Johnson et al v. Belcher et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Johnson and Andrea Hodges-Johnson
Defendant: Simon Byun, Fnu Pachoke, Brody Thomas, Matt Legerme, Rob Kirschner, Chance Belcher, Vince Difatta, Ashley Kessler, Seung (Steve) Suk, Dwayne Black, Christopher Dusik and Brandon Mathews
Case Number: 1:2020cv03409
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Vince Difatta, Christopher Dusik, Rob Kirschner, Matt Legerme, Seung (Steve) Suk. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A Search Warrant)(Dempsey, Brian)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Brian Dempsey (Dempsey, Brian)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Richard Carothers (Dempsey, Brian)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Thomas Mitchell (Dempsey, Brian)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Mitchell on behalf of Vince Difatta, Christopher Dusik, Rob Kirschner, Matt Legerme, Seung (Steve) Suk (Mitchell, Thomas)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Dempsey on behalf of Vince Difatta, Christopher Dusik, Rob Kirschner, Matt Legerme, Seung (Steve) Suk (Dempsey, Brian)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Carothers on behalf of Vince Difatta, Christopher Dusik, Rob Kirschner, Matt Legerme, Seung (Steve) Suk (Carothers, Richard)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Verification to Complaint for Damages by Andrea Hodges-Johnson, Christopher Johnson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification of Complaint for Damages)(Kendall, Wayne)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Manual Filing of Exhibits B, C, and D re #1 Complaint, by Andrea Hodges-Johnson, Christopher Johnson. (rvb)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 8/20/2020. (bdb)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Johnson and Andrea Hodges-Johnson. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10035999) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Ante Litem Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Lawsuit (12))(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Belcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Harry Martina Daniels
Represented By: Wayne B. Kendall
Represented By: Kimberly A. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Hodges-Johnson
Represented By: Harry Martina Daniels
Represented By: Wayne B. Kendall
Represented By: Kimberly A. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Byun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fnu Pachoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brody Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Legerme
Represented By: Thomas M. Mitchell
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Kirschner
Represented By: Thomas M. Mitchell
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chance Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Difatta
Represented By: Thomas M. Mitchell
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seung (Steve) Suk
Represented By: Thomas M. Mitchell
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Dusik
Represented By: Thomas M. Mitchell
Represented By: Brian R. Dempsey
Represented By: Richard A. Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?