Seitz v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donna L. Seitz
Defendant: Thomas Benson, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Target Corporation and Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03423
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for failure to comply with a lawfulorder of the Court. (dob)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for failure to comply with a lawful order of the Court. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/2/2020. (dob)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Donna L. Seitz.(Merritt, Julia) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint that properly alleges the citizenship of each party in this case and that otherwise establishes subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/18/2020. (dob)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, Target Corporation Answer due 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/11/2020. (dob)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time for Target to Answer Complaint)(Dermer, Stephen)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Donna L. Seitz. Target Corporation served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Cheeley, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas Benson. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Target Corporation. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (eop)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Donna L. Seitz. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-10040294) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seitz v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L. Seitz
Represented By: Julia Ann Merritt
Represented By: Robert David Cheeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Dermer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?