The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation et al v. Baran et al
Plaintiff: The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation and Yini Luo
Defendant: U. S. Department of Homeland Security, DHS, Kathy A. Baran, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of the California Service Center, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv04049
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation. (Suttle, Brooks)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons in Compliance with F.R.C.P. 4(i), as to All Defendants. (Suttle, Brooks)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael L. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-4049-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/11/19. (bjh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kathy A. Baran, DHS, Kenneth Cuccinelli for U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, and U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kenneth Cuccinelli, #2 Summons Kevin McAleenan, #3 Summons U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, #4 Summons DHS) (jed)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation and Yini Luo. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8921018) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation et al v. Baran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy A. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of the California Service Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation
Represented By: Brooks Allan Suttle
Represented By: Eileen Marie Golden Scofield
Represented By: Christopher Carl Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yini Luo
Represented By: Brooks Allan Suttle
Represented By: Eileen Marie Golden Scofield
Represented By: Christopher Carl Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?