Fair Fight Action et al v. Crittenden et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Care in Action and Fair Fight Action
Defendant: Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Seth Harp, Robyn A. Crittenden and State Election Board
Case Number: 1:2018cv05391
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint)(Belinfante, Joshua)
March 5, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 16-01 as to Lovita T. Tandy re 46 MOTION to Withdraw Lovita T. Tandy as Attorney. (rjs)
March 4, 2019 Filing 46 Letter to Clerk of Court (construed as a) MOTION to Withdraw Lovita T. Tandy as Attorney by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (rjs)
February 27, 2019 Filing 45 Initial Disclosures by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
February 27, 2019 Filing 44 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Bryan, Leslie)
February 27, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
February 26, 2019 Submission of 35 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
February 19, 2019 Filing 42 Supplemental Certificate of Interested Persons by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc., Care in Action, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
February 19, 2019 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Seth Harp, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Brad Raffenspergerwith Jury Demand filed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 12, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 37 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeremy Hale Ershow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8436966). Attorney Jeremy Hale Ershow added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Bryan, Leslie)
February 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Edward Lake on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Lake, Brian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Carey Allen Miller on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Miller, Carey)
February 7, 2019 Filing 37 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeremy Hale Ershow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8436966)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Bryan, Leslie)
February 7, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Robert Russo, Jr on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Russo, Vincent)
January 28, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Belinfante, Joshua)
January 24, 2019 Filing 34 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
January 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Kali Nneka Bracey re 33 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Kali Nneka Bracey. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/23/2019. (rjs)
January 18, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 31 APPLICATION for Admission of Kali Nneka Bracey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8378357). Attorney Kali Nneka Bracey added appearing on behalf of Fair Fight Action (pmb)
January 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden (Tyson, Bryan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Admission of Kali Nneka Bracey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8378357)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Bryan, Leslie)
January 2, 2019 RETURN of 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Kali Nneka Bracey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8321700) to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Scott Steven Bernstein. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/2/2019. (rjs)
December 31, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Scott Steven Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8335642). Attorney Scott Bernstein added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
December 28, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Thomas R. Bundy, III re 29 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas R. Bundy, III. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/28/2018. (rjs)
December 28, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Dara Sircus Lindenbaum re 28 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Dara Sircus Lindenbaum. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/28/2018. (rjs)
December 18, 2018 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission of Scott Steven Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8335642)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
December 17, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Dara Sircus Lindenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8304297). Attorney Dara Lindenbaum added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (cdg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. Rebecca N. Sullivan waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. Seth Harp waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. State Election Board waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. David J. Worley waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. Robyn A. Crittenden waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address for Leslie J. Bryan, counsel for Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (Bryan, Leslie)
December 14, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas R. Bundy, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8304391). Attorney Thomas Robinson Bundy, III added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
December 11, 2018 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Kali Nneka Bracey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8321700)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Bryan, Leslie)
December 11, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Sarah R. Fink re 18 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Sarah R. Fink. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/11/2018. (rjs)
December 11, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Matthew G. Kaiser re 17 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Matthew G. Kaiser. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/11/2018. (rjs)
December 11, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Andrew D. Herman re 16 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Andrew D. Herman. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/11/2018. (rjs)
December 11, 2018 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Sarah A. Dowd re 15 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Sarah A. Dowd. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/11/2018. (rjs)
December 10, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah R. Fink Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296521). Attorney Sarah R. Fink added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
December 10, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew G. Kaiser Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296518). Attorney Matthew G. Kaiser added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
December 10, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew D. Herman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296499). Attorney Andrew D. Herman added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
December 10, 2018 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah A. Dowd Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296407). Attorney Sarah A. Dowd added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas R. Bundy, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8304391)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Dara Sircus Lindenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8304297)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah R. Fink Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296521)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew G. Kaiser Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296518)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew D. Herman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296499)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah A. Dowd Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296407)by Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Care in Action and Fair Fight Action. (eop)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rebecca N. Sullivan. (eop)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to State Election Board. (eop)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Seth Harp. (eop)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson. (eop)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to David J. Worley. (eop)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robyn A. Crittenden. (eop)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Fair Fight Action and Care in Action. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8292516) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair Fight Action et al v. Crittenden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Worley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn A. Crittenden
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Election Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Care in Action
Represented By: Allegra J. Lawrence
Represented By: John A. Chandler
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Maia J. Cogen
Represented By: Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis
Represented By: Leslie J. Bryan
Represented By: Scott Bernstein
Represented By: Sarah A. Dowd
Represented By: Andrew D. Herman
Represented By: Matthew G. Kaiser
Represented By: Thomas Robinson Bundy, III
Represented By: Sarah R. Fink
Represented By: Dara Lindenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Fight Action
Represented By: Allegra J. Lawrence
Represented By: John A. Chandler
Represented By: Kurt G. Kastorf
Represented By: Maia J. Cogen
Represented By: Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis
Represented By: Leslie J. Bryan
Represented By: Scott Bernstein
Represented By: Sarah A. Dowd
Represented By: Andrew D. Herman
Represented By: Matthew G. Kaiser
Represented By: Kali Nneka Bracey
Represented By: Thomas Robinson Bundy, III
Represented By: Sarah R. Fink
Represented By: Dara Lindenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?