Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. et al v. Raffensperger et al
Plaintiff: DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. and DCCC
Defendant: Ben Satterfield, Seth Harp, Anh Lee, John Mangano, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Beauty Baldwin, Alice O'Lenick and Stephen Day
Case Number: 1:2019cv05028
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 30 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by DSCC, DCCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc..(Elias, Marc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss #28 for Tuesday, March 2, 2020 at 1:30 p.m.in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/23/19. (rlb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: #1 Brief - Gwinnett Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Tyson, Bryan)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Stephen Day, John Mangano, Beauty Baldwin, Alice OLenick, and Ben Satterfield deadline to file their response to Plaintiff's complaint is extended through December 23, 2019. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/20/19. (rlb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Seth Harp, Anh Lee, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan and David J. Worley Answers due 1/31/2020. If Plaintiffs amend their complaint prior to the response deadline, State Defendants' responsive pleadings shall be due by January 31, 2020, or 21 days after filing of the amended complaint, whichever is later. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/19/19. (rlb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Seth Harp, Anh Lee, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (McGowan, Charlene)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Martin Sparks on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (Sparks, Adam)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Gwinnett Defendants (Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield) Answer due 12/20/2019. Plaintiffs have through and inclduing 1/10/2020 to file a response to any Rule 12 motion to dismiss filed by Gwinnett Defendants. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/5/19. (rlb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyson, Bryan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' (Seth Harp, Anh Lee Answer, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley) time to respond to the Complaint is extended through and including December 20, 2019. Plaintiffs shall have through and including January 10, 2020 to file a response to any Rule 12 motion to dismiss filed by Defendants. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/3/19. (rlb)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Barrett Belinfante on behalf of Seth Harp, Anh Lee, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Belinfante, Joshua)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Robert Russo, Jr on behalf of Seth Harp, Anh Lee, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Russo, Vincent)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Seth Harp, Anh Lee, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (McGowan, Charlene)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlene S McGowan on behalf of Seth Harp, Anh Lee, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (McGowan, Charlene)
November 27, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Rachel Brailey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9115282). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Emily Rachel Brailey added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (pmb)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Tyson, Bryan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Emily Rachel Brailey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9115282). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Knapp, Halsey)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for K'Shaani O. Smith. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/20/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Marc Erik Elias. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/20/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bruce V. Spiva. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/20/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Amanda R. Callais. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/20/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for John M. Devaney. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/20/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
November 20, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Devaney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092645). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney John M. Devaney added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (pmb)
November 20, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce V. Spiva Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092722). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Bruce V. Spiva added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (pmb)
November 20, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda R. Callais Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092702). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Amanda R. Callais added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (pmb)
November 20, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of K'Shaani O. Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092789). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney K'Shaani O. Smith added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (pmb)
November 20, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc Erik Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092739). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Marc E. Elias added appearing on behalf of DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. (pmb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of K'Shaani O. Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092789). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Knapp, Halsey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Marc Erik Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092739). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Knapp, Halsey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce V. Spiva Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092722). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Knapp, Halsey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Amanda R. Callais Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092702). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Knapp, Halsey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of John M. Devaney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9092645). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. with Brief In Support by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Knapp, Halsey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by DCCC, DSCC, Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.. (Knapp, Halsey)
November 12, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Seth Harp, Anh Lee, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield, and Beauty Baldwin. (Attachments: #1 Summons Rebecca N. Sullivan, #2 Summons David J. Worley, #3 Summons Seth Harp, #4 Summons Beauty Baldwin, #5 Summons Stephen Day, #6 Summons John Mangano, #7 Summons Alice O'Lenick, #8 Summons Ben Satterfield, #9 Summons Anh Lee)(ah)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc., DSCC and DCCC (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9060103). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. et al v. Raffensperger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Satterfield
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Harp
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Vincent Robert Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anh Lee
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Vincent Robert Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mangano
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Vincent Robert Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca N. Sullivan
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Vincent Robert Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Worley
Represented By: Joshua Barrett Belinfante
Represented By: Charlene S McGowan
Represented By: Vincent Robert Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauty Baldwin
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice O'Lenick
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Day
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSCC
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Bruce V. Spiva
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: K'Shaani O. Smith
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Emily Rachel Brailey
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Bruce V. Spiva
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: K'Shaani O. Smith
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Emily Rachel Brailey
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCCC
Represented By: Halsey G. Knapp, Jr
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: Bruce V. Spiva
Represented By: John M. Devaney
Represented By: K'Shaani O. Smith
Represented By: Amanda R. Callais
Represented By: Emily Rachel Brailey
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?