Castillo v. Harmon et al
Plaintiff: Jaime Yruegas Castillo
Defendant: L. Adeniyi, J. Moore, M. Nwude, W. Mackelburg, D. J. Harmon, D. McQueen, T. Hollinger, Moreno, Ms. Crosslee, A. Antoine, R. Gillard, S. Moore, K. Holley, L. Jackson, J. Winston, S. Coleman, L. Pointer and D. Martin
Case Number: 1:2020cv04380
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI)
December 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jaime Yruegas Castillo re #8 General Order. (aaq)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #5 ), allowing Plaintiff to proceed IFP, and Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $54.00 within 30 days from the date of this Order. However, Plaintiff is obligated to pay $350.00 as funds are deposited into Inmate account. The Warden or the designee shall collect the monthly payments and remit to Clerk until $350.00 is paid in full. During the pendency of his case, Plaintiff must keep the Clerk of Court advised of his correct address at all times. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to transmit a copy of this Order to the warden of the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated. Service of process shall not issue pending further consideration of the complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/1/2020. (tcc)
December 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jaime Yruegas Castillo, D. J. Harmon (Warden) re #7 Order. (tcc)
November 20, 2020 Submission of #5 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, #6 Amended Complaint, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (tcc)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jaime Yruegas Castillo.(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Jaime Yruegas Castillo. (ddm)
November 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jaime Yruegas Castillo re #1 Complaint, #4 Order, Forms sent to party: Affidavit and Authorization. (tcc)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. At this time, to amend, Plaintiff need do nothing more than sign the copy of the complaint that will be returned to him with this Order. Furthermore, Plaintiff has not paid the $350.00 filing and $50.00 administrative fees required for civil actions or submitted an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, he must provide a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, including a financial affidavit and certified prison account statement. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete and submit the application within 30 days of the date this Order is entered. During the pendency of his case, Plaintiff must keep the Clerk of Court advised of his correct address at all times. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward Plaintiff a copy of his previously filed complaint, (Doc. #1 ), and an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis stamped with the case number for this action, together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned upon receipt of the amended complaint and required fees or application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, or at the expiration of the aforementioned time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/2/2020. (tcc)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 -DOCKETED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE ENTRY-EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop) Modified on 10/30/2020 (eop).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/20. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jaime Yruegas Castillo re #2 Order. (eop)
October 28, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jaime Yruegas Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Harmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Adeniyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Nwude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Mackelburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. J. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Hollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Crosslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Antoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Yruegas Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?