Daker v. Head et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv03690
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Submission of #238 Order, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (aar)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Filing Restriction ORDER Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 08/26/2019. (aar)
September 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Waseem Daker re #237 Order. (aar)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/01/2020. (aar)
September 4, 2020 Filing 236 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 6:14-cv-00047. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER ADOPTING in PART and REJECTING in PART #99 Report and Recommendations. The Court Severs and Transfers this case to the Northern District of Georgia as to the Cobb County claim Defendants listed herein; Severs and Transfers this Case to the Middle District of Georgia as to the GDCP claim Defendants listed herein. This case will proceed in this Court as to the remaining GSP claims listed herein. Docs #8 , #10 , #11 , #72 and #73 are denied. #146 is granted and #132 is denied as Moot. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/4/2020. (pts) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER denying #174 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #212 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #219 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/3/2020. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER denying as moot #111 Motion to Expedite; denying #113 Motion; denying #135 Motion to Stay; denying #150 Motion; granting #151 Motion to Stay discovery. The parties' discovery deadlines in this case are stayed until resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/31/20. (slt) Modified on 8/31/2020 (slt). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER denying #114 Motion for Access to Case Authorities. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 08/28/2020. (MG) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER denying #115 Motion to Certify State Law Questions to Supreme Court of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 08/28/2020. (MG) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 230 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 8/27/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 229 REPLY to Response to Motion re #205 MOTION to Strike; MOTION for Extension of Time; #206 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; #198 MOTION to Strike; #200 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; #201 MOTION, filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 228 U.S. Marshal Return Unexecuted as to Officer Henry, John Paul, Ms. Crowder, Aswon Cauley, P. Murphy, Mr Caravello, Ms. Brady, Doctor Dean Broome, Ms Cowart, Ms. Lightsey, Ms. Strickland, Tiffany Wooten, Debbie King, Ms Dobbs, William McNunn, Sharon Brown, Rick Jacobs, Mr Turmond, Ms Silvers. (pts) Modified on 8/12/2020 (wwp). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Leave to be Relieved from Having to Serve Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 08/07/2020. (MG) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 226 MOTION for Recusal by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(pts) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 225 Partial OBJECTION as to #214 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 224 REPLY to Response to Motion re #180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 223 REPLY to Response to Motion re #176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #171 MOTION to Exceed Page, Word, and Type-Size Limits for Brief, filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 222 REPLY to Response to Motion re #167 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #168 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 221 Second and Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re #136 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for access to stored legal materials, by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 7/22/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 220 MOTION for Subpoenas or Preservation of Evidence, by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 7/22/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 219 MOTION to Supplement re #1 Complaint, by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 7/22/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 218 REPLY to Response to Motion re #174 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 217 REPLY to Response to Motion re #167 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #168 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 216 RESPONSE to Motion re #208 MOTION to Supplement the Record to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status and Dismiss with Prejudice, filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 215 REPLY to Response to Motion #174 MOTION to Amend re #1 Complaint, filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting Defendants' #169 Motion for Protective Order. Denying as moot Defendants' #209 Motion for Extension of Time, and #211 Motion Request for Telephone Status Conference. Defendants are hereby relieved from responding to any of Plaintiff's pending or subsequent motions and filings in this action, including those docketed on June 9, 2020, unless otherwise ordered to do so by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/23/2020. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 213 RESPONSE to #205 MOTION to Strike #182 Reply to Response to Motion, MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Waseem Daker, #206 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Waseem Daker, #198 MOTION to Strike #159 Reply to Response to Motion, #158 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Waseem Daker, #200 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Waseem Daker, #202 MOTION filed by Waseem Daker, #201 MOTION filed by Waseem Daker filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 212 Third MOTION to Amend and Supplement re #1 Complaint, by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 7/7/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #211 MOTION Request for Telephone Status Conference re #169 MOTION for Protective Order. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 211 MOTION Request for Telephone Status Conference re #169 MOTION for Protective Order by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 7/6/2020. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 210 RESPONSE to #195 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Waseem Daker filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #209 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond., (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 209 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond , by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Jordan) Modified on 6/15/2020 (ca). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 11, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #208 MOTION to Supplement the Record to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status and Dismiss with Prejudice. