Heath v. Perry et al
Plaintiff: Kendrick D. Heath
Defendant: Clinton Perry and Timothy Sales
Case Number: 1:2019cv02137
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kendrick D. Heath re #3 Order and Docket Sheet. (sap)
May 17, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Georgia Northern has been opened in Middle District of Georgia as case 5:19-cv-00188, filed 05/17/2019. (sap)
May 17, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand terminated from case. (sap)
May 17, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Middle District of Georgia, Macon Division. (sap)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring this action to the Macon Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/17/2019. (sap)
May 14, 2019 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (bnw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Kendrick D. Heath. (bnw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kendrick D. Heath. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heath v. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendrick D. Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?