Kurtz v. LG Chem, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Kurtz
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc. and LG Chem, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2020cv02523
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Submission of #15 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial), to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #22 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Fact Discovery ends on 4/6/2021. Deadline for Plaintiff to disclose expert reports: December 30, 2020; Deadline for LGCAI to disclose expert reports: January 29, 2021 Deadline for parties' supplemental expert reports: February 26, 2021. The parties are directed to file an amended Joint Scheduling Report within 14 days after LG Chem, LTD files an appearance in this action. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/10/2020. (bdb)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Melissa Foster Bird as to LG Chem America, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/10/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Rachel Atkin Hedley as to LG Chem America, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/10/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 10, 2020 Clerks Notation re #14 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
August 7, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures and First Set of Discovery Requests to LG Chem America, Inc. by Benjamin Kurtz.(Nehmens, Angela)
August 7, 2020 Filing 24 Initial Disclosures by Benjamin Kurtz.(Nehmens, Angela)
August 7, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Initial Disclosures, ROGs & RFPs) by LG Chem America, Inc..(North, Richard)
August 7, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard)
August 7, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa Foster Bird Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9995266).. Attorney Melissa Foster Bird added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (cdg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Admission of Melissa Foster Bird Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9995266).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 4, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9981627).. Attorney Rachel Atkin Hedley added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (cdg)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9981627).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Benjamin Kurtz. (Nehmens, Angela)
July 14, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Nehmens, Angela)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) with Brief In Support by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - VA Complaint)(North, Richard)
July 8, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG Chem America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Chem Michigan, Inc. for LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 LG Chem America, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by LG Chem America, Inc.. Discovery ends on 12/7/2020.(North, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Application of William A. Levin for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/2/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Benjamin Kurtz LGCAI (Sleppy, David)
July 1, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of William A. Levin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9848967).. Attorney William A. Levin added appearing on behalf of Benjamin Kurtz (nmb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of William A. Levin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9848967).by Benjamin Kurtz. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Application of Angela Nehmens for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 6/23/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
June 19, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Angela Nehmens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9808544).. Attorney William A. Levin added appearing on behalf of Benjamin Kurtz (nmb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Benjamin Kurtz. LG Chem America, Inc. served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Sleppy, David)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on June 17, 2020. (ash)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Angela Nehmens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9808544).by Benjamin Kurtz. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem America, Inc.. (eop)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem, Ltd. (eop)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Benjamin Kurtz. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9801446) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurtz v. LG Chem, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Rachel Atkin Hedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Kurtz
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: David A. Sleppy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?