Diaz Caballero v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Hernan A. Diaz Caballero
Defendant: Denise Frazier, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan and Christopher Wray
Case Number: 1:2019cv03545
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
September 27, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tcc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Hernan A. Diaz Caballero (Cohen, Marshall)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Hernan A. Diaz Caballero. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019; Denise Frazier served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019; Kevin K. McAleenan served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019; Christopher Wray served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cuccinelli - executed summons, #2 Summons Wray - executed summons, #3 Summons Frazier - executed summons, #4 Summons Barr - executed summons, #5 Summons Pak - executed summons)(Cohen, Marshall)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Denise Frazier, Kevin K. McAleenan, Christopher Wray. (Attachments: #1 Summons Christopher Wray, #2 Summons Denise Frazier, #3 Summons Kenneth T Cuccinelli, #4 Summons Kevin K McAleenan, #5 Summons William P Barr)(bnw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall Lewis Cohen on behalf of Hernan A. Diaz Caballero (bnw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR NATURALIZATION; COMPLAINT FOR MANDAMUS; AND PETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by Hernan A. Diaz Caballero. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC- 8843927) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - receipt notice, #3 Exhibit B - biometric notification, #4 Exhibit C - Form N-652 interview results, #5 Exhibit D - plaintiff's letter to USCIS, #6 Exhibit E - USCIS response to request, #7 Exhibit F - USCIS case status information)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz Caballero v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernan A. Diaz Caballero
Represented By: Marshall Lewis Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?