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 208 MOTION to Supplement the Record to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status and Dismiss with Prejudice by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #174 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 206 Third Renewed, Amended, and Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for access to photocopying by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 6/23/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 205 MOTION to Strike re #182 Reply to Response to Motion; MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply, by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 6/23/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 204 Sur REPLY as to #182 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re #164 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 202 Second MOTION For Access to Case Authorities by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 6/23/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 201 MOTION For 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) Certification by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 6/23/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 200 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re #137 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for law library access, by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 6/23/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re #163 MOTION for access to case authorities filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 198 MOTION to Strike re #159 Reply to Response to Motion, #158 Reply to Response to Motion, by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 6/23/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #1 Main Document (Corrected)) (MG). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 197 REPLY to Response to Motion re #166 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 196 REPLY to Response to Motion re #169 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 195 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 6/16/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 194 RESPONSE to #180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Waseem Daker filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 193 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren re #169 MOTION for Protective Order . (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 192 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #169 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 191 RESPONSE to #176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Waseem Daker, #177 Brief in Support/Opposition of Motion filed by Waseem Daker, #173 Declaration filed by Waseem Daker, #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Waseem Daker, #171 MOTION filed by Waseem Daker, #172 Statement of Material Facts filed by Waseem Daker filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 190 RESPONSE to Motion re #167 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #168 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #188 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #174 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Responses due by 6/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/18/2020. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #188 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #174 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 188 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #174 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 5/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Jordan) Modified on 5/15/2020 (ca). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #170 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #168 , #167 MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 6/2/2020. Defendants have timely filed responses and replies, docs. #182 , #183 , #184 , #185 , #186 , and, therefore, the Court DENIES as moot Defendants request as it applies to those responses and replies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/12/2020. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 186 RESPONSE to Motion re #166 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 185 RESPONSE to Motion re #163 MOTION re #148 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion for Access to Case Authorities filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 184 RESPONSE to Motion re #164 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 183 REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 182 REPLY to Response to Motion re #148 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Supplemental Declaration of Edwards and exhibits, #2 Exhibit B- Declaration of Jackson and exhibits)(Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE issued re: #180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/25/2020. (wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Main Doc) (wwp). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and MOTION for Permanent Injunction, alternatively, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or temporary restraining order by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 6/1/2020. Responses due by 5/25/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 179 NOTICE of Intent to File Replies by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren re #148 MOTION to Dismiss , #151 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE issued re: #176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/27/2020. #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on tier-II Segration-related claims. Responses due by 5/27/2020. Modified on 5/6/2020 (wwp). (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 177 Plaintiff's Brief in Support re #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on cellphone-related claims, MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/27/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) Modified on 5/6/2020 (wwp). Modified on 5/6/2020 (wwp). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on tier-II Segration-related claims, MOTION for Permanent Injunction, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/27/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) Modified on 5/6/2020 (wwp). Modified on 5/6/2020 (wwp). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 174 MOTION to Amend and Supplement re #1 Complaint, by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/20/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2020: #1 Part 2) (jrb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 173 DECLARATION by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 172 Statement of Material Facts by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 171 MOTION to Exceed Page, Word, and Type-Size Limits for Brief by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/20/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 4, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #169 MOTION for Protective Order , #170 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #166 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #164 MOTION for Sanctions, #160 Response to Motion, #165 MOTION to Certify Class, #167 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #163 MOTION (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 170 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #166 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #164 MOTION for Sanctions, #160 Response to Motion, #165 MOTION to Certify Class, #167 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #163 MOTION re #148 MOTION to Dismiss , #161 Response, #168 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 169 MOTION for Protective Order by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Weber, Jordan) Modified on 5/4/2020 (wwp). