Swift Stop, Inc. v. Mattress Firm, Inc.
Plaintiff: Swift Stop, Inc.
Defendant: Mattress Firm, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02130
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Compel Payment of Rent Into Court filed by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Lewis, Joyce)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 9, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Disclosures by Swift Stop, Inc..(Maurer, Jacob)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #9 MOTION to Compel Payment of Rent Into Court . Defendant shall have until July 13, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/9/2020. (bnp)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: #9 MOTION to Compel Payment of Rent Into Court by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(Lewis, Joyce)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/9/2020. (bnp)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Swift Stop, Inc.. (Maurer, Jacob)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Payment of Rent Into Court with Brief In Support by Swift Stop, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Payment of Rent, #2 Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Payment of Rent, #3 Exhibit 2 to Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Payment of Rent, #4 Exhibit 3 to Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Payment of Rent, #5 Exhibit 4 to Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Payment of Rent, #6 Exhibit 5 to Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Payment of Rent)(Maurer, Jacob)
June 12, 2020 Clerks Notation re #8 Certificate of Interested Persons read and approved by LMM. (rlb)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Swift Stop, Inc.. (Maurer, Jacob)
June 5, 2020 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons read and approved by LMM. (rlb)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mattress Firm, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Steinhoff International Holdings N.V. for Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Horst, Jeffrey)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Affirmative Defenses, ANSWER to COMPLAINT , and ( Discovery ends on 10/30/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against Swift Stop, Inc. by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Lease & First Amendment)(Horst, Jeffrey) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for John Bryant Thomas. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/29/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
May 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of John Bryant Thomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9729056).. Attorney John Bryant Thomas added appearing on behalf of Mattress Firm, Inc. (cdg)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Wildstein on behalf of Swift Stop, Inc. (Wildstein, Robert)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of John Bryant Thomas Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9729056).by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Horst, Jeffrey) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Mattress Firm, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9707489) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -State Court Pleading, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swift Stop, Inc. v. Mattress Firm, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattress Firm, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Horst
Represented By: Barclay Hendrix
Represented By: Joyce Gist Lewis
Represented By: John Bryant Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swift Stop, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Aaron Maurer
Represented By: Robert D. Wildstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?