order, #23 Order by Brian Kemp. Transcript Order Form due on 11/9/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order (Doc. 23), #2 Exhibit Order (Doc. 26))(Correia, Cristina)
October 26, 2018 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/23/2018, before Judge Leigh Martin May. Court Reporter Montrell Vann, Telephone number 404-215-1549. Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) (mv)
October 26, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Danielle M. Lang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8221943). Attorney Bryan Ludington Sells added appearing on behalf of Campaign Legal Center (jkm)
October 26, 2018 Payment of Appeal Fees re #29 Notice of Appeal by Brian Kemp. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-8234701. (Correia, Cristina)
October 26, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark P. Gaber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8221963). Attorney Bryan Ludington Sells added appearing on behalf of Campaign Legal Center (jkm)
October 26, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of John Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8220294). Attorney Bruce P. Brown added appearing on behalf of Rhonda J. Martin (jkm)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file a response by noon on Monday, October 29, 2018 to the #27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/26/2018. (rvb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 27 Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp. (Correia, Cristina)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/25/2018. (btql)
October 25, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE re #23 Order,, Objections Related to Form of Relief filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Chris Harvey)(Correia, Cristina)
October 25, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE re #23 Order,, Objections to Form of Proposed Injunction filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Lynn Ledford)(Tyson, Bryan)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER addressing the signature mismatch argument from the #19 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The Court proposes entering the proposed injunction as detailed within this order. As the parties have not had an opportunity to be heard on the exact terms of the Court's proposal, the parties have until noon on Thursday, October 25, 2018, to provide the Court with any objections to the form. See Order for further detail. All other Elector claims will be addressed by the Court at a later time, after Defendants have had an opportunity to be heard ( See dkt. #21 ). Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/24/2018. (rvb)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc Plaintiffs' #18 Motion for Leave to File to Hearing Brief. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/24/2018. (rvb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2018. Oral argument was held on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction #19 . The Court heard from Plaintiffs' and Defendants' counsel. The motion was taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(btql)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to file a Response Brief to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction #19 by Monday, October 29, 2018 by 12:00 p.m. If Plaintiffs are inclined to file a Reply Brief, their reply shall be due by close of business on Wednesday, October 31, 2018. After the motion is fully briefed, the Court will determine if a hearing is necessary and issue an order on an expedited basis. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/23/2018. (rvb)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM for a hearing set for 10/23/2018. Counsel shall bring a copy of this order with them to the courthouse. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/23/2018. (rvb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rhonda J. Martin, Dana Bowers, Smythe Duval, Jeanne Dufort, Jasmine Clark, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Bruce) Modified on 10/23/2018 to edit filers (btql).
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Hearing Brief with attached Hearing Brief by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Campaign Legal Center #13 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/23/2018. (rvb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION To Bring Electronic Equipment Into the Courthouse by Rhonda J. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Bruce)
October 22, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE Of Filing Declarations in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rhonda J. Martin (Brown, Bruce) Text modified on 10/23/2018 (btql).
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark P. Gaber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8221963)by Campaign Legal Center. (Sells, Bryan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Danielle M. Lang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8221943)by Campaign Legal Center. (Sells, Bryan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' #4 MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction by Campaign Legal Center. (Attachments: #1 Brief of proposed amicus curiae)(Sells, Bryan) Text modified on 10/23/2018 (btql).
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Ludington Sells on behalf of Campaign Legal Center (Sells, Bryan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Ware Lewis on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Lewis, Anne)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rhonda J. Martin, Dana Bowers, Smythe Duval, Jeanne Dufort, Jasmine Clark, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc. (Brown, Bruce) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 10/23/2018 to edit filers (btql).
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Strickland, Frank)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of John Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8220294)by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE Of Filing Declarations in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rhonda J. Martin (Brown, Bruce) Text modified on 10/22/2018 (btql).
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Willard on behalf of Seth Harp, Brian Kemp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Willard, Russell)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Tyson, Bryan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Rhonda J. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Brown, Bruce)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Seth Harp, Brian Kemp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Correia, Cristina)
October 19, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction A Motion Hearing is set for 10/23/2018 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2107 before Judge Leigh Martin May. (rvb)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/16/2018. (rvb)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dana Bowers, Smythe Duval, Jeanne Dufort, Rhonda J. Martin, Jasmine Clark. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8207977) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. Kemp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauty Baldwin
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Anne Ware Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Monyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Harp
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Monyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mangano
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Anne Ware Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Satterfield
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Anne Ware Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N. Sullivan
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Monyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Worley
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Monyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice O'Lenick
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Anne Ware Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Day
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Frank B. Strickland
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Anne Ware Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn A. Crittenden
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Monyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Cristina Correia
Represented By: Russell D. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Clark
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Dufort
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Bowers
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smythe Duval
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda J. Martin
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corliss Armstead
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Arthur Moore
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinesh Chandra
Represented By: Bruce P. Brown
Represented By: John Michael Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Fazal Khan
Represented By: Veronica Higgs Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress
Represented By: Veronica Higgs Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Campaign Legal Center
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Represented By: Danielle M. Lang
Represented By: Bryan Ludington Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?