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 168 Second Renewed Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/12/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(jrb) Modified on 4/28/2020 (jrb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 167 Renewed, Amended, and supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for access to photocopying by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/12/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) Modified on 4/28/2020 (wwp). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 166 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or temporary restraining order by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/11/2020. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 165 MOTION to Certify Constitutional Challenges to U.S. Attorney General by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/11/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 164 MOTION for Sanctions by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/11/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 163 MOTION for access to case authorities re #148 MOTION to Dismiss by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/11/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 162 REPLY to Response to Motion re #138 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 161 Partial RESPONSE as to #148 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 160 RESPONSE to Motion re #151 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 159 REPLY to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 158 REPLY to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION to Sever filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE of Intent to File Replies by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren re #140 MOTION to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status, #139 MOTION to Sever . (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 156 RESPONSE to #150 MOTION re #135 MOTION to Stay filed by Waseem Daker filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 155 RESPONSE to Motion re #139 MOTION to Sever filed by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 154 RESPONSE to Motion re #140 MOTION to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status filed by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 153 DECLARATION by Waseem Daker and Proffer on unavailability of Administrative remedies. (wwp) Modified on 4/7/2020 (wwp). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #151 MOTION to Stay Discovery.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #148 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 4/16/2020. (MG) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re #148 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court orders Plaintiff to file a response either opposing or indicating his lack of opposition to these Defendants' Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 04/02/2020. (Attachments: #1 FRCP 12, #2 FRCP 41) (MG) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 151 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Brief in Support)(Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 150 Renewed MOTION to not stay discovery re #135 MOTION to Not Stay Discovery by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 4/15/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 4/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Attachment A- Declaration of Edwards, #3 Exhibit 1- GDC SOP, #4 Exhibit 2- Movement History, #5 Exhibit 3- Grievance History, #6 Exhibit 4- Grievance 176847, #7 Exhibit 5- Grievance 176848)(Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Alexander Weber on behalf of Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren (Weber, Jordan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 149 REPLY to Response to Motion re #135 MOTION to not Stay Discovery filed by Waseem Daker. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 146 MOTION to Withdraw #132 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 4/13/2020. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2020: #1 Correct image) (jrb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #139 MOTION to Sever and #140 MOTION to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status. Responses due by 4/6/2020. (MG) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file his desired responses to these motions #139 , #140 on or before April 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 03/26/2020. (MG) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to #139 Motion to sever and #140 Motion to vacate by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 143 Brief in Opposition re #137 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #138 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Wendell Fowler, Muriel Jackson, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 142 Brief in Opposition re #135 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Brief in Opposition Motion to NOT Stay Discovery filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Lisa Fountain, Wendell Fowler, Muriel Jackson, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 141 Brief in Opposition re #132 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Wendell Fowler, Muriel Jackson, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order (8 pages dated 10-18-19, Doc 264))(Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #140 MOTION to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #139 MOTION to Sever. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 140 MOTION to Vacate Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order and Final Report and Recommendation 103113, #2 Exhibit B Motion to Reconsider and Vacate Order 112213, #3 Exhibit C Petitioner's Objection to Magistrate's 103113 R etc, #4 Exhibit D Order (Doc 18) dated 060514, #5 Exhibit E LexisNexis Deed Record for Gwinnett County, #6 Exhibit F USDC Docket for 5:19cv126 Daker v Ward)(Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 139 MOTION to Sever by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Wendell Fowler, Muriel Jackson, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Sever)(Pontrelli, Paul) Modified on 3/5/2020 (ca). