Johnson v. LG Chem, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc. and LG Chem, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2020cv03230
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (LGCAI's Subpoena duces Tecum to Vape Shop) by LG Chem America, Inc..(Rogers, James)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #27 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Plaintiff to disclose expert reports: January 29, 2021. LGCAI to disclose expert reports: March 1, 2021. Parties' supplemental expert reports: March 31, 2021. Expert Discovery ends on May 27, 2021. The parties are directed to file an amended Joint Scheduling Report within 14 days after LG Chem, LTD files an appearance in this action. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/30/2020. (bdb)
September 30, 2020 Clerks Notation re #24 Certificate of Interested Persons, #14 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
September 30, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Irvin, James)
September 30, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Rogers, James)
September 30, 2020 Filing 32 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Bird, Melissa) Modified on 9/30/2020 to add red text and edit document restrictions per attorney phone call (jpk).
September 30, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hedley, Rachel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery and Initial Disclosures by Richard Johnson.(Nehmens, Angela)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 28, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (LGCAI's Initial Disclosures, 1st Interrogatories & RFPs to Plaintiff) by LG Chem America, Inc..(North, Richard)
September 28, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Richard Johnson. (Nehmens, Angela)
September 28, 2020 Submission of #15 MOTION to Dismiss (partial), to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF re #15 MOTION to Dismiss (partial) filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 Initial Disclosures by Richard Johnson.(Nehmens, Angela)
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Persons by Richard Johnson. (Nehmens, Angela)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice James F. Rogers as to LG Chem America, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/22/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice James T. Irvin, III as to LG Chem America, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/22/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Rachel Atkin Hedley as to LG Chem America, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/22/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
September 21, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #20 APPLICATION for Admission of James F. Rogers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160591).. Attorney James F. Rogers added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb)
September 21, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of James T. Irvin, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160515).. Attorney James T. Irvin, III added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb)
September 21, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160457).. Attorney Rachel Atkin Hedley added appearing on behalf of LG Chem America, Inc. (nmb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of James F. Rogers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160591).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 18, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of James T. Irvin, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160515).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Rachel Atkin Hedley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10160457).by LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss (partial) filed by Richard Johnson. (Nehmens, Angela)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss (partial) with Brief In Support by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(North, Richard)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG Chem America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Chem Michigan, Inc. for LG Chem America, Inc.. (North, Richard)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by LG Chem America, Inc.. Discovery ends on 1/25/2021.(North, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for William A. Levin (Levin, William)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Angela J. Nehmens (Nehmens, Angela)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Angela Nehmens as to Richard Johnson. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/13/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice William Levin as to Richard Johnson. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/13/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bdb)
August 12, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Angela Nehmens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10011271).. Attorney Angela J. Nehmens added appearing on behalf of Richard Johnson (cdg)
August 12, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of William Levin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10011249).. Attorney William A. Levin added appearing on behalf of Richard Johnson (cdg)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Richard Johnson. LG Chem America, Inc. served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Sleppy, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Angela Nehmens Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10011271).by Richard Johnson. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of William Levin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10011249).by Richard Johnson. (Sleppy, David) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 6, 2020. (ash)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem America, Inc.. (eop)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to LG Chem, Ltd. (eop)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Richard Johnson. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9987822) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. LG Chem, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Johnson
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: David A. Sleppy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Rachel Atkin Hedley
Represented By: James T. Irvin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?