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for access to photo copying by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 137 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for law library access by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 136 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for access to stored legal materials by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 135 MOTION to Not Stay discovery by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) Modified on 4/1/2020 (jrb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint filed by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to #9 Amended Complaint. Responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended up to and including March 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 3/2/2020. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 132 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 3/10/2020. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren. Responses due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Jay Pontrelli on behalf of Betty Bailey-Dean, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Kilgore, Brian Owens, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren (Pontrelli, Paul) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 129 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Muriel Jackson. Muriel Jackson waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 128 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deloach. Deloach waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 127 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Freddie Davis. Freddie Davis waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 126 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Benjamin Warren. Benjamin Warren waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 125 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timothy Ward. Timothy Ward waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 124 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Toole. Robert Toole waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 123 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Taral Todman. Taral Todman waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 122 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wendell Fowler. Wendell Fowler waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 121 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Milton Smith. Milton Smith waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 120 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kilgore. Kilgore waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 119 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Betty Bailey-Dean. Betty Bailey-Dean waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 118 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Salgado. Salgado waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 117 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Owens. Brian Owens waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 116 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronnie Shuemake. Ronnie Shuemake waiver sent on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (Chalmers, Roger) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 115 MOTION to certify State Law questions to Supreme Court of Georgia by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION for access to case authorities by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION to not stay discovery by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION for leave to be relieved from having to serve Defendants by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION to Expedite start of discovery by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 110 Plaintiff's Partial OBJECTION to #99 Report and Recommendations and #99 Order by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 109 U.S. Marshal Return (Green Card) as to Betty Bailey-Dean, Brady, Dean Broome, Caravello, Aswon Cauley, Cowart, Crowder, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Wendell Fowler, Muriel Jackson, Kilgore, Lightsey, P. Murphy, Brian Owens, Ronnie Shuemake, Milton Smith, Ms. Strickland, Taral Todman, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren signed by B. Lane and Savannah on 1/13/20 and 1/15/20. (Attachments: #1 Part II)(jrb) Modified on 2/5/2020 (jrb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDERED that the order of the United States Court of Appeals for theEleventh Circuit is made the order of this Court. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/31/2020. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 107 MANDATE of USCA as to #63 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker for appeal number 19-15089. ORDER: Motion to voluntarily dismiss mandamus petition filed by Petitioner Waseem Daker is GRANTED. Motion for refund of the filings fees filed by Petitioner Waseem Daker is DENIED. Petition for writ of mandamus is MOOT due to the Court's Order being entered. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 106 USCA Mandate: Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Petitioner Waseem Daker is GRANTED by clerk. (evk) (evk). Modified on 1/28/2020 (jrb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 105 RESPONSE TO ORDER in reference to #99 Report and Recommendations, #90 Report and Recommendations filed by Waseem Daker. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 104 CONSENT by Prisoner Waseem Daker to collection of fees. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 2/9/2020. (evk) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 103 U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Stephen Nicolou for #9 Amended Complaint filed by Waseem Daker, #1 Complaint filed by Waseem Daker, #98 Order Directing USMS Service of Process on 01/13/2020. (evk) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #99 Order and Report and Recommendations. Objections to R&R due by 2/5/2020 re: #102 Order. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to the #99 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff shall file his desired Objections to the Report and Recommendation on or before February 5, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/8/2020. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Extension of Time to file objections to the #99 Report and Recommendation by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER of USCA as to #63 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. ORDER: Motion for reconsideration of single judge's order filed by Petitioner Waseem Daker is DENIED. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge re #8 , #10 , #11 MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within 14 days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2020). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/20/2019. (ca) Modified on 12/23/2019 (ca). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #98 Order due by 1/10/2020. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process the #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, and a copy of this Order upon Defendants King, Paul, Toole, Salgado, Lightsey, Sharon Brown, Strickland, Dobbs, Crowder, Caravello, McNunn, Nicolou, Silvers, Cowart, Brady, Wooten, Thurmond, Milton Smith, Owens, Ward, Jacobs, Bailey-Dean, Murphy, Shuemake, Todman, and Davis, Warren, Cauley, Kilgore, Henry, Deloach, Fowler, Deloach, Broome, Jackson. Plaintiff's claims and allegations require clarification in order to proceed. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to clarify his claims within 21 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/20/2019. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2019: #1 Prepared 285 forms) (ca). Modified on 12/20/2019 (ca). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2020: #2 GAS 398s and AO 399s - Notice and Waiver) (evk). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/20/2019. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 96 USCA ORDER: Accordingly, Daker's mandamus petition and motion will be DISMISSED without further notice unless the full filing fee is paid within 14 days of this order's entry. (evk) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 95 Appeal Remark re #63 Notice of Appeal: Certificate of Service. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying as moot #74 , #78 , #80 , #81 , #83 , and #86 Plaintiff's Motions for injunctive relief, but declines to sever and transfer Plaintiff's injunctive relief claims to the Middle District of Georgia. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/28/19. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 93 OBJECTION to #91 Order on Motion to Expedite by Waseem Daker. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 92 OBJECTION to #90 Report and Recommendations by Waseem Daker. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying #84 - #85 and #89 Plaintiff's Motions to Expedite Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/27/2019. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DENY Plaintiff's Motions for injunctive relief re: #72 - #74 , #78 , #80 - #81 , #83 and #86 . It is also RECOMMENDED that the Court sever Plaintiff's claims for declaratory and injunctive relief and TRANSFER those claims to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Georgia. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2019). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/27/2019. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION to Expedite 28 U.S.C. 1915A Review and Other Proceedings by Waseem Daker. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying #71 Motion for Recusal. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/8/19. (trb) Modified on 2/11/2019 (trb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of Address by Waseem Daker. (evk) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 16, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #78 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #85 MOTION to Expedite, #83 MOTION, #74 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #86 MOTION, #73 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #72 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #86 MOTION for Law Library Access. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 86 MOTION for Law Library Access by Waseem Daker.(trb) Modified on 10/25/2018 (trb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION to Expedite 28 U.S.C. 1915A Review and Other Proceedings by Waseem Daker. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION to Expedite by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro pursuant to standing Order in 1:18-mc-12. Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker-MJ no longer assigned to the case. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for Law Library Access by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Chief Judge J. Randal Hall no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/04/2018. (evs) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION for Access to Photocopying filed by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge R. Stan Baker.(trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION for Law Library Access filed by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge R. Stan Baker.(trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 79 Supplemental Citation of Authority in Support of #70 Brief in Support of Joinder. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 78 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 6/4/2018. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 77 MANDATE of USCA reopen the case and remanding to US District Court as to #38 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (evs) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/16/2018. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #70 Brief. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER of USCA as to #38 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. Before the Court is Appellant Waseem Daker's "Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order." In the motion, Daker, a prisoner proceeding pro se, asks the Court to issue a preliminary junction or temporary restraining order to restrain prison officials from forcibly shaving his beard. Daker contends that prison officials forcibly shaved his beard on March 23, 2018, and have threatened to forcibly shaving him again in a few weeks. Daker's motion was dated April 3, 2018 and docketed on April 6, 2018. Daker had previously asserted in this action that the defendants violated his constitutional rights by forcibly shaving him. Shortly after filing the complaint in this case, Daker filed a motion for a preliminary injunction raising this very issue. But the magistrate judge recommended that Daker's complaint be dismissed because he could not proceed in forma pauperis under the Prison Litigtion Refonn Act's ("PLRA") "three strikes'' provision, 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and because of improper joinder. Because Daker' s complaint was due to be dismissed, the magistrate judge further recommended denying Daker's preliminary injunction motion. The district court adopted the magistrate judge's recommendations, dismissed Daker's complaint without prejudice, and denied his preliminary injunction motion. On appeal, we issued an opinion-apparently on the same day that Daker's current motion was docketed -vacating the district court's order and remanding for futher proceedings. We explainted that the district court had erred in concluding that Daker had three or more strikes under the PLRA and that there was improper joinder. We vacated the district court's order dismissing the case and denying his motion for preliminary injunction. A party must ordinarily move first in the district court for a stay pending appeal. See Fed.R. App. P. 8(a). Although it appears that Daker moved for similar relief in the district court, the district court denied this relief after concluding that his action was due to be dismissed based the PLRA's "three strikes" provision or because of improper joinder. In light of this Court's opinion vacating the district court's judgment and remanding the case, Daker's "Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order" is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE so that he may refile this motion in the district court. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 74 Fourth MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/14/2018. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 73 SUPPLEMENT OF ENTRY #10 . Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/14/2018. (jrb) Modified on 3/28/2019 (trb [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 72 SUPPLEMENT OF ENTRY #8 . Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/14/2018. (jrb) Modified on 3/28/2019 (trb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Recusal of Judge R. Stan Baker and Judge J. Randal Hall by Waseem Daker. Responses due by 5/14/2018. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 70 BRIEF in Support of Joinder by Waseem Daker. (jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2018: #1 Correct image) (jrb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2018: #2 Signature Page) (jrb). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Change of Address by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 68 Appeal Opinion re #63 Notice of Appeal : Vacated and Remanded. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying #66 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 01/17/2018. (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 16, 2018 REQUEST TO USDC CLERK: Please promptly advise this office whether your court has entered an order concerning DE [ 66], motion for fee status re #63 Notice of Appeal. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
December 4, 2017 REQUEST TO USDC CLERK: Please promptly advise this office whether your court has entered an order concerning DE [ 66], motion for fee status re #63 Notice of Appeal. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Waseem Daker. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 65 Amended Notice of Appeal re #63 Notice of Appeal. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 64 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #63 Notice of Appeal Other Appeals : Yes; Judge Appealed: J. Randal Hall; Court Reporter: Lisa Davenport; Fee Paid: No; Pending COA/IFP: No. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal)(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #62 Order denying re #58 Motion for Relief from Judgment by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying #58 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/03/2017. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 5, 2017 F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re #48 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (trb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER deferring ruling on #58 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/03/2017. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 60 Mandate from USCA dismissing Appeal 17-10240 pursuant to appellant's motion to Dismiss as to Waseem Daker. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 9, 2017 Filing 59 Appeal Remark re #48 Notice of Appeal: PLRA Consent Form filed in the Eleventh Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(jlm) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 1, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION for Relief from Judgment by Waseem Daker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 30, 2016 Filing 56 Appeal Remark re #48 Notice of Appeal: Requesting status of motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (jlm) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 55 Appeal Letter requesting status of #44 motion re #48 Notice of Appeal. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 18, 2016 Filing 54 MANDATE of USCA Dismissing #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 26, 2016 Filing 53 Letter from USCOA inquiring into the status of the Motion for IFP. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER of USCA granting the motion to reinstate the #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Randal Hall for all further plenary disposition. Judge B. Avant Edenfield no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 8/16/2016. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 15, 2016 Filing 50 Appeal Remark - USCA correspondence to the District Court regarding a #44 MOTION for leave to appeal for the #48 Notice of Appeal. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 11, 2016 Filing 49 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #48 Amended Notice of Appeal on #22 Judgment and #21 Order on Motion and on Report and Recommendations. Other Appeals: Yes. Judge Appealed: Judge Edenfield. Fee Paid: No. Pending COA/IFP: Yes. (Attachments: #1 docket sheet and pleadings)(slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 48 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #22 Judgment and #21 Order on Motion and Report and Recommendations, by Waseem Daker. Amends Notice of Appeal #38 . (slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 47 SEE AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL #48 - AMENDED DOCUMENT by Waseem Daker. Amendment to #38 Notice of Appeal. (jlm) Modified on 8/11/2016 (slt). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER of USCA granting the motion to reinstate the #26 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 13, 2016 Filing 45 Appeal Notice reinstating #26 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Court Action-Consent Form)(ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 6, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 17, 2016 Filing 43 USCA Case Number 15-10144-E for #38 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER of USCA denying motion to consolidate, denying the motion to stay and denying the motions to reinstate appeal as to #26 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
February 6, 2015 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker pursuant to the standing order in MC215-3. Magistrate Judge James E. Graham no longer assigned to the case. (slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 20, 2015 Filing 41 USCA Case Number 15-10176-E (Three Strikes) for #38 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker, #35 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 15, 2015 Filing 40 Appeal Notice of docketing #38 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 15-10144-E. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 39 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #38 Notice of Appeal Other Appeals: Yes; Judge Appealed: B. Avant Edenfield; Court Reporter: Kelly Dorsey; Fee Paid: No; Pending COA/IFP: No. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Judgment, #3 Docket Sheet)(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #22 Judgment, #21 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Report and Recommendations, by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER of USCA as to #26 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 36 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #35 Notice of Appeal Other Appeals: No; Judge Appealed: B. Avant Edenfield; Court Reporter: Kelly Dorsey; Fee Paid: No; Pending COA/IFP: No. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 R&R, #3 Order, #4 Judgment, #5 Docket Sheet)(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #22 Judgment, #21 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Report and Recommendations, by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #28 Motion for Recusal; denying #29 Motion to Stay; denying #31 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 11/25/2014. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 33 USCA Case Number 14-15150 for #26 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER of USCA dismissing appeal as to #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION to Vacate #22 Judgment, #21 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Report and Recommendation by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of constitutional challenge to Federal Statute. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay proceedings by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION for Recuse Judge B. Avant Edenfield by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 27 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #26 Notice of Appeal, Other Appeals: Yes, Judge Appealed: Judge Edenfield, Fee Paid: No, Pending COA/IFP: No. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 13, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #22 Judgment, #21 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Report and Recommendations by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #23 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 11/4/14. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 29, 2014 Filing 24 USCA Case Number 14-14490 for #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Waseem Daker. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 21, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION to Vacate #12 Order denying IFP by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 9, 2014 Filing 22 JUDGMENT entered dismissing case. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #10 Motion for TRO; denying #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting re #13 Report and Recommendations and dismissing the complaint; denying #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #8 Motion for TRO; denying #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 10/9/14. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 6, 2014 Filing 20 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #19 Notice of Appeal. Other Appeals: No. Judge Appealed: Judge Edenfield. Fee Paid: No. Pending COA/IFP: No. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 6, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order by Waseem Daker. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
October 6, 2014 Filing 18 Second Supplemental OBJECTION to #13 Report and Recommendations by Waseem Daker. (bcw) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 30, 2014 Filing 17 Supplemental OBJECTION re #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 23, 2014 Filing 16 OBJECTION to #13 Report and Recommendations by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 23, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge to Federal Statute by Waseem Daker. (loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing service of #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: #8 , #10 & #11 MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order, and #1 Complaint & #9 Amended Complaint filed by Waseem Daker. Objections due 9/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 9/8/2014. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: Denying #8 , #10 & #11 MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order and dismissing Plaintiff's claims without prejudice re: #1 Complaint & #9 Amended Complaint filed by Waseem Daker. Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 9/8/2014. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 9/8/2014. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 19, 2014 Filing 11 THIRD MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge James E. Graham.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 19, 2014 Filing 10 SECOND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge James E. Graham.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
August 19, 2014 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sarah Barber, June Bishop, Brady, Dean Broome, Brown, Sharon Brown, Caravello, Aswon Cauley, Bruce Chatman, Cowart, Crowder, Freddie Davis, Deloach, Dobbs, Jane Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe, John Doe, Jesse D. Evans, Shevondah Fields, Lisa Fountain, Wendell Fowler, Georgia Department of Corrections, Patrick Head, Henry, Carl Humphrey, Muriel Jackson, Rick Jacobs, Robert E. Jones, Kilgore, King, Debbie King, Sharon Lewis, Lightsey, James McMillan, William McNunn, Lesley Medlock, P. Murphy, Torjka Nash, Stephen Nicolov, Michael Nupen, Brian Owens, John Paul, Toris Mclessia Rozier, Salgado, Ronnie Shuemake, Sicvers, Smith, James Demetrius Smith, Milton Smith, Mary E. Staley, Ms. Strickland, Three John Does, Thurmond, Randy Tillman, Taral Todman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward, Benjamin Warren, Tiffany Wooten, filed by Waseem Daker.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 21, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge James E. Graham.(loh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 10, 2014 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Waseem Daker. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
July 10, 2014 Filing 6 CONSENT by Prisoner Waseem Daker to collection of fees. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 10, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 7/8/2014 re: #5 Order. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - VACATED: see #12 Order. ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff to complete, sign and return both the Prisoner Trust Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk by July 8, 2014. Plaintiff advised of PLRA procedures. Failure to comply shall result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's case without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 6/10/2014. (csr) Modified on 9/8/2014 (csr). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
June 9, 2014 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Waseem Daker. REFERRED to Judge James E. Graham.(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 19, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 6/9/2014. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 19, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing fee deficiency for the #1 Complaint filed on 5/19/14. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 19, 2014 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT in support of Request to proceed in forma pauperis by Waseem Daker. Authorized withdrawal form. (wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]
May 19, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against June Bishop, Brown, Bruce Chatman, Deloach, Jane Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe, John Doe, Jesse D. Evans, Shevondah Fields, Lisa Fountain, Wendell Fowler, Georgia Deparment of Corrections, Patrick Head, Henry, Carl Humphrey, Muriel Jackson, Rick Jacobs, Robert E. Jones, Kilgore, King, Sharon Lewis, P. Murphy, Brian Owens, John Paul, Toris Mclessia Rozier, James Demetrius Smith, Milton Smith, Mary E. Staley, Three John Does, Randy Tillman, Robert Toole, Timothy Ward filed by Waseem Daker. (Attachments: #1 env)(wwp) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 9/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daker v. Head et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?